Lone Star Bank of West Texas et al v. Rabo AgServices Inc
Plaintiff: Lone Star Bank of West Texas
Defendant: Rabo AgServices Inc
Not Yet Classified: Robert L Jones and Case Admin Sup
Case Number: 2:2019cv00098
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Report and Recommendation to #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal or Withdrawal of Reference,,, (Longoria - TXNB, Sheree)
May 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Fri May 10 13:19:00 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER regarding procedure for report and recommendation of United States Bankruptcy Judge on #1 MOTION to withdraw the reference. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/10/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
May 8, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (vls)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of transmittal of motion for Withdrawal of Reference in < number 18-20126 to presiding judge. The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court. A link to the < is provided for your review. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: <. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Withdrawal of Reference, #3 Withdrawal of Reference) (Longoria - TXNB, Sheree)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lone Star Bank of West Texas et al v. Rabo AgServices Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabo AgServices Inc
Represented By: Michael R Johnson
Represented By: W Heath Hendricks
Represented By: Thomas C Riney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lone Star Bank of West Texas
Represented By: Matthew Scott Merriott
Represented By: Barbara A Bauernfeind
Represented By: Brad W Odell
Represented By: John Hunt Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Robert L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?