Texas Farm Bureau Underwriters v. Deere & Company et al
Plaintiff: Texas Farm Bureau Underwriters
Defendant: Deere & Company, Western Equipment LLC and John Deer Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00244
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Contract: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2019. Plaintiff's counsel is to provide clarification to the Court on or before March 14, 2019 as Plaintiff's form of entity as related to diversity jurisdiction. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Jon C. (Kit) Gallini via phone; Defense - Chris Allen Blackerby via phone, Ben T. Zinnecker. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :44. (cmk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Defendant Deere & Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel. Defendant Deere & Co. may proceed in this case without local counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 2/21/2019) (Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Western Equipment LLC. Party Western Equipment LLC terminated. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/19/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: Please submit your proposed order for the following motion -- in modifiable Word or WordPerfect format -- to Fitzwater_Orders@txnd.uscourts.gov.: #10 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Western Equipment LLC. (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater).
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Western Equipment LLC (Farris, Thomas)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint Proposed Scheduling Order) by Deere & Company, Western Equipment LLC., Texas Farm Bureau Underwriters (Blackerby, Chris) Modified filers on 2/19/2019 (vls).
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Deere & Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blackerby, Chris)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/18/2019. FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3rd Floor, 205 E. 5th St. Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 1/14/2019) (vls)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/11/2019) (djs)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Western Equipment LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Farris, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Western Equipment LLC. (Farris, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (vls)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deere & Company. (Zinnecker, Ben)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 100th Judicial District Court, Hall County, case number 7918 filed by Deere & Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9673558) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7) (Zinnecker, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Farm Bureau Underwriters v. Deere & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Ben T Zinnecker
Represented By: Chris A Blackerby
Represented By: Chris Allen Blackerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Equipment LLC
Represented By: Thomas D Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deer Company
Represented By: Ben T Zinnecker
Represented By: Chris Allen Blackerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Farm Bureau Underwriters
Represented By: Jon C (Kit) Gallini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?