Hill v. Hunt et al
Plaintiff: Albert G Hill, III
Defendant: Lyda Hill, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr Trust Estate, Tom Hunt, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne, Alinda H Wikert, Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, Albert G Hill, Jr, Carol E. Irwin, William Schilling, Brett Ringle, John W Creecy, Margaret Keliher and William Herbert Hunt
Petitioner: Shamoun & Norman, LLP, Tom M Dees, III, Ellen Flowers, PBL Multi-Strategy Fund LP, Wilmington Trust NA, Eliot Shavin, Joyce Waller, Albert G. Hill, IV, Nance Hill, Michael V Bourland, Joyce E. Waller and Stewart H Thomas
Respondent: The Aldous Law Firm, Albert G. Hill, III and R. Dean Gresham
Intervenor Plaintiff: Erin Nance Hill, Melrose Properties, LLC, THH Properties Limited Partnership, Aldous Law Firm, Charla Aldous, PC, Law Offices of Stephen F. Malouf, PC, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership, Stephen Malouf, Lisa Blue, Charla Aldous, Baron & Blue and D&B Thompson Investments, LP
Trustee: Peggy Allison, Regions Bank, Chester Donnally, Larry E. Jacobs, Danny Bowlin and Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A.
Interested Party: XTO Energy Inc., Jonathan Nockels, David Evans, Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP, Brent Walker, Gresham PC and Ron Cresswell
Guardian Ad Litem: Guardian Ad Litem
Intervenor: Calloway Norris Burdette & Weber PLLC, Blind Faith Speculation LLC and Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP
Receiver: Daniel L Jackson
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2007cv02020
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2009 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #2003 Motion for Leave to File, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G. Hill, IV (Spencer, Blake)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2008 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #2003 Motion for Leave to File, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Carol E. Irwin, Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.), Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Dees, Tom)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order The clerk declines to issue summons at this time per U.S. District Judge re: #2006 , #2007 Requests for Clerk to issue Summons. (axm) Modified text on 1/11/2021 (svc).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2007 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in Civil Action filed by Albert G. Hill, IV. (Spencer, Blake)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2006 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in Civil Action filed by Albert G. Hill, IV. (Spencer, Blake)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2005 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2004 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, the deadline for any response to the Grandchildren's Motion for Leave to File Their MotionTo Enforce Final Judgment and Global Settlement Agreement and For Other Relief is 1/15/2021. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/31/2020) (chmb)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2004 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Grandchildren's Motion for Leave filed by Carol E. Irwin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael J Lang added to party Carol E. Irwin(pty:dft) (Lang, Michael)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2003 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Enforce and Brief filed by Albert G. Hill, IV (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s)). Party Albert G. Hill, IV added. Attorney Zachary E Johnson added to party Albert G. Hill, IV (Johnson, Zachary) Modified security on 1/8/2021 to seal documents per relief requested in title of motion (ctf).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2001 ORDER: The court will rule on the Sisters outstanding request for additional fees and costs, as requested in Document #1993 , as expeditiously as possible, taking into account the inherent delays caused by the COVID-19 Pandemic (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/14/2020) (svc)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2002 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam A. Lindsay: Telephone Conference held on 9/24/2020. Attorney Appearances: William Moore; Tom Dees, Brian Mason. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:00. (chmb)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2000 ORDER: To clear up issues regarding the limited remand, the court will hold a telephone conference on September 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/18/2020) (svc)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1999 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1998 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Accordingly, the court allows McGuireWoods LLP and Thomas M. Farrell to withdraw as counsel for Albert G. Hill, III and they are relieved of any further obligation to or representative of Albert G. Hill, III in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/18/2020) (chmb)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1998 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Farrell, Thomas)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1997 ORDER: IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the relief requested in the #1996 Motion is hereby granted, the Proposed Transaction as contemplated by the Al III Trusts Agreement is hereby approved, and the Executor is hereby authorized to engage in the Proposed Transaction according to the terms set forth in the Motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 6/24/2020) (svc)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1996 JOINT MOTION SEEKING APPROVAL OF ASSET TRANSACTION CONTEMPLATED BY THE COURTS NOVEMBER 8, 2010 FINAL JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Albert G Hill, III, Lyda Hill, Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) (svc) (Main Document 1996 replaced on 6/24/2020) (svc).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1995 ORDER granting #1994 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 6/23/2020) (svc)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1994 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion Seeking Approval of Asset Transaction Contemplated by the Court's November, 8, 2010 Final Judgment filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion Seeking Approval of Asset Transaction, #8 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Leave to File) (Moore, William)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1993 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.), Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne re #1927 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1935 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, Second Supplement to ECF 1927: Brief in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to ECF 1919. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Dees, Tom)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1992 REVISED Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re #1925 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert G Hill, III. (svc)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1991 ORDER denying #1990 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/10/2020) (svc)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1990 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) (Farrell, Thomas)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1989 Memorandum Opinion and Order Denies #1965 Motion to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant. The court directs the clerk of court to file a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order in Civil Action Nos. 3:07-CV-2020-L-BK and 3:10-CV-2269-L-BK. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/21/2020) (ndt)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1988 ORDER denying as moot sealed and/or ex parte motion #1959 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/11/2020) (svc)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1987 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney William J Moore on behalf of Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Moore, William)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1986 NOTICE of Joint Notice Regarding Paragraph 43 of the Court's November 8, 2010 Final Judgment re: 999 xx (retired) Sealed Order, filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Moore, William)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1985 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William J Moore on behalf of Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moore, William)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1984 ORDER Accepting #1978 Findings and Recommendation. The court awards Keliher reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $27,378.50 and costs in the amount of $15. Interest shall accrue on the amount of this award from the date of entry of this order at the applicable federal rate of 1.63% until it is paid in full. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/16/2019) (axm)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1983 Appendix in Support re #1982 AL III's OPPOSITION TO ECF NO. 1965 AND INCORPORATED BRIEF. (ndt)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1982 AL III's OPPOSITION TO ECF NO. #1965 AND INCORPORATED BRIEF. (ndt)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1981 HILL JR. DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ECF #1965 , #1966 (ndt)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1980 ORDER granting in part and denying in part sealed and/or ex parte motion #1979 . The court grants the motion with respect to the Hill Jr. Defendants' request for leave to exceed the 10-page limitation for a reply brief by no more than six (6) pages. The court, however, denies the motion with respect to the Hill Jr. Defendants' request for leave to file the reply brief under seal. The court directs the Clerk of Court to docket the Hill Jr. Defendants' Reply in Support of ECF #1966 (Doc. [1979-1]). In reviewing the docket sheet, the court notes that, in its September 20, 2019 Order (Doc. #1974 ), while granting Albert G. Hill, III's request to exceed the page limitations in his response to the Hill Jr. Defendants' motion, it omitted to direct the Clerk of Court to docket "Al III's"Opposition to ECF No. 1965 (Doc. [1972-1]) and Appendix in Support (Doc. [1972-1]). Accordingly, the court hereby directs the Clerk of Court to docket Al III's Opposition to ECF No. #1965 (Doc. [1972-1]) and Appendix in Support (Doc. [1972-1]). Finally, the court directs the Clerk of Court to remove the seal on its September 20, 2019 Order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/8/2019) (ndt)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1979 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation with Their Reply in Support of ECF 1966 and to File Their Reply Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.), Elisa M Summers, Joyce Waller, Heather V Washburne, Alinda H Wikert (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of ECF 1966, #2 Proposed Order) (Gruber, G)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1978 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to the District Judge's #1940 Amended Order of Reference, Margaret Keliher, as Independent Executor of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr., Deceased's, Application and Brief in Support of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Court's 12/10/2018 Memorandum Opinion and Order (ECF #1920 ) is before the Court for a recommended disposition. Keliher should be awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $27,378.50 and costs in the amount of $15.00. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/30/2019) (ndt) Modified text on 10/5/2019 (axm).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1977 DECLARATION OF CRAIG D. BELL filed by Albert G Hill, III. (axm)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1976 NOTICE REGARDING DECISION IN FORMER TAX COURT LITIGATION filed by Albert G Hill, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (axm)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1975 NOTICE REGARDING TAX COURT LITIGATION filed by Albert G Hill, III. (axm)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1974 (Document Restricted) SEALED ORDER granting #1954 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Notice; granting #1963 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Notice; granting #1972 Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitations; granting #1973 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Declaration Regarding Tax Suit. The cou rt directs the clerk of court to file Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Tax Court Litigation (Doc. 1954-1); Notice Regarding Decision in Former Tax Court Litigation (Docs. 1963-1 and 1963-2); and the Declaration of Craig D. Bell (Doc. 1973-1). