Dodds v. Autozone, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tricia Bopp Dodds
Defendant: Autozone West, LLC, Autozone Texas, LLC and Autozone, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00289
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referring Judge: Lee Ann Reno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REGARDING POTENTIAL DISCOVERY DISPUTES (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 2/18/2021) (daa)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/14/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2021. Pretrial Materials (Expert Witnesses) due by 8/13/2021 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 9/17/2021 by parties opposing affirmative relief. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. Summary Judgment/Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 12/31/2021. Motions Not Otherwise Covered due by 1/7/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2022 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 2/18/2021) (awc)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: The conference set for February 22, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 2/18/2021) (awc)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tracy E Kern. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 2/18/2021) (awc)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno for all further proceedings. Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/17/2021) (awc)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laurie M Riley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 2/17/2021) (awc)
February 17, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Autozone, Inc. for Autozone Texas, LLC. (James, Stephanie)
February 17, 2021 Filing 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (James, Stephanie)
February 17, 2021 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. re #20 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal) (James, Stephanie)
February 17, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal) filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (James, Stephanie)
February 17, 2021 Filing 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Order) (Kern, Tracy)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT and proposed scheduling order filed by Tricia Bopp Dodds. (Hommel, William)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Riley, Laurie)
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe L Lovell for William Hommel on behalf of Tricia Bopp Dodds. (Lovell, Joe)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly D Utsinger on behalf of Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Utsinger, Kelly)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendants' applications (ECF Nos. 12, 13) are DENIED. Defendants areORDERED to (1) obtain local counsel within 14 days as required by the local rules and (2) refile the applications for admission pro hac vice within 14 days. The Court will not grant leave to proceed without local counsel. (See order for further specifics.) re: #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice; #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 1/22/2021) (awc)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kern, Tracy)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Riley, Laurie)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO OBTAIN LOCAL COUNSEL: Within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, each party who is required to obtain local counsel shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Any party entering an appearance after the date of this Order who is required to obtain local counsel shall have twenty-one (21) days from the entry of such appearance to secure local counsel and file the entry of appearance of counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 1/19/2021) (awc)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING VIDEO RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE -- Joint Proposed Scheduling Order Due Date: February 18, 2021; Video Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: February 22, 2021 @ 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 1/19/2021) (awc)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laurie M Riley; denying #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tracy Elizabeth Kern. Defendants' Applications are DENIED for failing to comply with Local Rule 83.1 0(a). Defendants are ORDERED to comply with the rule and refile the Applications or file for leave to proceed without local counsel supported by good cause. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 1/19/2021) (awc)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Hommel, William)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11515322) filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) Attorney Tracy Elizabeth Kern added to party Autozone Texas, LLC(pty:dft), Autozone West, LLC(pty:dft), Autozone, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kern, Tracy) Modified text on 1/15/2021 (daa).
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11515020) filed by Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) Attorney Laurie M Riley added to party Autozone Texas, LLC(pty:dft), Autozone West, LLC(pty:dft), Autozone, Inc.(pty:dft) (Riley, Laurie) Modified text on 1/15/2021 (daa).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This action is hereby REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Reno for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 1/5/2021) (awc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. (awc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tricia Bopp Dodds. (Hommel, William)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Autozone Texas, LLC, Autozone West, LLC, Autozone, Inc. filed by Tricia Bopp Dodds. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11458404) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Hommel, William) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened document on 12/21/2020) (awc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodds v. Autozone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone West, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Jean James
Represented By: Tracy Elizabeth Kern
Represented By: Kelly D Utsinger
Represented By: Laurie M Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Texas, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Jean James
Represented By: Tracy Elizabeth Kern
Represented By: Kelly D Utsinger
Represented By: Laurie M Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Jean James
Represented By: Tracy Elizabeth Kern
Represented By: Kelly D Utsinger
Represented By: Laurie M Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Bopp Dodds
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Represented By: Joe L Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?