Cummins v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Cummins
Defendant: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID and FNU Tucker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00180
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Tue Oct 15 09:50:22 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically.(jak).
September 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Sep 23 14:35:55 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PLRA Filing Fee Order. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee; however, plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee of of $350.00 remaining due in monthly installments as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/23/2019) (mmg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Jeremy Cummins. (mmg)
September 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Sep 4 16:17:16 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Jeremy Cummins must address the following deficiency: failure to pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis and certificate of his inmate trust account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 20 days. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/4/2019) (mmg)
August 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Aug 22 11:38:24 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jak)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeremy Cummins. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jak)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummins v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?