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/20/2019) (axm)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1973 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration Regarding Tax Suit filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1972 MOTION To Exceed Page Limitations, MOTION for Leave to File AL III's Opposition to ECF No. 1965 and Incorporated Brief () filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Al III's Opposition to ECF No. 1965 and Incorporated Brief, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Appendix in Support of Al III's Opposition to ECF No. 1965 and Incorporated Brief, #3 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1971 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1959 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Settlement Agreement (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/11/2019) filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) (Mason, Brian)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1970 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support of: #1969 Sealed Response and Brief in Opposition to #1959 Sealed Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Settlement Agreement filed by Albert G Hill, III. (zkc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1969 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Brief in Opposition to #1959 Sealed Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Settlement Agreement filed by Albert G Hill, III. (zkc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1968 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #1961 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Response and Brief in Opposition to ECF NO. 1959 and Evidentiary Appendix and (2) Motion to Exceed Page Limitations. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/31/2019) (zkc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1967 Appendix in Support filed by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher, Elisa M Summers, Joyce E. Waller, Heather V Washburne re #1965 MOTION to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation. (zkc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1966 Brief in Support filed by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher, Elisa M Summers, Joyce E. Waller, Heather V Washburne re #1965 MOTION to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation. (zkc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1965 MOTION to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation filed by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher, Elisa M Summers, Joyce Waller, Heather V Washburne. (zkc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1964 ORDER granting #1956 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III From Vexatious Litigation, Brief in Support, and Appendix in Support, and Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/31/2019) (zkc)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1963 MOTION for Leave to File to File Tax Notice filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Thomas)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1962 REPLY filed by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.), Elisa M Summers, Joyce Waller, Heather V Washburne re: #1956 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal its Motion to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) (Gruber, G)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1961 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Additional Page(s) Exhibit B Appendix, #3 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1960 OBJECTION filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1956 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal its Motion to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) (Farrell, Thomas)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1959 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Settlement Agreement filed by Margaret Keliher (Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.). (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Appendix in Support) (zkc)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1958 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #1953 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/11/2019) (zkc)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1957 (Document Restricted) Sealed Order: Motion for Leave to File Notice of Withdrawal of Emergency Motion for Leave to Produce Certain Material is granted and Sealed motion #1951 is withdrawn. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/11/2019) (svc)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1956 Motion for Leave to File its Motion to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation filed by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher (Individually and in her capacity as Trustee of the MHTE and a member of the Advisory Board of the HHTE), Elisa M Summers, Joyce Waller, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Motion to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation, #2 Brief in Support of its Motion to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation, #3 Appendix in Support of its Motion to Enjoin Vexatious Litigant Albert G. Hill, III from Vexatious Litigation, #4 Proposed Order) (Gruber, G) Modified security description per attorney on 6/7/2019 (ykp).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1955 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Withdrawal of Emergency Motion for Leave to Produce Certain Material Currently Under Seal filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Thomas) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (svc).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1954 MOTION for Leave to File Notice Regarding Tax Court Litigation filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Notice Regarding Tax Court Litigation, #2 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Thomas)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1953 (Document Restricted) Motion for leave to file under seal its: (1) Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement; Application for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction; and Motion for Show Cause Order; (2) Brief in Support; and (3) Evidentiary Appendix in Support (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) (Attachments: #1 Motion to Enforce, #2 Brief in Support, #3 Appendix in Support, #4 Proposed Order) (Gruber, G)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1952 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1951 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion filed by Albert G Hill, III. (rekc)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1951 (Document Restricted) Emergency Motion for Leave to Produce Certain Material Currently Under Seal and Incorporated Brief in Support filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (rekc)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1950 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #1949 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/23/2019) (rekc)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1949 (Document Restricted) Emergency Motion (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Thomas)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SEALED Record on Appeal for USCA5 18-11633 (related to #1925 appeal): transmitted to H Scott Hastings on disk only by hand delivery. (svc)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1948 ORDER of USCA as to #1925 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert G Hill, III. Appellees unopposed motion to view and obtain sealed documents is GRANTED. (svc)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Sealed Record on Appeal for USCA5 18-11633 (related to #1925 appeal): transmitted to McGuireWoods LLP on disk only by mail. (svc)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1947 ORDER of USCA as to #1925 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert G Hill, III. Granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellant Mr. Albert G. Hill, III (svc)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 18-11633 (related to #1925 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 21 Volume(s) electronic transcript, 1 flash driveof exhibits, and Sealed or ex parte electronic document number(s): 10, 24, 29, 122, 123, 268, 378, 379, 382, 395, 396, 397, 406, 407, 410, 412, 413, 419, 421, 440, 458, 465, 475, 502, 525, 575, 636, 637, 714, 787, 824, 879, 880, 884, 886, 891, 892, 895, 896, 899, 905, 906, 908, 910, 913, 916, 917, 920, 921, 922, 924, 926, 927, 929, 930, 932, 933, 934, 935, 936, 937, 938, 939, 940, 941, 942, 943, 944, 945, 946, 947, 948, 949, 950, 951, 952, 953, 954, 955, 956, 957, 958, 959, 960, 961, 962, 963, 964, 965, 968, 972, 973, 974, 975, 976, 978, 979, 980, 981, 983, 985, 987, 988, 989, 990, 991, 992, 993, 995, 999, 1000, 1004, 1006, 1007, 1009, 1010, 1011, 1013, 1016, 1018, 1020, 1021, 1023, 1025, 1027, 1028, 1030, 1031, 1033, 1035, 1036, 1038, 1040, 1041, 1042, 1043, 1046, 1050, 1051, 1052, 1053, 1054, 1055, 1056, 1058, 1059, 1060, 1061, 1062, 1063, 1064, 1066, 1068, 1070, 1071, 1072, 1073, 1074, 1075, 1076, 1077, 1078, 1079, 1080, 1081, 1082, 1083, 1084, 1086, 1087, 1089, 1090, 1091, 1092, 1093, 1094, 1096, 1098, 1099, 1100, 1102, 1112, 1113, 1114, 1115, 1116, 1124, 1126, 1130, 1131, 1133, 1134, 1147, 1148, 1149, 1150, 1155, 1156 ,1157, 1159, 1160, 1161, 1162, 1165, 1166, 1167, 1168, 1169, 1170 ,1171, 1172, 1173, 1174, 1176, 1177, 1179, 1181, 1182, 1183, 1184 ,1190, 1192, 1195, 1196, 1197, 1198, 1199, 1200, 1202, 1203, 1204, 1205, 1206, 1207, 1214, 1215, 1216, 1217, 1221, 1222, 1223, 1224, 1225, 1226, 1227, 1228, 1229, 1242, 1243, 1245, 1246, 1248, 1250, 1251, 1252, 1253, 1256, 1257, 1263, 1264, 1265, 1266, 1267, 1268, 1269, 1270, 1271, 1272, 1273, 1274, 1275, 1278, 1279, 1280, 1281, 1283, 1284, 1285, 1287, 1288, 1289, 1291, 1292, 1294, 1297, 1298, 1299, 1300, 1303, 1304, 1307, 1308, 1310, 1311, 1312, 1313, 1317, 1321, 1324, 1325, 1326, 1328, 1329, 1333, 1334, 1336, 1337, 1338, 1340, 1341, 1343, 1346, 1348, 1349, 1350, 1351, 1353, 1354, 1355, 1356, 1357, 1359, 1362, 1368, 1370, 1371, 1372, 1376, 1377, 1378, 1379, 1389, 1390, 1393, 1394, 1395, 1396, 1397, 1399, 1400, 1401, 1403, 1404, 1405, 1407, 1409, 1410, 1411, 1412, 1414, 1415, 1416, 1417, 1418, 1419, 1420, 1421, 1422, 1423, 1424, 1425, 1427, 1429, 1432, 1436, 1437, 1438, 1439, 1440, 1441, 1444, 1445, 1446, 1447, 1448, 1450, 1452, 1453, 1454, 1455, 1457, 1458, 1459, 1461, 1462, 1465, 1472, 1474, 1483, 1487, 1489, 1490, 1492, 1494, 1495, 1496, 1497, 1498, 1499, 1500, 1501, 1502, 1503, 1504, 1506, 1507, 1511, 1513, 1514, 1515, 1516, 1517, 1519, 1520, 1521, 1522, 1523, 1524, 1526, 1529, 1530, 1531, 1532, 1533, 1534, 1535, 1536, 1537, 1540, 1541, 1542, 1543, 1546, 1547, 1549, 1554, 1556, 1561, 1564, 1565, 1569, 1573, 1577, 1578, 1589, 1614, 1628, 1651, 1670, 1696, 1697, 1700, 1703, 1735, 1736, 1741, 1742, 1745, 1747, 1751, 1752, 1754, 1755, 1758, 1763, 1766, 1767, 1768, 1779, 1780, 1781, 1782, 1785, 1788, 1794, 1820, 1821, 1825, 1826, 1827, 1832, 1833, 1839, 1841, 1847, 1849, 1851, 1852, 1853, 1855, 1857, 1859, 1863, 1864, 1865, 1866, 1867, 1868, 1869, 1870, 1876, 1877, 1878, 1880, 1881, 1884, 1886, 1889, 1890, 1893, 1894, 1895, 1900, 1901, 1913, 1916 (circuit approval is required for access). PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (epm) Modified on 3/20/2019 (epm). Modified text on 3/21/2019 (svc).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order USB of Exhibits Admitted at Hearing re #1925 Notice of Appeal. Exhibits are available for public inspection at the clerk's office. (svc)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1946 Received letter from USCA5: No court report acknowledgment received from Charyse Crawford. (epm)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1945 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on December 13, 2018 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charyse C. Crawford, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (214)753-2373. