Garcia et al v. Swift Beef Company et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Garcia, Jose Campos, Simon Garcia and Rebecca Garcia
Defendant: Jacob Montoya, Manny Guerrero, Ashley Henning, Swift Beef Company and Donna Estrada
Case Number: 2:2020cv00263
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING POTENTIAL DISCOVERY DISPUTES. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 1/5/2021) (awc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall be ready for trial on or before January 10, 2023. This is not a trial setting. Joinder of Parties due by 2/9/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2021. Pretrial Materials (Expert Witnesses) due by 1/14/2022 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 2/25/2022 by parties opposing affirmative relief. Discovery due by 6/24/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/15/2022. Summary Judgment/Dispositve Motions due by 7/29/2022. Motions Not Otherwise Covered due by 7/29/2022. The parties must file Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures on or before December 16, 2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 1/5/2021) (awc)
January 4, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held via video teleconference on 1/4/2021. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Joseph McGowen, Joe L Lovell; Defense - Alexander M Brauer, Adam Gregory Bell, Benjamin L Stewart, Matthew W Sherwood. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 0:41. (chmb)
December 30, 2020 Filing 21 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Jointly filed pursuant to the Court's December 9, 2020 Order by Swift Beef Company. (Brauer, Alexander)
December 29, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Donna Estrada, Manny Guerrero, Ashley Henning, Jacob Montoya, Swift Beef Company re: #11 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex A - Nick White Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex B - Alexander Brauer Declaration) (Brauer, Alexander)
December 23, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY filed by Donna Estrada, Manny Guerrero, Ashley Henning, Jacob Montoya re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendants (Brauer, Alexander)
December 23, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY filed by Swift Beef Company re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Brauer, Alexander)
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe L Lovell on behalf of Jose Campos, Christopher Garcia, Rebecca Garcia, Simon Garcia. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lovell, Joe)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Jose Campos, Christopher Garcia, Rebecca Garcia, Simon Garcia (Newsom, Timothy)
December 9, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Jose Campos, Christopher Garcia, Rebecca Garcia, Simon Garcia re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Arnold, Kurt)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Jose Campos, Christopher Garcia, Rebecca Garcia, Simon Garcia re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Arnold, Kurt)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO OBTAIN LOCAL COUNSEL: Within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, each party who is required to obtain local counsel shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Any party entering an appearance after the date of this Order who is required to obtain local counsel shall have twenty-one (21) days from the entry of such appearance to secure local counsel and file the entry of appearance of counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/9/2020) (daa)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING VIDEO RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/30/2020. VIDEO FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2021 03:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/9/2020) (daa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand filed by Jose Campos, Christopher Garcia, Rebecca Garcia, Simon Garcia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Arnold, Kurt)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 11/30/2020) (nhp)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Donna Estrada, Manny Guerrero, Ashley Henning, Jacob Montoya re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendants (Brauer, Alexander)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendants filed by Donna Estrada, Manny Guerrero, Ashley Henning, Jacob Montoya (Brauer, Alexander)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 Appendix in Support filed by Swift Beef Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Brauer, Alexander)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Swift Beef Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Brauer, Alexander)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Swift Beef Company (Brauer, Alexander)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Payment for #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,, filed by Swift Beef Company. ($400; Receipt number 0539-11351547). (Brauer, Alexander)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Individual Defendants' Consent re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,, filed by Donna Estrada, Manny Guerrero, Ashley Henning, Jacob Montoya, Swift Beef Company (Brauer, Alexander)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Swift Beef Company. (Filing Fee $400; receipt number 0539-11351547) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Ex. A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement Ex. B - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - Certificate of Interested Persons, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Index of Pleadings from State Court, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex D-1 Moore County Civil Docket, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex D-2 Original Petition, #7 Exhibit(s) Ex D-3 Notice of Appearance, #8 Exhibit(s) Ex D-4 Notice of Non-Suit of Sandy Dean, #9 Exhibit(s) Ex D-5 Defendants' Original Answer, #10 Exhibit(s) Ex D-6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #11 Exhibit(s) Ex D-7 Notice of Hearing, #12 Exhibit(s) Ex D-8 Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss, #13 Exhibit(s) Ex D-9 Defendants' Reply to Motion to Dismiss, #14 Exhibit(s) Ex D-10 Letter to Court, #15 Exhibit(s) Ex D-11 Order Denying Motion, #16 Exhibit(s) Ex D-12 First Amended Petition, #17 Exhibit(s) Ex D-13 Letter to Clerk) (Brauer, Alexander) Modified payment info on 11/12/2020 (nhp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Swift Beef Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Montoya
Represented By: Adam Gregory Bell
Represented By: Alexander M Brauer
Represented By: Benjamin L Stewart
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny Guerrero
Represented By: Adam Gregory Bell
Represented By: Alexander M Brauer
Represented By: Benjamin L Stewart
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Henning
Represented By: Adam Gregory Bell
Represented By: Alexander M Brauer
Represented By: Benjamin L Stewart
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Beef Company
Represented By: Adam Gregory Bell
Represented By: Alexander M Brauer
Represented By: Benjamin L Stewart
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Estrada
Represented By: Adam Gregory Bell
Represented By: Alexander M Brauer
Represented By: Benjamin L Stewart
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Represented By: Matthew W Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Garcia
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Traver
Represented By: Kurt B Arnold
Represented By: Roland Thomas Christensen
Represented By: Caj D Boatright
Represented By: Timothy D Newsom
Represented By: Joseph F McGowin
Represented By: Joe L Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Campos
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Traver
Represented By: Kurt B Arnold
Represented By: Roland Thomas Christensen
Represented By: Caj D Boatright
Represented By: Timothy D Newsom
Represented By: Joseph F McGowin
Represented By: Joe L Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Garcia
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Traver
Represented By: Kurt B Arnold
Represented By: Roland Thomas Christensen
Represented By: Caj D Boatright
Represented By: Timothy D Newsom
Represented By: Joseph F McGowin
Represented By: Joe L Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Garcia
Represented By: Claire Elizabeth Traver
Represented By: Kurt B Arnold
Represented By: Roland Thomas Christensen
Represented By: Caj D Boatright
Represented By: Timothy D Newsom
Represented By: Joseph F McGowin
Represented By: Joe L Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?