Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. King et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeremy J True and Shylla V King
Case Number: 2:2019cv00206
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Extend Time to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. The Court will enter an Amended Order to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference with a new deadline for the parties to submit a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, the new date of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, and other requirements after resolution of the issues raised by King's Request for the Clerk's Entry of Default as to Jeremy J. True (ECF 12). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/27/2019) (awc)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Extend Time to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moore, Linda)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by Shylla V King. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s)) (Young, J)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/10/2020. FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3rd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/17/2019) (nhp)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO OBTAIN LOCAL COUNSEL: Accordingly, within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, each party who is required to obtain local counsel shall file the entryof appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/17/2019) (nhp)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeremy J True ; served on 12/2/2019. (Moore, Linda)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jeremy J True. (nhp)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Linda) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 11/27/2019) (awc).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 11/15/2019) (djs)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shylla V King. (Young, J) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 11/13/2019) (nhp).
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Shylla V King. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney J Michael Young added to party Shylla V King(pty:dft) (Young, J)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Linda)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10378440) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet) (Moore, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy J True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shylla V King
Represented By: J Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?