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (45 pages) Redaction Request due 2/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019. (ccc)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1944 REPLY filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.), Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne re: #1943 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s)) (Dees, Tom)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1943 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1927 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1935 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Appendix and Exhibits A-C) (Farrell, Thomas)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1942 Transcript Order Form: re #1925 Notice of Appeal, transcript requested by Albert G Hill, III for Telephonic Hearing on Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal 12/13/18 (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford.) Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter. Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court. (Farrell, Thomas) (Main Document 1942 replaced to flatten image on 1/16/2019) (epm).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1941 REPLY filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) re: #1920 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Gruber, G)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1940 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE: In the court's Order of Reference (Doc. #1937 ) issued yesterday, the court in error stated, "Plaintiff was entitled to recover reasonable attorney's fees." Therefore, the court vacates the Order of Reference (Doc. #1937 ) and issues this Amended Order of Reference. These matters as to the amount of reasonable attorney's fees to be awarded are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and for the United States Magistrate Judge to submit to the court proposed findings and recommendations for disposition of these matters. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/9/2019) (mla)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1939 Request for Clerk to issue GAL's Sealed Filings filed by Eliot Shavin. (Shavin, Eliot)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1938 ORDER granting #1931 Motion to for Permission to Obtain Sealed Reports and Other Documents. It is ordered that Mr. Shavin, and any members of his immediate staff, who wish to have access to Doc. 880 ; Doc. 891 ; Doc. 895 ; Doc. 899 ; Doc. 950 ; Doc. 983 ; Doc. 985 ; Doc. 995 ; and Doc. 1006 (collectively, the GAL's Sealed Filings), will be provided a copy of the governing Protective Order in this case (Doc. #256 ). It is ordered that, within three days of the date on which Mr. Shavin signs and returns the Protective Order Agreement attached to the Protective Order the clerk of court is directed to provide to Mr. Shavin the GAL's Sealed Filings. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/8/2019) (rekc) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (rekc).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1937 ***VACATED PER #1940 ORDER*** ORDER OF REFERENCE: The matters of the amount of reasonable attorney's fees to be awarded are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and for the United States Magistrate Judge to submit to the court proposed findings and recommendations for disposition of these matters. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/8/2019) (rekc) Modified on 1/9/2019 (mla).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1936 RESPONSE filed by Guardian Ad Litem re: #1931 MOTION for Permission to Obtain Sealed Reports and Other Documents filed by the Guardian Ad Litem (Hurst, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1935 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.), Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne re #1927 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1924 Memorandum Opinion and Order,, Modify Hearings/Deadlines, #1919 Memorandum Opinion and Order,,,, Modify Hearings/Deadlines,,, Supplement to ECF 1927: Brief in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to ECF 1919 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) (Dees, Tom)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1934 NOTICE of Compliance re: #1924 Memorandum Opinion and Order,, Modify Hearings/Deadlines, #1919 Memorandum Opinion and Order,,,, Modify Hearings/Deadlines,,, filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Farrell, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1933 ORDER re: #1931 Motion for Permission to Obtain Sealed Reports and Other Documents filed by the Guardian Ad Litem. The court directs Mr. Hurst to inform the court in writing whether he is opposed to Movant's request on or before Tuesday, 1/8/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/4/2019) (axm)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1932 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1928 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1929 Appendix in Support (Farrell, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1931 MOTION for Permission to Obtain Sealed Reports and Other Documents filed by the Guardian Ad Litem filed by Eliot Shavin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)). Party Eliot Shavin added.Attorney Eliot D Shavin added to party Eliot Shavin(pty:mov) (Shavin, Eliot) Modified title on 1/4/2019 (axm).
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1930 ORDER of USCA as to #1925 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. The motion for a stay is DENIED. The appellant's alternative motion to expedite appeal is DENIED (epm)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 18-11633 in USCA5 for #1925 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert G Hill, III. (svc)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1929 Appendix in Support filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) re #1928 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Gruber, G)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1928 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) re #1920 Memorandum Opinion and Order,,, (Gruber, G)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1927 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.), Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne re #1919 Memorandum Opinion and Order,,,, Modify Hearings/Deadlines,,, Brief in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to ECF 1919 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Dees, Tom)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1926 NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Dees, Tom)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1925 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1924 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #1919 Memorandum Opinion and Order to the Fifth Circuit by Albert G Hill, III. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-9662448. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Farrell, Thomas)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1924 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #1921 Emergency Motion to Stay. The deadline to submit proof of reasonable attorney's fees and costs is 1/4/2019. Responses due by 1/18/2019. Replies due by 1/29/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/20/2018) (zkc)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1923 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam A Lindsay: Telephone Conference held on 12/13/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Thomas M. Farrell, Emil Lippe; Defense - G. Michael Gruber, Brian Mason, Tom Dees. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:20. (chmb)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1922 ORDER: The court will hold a telephonic hearing on Hill III's Emergency #1921 Motion a 10:00 AM, on 12/13/2018 before Judge Sam A Lindsay. The court hereby stays the permanent injunction issued on 12/7/2018, pending the disposition of Hill III's Emergency Motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/11/2018) (ykp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1921 MOTION to Stay re #1919 Memorandum Opinion and Order,,,, Modify Hearings/Deadlines,,, filed by Albert G Hill, III with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Farrell, Thomas)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1920 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Within 14 days of the date this memorandum opinion and order is filed, Keliher, as Independent Executor of the Estate of Hill Jr., must apply for such fees and costs by filing an application, supporting brief, and supporting evidence in the form of an appendix. Opposition briefs and supporting evidence in the form of appendixes must be filed within 14 days, and reply briefs must be filed within 10 days of the filing of the opposition response. The court determines that the imposition of the previously described attorneys fees and legal costs as a sanction is eminently reasonable and fair, as Hill Jr., now deceased, and the Estate of Hill Jr. have incurred attorneys fees and costs in connection with Hill IIIs attempts to remove FTB as trustee of the Grandchildrens Trusts. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/10/2018) (svc)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1919 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants Washburne and Summers' Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement, and Application for Permanent Injunction (Doc. #1886 ); and grants Margaret Keliher, as Independent Executor of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Joinder in Heather Hill Washburne and Elisa Hill Summers' Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement (Doc. #1916 ). The court directs counsel for Movants to provide it with documentation, including affidavits and invoices, supporting their request for reasonable attorney's fees and costs. The deadline to submit proof of reasonable attorney's fees and costs is 12/21/2018. Responses due by 1/11/2019. Replies due by 1/22/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/7/2018) (zkc)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1918 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam A Lindsay: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/16/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Thomas Farrell, Emil Lippe; Defense - Brian Mason. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:35. (chmb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1917 NOTICE of CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE re: #1899 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing filed by Albert G Hill, III (Lippe, Emil)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1916 (Document Restricted) Sealed Joinder in Washburne and Summers' Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and Settlement Agreement filed by Margaret Keliher. (zkc)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1915 ORDER granting #1901 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Joinder in Washburne and Summers' Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and Settlement Agreement (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/13/2018) (zkc)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1914 REPLY filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) re: #1906 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing (Gruber, G)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1913 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1909 Opposition of Albert G. Hill, III to ECF No. 1900 (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Dees, Tom)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1912 NOTICE of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices filed by Erin Nance Hill (Barr, John)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1911 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Permanent Injunction Hearing Proceedings held on November 13, 2017 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charyse C. Crawford, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (214)753-2373. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (59 pages) Redaction Request due 11/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2019. (ccc)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1910 OBJECTION filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson) re: #1901 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Joinder (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/7/2017) (Farrell, Thomas)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1909 OBJECTION filed by Albert G. Hill, III re: #1900 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Farrell, Thomas)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1908 Transcript Order Form: transcript requested by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) for Permanent Injunction Hearing 11/13/2017 (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford.) Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter. Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court.. (Mason, Brian)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1907 NOTICE of Filing filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Dees, Tom)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1906 ORDER: Responses due by 11/5/2018. Replies due by 11/9/2018. re: #1901 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Joinder (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/7/2017) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/25/2018) (svc)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1905 ORDER: Responses due by 11/5/2018. Replies due by 11/9/2018. re: #1900 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/25/2018) (svc)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1904 Transcript Order Form: transcript requested by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson) for Permanent Injunction Hearing 11/13/2017 (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford.) Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter. Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court.. (Farrell, Thomas)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1903 NOTICE of Proceedings in Probate Court and Request for a Briefing Schedule filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Farrell, Thomas)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1902 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Farrell on behalf of Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson). (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Farrell, Thomas)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1901 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Joinder (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/7/2017) filed by Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) (Attachments: #1 Keliher's Joinder in Washburne and Summers' Motion to Enforce) (Gruber, G)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1900 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1897 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order,,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Dees, Tom)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1899 ORDER RESETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING: Show Cause Hearing reset for 11/16/2018 09:00 AM, 15th Floor, before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Hill III is ordered to appear at this hearing to show cause why he should not be held in contempt of court and sanctioned for failure to comply with the above-cited court orders. Counsel for any other party is invited, but not required, to attend this show cause hearing. The court directs counsel for Hill III, Mr. Emil Lippe, Jr., to provide Hill III with a copy of this Show Cause Order. If Hill III fails to appear at the scheduled hearing, the court will issue a warrant for his arrest. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/16/2018) (zkc)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1898 NOTICE of Designation as Independent Executor filed by Margaret Keliher(Individidually and in her capacity as Trustee of the MHTE and a member of the Advisory Board of the HHTE) (Gruber, G)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1897 Order re: #1886 Sealed Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement, and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction, Based on New Evidence and New Developments in the Probate Court. The court directs Washburne and Summers to submit a brief, not to exceed 7 pages, advising the court whether Judge Warren's Order has rendered their motion moot, or whether they are still pursuing their motion. If they are still pursuing the relief sought, Washburne and Summers must explain to the court why their motion has not been rendered moot. The deadline for Washburne and Summers to file their brief is Friday, 10/26/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/16/2018) (zkc) Docket entry security modified per DC chambers request on 10/16/2018 (twd).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1896 NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to ECF 1888 filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Dees, Tom)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1895 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1893 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection filed by Albert G Hill, III (ykp)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1894 (Document Restricted) Sealed Brief/Memorandum in Support re: #1893 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection filed by Albert G Hill, III (ykp)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1893 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response to Motion re: #1886 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, Motion for Injunction filed by Albert G Hill, III (ykp)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1892 ORDER granting in part and denying in part sealed and/or ex parte motion #1889 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/9/2018) (ykp)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1891 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Motion of Albert G. Hill, III for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitations #1890 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/5/2018) (chmb)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1890 (Document Restricted) Motion of Albert G. Hill III for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitations (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/7/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1889 (Document Restricted) MOTION OF ALBERT G. HILL III FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO ENFORCE, BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE, EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX, AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/7/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Response to Mtn Enforce, #2 Exhibit(s) Brief in Support to Response to Mtn Enforce, #3 Exhibit(s) Appendix 1-15, #4 Exhibit(s) Appendix 16-20, #5 Exhibit(s) Appendix 21-33, #6 Exhibit(s) Alternative Motion for Reconsideration, #7 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1888 ORDER re: #1886 Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement, Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction. Once the Probate Court addresses the outstanding Objection and Hill III files his response to W & S's Motion, the court will consider the matter ripe for adjudication. The court directs Washburne and Summers to notify the court in writing when the Probate Court rules on Miller's Objection. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/26/2018) (zkc)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1887 ***DISREGARD/DUPLICATE FILING OF DOCUMENT NO. #1886 *** (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement, and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction, Based on New Evidence and New Developments in the Probate Court filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne. (zkc) Modified on 9/14/2018 (zkc).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1886 (Document Restricted) Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/14/2018), Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction, filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Dees, Tom). Added MOTION for Injunction, expanded text on 9/17/2018 (dsr).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1885 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (Doc. 1884) Washburne and Summers' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/14/2018) (chmb)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1884 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Proposed Order) (Dees, Tom)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1883 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court denies without prejudice as premature the remaining relief sought in Washburne and Summers' Emergency Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and Settlement Agreement, and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Permanent Injunction (Doc. #1876 ); and denies without prejudice as premature Albert G. Hill, III's Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief to Enforce Global Settlement Agreement and Final Judgment and for Preservation of Assets and Records (Doc. #1877 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/3/2018) (zkc)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1882 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court denies Washburne and Summers's #1876 Application for Temporary Restraining Order; denies Hill III's #1877 Application for Temporary Restraining Order; and defers ruling on the remainder of the relief requested pending its consideration of the parties' respective applications for preliminary injunction and related relief. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/1/2018) (zkc)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1881 (Document Restricted) Sealed #1880 APPENDIX TO THE REPLY BRIEF OF ALBERT G. HILL III IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE HIS EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO ENFORCE GLOBAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR PRESERVATION OF ASSETS AND RECORDS, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, AND EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT, UNDER SEAL, AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS IN HIS BRIEF filed by Albert G Hill, III (ykp)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1880 (Document Restricted) Sealed REPLY BRIEF OF ALBERT G. HILL III IN SUPPORT OF 1859 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE HIS EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO ENFORCE GLOBAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR PRESERVATION OF ASSETS AND RECORDS, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, AND EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT, UNDER SEAL, AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS IN HIS BRIEF filed by Albert G Hill, III (ykp)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1879 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1869 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/30/2018) (chmb)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1878 (Document Restricted) SEALED REPLY #1857 IN SUPPORT OF WASHBURNE AND SUMMERS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE THE FINAL JUDGMENT AND THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Chester Donnally, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.), Margaret Keliher(Individidually and in her capacity as Trustee of the MHTE and a member of the Advisory Board of the HHTE), Elisa M Summers, Thomas P. Tatham, Joyce E. Waller, Heather V Washburne (svc) Modified on docket text 5/30/2018 (ran).
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1877 (Document Restricted) EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO ENFORCE GLOBAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR PRESERVATION OF ASSETS AND RECORDS filed by Albert G Hill, III (svc)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1876 (Document Restricted) Emergency Motion to Enforce the Final Judgment and the Settlement Agreement (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/29/2018) filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (Dees, Tom)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1874 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 1859 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document under seal as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/29/2018) (chmb)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1872 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Trey H Crawford on behalf of Chester Donnally, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Joyce E. Waller. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Crawford, Trey)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1871 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #1870 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/24/2018) (chmb)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1870 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File After Deadline (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/2/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1869 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief to Exceed Page Limitations Re: 1859 Motion for Leave to File,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/17/2018) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix to Reply Brief, #3 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil) Modified docket text and event type on 5/30/2018 (ali).
