Lewis v. Davis
Petitioner: Darren Glenn Lewis
Respondent: Kendall T Richerson and Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 1:2019cv00165
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 (Document Restricted) Unsworn Declaration filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to Allow Additional Pre-Trial Motions filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to Suppress Evidence Under Art. 38.071 and Motion for Hearing filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (**Clerk's note: motion for hearing referenced in prayer of document.) (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration) (jak)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 Administrative Record consisting of State court papers filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Attachments: #1 01 Pro-Se Notice of Appeal, #2 02 Pro Se Doc 7.26.18, #3 03 Pro Se Doc 8.1.18, #4 04 Pro Se Doc 8.6.18, #5 05 Pro Se Doc 8.10.18, #6 06 Pro Se Doc 8.15.18, #7 07 Trial Court's Certification of Defendant's Right of Appeal, #8 08 Written Plea Admonishments, #9 09 Judgment and Sentence, #10 10 MEM OPINION ISSD - 1118186CR-Lewis, #11 11 MEM OPINION ISSD - j18186CR-Lewis, #12 12 MEM OPINION ISSD (CR)_FILECOPY, #13 13 Opinion, #14 14 Stipulation of Evidence, #15 15 PD-0361-19 EXT PDR, #16 16 PD-0361-19 EXT PDR DENIAL, #17 17 WR-88,859-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 9-19-2018, #18 18 WR-88,859-01 ADDRESS CHANGE 10-24-2018, #19 19 WR-88,859-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 8-17-2018, #20 20 WR-88,859-02 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 11-7-2018, #21 21 WR-88,859-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-15-2018) (Todd, Patrick)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for Exculpatory and Mitigating Evidence filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Todd, Patrick)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Daniel Todd on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Todd, Patrick)
August 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Tue Aug 27 13:24:47 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Petitioner filed an "Order Appointing Counsel for the Appeal" #11 . The motion is denied. If a court determines that an evidentiary hearing is necessary to resolve the habeas petition, the court must appoint counsel. But "until the judge decides to hold a hearing, he has discretion over whether to appoint counsel." At this time, no hearing has been scheduled. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/27/2019) (jmc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (jak)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Consent by Darren Glenn Lewis to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Response Letter) (jak) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/16/2019) (jak).
August 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Tue Aug 13 14:59:57 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Pursuant to Special Order 3-331 the clerk is to reassign all cases assigned to Judge Cummings that do not appear on Exhibit A to the docket of US District Judge Wes Hendrix, and all such cases are to carry the suffix letter "H." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/9/2019) (lrl)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Electronic Service by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, re #7 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, #4 Order Transferring to Another Division, #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jak)
August 7, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Aug 7 13:51:24 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. Respondent is directed to file an answer to Petitioner's petition pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. No extensions will be granted. See Order for further details and instructions. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID added. Kendall T Richerson terminated. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/7/2019) (jak)
August 2, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4, 6. Fri Aug 2 13:10:25 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jak)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jak)
August 2, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Aug 2 11:46:57 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 1, 2019 New case number 1:19-cv-00165-C Lewis v. Richerson has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:19cv1812-G. Future filings should be made in the ABILENE division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order transferring case to the Abilene Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/1/2019) (rekc)
July 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed Jul 31 10:44:00 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darren Glenn Lewis. (Filing fee $5; receipt number 117881) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (rekc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darren Glenn Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kendall T Richerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?