Sandoval v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Losaro Sandoval, Jr and Lasaro J Sandoval
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 2:2019cv00145
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lori Denise Brodbeck on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Brodbeck, Lori)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer. (nhp)
July 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Jul 18 13:47:37 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES. Respondent is directed to answer this petition within 70 days after entry of this Order. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/18/2019) (nhp)
July 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Jul 18 10:54:25 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Petitioner's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/18/2019) (Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno)
July 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of first page of file-marked petition also mailed to petitioner.) Tue Jul 16 15:08:33 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Losaro Sandoval, Jr. (awc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Losaro Sandoval, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (awc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Losaro Sandoval, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lasaro J Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Lori Denise Brodbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?