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1868 (Document Restricted) DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS WITH CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ECF 1857 (Sealed pursuant to order dated 8/10/2017) filed by Chester Donnally, Albert G Hill, Jr, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Defendants' Consolidated Reply, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave) (Gruber, G)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1867 (Document Restricted) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: After considering the motion and request for injunctive relief #1735 , response #1740 , reply #1741 , appendixes, counsels' argument and evidence admitted by the court at the 11/13/2017 permanent injunction hearing, pleadings, record, and applicable law, and for the reasons set forth below, the court determines that Hill Jr. has met his burden under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a) for issuance of a permanent injunction, and grants his application for a permanent injunction. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/23/2018) (epm)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1866 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: 1859 Motion for Leave to File,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dees, Tom)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1865 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: 1859 Motion for Leave to File,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 8/10/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr, Margaret Keliher(Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.) (Gruber, G)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1864 (Document Restricted) Sealed Brief/Memorandum in Support re: 1859 Motion for Leave to File,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 8/10/2017) filed by Chester Donnally, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Joyce E. Waller (Lang, Michael)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1863 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1857 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/2/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Lippe, Emil)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1862 NOTICE of PROOF OF SERVICE re: 1861 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Lippe, Emil)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1861 ELECTRONIC ORDER deferring ruling on 1859 Albert G. Hill, III's Motion for Leave to File. The court determines that expedited briefing is warranted. The deadline for any response in opposition to Albert G. Hill, III's Motion for Leave to File is Monday, May 21, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Any reply shall be filed by Wednesday, May 23, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. As several non-parties are the subject of Albert G. Hill, III's Motion for Leave to File, the court directs Albert G. Hill, III and his counsel to serve all non-parties with this order and with any of the underlying motions and exhibits pertaining to this order, and to provide the court with proof of this service on or before Friday, May 18, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/17/2018) (chmb)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1860 ELECTRONIC ORDER deferring ruling on sealed and/or ex parte motion #1857 . The court determines that expedited briefing is warranted. The deadline for Albert G. Hill, III to file a response to ECF # 1857 is Monday, May 21, 2018, by 5:00 p.m. Any reply shall be filed by Wednesday, May 23, 2018, by 5:00 p.m. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/17/2018) (chmb)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1858 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #1839 (Document Restricted) Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Estate Sealed Motion to Substitute. Temporary Administrator Margaret Keliher is hereby substituted in place of decedent Albert G. Hill, Jr. in this action, and the court directs the clerk of court to reflect this substitution on the docket sheet. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/15/2018) (aaa)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1857 (Document Restricted) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE THE FINAL JUDGMENT AND THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, AND EVIDENTIARY APPENDIX IN SUPPORT, UNDER SEAL, AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS IN THEIR BRIEF (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Proposed Order) (Dees, Tom) Modified on 5/16/2018 to enhance title (svc).
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1856 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot sealed and/or ex parte motion #1832 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/4/2018) (chmb)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1855 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply to #1839 Sealed Motion to Substitute filed by Margaret Keliher. (axm)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1853 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Substitute (Sealed pursuant to order dated 8/10/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1852 (Document Restricted) Notice of Filing Exhibit "A" to Supplementary Response of Albert G. Hill III to Motion of Temporary Administrator to Substitute (Sealed pursuant to order dated 8/10/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Lippe, Emil)
April 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1851 (Document Restricted) Supplementary Response of Albert G Hill III to Motion of Temporary Administrator to Substitute, filed by Albert G Hill, III. (ran)
April 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1850 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1848 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/22/2018) (chmb)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1849 (Document Restricted) Sealed Brief/Memorandum in Support re: #1835 Order, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/18/2017) filed by Albert G. Hill, III (Lippe, Emil)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1848 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Response to Motion to Substitute filed by Albert G. Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed filing, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex.A to Proposed Filing) (Lippe, Emil)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1847 (Document Restricted) Sealed Temporary Administrator's Response (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/18/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr re: #1835 Order. (Gruber, G) Modified title on 4/20/2018 (axm).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1846 Amended Emergency Motion of Albert G. Hill III to Modify Protective and Sealing Orders, filed by Albert G Hill, III. (ran)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1845 ORDER granting #1844 Amended Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/19/2018) (ran)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1844 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Amended Emergency Motion of Albert G. Hill III To Modify Protective and Sealing Orders filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) 1-Amended Emergency Mtn, #7 Proposed Order Amended Mtn for Leave, #8 Proposed Order Amended Emergency Mtn) (Lippe, Emil)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1843 ORDER: The court hereby extends the preliminary injunction order set forth in its memorandum opinion and order of 10/6/2017 (Doc. #1785 ), previously extended to April 30, 2018 (see Docs. #1790 , #1806 , #1818 , and #1829 ), to 5/31/2018, unless otherwise modified or dissolved by the court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/17/2018) (ykp)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1842 ORDER denying without prejudice #1838 Motion for Leave to File Emergency Motion to Modify Protective and Sealing Orders. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/17/2018) (ykp)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1841 (Document Restricted) Sealed RESPONSE OF ALBERT G. HILL III TO re: #1825 Sealed MARGARET KELIHER'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE filed by Albert G Hill, III (ykp)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1840 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting sealed motion for leave to file response #1833 . (Clerk to enter the sealed document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/17/2018) (chmb)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1839 (Document Restricted) Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Estate Sealed Motion to Substitute (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/18/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1838 MOTION for Leave to File Emergency Motion of Albert G. HIll III to Modify Protective and Sealing Orders filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) 1-Emergency Motion, #3 Proposed Order Order Mtn Leave, #4 Proposed Order Order Emergency Modify) (Lippe, Emil)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1837 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney G Michael Gruber on behalf of Albert G Hill, Jr. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Gruber, G)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1836 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in other part sealed Motion for Leave #1825 . The Motion for Leave is granted with respect to Temporary Administrator Margaret Keliher's Motion for Leave to File "Motion to Substitute," and denied without prejudice as premature with respect to Margaret Keliher's Motion for Leave to File "Supplement to Emergency Motion to Enforce Final Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief." Margaret Keliher is directed to file as a separate docket entry her "Motion to Substitute," currently incorporated into her Motion for Leave, by Wednesday, April 18, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/17/2018) (chmb)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1835 ORDER: The court directs Hill III to file a response to the Temporary Administrator's Response to the Court's December 18, 2017 Order (Doc. #1826 ); and directs the Temporary Administrator to file a response to Albert G. Hill, III Brief on Survival of Cause of Action (Doc. #1824 ). Each response is to be specific with its authority and is limited to five pages. The deadline to submit these briefs is Friday, April 20, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/11/2018) (zkc)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1834 NOTICE of Designation of New Lead Counsel filed by John W Creecy, Brett Ringle (Paterson, Thomas)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1833 (Document Restricted) MOTION OF ALBERT G. HILL FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/2/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment Proposed response, #2 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1832 (Document Restricted) MOTION OF ALBERT G. HILL III FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO PROPOSED SUPPLEMENT (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/2/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment Proposed Supplement, #2 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1831 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE***(Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1825 Motion for Leave to File Supplement (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/17/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Lippe, Emil) Modified on 2/12/2018 (ctf).
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1830 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE***(Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1825 Motion to Substitute (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/18/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Lippe, Emil) Modified on 2/12/2018 (ctf).
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1829 ORDER: The court hereby extends the preliminary injunction order set forth in its #1785 memorandum opinion and order, and subsequently extended to #1818 April 30, 2018, unless otherwise modified or dissolved by the court. The court hereby vacates the February 12, 2018 show cause hearing set in this matter and will reset the show cause hearing by separate order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/30/2018) (svc)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1828 USMS Process Receipt and Return for Show Cause Order unexecuted on Albert G. Hill, III, dated 12/8/2017. (zkc)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1827 (Document Restricted) Sealed Brief/Memorandum in Support re: #1819 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #1800 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/18/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III, Albert G. Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) B-1, #6 Exhibit(s) B-2, #7 Exhibit(s) B-3, #8 Exhibit(s) BB, #9 Exhibit(s) C-1, #10 Exhibit(s) C-2, #11 Exhibit(s) C-3, #12 Exhibit(s) D, #13 Exhibit(s) E, #14 Exhibit(s) F, #15 Exhibit(s) G, #16 Exhibit(s) H-1, #17 Exhibit(s) H-2, #18 Exhibit(s) H-3, #19 Exhibit(s) H-4, #20 Exhibit(s) I, #21 Exhibit(s) J-1, #22 Exhibit(s) J-2, #23 Exhibit(s) J-3) (Lippe, Emil)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1826 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1813 Order,, #1818 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/18/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Mason, Brian) Modified filer and text on 1/16/2018 (ykp).
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1825 (Document Restricted) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE AND SUPPLEMENT TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE THE FINAL JUDGMENT AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G) Modified event to add gavel on 2/12/2018 (ctf).
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1824 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Albert G Hill, III re #1813 Order,, BRIEF ON SURVIVAL OF CAUSE OF ACTION (Lippe, Emil)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1823 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emil Lippe, Jr on behalf of Albert G Hill, III. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lippe, Emil)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1822 Certified Mail returned as undeliverable. #1819 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, received back from Albert G. Hill, III as unclaimed. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (rekc)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1821 (Document Restricted) Notice of address per #1817 Order filed by Albert G Hill, III (svc)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1820 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response to Order re: #1817 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #1818 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, filed by Albert G Hill, III. Received via email. (svc)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1819 ORDER granting #1808 MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing set for December 21, 2017 and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Brief to Show Cause Order filed by Albert G Hill, III. Show Cause Response due by 1/14/2018. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/12/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/13/2017) (svc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2017: #1 certified mail) (svc).
