Bishop v. Olsen et al
Plaintiff: Marvin L Bishop
Defendant: Marcia N Olsen, Keith A Olsen, Amarillo and Washington, DC Branches of the DEA and Marcia N Tiersky
Case Number: 2:2018cv00163
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amarillo and Washington, DC Branches of the DEA ; served on 10/16/2018. (vls)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 Summons issued as to Amarillo and Washington, DC Branches of the DEA, Keith A Olsen, Marcia N Tiersky, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (vls)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, TO ISSUE PROCESS, AND TO EFFECT SERVICE BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL - Based on the responses in the supporting affidavits, the Court is of the opinion plaintiff qualifies for in forma pauperis status. Thus, plaintiffs Motion for Permission to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [ECF 4 and 9] is GRANTED. (See Order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 10/2/2018) (vls)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marvin L Bishop (vls)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marvin L Bishop. (vls)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Keith A Olsen, Marcia N Tiersky, Amarillo and Washington, DC Branches of the DEA filed by Marvin L Bishop. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (vls) Modified text on 10/1/2018 (vls). (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/1/2018) (vls).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/19/2018) (djs)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marvin L Bishop. (awc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marvin L Bishop. (awc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Keith A Olsen, Marcia N Olsen filed by Marvin L Bishop. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (awc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Olsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia N Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarillo and Washington, DC Branches of the DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia N Tiersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin L Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?