West v. Cobb

Plaintiff: David James West
Defendant: Alice Cobb
Case Number: 2:2019cv00058
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6, 7. (Copy of NEF showing case transferred also mailed) Wed Mar 27 13:37:16 CDT 2019 (crt)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (vls)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (vls)
March 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Mar 27 08:41:09 CDT 2019 (crt)
March 26, 2019 New case number 2:19-cv-00058-D West v. Cobb has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:19cv0675-L. Future filings should be made in the AMARILLO division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order transferring case to the Amarillo Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/26/2019) (mcrd)
March 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Mar 22 11:28:45 CDT 2019 (crt)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/22/2019) (svc)
March 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Mar 19 17:21:28 CDT 2019 (crt)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Alice Cobb filed by David James West. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number DS114833) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) Modified jury demand on 3/20/2019 (mla).
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (epm)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David James West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?