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1818 ORDER granting #1814 Motion for Extension of Time to File for Parties to File Briefs Regarding Effect of Death. The deadline for the parties to file supplemental briefing is hereby extended to 1/16/2018. For this reason, the court hereby extends the preliminary injunction order set forth in its #1785 memorandum opinion and order and subsequently extended to 12/18/2017 (see Docs. 1790 and 1806), to 2/1/2018, unless otherwise modified or dissolved by the court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/12/2017) (ykp)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1817 ORDER: The court grants the Motion to Withdraw filed in the 2269 Action (Doc. 631), grants the Motion to Withdraw filed in the 2020 Action (Doc. 1810) and, accordingly, allows Messrs. R. Paul Yetter, Christian J. Ward, Autry W. Ross, James B. Zucker, and the law firm of Yetter Coleman, LLP, to withdraw as counsel of record for Hill III and Erin Hill in the 2269 Action and to withdraw as counsel of record for Hill III in 2020 Action, and, other than providing Hill III and Erin Hill with a copy of this Order, they are relieved of any further obligation or responsibility for the representation of Hill III or Erin Hill in the 2269 Action and of Hill III the 2020 Action. Further, as Eric P. Chenoweth and George H. Fibbe are no longer associated with Yetter Coleman and, therefore, do not represent any party in these two lawsuits, the court directs the clerk of court to remove their names from the docket sheet as counsel for Hill III and Erin Hill in the 2269 Action and as counsel for Hill III in the 2020 Action. The court directs the clerk of court to file a copy of this order in Civil Action Nos. 3:07-cv- 2020-L-BK and 3:10-cv-2269-L-BK. Further, in addition to Movants providing Hill III and Erin Hill with a copy of this Order, see supra, the clerk of the court shall provide by written mail a copy of this order to Albert G. Hill, III, and Erin Nance Hill at 981 Davis Drive N.W., Atlanta, Georgia 30327, and shall provide an e-mail copy of this order to Albert G. Hill, III, at aghilliii@mac.com and to Erin Nance Hill at erinnancehill@mac.com. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/12/2017) (ykp)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1816 Mail returned as undeliverable. #1800 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer received back from Albert G Hill, III as VACANT. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ykp)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1815 NOTICE of Declaration of Albert G. Hill, III re: #1812 Order, filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Declaration of Albert G. Hill III) (Ward, Christian)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1814 MOTION for Extension of Time for Parties to File Briefs Regarding Effect of Death filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Ward, Christian)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1813 ORDER: In light of Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s ("Hill, Jr.") death prior to the court's ruling on his application for permanent injunctive relief, the court requires supplemental briefing by the parties, not to exceed five pages, on the issue of whether Hill, Jr.'s claim for equitable relief survives his death, as well as the effect, both procedurally and substantively, of his death on his pending application for permanent injunctive relief. The deadline to submit these briefs is 12/15/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/8/2017) (axm)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1812 ORDER: The deadline for Movants to file Affidavit of Hill III is Tuesday, December 12, 2017, by Noon (CST). If the court does not receive an affidavit or declaration as herein set forth, it will not postpone the hearing set for December 21, 2017, or allow counsel to withdraw. If Hill III complies and provides an affidavit or declaration as directed, the court will reset the hearing and allow counsel to withdraw. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/7/2017) (svc)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1811 NOTICE of Suggestion of Death (Statement Noting Death) filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Ward, Christian)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1810 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of R. Paul Yetter, Christian J. Ward, Autry W. Ross, Eric P. Chenoweth, George H. Fibbe, and Yetter Coleman LLP filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Ward, Christian)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1809 ORDER denying #1803 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. To the extent Movants seek to withdraw in Civil Action No. 3:12-cv-4599-L, the motion is denied as moot, as they are not listed as counsel of record in that civil action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/5/2017) (aaa)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1808 MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing set for December 21, 2017 (), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Brief to Show Cause Order filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Ward, Christian)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1807 Transcript Order Form: transcript requested by Calloway Norris Burdette & Weber PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP for Permanent Injunction Hearing held November 13, 2017 (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford.) Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter.. (McAndrew, Patrick)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1806 ORDER: The court extends the preliminary injunction order set forth in its memorandum opinion and order of 10/6/2017 (Doc. #1785 ) (filed under seal), and its Order of 11/7/2017 (Doc. #1790 ), to 12/18/2017, unless otherwise dissolved or modified by the court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/28/2017) (aaa)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1805 ORDER granting #1799 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Accordingly, Mr. Jackson is relieved of any further obligation or responsibility for the representation of Hill III in the 4599 Action and the 2020 Action. The court directs the clerk of court to file a copy of this order in Civil Action Nos. 3:07-CV- 2020-L-BK and 3:12-CV-4599-L-BK. Further, the clerk of the court shall provide by regular mail a copy of this order to Albert G. Hill, III, 981 Davis Drive N.W., Atlanta, Georgia 30327, and shall provide an e-mail copy of this order to Albert G. Hill, III, at aghilliii@mac.com. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/17/2017) (aaa)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1804 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re #1800 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer. Signed on 11/17/2017. (ndt)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1803 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Ward, Christian)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1802 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Ward, Christian) Modified docket text and terminated motion on 11/17/2017 (aaa).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1801 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G. Hill, III (Ward, Christian) Modified docket text and terminated motion on 11/17/2017 (aaa).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1800 SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/21/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2017. Counsel for any other party is invited, but not required, to attend this show cause hearing. The court directs the clerk of court to provide Albert G. Hill, III with a copy of this Show Cause Order by regular and certified mail to 981 Davis Drive NW, Atlanta, GA 30327, and by e-mail to aghilliii@mac.com. Further, the court directs the United States Marshal to serve a copy of this Show Cause Order on Albert G. Hill, III at his residence at 981 Davis Drive NW, Atlanta, GA 30327, and to provide the court with proof of service. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/17/2017) (ndt)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1799 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Frank H Jackson added to party Albert G Hill, III(pty:cd) (Jackson, Frank)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1798 NOTICE of Supplemental Exhibits filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4) (Ward, Christian)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1797 ORDER granting #1791 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney W Bruce Maloy and Wilmer Parker, III terminated. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/14/2017) (rekc)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1796 ORDER granting #1786 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John E Leslie terminated. (Copy provided by mail to plaintiff Albert G. Hill, III.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/13/2017) (rekc)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1795 Court's Exhibit List from Permanent Injunction Hearing held November 13, 2017. Plaintiff Albert G. Hill, III - 283-287, 109 - admitted. (chmb)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1794 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Final Exhibit List in Support of Nov. 13, 2017 Permanent Injunction Hearing (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1793 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam A Lindsay: Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 11/13/2017. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - John Leslie; Defense - Michael Gruber, Brian Mason, Michael Lang. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford) (Exhibits admitted - Plaintiff Albert G. Hill, III - Exhibits 283-287, and 109) Time in Court - 2:00. (chmb)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1792. Thu Nov 9 12:23:33 CST 2017 (crt)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1792 ORDER: The court hereby notifies counsel that it will not rule on motions #1786 and #1791 until after the hearing in this matter scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on Monday, 11/13/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/8/2017) (ran) Modified to correct motion number on 11/9/2017 (cea).
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1791 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Albert G Hill, III (Maloy, W)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1790. Wed Nov 8 08:39:21 CST 2017 (crt)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1790 ORDER: The preliminary injunction put in place as a result of the court's 10/6/2017 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Doc. #1785 ) is hereby extended and shall remain in effect through Thursday, 11/30/2017, unless otherwise dissolved or modified by the court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/7/2017) (ran)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1789 ORDER: A hearing is set on Monday, 11/13/2017, on Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s request for permanent injunctive relief. Absent leave of court and good cause shown, no further filings are permitted in this civil action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/2/2017) (ran)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1789. Thu Nov 2 16:38:55 CDT 2017 (crt)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1788 (Document Restricted) Supplemental Request for Injunctive Relief (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1787 ORDER: The #1784 findings and recommendation of the magistrate judge are hereby accepted by the court. Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Objection to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment (Doc. #1735 ), is overruled. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/27/2017) (sss)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1787. Fri Oct 27 11:46:46 CDT 2017 (crt)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1786 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by John E. Leslie and John Leslie | PLLC filed by Albert G Hill, III (Leslie, John)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1785 (Document Restricted) SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: #1735 Sealed Motion to Enforce Judgment and Objection to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/6/2017) (ran)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1784 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is recommended that Hill Jr.'s Objection #1735 to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment be OVERRULED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/6/2017) (mcrd)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1784. Fri Oct 6 14:51:32 CDT 2017 (crt)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1785. Fri Oct 6 15:04:12 CDT 2017 (crt)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1783 ORDER: The court directs the Clerk to strike forthwith Mr. Clevenger as counsel for Plaintiff. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/5/2017) (ran)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1782 (Document Restricted) Sealed Declaration of Albert G. Hill, III to #1781 Sealed Response re: #1780 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson) (Clevenger, Ty) Modified title on 10/6/2017 (axm).
