GW Equity LLC v. Xcentric Ventures LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff GW Equity LLC alleges that defendant Xcentric Ventures LLC, which operates the websites www.ripoffreport.com and www.badbusinessbureau.com, publishes false, misleading, disparaging and defamatory statements about plaintiff and its services. Plaintiff further alleges that defendant's websites contain discussions of intellectual property and proprietary information that belongs to plaintiff.

Plaintiff: GW Equity LLC
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures LLC, www.ripoffreport.com, www.badbusinessbureau.com and Edward Magedson
Case Number: 3:2007cv00976
Filed: June 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER RESOLVING OBJECTIONS AND AFFIRMING 241 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court concludes that the magistrate judge's October 8, 2008 order recommending the Court grant Defendant's motion for summary judgment is hereby AFFIRMED, and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Reed C O'Connor on 01/09/09) (lmp)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 180 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants for Intentional Spoliation of Relevant Evidence filed by GW Equity LLC. Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions should be DENIED. (See Order for specifics) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 10/8/08) (skt)
November 6, 2007 Filing 48
STIPULATION by GW Equity LLC and Proposed Order. (Cox, John)
November 2, 2007 Filing 44
Designation of Mediator by GW Equity LLC. (Cox, John)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43
SCHEDULING ORDER:Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2007. Discovery due by 5/12/2008. Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2007. Jury Trial set on the Court's three week docket for 11/3/2008 before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Motions due by 6/2/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2008. Pretrial Materials due by 10/20/2008. (see order for specifics) (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/19/07) (lmp)
October 9, 2007 Filing 42
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by GW Equity LLC, Xcentric Ventures LLC, Edward Magedson. (Cox, John)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41
ORDER denying GW Equity's 38 Unopposed Motion for leave to Take Immediate Discovery from Comcast Cable Communications, LLC ("Comcast"). The Court DENIES the motion because Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's request for a written statement of Comcast's position on the discovery request from a licensed attorney authorized to speak on behalf of Comcast. (See Order for specifics) (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/11/07) (skt)
August 29, 2007 Filing 40
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: The Joint Report shall be filed no later than 10 days from the date of the scheduling conference. See order for specifics. (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 08/29/2007) (axm)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39
ORDER denying 29 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Expedited Proceedings. (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on August 28, 2007) (jyg) Modified on 8/29/2007 (klm).
August 22, 2007 Filing 37
ANSWER to Complaint by Xcentric Ventures LLC, Edward Magedson (Speth, Maria)
August 15, 2007 Filing 35
Proof of Service for Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Cingular Wireless on 08/09/07. (lmp)
August 13, 2007 Filing 34
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Xcentric Ventures LLC, www.ripoffreport.com, www.badbusinessbureau.com, Edward Magedson re 29 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Proceedings (Speth, Maria)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33
ORDER denying 18 Defendant Xcentric Ventures LLC and Ed Magedson's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 08/07/2007) (axm) Modified on 8/8/2007 (klm).
August 6, 2007 Filing 32
Proof of Service for Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Legal Deparment at Road Runner by serving Carolyn Gold-Herrera on 07/26/07 @1:45pm. (lmp)
August 3, 2007 Filing 31
Proof of Service for Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Legal Dept. AT&T Inc on 07/31/07. (lmp)
July 31, 2007 Filing 30
Proof of Service for Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Comcast Corporation on 07/18/07. (lmp)
July 27, 2007 Filing 29
Emergency MOTION to Expedite Proceedings by GW Equity LLC (Cox, John)
July 24, 2007 Filing 28
Affidavit of Service for Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Time Warner Cable on 07/17/07. (lmp)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27
ORDER denying 1 Application for Injunctive Relief; denying 6 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief; denying as moot 10 Motion to Substitute Service of Process; denying as moot 13 Motion to Strike Declaration of Edward Magedson; denying 15 Second Motion for Leave to File Supplement Application for Emergency Injunctive Relief; denying as moot 20 Motion to Strike. (see order for specifics) (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 06/27/2007) (axm)
June 25, 2007 Filing 26
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by GW Equity LLC re 20 MOTION to Strike Hearsay Contained in the Affidavit of Ryan Binkley and Supplemental Affidavit of Ryan Binkley (Cox, John)
June 21, 2007 Filing 19
Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by GW Equity LLC, Edward Magedson, Xcentric Ventures LLC, www.badbusinessbureau.com, and www.ripoffreport.com. (Cox, John) Modified text on 6/21/2007 (axm).
June 14, 2007 Filing 14
Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Maria Crimi Speth for Xcentric Ventures LLC www.ripoffreport.com and www.badbusinessbureau.com. (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 06/14/2007) (axm) Modified text on 6/18/2007 (axm).
June 12, 2007 Filing 9
Notice of Manual Filing by all defendants (Seeburger, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/13/2007 (axm).
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5
ORDER: Plaintiff's 1 Application for a preliminary injunction hearing is GRANTED in part; accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to appear before this Court on Thursday, June 14, 2007 at 10:15 a.m. for a preliminary injunction hearing. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's application in so far as it seeks an ex parte TRO. Plaintiff shall promptly serve (1) the Original Complaint for Damages and Emergency Application Injunctive Relief and (2) this Order on Defendants and all necessary parties. See order for details. (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on June 6, 2007) (jyg)
June 4, 2007 Filing 4
Standing Order Designating Case for ECF - see order for specifics. (Signed by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 06/04/2007) (axm)
June 1, 2007 Filing 3
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GW Equity LLC. (axm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GW Equity LLC v. Xcentric Ventures LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GW Equity LLC
Represented By: John T Cox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures LLC
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.ripoffreport.com
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.badbusinessbureau.com
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Magedson
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?