AgTexas, PCA v Foote et al
Plaintiff: AgTexas, PCA
Defendant: George Victor Foote, Jr.
Not Yet Classified: Laine S. Foote
Case Number: 2:2019cv00194
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Laine S. Foote ; served on 11/13/2019. (Cox, Roger)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to George Victor Foote, Jr ; served on 11/12/2019. (Cox, Roger)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 10/25/2019) (djs)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to George Victor Foote, Jr, Laine S. Foote. (awc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff AgTexas, PCA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Cox, Roger)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AgTexas, PCA. (Cox, Roger)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Victor Foote, Jr, Laine S. Foote filed by AgTexas, PCA. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10334259) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Cox, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AgTexas, PCA v Foote et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Victor Foote, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Laine S. Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AgTexas, PCA
Represented By: Roger S Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?