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1781 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1780 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order (Sealed pursuant to order dated 10/4/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1780 (Document Restricted) SEALED ORDER: The court sua sponte extends and keeps in place the temporary restraining order set forth in its orders of 6/9/2017, 6/28/2017, and 7/20/2017 (Docs. #1745 , #1753 , #1761 , and #1777 ) to 10/6/2017, 5:00 p.m., unless otherwise dissolved or modified by the court. Accordingly, Albert G. Hill Jr. and Albert G. Hill III are hereby ordered to verify the dates of birth of Albert G. Hill, IV, Nance H. Hill, and Caroline M. Hill, and to provide this information to the court in writing and under seal by 12:00 p.m., Thursday, 10/5/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/4/2017) (axm)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1779 (Document Restricted) DECLARATION OF O. MIMS CLAYTON (Sealed pursuant to order dated 8/10/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Leslie, John)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1778 ORDER: Albert G. Hill, III is DIRECTED to submit evidence to the Court by September 27, 2017, showing the adjustment for inflation of $10 billion from May 2011 through February 2017, using the required method of calculation, and the value of FTB's assets on February 8, 2017. Albert G. Hill Jr. may respond to the submission of the evidence within seven days after Hill III's filing. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/13/2017) (mcrd)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1777 ORDER: The court sua sponte extends and keeps in place the temporary restraining order set forth in its orders of 6/9/2017, 6/28/2017, and 7/20/2017 (Docs. 1745, 1753, and 1761), to 10/4/2017, unless otherwise dissolved or modified by the court. This will be the final extension granted as to the temporary restraining order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/8/2017) (epm)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1776 ORDER granting #1772 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Accordingly, the court allows John R. Woodward to substitute in place of Brian Patrick Shaw as attorney of record for Defendant Hunt in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/8/2017) (epm)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1775 ORDER re : 1171 Notice of Unauthorized Filing. In light of this order, the court will disregard the Notice of Unauthorized Filing of Docket No. #1762 "Joint Motion for Protective Order" and directs the clerk of the court to strike it (Doc. #1771 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/6/2017) (aaa)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1774 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, Jr re: #1771 Notice (Other), (Gruber, G)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1773 Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in #1772 Motion to Substitute Attorney, filed by William Herbert Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Woodward, John)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1772 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, William Herbert Hunt added attorney John R Woodward,John R Woodward for William Herbert Hunt. Motion filed by William Herbert Hunt (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John R Woodward added to party William Herbert Hunt(pty:dft) (Woodward, John)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1771 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER #1775 ORDER*** NOTICE of Unauthorized Filing of Docket No. 1762 "Joint Motion for Protective Order" re: #1762 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , #1770 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, filed by Albert G Hill, III (Leslie, John) Modified on 9/6/2017 (aaa).
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1770 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Albert G. Hill, Jr., Albert G. Hill, III, and First Tennessee Bank National Association (each of the foregoing, a "Party," and collectively, the "Parties") anticipate that certain of their confidential financial and personal records, as well as those of non-parties, may be produced in discovery in the above-captioned actions ("the Actions") and that such confidential records must be protected from further disclosure. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 8/10/2017) (sss)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1769 ORDER: The court overrules the Objection to Jurisdiction (Doc. #1758 ) filed by Albert G. Hill, III in the 2020 Action; and denies Defendant First Tennessee Bank National Association's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 28) filed in the 1298 Action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 8/10/2017) (sss)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 (Document Restricted) Sealed Plaintiff's Post-Hearing Brief re: July 20, 2017 hearing (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/20/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G Hill, III (Clevenger, Ty)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1767 (Document Restricted) Sealed Brief in Support of Temporary Injunction (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1766 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1758 Objection to Jurisdiction (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr. (Lang, Michael)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1765 ORDER granting #1764 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to file their briefs is extended from 7/31/2017, to three days after the transcript is produced and distributed by the Court Reporter. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/31/2017) (aaa)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1764 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Brief filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Email agreeing to motion) (Clevenger, Ty)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1763 (Document Restricted) Supplemental Declaration of Albert G. Hill, III (sealed document) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/27/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s)) (Leslie, John)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1762 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gruber, G)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1761 ORDER: The temporary restraining order put in place as a result of the courts orders of June 9, 2017 and June 28, 2017 (Docs. 1745, 1753), is hereby extended to and shall remain in effect through September 8, 2017, unless otherwise dissolved or modified by the court. Further, the parties agreed to the extension of the temporary restraining order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/20/2017) (svc)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1760 AMENDED ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam A Lindsay: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 7/20/2017. Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - John Leslie; Defense - Mike Gruber, Brian Mason, Michael Lang. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford) (Exhibits admitted: Movant - 279, 280, 281, 3, 102, 133, 237, 113, 154, 251, 116, 204, 135; Respondent - H-1, H-2.) Time in Court - 3:30. (mcrd) Modified on 7/21/2017 (mcrd).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1759 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John E Leslie on behalf of Albert G Hill, III. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Leslie, John)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1758 (Document Restricted) Objection to Jurisdiction (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/23/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 (FTB Response), #2 Exhibit(s) 2 (Chubb letter excerpt)) (Clevenger, Ty)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1757 ORDER: The court has carefully reviewed Plaintiff's #1754 Sealed Emergency Motion to Enforce the Courts June 9, 2017 Memorandum Opinion and Order and Motion for Show Cause. In light of the court's observation, it appears that these motions are premature, and, accordingly, denied as moot. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/10/2017) (epm)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1756 ***STRICKEN PER #1783 ORDER*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ty Clevenger on behalf of Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson), Albert G Hill, III. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Clevenger, Ty) Modified text on 10/5/2017 (ran).
