Ortiz v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Encarcion Ortiz
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 1:2020cv00136
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 Response to #8 Order filed by Encarcion Ortiz. (jak) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/29/2020) (jak).
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE, re: #8 Order, filed by Encarcion Ortiz. (jak)
June 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Wed Jun 24 10:32:27 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order: The Court has considered Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and his statement of inmate trust account and finds that it should be denied. Petitioner must pay the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order or the Court may dismiss this action without further notice. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/24/2020) (jak)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Petitioner filed a motion for appointment of counsel #5 and a motion for an evidentiary hearing #6 . As explained herein, the motions are denied at this time. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 6/24/2020) (jak)
June 18, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Jun 18 11:11:56 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing Requested "2254" filed by Encarcion Ortiz. (jak)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Encarcion Ortiz. (jak)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Encarcion Ortiz. (jak)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jak)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jak)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Encarcion Ortiz. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Encarcion Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?