Turner v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: David Blake Turner
Respondent: Brian Collier-TDCJ Executive Director and Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 2:2020cv00164
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Michelle Manojlovich on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Manojlovich, Jessica)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO RESPONDENT TO FILE A PRELIMINARY ANSWER ON LIMITATIONS: Respondent is directed to file a preliminary answer on limitations within 70 days after entry of this Order. The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 7/1/2020) (nhp)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,, filed by David Blake Turner with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Clayton, Barbara)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Blake Turner. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $5; receipt number 0539-10931785) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Clayton, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Collier-TDCJ Executive Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Manojlovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Blake Turner
Represented By: Barbara Allison Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?