United States of America v. Messer Construction Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Messer Construction Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00225
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
0 Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
1 Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Messer Construction Co., Inc. (awc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by United States of America. (Ray, Doug)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Messer Construction Co., Inc. filed by United States of America. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ray, Doug)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/11/2018) (djs)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Messer Construction Co., Inc. (awc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Ray, Doug)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Messer Construction Co., Inc. filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ray, Doug) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/28/2018) (awc). Modified - attachment 1 image replaced with flattened document on 11/28/2018 (awc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Messer Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messer Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Doug W Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?