United States of America (IRS) v. Bowers et al

Plaintiff: United States of America (IRS)
Defendant: Bowers Family Limited Partnership, Trustee Amarillo National Bank, John Thomas Bowers, Jr. and Pamela K. Bowers
Case Number: 2:2019cv00028
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE -- Joint Proposed Scheduling Order Due Date: April 26, 2019; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: May 2, 2019 @ 11:00 a.m. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/19/2019) (awc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT AMARILLO NATIONAL BANK, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN THOMAS BOWERS, JR., TRUST, AS A PARTY TO THIS PROCEEDING re: #13 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Amarillo National Bank, as Trustee of the John Thomas Bowers, Jr., Trust, as a Party to this Proceeding. Thus, it is ORDERED that Defendant Amarillo National Bank, as Trustee of the John Thomas Bowers, Jr., Trust, has no interest in the property identified in the United States' Complaint. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Amarillo National Bank, as Trustee of the John Thomas Bowers, Jr., Trust, is dismissed from this case and excused from all future proceedings related to this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/18/2019) (awc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: Please submit your proposed order for the following motion -- in modifiable Word or WordPerfect format -- to Fitzwater_Orders@txnd.uscourts.gov.: #13 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Amarillo National Bank, as Trustee of the John Thomas Bowers, Jr., Trust, as a Party to this Proceeding filed by United States of America (IRS) (Senior Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater).
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Amarillo National Bank, as Trustee of the John Thomas Bowers, Jr., Trust, as a Party to this Proceeding filed by United States of America (IRS) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Herrin, Thomas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America (IRS). (Herrin, Thomas)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Thomas Bowers, Jr, Bowers Family Limited Partnership. (Smith, Brian)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by John Thomas Bowers, Jr, Bowers Family Limited Partnership. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Brian R Smith added to party John Thomas Bowers, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Brian R Smith added to party Bowers Family Limited Partnership(pty:dft) (Smith, Brian)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/26/2019) (djs)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John Thomas Bowers, Jr ; served on 2/22/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pamela K. Bowers ; served on 2/22/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bowers Family Limited Partnership ; served on 2/22/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amarillo National Bank ; served on 2/21/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amarillo National Bank, John Thomas Bowers, Jr, Pamela K. Bowers, Bowers Family Limited Partnership. (awc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses in a Civil Action filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s)) (Herrin, Thomas)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America (IRS). (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Herrin, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/12/2019) (awc). Modified - attachment 1 replaced with flattened document on 2/12/2019 (awc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America (IRS) v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America (IRS)
Represented By: Thomas M Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowers Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Brian R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Amarillo National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomas Bowers, Jr.
Represented By: Brian R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela K. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?