Hayes v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Johnny Hayes
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 1:2021cv00186
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: John R Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 Summons issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration; Attorney General of the United States; Region VI, Social Security Administration; and U.S. Attorney. **Clerk's Note: Summonses, USM-285 and attachments hand delivered and emailed to USMS/Abilene usms.abilene-opsdesk@usdoj.gov. (amg)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. #4 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to complete Form USM-285 and issue summons to the Defendant. The Clerk is directed to provide (a) Form USM-285, (b) the completed summons, (c) Plaintiff's Complaint, (d) a blank Notice and Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge, and (d) a copy of this Order to the United States Marshal (USM) for service upon Defendant as provided in Rule 4(c)(3). The USM must, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, complete service upon Defendant as required by Rule 4(i). Although the Court has directed the USM to serve the Defendant, it is ultimately the Plaintiff's responsibility to ensure that the Defendant is timely served under Rule 4(m). A return of service which indicates that a defendant was not served is notice to Plaintiff of a defect in service. Once Plaintiff receives notice of a service defect, Plaintiff must attempt to remedy that defect. Once served, Defendant shall file a written answer or other responsive pleading as required by Rule 12. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 10/14/2021) (amg)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. The Court has considered the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Betty Herrera. Dkt. No. #5 . It is ordered that the application is granted. The Clerk of Court shall deposit the admission fee to the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. It is further ordered that, if the applicant has not already done so, the applicant must register as an ECF user within 14 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 10/14/2021) (amg)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The above-styled and -numbered civil action is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable John R. Parker, United Stales Magistrate Judge, for further proceedings. This case shall henceforth be numbered Civil Action No. l:21-CV-l86-BU. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/12/2021) (amg)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (amg)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12286599) filed by Johnny Hayes (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s)) (Herrera, Betty)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Johnny Hayes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Herrera, Betty)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet (ANSWER to Complaint) filed by Johnny Hayes. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Herrera, Betty) Modified on 10/8/2021 to change docket text from an Answer to Civil Cover Sheet. (amg).
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnny Hayes. (Herrera, Betty)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Johnny Hayes. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Herrera, Betty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Hayes
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?