Keenan v. Robin et al
Plaintiff: Ramona L Keenan and Michael R. Keenan
Defendant: John Doe LLC, Meredith C. Lubbock, Thomas Samuel Robin, Dustin Wayne Lubbock and Mary Margot Connor
Case Number: 2:2019cv00231
Filed: December 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Thomas Samuel Robin. (awc)
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION U.S. Marshall Service filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Hesse, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 18 Amended MOTION U.S. Marshall Service filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Hesse, David) Modified title on 2/11/2020 (awc).
February 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION U.S. Marshall Service filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Hesse, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION U.S. Marshall Service filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Hesse, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION U.S. Marshall Service filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Hesse, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Meredith C. Lubbock. (awc)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Mary Margot Connor. (awc)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Dustin Wayne Lubbock. (awc)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan. (Hesse, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan. (Hesse, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan. (Hesse, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan. (Hesse, David)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Ramona L Keenan, Michael R. Keenan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bradt, L)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPERLY ALLEGE CITIZENSHIP: No later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs must file an amended complaint that alleges diversity of citizenship as to all plaintiffs and defendants; otherwise, this action will be dismissed without prejudice for want of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 1/15/2020) (awc)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 1/6/2020) (daa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to #1 COMPLAINT. (Bradt, L) (Main Document 4 replaced with flattened document and corrected text on 12/26/2019) (nhp).
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Michael R. Keenan, Ramona L Keenan (Bradt, L) (Main Document 3 replaced with flattened doc on 12/26/2019) (nhp).
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Michael R. Keenan. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10498442) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bradt, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keenan v. Robin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith C. Lubbock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Samuel Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Wayne Lubbock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Margot Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona L Keenan
Represented By: David Christopher Hesse
Represented By: L T Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Keenan
Represented By: David Christopher Hesse
Represented By: L T Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?