Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ortiz et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Victor Ortiz d/b/a Lupita's Restaurant & Bar and d/b/a Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar, Anastacio Ortiz d/b/a Lupita's Restaurant & Bar and d/b/a Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar, Maria D. Ortiz d/b/a Lupita's Restaurant & Bar and d/b/a Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar, Anastacio Ortiz doing business as Lupita's Restaurant & Bar doing business as Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar, Victor Ortiz doing business as Lupita's Restaurant & Bar doing business as Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar and Maria D. Ortiz doing business as Lupita's Restaurant & Bar doing business as Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar
Case Number: 2:2020cv00254
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anastacio Ortiz, Maria D. Ortiz, Victor Ortiz (Young, Jeremi)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Victor Ortiz ; served on 12/14/2020. (King, Jamie)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Anastacio Ortiz, Maria D. Ortiz, Victor Ortiz. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Jeremi K Young added to party Anastacio Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremi K Young added to party Maria D. Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremi K Young added to party Victor Ortiz(pty:dft) (Young, Jeremi)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT VICTOR ORTIZ #7 Motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/9/2020) (nhp)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Anastacio Ortiz ; served on 11/28/2020. (King, Jamie)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Maria D. Ortiz (daa)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default against Defendant, Maria D. Ortiz filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Proposed Order Entry of Default) (King, Jamie)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 Appendix in Support filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #7 MOTION Motion for Order of Substituted Service of Process on Defendant, Victor Ortiz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (King, Jamie)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION Motion for Order of Substituted Service of Process on Defendant, Victor Ortiz filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Maria D. Ortiz ; served on 11/3/2020. (King, Jamie)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 11/10/2020) (daa)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anastacio Ortiz, Maria D. Ortiz, Victor Ortiz. (nhp)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11302880) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Ortiz d/b/a Lupita's Restaurant & Bar and d/b/a Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anastacio Ortiz d/b/a Lupita's Restaurant & Bar and d/b/a Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria D. Ortiz d/b/a Lupita's Restaurant & Bar and d/b/a Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anastacio Ortiz doing business as Lupita's Restaurant & Bar doing business as Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar
Represented By: Audrey Sirmon
Represented By: Jeremi K Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Ortiz doing business as Lupita's Restaurant & Bar doing business as Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar
Represented By: Audrey Sirmon
Represented By: Jeremi K Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria D. Ortiz doing business as Lupita's Restaurant & Bar doing business as Lupita's Mexican Restaurant & Bar
Represented By: Audrey Sirmon
Represented By: Jeremi K Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?