Welch v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Billy Lane Welch
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 2:2020cv00132
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #10 Findings and Recommendation. (daa) Copy of page 1 & 6 mailed in SASE on 7/14/2020 (daa).
July 7, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Tue Jul 7 14:48:28 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/7/2020) (daa)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Billy Lane Welch re: #7 Briefing Order. (daa)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Brief in Support by Billy Lane Welch as to #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (daa) Modified on 6/30/2020 -- file-marked copy mailed to petitioner in SASE (awc).
June 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Jun 24 11:05:36 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEFING ORDER: Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to file a pleading entitled "Response to the Court's Briefing Order" advising the Court why the instant federal habeas application should not be denied. Petitioner shall file his response within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. Failure to fully and timely comply with this Order will result in the immediate recommendation that this case be dismissed without further notification. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/24/2020) (daa)
June 23, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Jun 23 14:59:19 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER WITHDRAWING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION: On June 22, 2020, the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge entered findings, conclusions and a recommendation to the United States District Judge, recommending therein that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by petitioner be dismissed for want of prosecution for failure to pay the $5.00 filing fee. On June 23, 2020, petitioner paid the $5.00 filing fee in this cause. Based upon the foregoing, this Court hereby WITHDRAWS its Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation to dismiss petitioner's habeas application. [ECF 5]. Motion terminated: #5 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/23/2020) (daa)
June 22, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Jun 22 12:43:38 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *W I T H D R A W N* See Dkt. #6 . FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Billy Lane Welch. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/22/2020) (daa) Modified text on 6/23/2020 (daa).
May 26, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue May 26 15:45:08 CDT 2020 (crt)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TEMPORARILY GRANTING PERMISSION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS PENDING SUPPLEMENTATION: Petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the entry of this Order in which to submit the request and data sheet, pay the filing fee to the United States District Clerk, or submit evidence that petitioner has authorized the institution to disburse the requisite funds from his trust account. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/26/2020) (nhp)
May 22, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. (Copy of 1st page of Petition also mailed to Petitioner) Fri May 22 11:21:38 CDT 2020 (crt)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Billy Lane Welch. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nhp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (nhp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Lane Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?