Henderson v. General Motors LLC

Plaintiff: Paris Henderson
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Interested Party: General Motors Company and General Motors Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2019xc00053
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Abandoned case - Case is not proceeding: Clerical error; wrong case transferred. If one or more judges was assigned, clerk to contact the Operations Assistance Team to request assignment card reconciliation. (twd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (jmc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:16-cv-03500. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
February 6, 2017 Interdistrict transfer to USDC ND/TX- Huntsville. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 2/6/2017, filed. (gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to USDC ND/TX- Huntsville. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Paris Henderson, filed.(Vaughan, Monica) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 31, 2017 Filing 9 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
December 14, 2016 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by General Motors LLC, filed.(Wade, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
December 14, 2016 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Motors LLC identifying General Motors Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Wade, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
December 14, 2016 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Paris Henderson, filed.(Vaughan, Monica) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 5 Supplemental BRIEF in Support of GM's Motion to Transfer Venue re: #3 Other Miscellaneous Relief by General Motors LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(Wade, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
December 6, 2016 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC, filed.(Wade, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 3 Defendant GM Motion to Transfer Venue/Other Miscellaneous Relief ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0541-17608404.) filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wade, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/10/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]
November 28, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th Judicial District - Harris County, case number 2016-74624 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17567762) filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Wade, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 4/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: General Motors Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Deron Lynn Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris Henderson
Represented By: Monica Celeste Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?