United States of America v. $10,000 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $10,000 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2018cv00155
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
0 Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
1 Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture/Penalty: Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/4/2018) (djs)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Tindall-DOJ, Mark)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $10,000 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Tindall-DOJ, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2018) (awc). Modified - attachment replaced with flattened document on 8/22/2018 (awc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $10,000 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,000 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mark Joseph Tindall-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?