Lewis v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: John Brown Lewis, IV
Defendant: Gov. Greg Abott, Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles, Ricky Bishop, James Hicks, FNU Sullivan, Maverick County Sheriff's Office, Greg Abott, FNU McNally, Taylor County District Attorneys Office and Taylor County Sheriffs Officers
Case Number: 1:2023cv00153
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO FILE COMPLETE AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Court directs the Clerk to unfile and return the latest amendment #22 , #23 , #24 , and supplements to Plaintiff. Finally, if Plaintiff wishes to maintain all of the claims he has asserted in different documents, he must, within 30 days of the date of this order, file a complete, final amended complaint. The Clerk will mail a prisoner civil-rights complaint form, marked "FINAL AMENDED" and with this cause number, to Plaintiff along with a copy of this order. Plaintiff's latest requests for appointment of counsel are denied. **Clerk's Note: Complaint form marked FINAL AMENDED mailed to Plaintiff. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/31/2023) (skf)
August 31, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:25. dkt nos. 22,23,24, and Final Amended complaint form mailed to John Brown Lewis, IV at Tarrant County Jail on Thu Aug 31 15:28:11 CDT 2023 (crt)
August 29, 2023 Filing 24 **UNFILED PER #25 ORDER.** Supplemental Document by John Brown Lewis, IV as to #19 Second Amended Complaint. (amg) Modified on 8/31/2023 (skf).
August 28, 2023 Filing 23 **UNFILED PER #25 Order** AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. **Clerk's Note: docketed per instruction of STAH/Judge Hendrix. (amg) Modified on 8/31/2023 (skf).
August 11, 2023 Filing 22 **UNFILED PER 25 ORDER.** MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (amg) Modified on 8/31/2023 (skf).
August 11, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. (amg)
August 11, 2023 Filing 20 Prisoner Consent by John Brown Lewis, IV to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (amg)
August 11, 2023 Filing 19 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greg Abott, Ricky Bishop, James Hicks, Maverick County Sheriff's Office, FNU Sullivan, Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. **Clerk's Note: docketed per instruction from STAH/Judge Hendrix. (amg)
August 3, 2023 Filing 18 Mail returned as undeliverable. #12 Order #11 PLRA Filing Fee Order received back from John Brown Lewis IV as Returned for Additional Postage. Address updated from last filed document, #13 . New address: #0321469 Tarrant County Jail 100 North Lamar Street Fort Worth, TX 76196. The current document has been re-mailed. (skf)
August 3, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12, and amended complaint form re-mailed to John Brown Lewis, IV at on Tarrant County Jail Thu Aug 3 11:47:01 CDT 2023 (crt) Modified on 8/3/2023 (skf).
July 26, 2023 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greg Abott, Maverick County Sheriffs Office, FNU McNally, FNU Sullivan, Taylor County District Attorneys Office, Taylor County Sheriffs Officers filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (skf)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. On July 24, 2023, the Court denied Plaintiff's prior request to amend his complaint and ordered him to file a complete amended complaint on the required form. Dkt. No. #12 . Plaintiff then filed a second motion for leave to amend his complaint, with the proposed amended complaint on the required form attached. Dkt. No. #13 . The Court finds that the motion should be granted. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's amended complaint with exhibits. The caption of this case is changed to Lewis v. Sullivan, et al. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 7/26/2023) (skf)
July 26, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. mailed to John Brown Lewis, IV at Tarrant County Jail on Wed Jul 26 16:09:41 CDT 2023 (crt)
July 25, 2023 Filing 15 Mail returned as undeliverable. #9 Clerk's Response Letter, #2 #3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party received back from John Brown Lewis, IV as Forward Time Exp. Address updated from last filed document, #13 . New address: Tarrant County Jail 100 North Lamar Street Fort Worth, TX 76196. The current documents have been re-mailed. (skf) Modified on 8/11/2023 to correct typographical errors (amg).
July 25, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant John Brown Lewis, IV. New address: Prisoner ID #0321469 Tarrant County Jail 100 North Lamar Street Fort Worth, TX 76196. **Clerk's Note: Dkt. Nos. #2 , #3 , 7 , #11 , #12 re-mailed to Plaintiff. (skf)
July 25, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment, #2 Additional Page(s)) (skf)
July 25, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3,7,11,12. and Amended Complaint Form mailed to John Brown Lewis, IV at Tarrant County Jail on Tue Jul 25 11:15:51 CDT 2023 (crt)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Plaintiff requested leave to amend his complaint, Dkt. No. #6 , and the appointment of counsel, Dkt. No. #5 . As explained herein, both motions are denied. However, Plaintiff will be given the opportunity to file a complete amended complaint within 30 days. The Clerk will mail a prisoner civil-rights complaint form marked "amended" and with this cause number, to Plaintiff along with a copy of this order. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 7/24/2023) (amg)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER. After reviewing the application, the Court orders the following: Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee because he lacks the requisite funds in his prison account to pay an initial fee; however, plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee of $350.00 under the PLRA. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 in monthly installments as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Clerk will mail a copy of this order to the inmate accounting office or other persons or entity with responsibility for assessing, collecting, and remitting to the Court the interim filing fee payments on behalf of inmates, as designated by the facility in which Plaintiff is confined. **Clerk's Note: docketed per instruction from STAH/Judge Hendrix. Not able to forward to current facility as Plaintiff has been released. *Clerk's Note: 07/25/2023- Mailed to Tarrant County Jail per 14 Notice of Change of Address. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 7/24/2023) (amg) Modified on 7/25/2023 (skf).
July 24, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 11, 12. and an Amended Complaint form mailed to John Brown Lewis, IV at 1017 Villa Dr. Fort Worth, TX 76120 on Mon Jul 24 15:15:11 CDT 2023 (crt)
July 19, 2023 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable. 7 Order, received back from John Brown Lewis IV as not deliverable as addressed. Address updated from last filed document, #9 . New address: 1017 Villa Dr. Fort Worth, TX 76120. The current document has been re-mailed. (skf)
July 19, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. remailed to John Brown Lewis, IV at 1017 Villa Dr. Fort Worth, TX 76120 on Wed Jul 19 11:48:35 CDT 2023 (crt)
July 18, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant John Brown Lewis, IV. New address: 1017 Villa Dr. Fort Worth, TX 76120. **Clerk's Note: #2 Notice and Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge, #3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party re-mailed to Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Response Letter) (skf)
July 13, 2023 Filing 8 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2 Notice and Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge, #3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party received back from John Brown Lewis IV as attempted- not known. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (skf)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER: Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2); 28 U.S.C. 1915A(a). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process will be withheld until judicial screening is complete, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel may be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until an answer is filed or until further order, (4) no amendments or supplements may be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 7/6/2023) (chmb)
July 6, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. mailed to John Brown Lewis, IV at Taylor County Detention Center on Thu Jul 6 14:07:48 CDT 2023 (crt)
July 5, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ricky Bishop, James Hicks, FNU Sullivan, Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skf)
July 5, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. (skf)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. (skf)
July 5, 2023 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skf)
July 5, 2023 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skf)
July 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Brown Lewis, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skf)
July 5, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,2. mailed to John Brown Lewis, IV at Taylor County Detention Center on Wed Jul 5 13:46:40 CDT 2023 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brown Lewis, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. Greg Abott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverick County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU McNally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor County District Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor County Sheriffs Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?