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1755 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1754 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1754 (Document Restricted) Sealed Emergency Motion to Enforce the Courts June 9, 2017 Memorandum Opinion and Order (ECFNo. 1745), and Motion for Show Cause (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1753. Thu Jun 29 08:41:21 CDT 2017 (crt)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1753 ORDER: Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 7/20/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. The parties shall be limited in the hearing to ninety minutes each in presenting testimony and evidence, which includes direct and cross-examination of witnesses. The temporary restraining order put in place as a result of the court's #22 memorandum opinion and order is hereby extended to and shall remain in effect until 7/26/2017 unless otherwise dissolved or modified by the court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/28/2017) (rekc)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1752 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1745 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/9/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Albert G. Hill, III, #2 Exhibit(s) A-F) (Parker, Wilmer)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1751 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #1747 Sealed Motion for Expedited Discovery. Responses due by 6/23/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/19/2017) (epm)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1750 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Hearing held on 6/16/2017 re #1747 Sealed Motion filed by Albert G Hill, Jr. (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017). Motion granted to the extent stated on the record (order to follow). Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Wilmer Parker, III; Defense - G. Mike Gruber, Brian Mason Kristine Roberts, Robert Glover, Patrick McAndrews. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (mcrd)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1749 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Telephone Hearing set for 6/16/2017 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. re: #1747 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/16/2017) (mcrd)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1748 Order Referring Motion re: #1747 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Expedited Discovery and Brief in Support Thereof. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/15/2017) (epm)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1747 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Expedited Discovery and Brief in Support Thereof (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/16/2017) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1746 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s #1735 Objection to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment, filed under seal on 5/15/2017 is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Rene H. Toliver, for hearing,if necessary, and for determination. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/9/2017) (epm)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1745 (Document Restricted) SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s #1735 Emergency Motion to Enforce Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief and refers his Objection to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment to the magistrate judge; and denies as moot #1744 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Accordingly, the court hereby sets a bond to be paid by Hill Jr. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/3/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Sam A Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/9/2017) (axm)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1745. Fri Jun 9 16:09:53 CDT 2017 (crt)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1746 . Fri Jun 9 16:54:47 CDT 2017 (crt)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1744 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Emergency Motion to Enforce Judgment and Objection to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief filed by Albert G Hill, III with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit(s) A: DOC 119) (Parker, Wilmer)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1743 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher S Hamilton on behalf of Lisa Blue. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hamilton, Christopher)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1742 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1741 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1741 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1735 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1740 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1735 Sealed Emergency Motion to Enforce Judgment and Objection to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Removal of Appointment of Trustee, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of O. Mims Clayton, #3 Exhibit(s) Expedited Briefing Order in First Tennessee Case) (Parker, Wilmer)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1738. Wed May 17 15:42:30 CDT 2017 (crt)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1739 EXPEDITED BRIEFING ORDER re: #1735 Sealed Motion to Enforce Judgment and Objection to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief. The deadline for Plaintiff Albert G. Hill, III to respond to the Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief is 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 5/23/2017. The deadline for Albert G. Hill, Jr. to file a reply is 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 5/26/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/16/2017) (aaa)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1737 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/16/2017) (chmb)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1739. Tue May 16 10:30:47 CDT 2017 (crt)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1737 MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT AND OBJECTION TO APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE IN VIOLATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF UNDER SEAL filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gruber, G)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1735 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1735 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Enforce Judgment and Objection to Appointment of Successor Trustee in Violation of Final Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Gruber, G)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1734 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G Michael Gruber for G. Michael Gruber, Michael J. Lang, and Brian E. Mason on behalf of Albert G Hill, Jr. (Gruber, G)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1733 STATUS REPORT on Compliance with Final Judgment filed by Albert G Hill, III. (Maloy, W)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1732. Wed Feb 8 07:59:43 CST 2017 (crt)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1732 ORDER: By his motion, Hill Jr. requests that the court require Hill III to comply with Paragraph 43 of the Final Judgment (Doc. 999 ) and complete the second appraisal process. The court finds that the motion has merit and is hereby granted. Hill III is further ordered to submit a report to the court no later than 4/10/2017, detailing the steps he has taken to comply with Paragraph 43 of the Final Judgment and to complete the second appraisal process. Hill III is hereby placed on notice that if he is in violation of the Final Judgment, a show cause order will be issued for him to explain why he should not be held in contempt of court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/7/2017) (sss)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1731 Order Accepting #1729 Findings and Recommendations on #1718 Emergency MOTION for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002. The court denies Plaintiff's Motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/27/2017) (rekc)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1731. Fri Jan 27 10:15:43 CST 2017 (crt)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1730 MOTION Requesting that the Court Require Albert G. Hill, III to Comply with Paragraph 43 of the Final Judgment filed by Albert G Hill, Jr re 999 Judgment. (Raiff, Michael)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1729 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: #1718 Emergency Motion for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002, filed by Calloway Norris Burdette & Weber PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP. The Court recommends that the Law Firms Emergency Motion for Aid in Execution of Judgment, Doc. 1718, be DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/12/2017) (mem)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1729. Thu Jan 12 11:42:59 CST 2017 (crt)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1728. Wed Dec 21 08:23:42 CST 2016 (crt)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1728 ORDER Accepting #1724 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: #1709 Motion to Pay Gift Tax Refund to Registry. Accordingly, the court denies CHD/CNBWs #1709 Motion to Pay Gift Tax Refund to the Registry without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/20/2016) (ran)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1727 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1726 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Parker, Wilmer)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1726 Supplemental Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Calloway Norris Burdette & Weber PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re #1718 Emergency MOTION for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002 (Fair, Kenneth)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1725 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Calloway Norris Burdette & Weber PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re #1718 Emergency Motion for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002. (Wright, Thomas) Modified text and linkage on 12/13/2016 (axm).
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1724 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Firms' Motion #1709 to Pay Gift Tax Refund to the Registry should be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/1/2016) (mcrd)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1724. Thu Dec 1 17:07:33 CST 2016 (crt)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1723 REPLY filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1718 Emergency MOTION for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002 (Fair, Kenneth)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1722 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1718 Emergency MOTION for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer) (Maloy, W)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1721 RESPONSE filed by Wilmington Trust NA re: #1718 Emergency MOTION for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002 (Broughton, Kenneth)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1720 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Upon review,the Court has determined that expedited briefing is warranted on the Law Firm's Emergency MOTION for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002 re: [Doc. 1718] A Response is due by 11/14/2016. Any Reply is due by 11/17/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/4/2016) (chmb)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1719 ORDER OF REFERENCE re: #1718 Emergency MOTION for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/3/2016) (epm)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1719. Thu Nov 3 14:49:00 CDT 2016 (crt)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1718 Emergency MOTION for Aid in Collection of Judgment Under CPRC 31.002 filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Dispossessory Affidavit Filed by MHTE-DD, LLC, #2 Exhibit(s) Answer and Counterclaim of Albert G. Hill III, #3 Exhibit(s) Answer of MHTE-DD, LLC, to Counterclaim of Albert G. Hill III, #4 Proposed Order) (Fair, Kenneth)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1717 REPLY filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1709 MOTION to Pay Gift Tax Refund to Registry re 1169 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1222 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order, (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Kenneth J. Fair) (Fair, Kenneth)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1716 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1714 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Motion for Summary Judgment) (Parker, Wilmer)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1715 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Intervene re: #1712 MOTION for Leave to Intervene, #1713 Response/Objection, filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. (Fischman, Lawrence)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1714 RESPONSE filed by Chester Donnally re: #1709 MOTION to Pay Gift Tax Refund to Registry re 1169 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1222 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order, (Benedict, J)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1713 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT #1712 *** RESPONSE filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. re: #1709 MOTION to Pay Gift Tax Refund to Registry re 1169 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1222 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order. (Fischman, Lawrence) Modified on 10/18/2016 (axm).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1712 ***WITHDRAWN per #1715 Notice*** MOTION for Leave Intervene and Response to #1709 Motion to Pay Gift Tax Refund into Court's Registry filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. (Fischman, Lawrence) Modified text on 10/18/2016 (axm). Modified on 10/25/2016 (sss).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1711 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1709 MOTION to Pay Gift Tax Refund to Registry re 1169 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1222 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order, (Parker, Wilmer)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1710. Fri Sep 30 13:02:47 CDT 2016 (crt)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1710 ORDER OF REFERENCE re: #1709 MOTION to Pay Gift Tax Refund to Registry. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/29/2016) (aaa)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1709 MOTION to Pay Gift Tax Refund to Registry re 1169 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1222 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order, filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fair, Kenneth)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1708 ORDER of USCA as to #1705 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert G Hill, III. The appeal is dismissed as of 5/6/2016, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely file appellant's brief and record excerpts. (axm)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 16-10180 (related to #1705 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 19 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic document number(s): 10, 24, 29, 122-123, 268, 378-379, 385, 392, 395-397, 406-407, 410-413, 419, 421, 440, 458, 465 502, 525, 575, 636-637, 714, 787, 824, 879-880, 884, 886, 891-892, 895, 896, 899, 905-906, 908, 910, 913, 916-917 920-922, 924, 926-927, 929-930, 932 933-943, 945-960, 962-965 972-976, 978-981, 983, 985, 987-993, 995, 999-1000, 1004, 1006-1007, 1009-1011, 1013, 1016, 1018, 1020-1021, 1023, 1025, 1027-1028, 1030-1031, 1033, 1035, 1036, 1038, 1040-1043, 1046, 1050-1056, 1058-1064, 1066, 1068, 1070-1079, 1080-1084, 1086-1087, 1089, 1090-1094, 1096, 1098-1099, 1100, 1102, 1112-1116, 1124, 1126, 1130-1131, 1133- 1134, 1147-1150, 1155-1157, 1159-1162, 1165-1169, 1170-1173, 1174-1177, 1179, 1181-1184, 1190, 1192, 1195-1207, 1214-1217, 1221-1229, 1242-1243, 1245-1246, 1248, 1250-1253, 156-1257, 1263-1275, 1278-1281, 1283-1285, 1287-1289, 1291-1292, 1294, 1298-1300, 1303-1304, 1307-1308, 1310-1313, 1317, 1321, 1324-1326, 1328-1329, 1333-1334, 1336-1338, 1340-1341, 1343, 1346, 1348-1349, 1350-1357, 1359, 1362, 1368, 1370-1372, 1376-1379, 1389-1390, 1393-1397, 1399-1401, 1403-1405, 1407, 1409-1412, 1414-1425, 1427, 1429, 1432, 1436-1441, 1447-1447, 1450, 1452-1455, 1457-1459, 1461-1462, 1465, 1472, 1474, 1483, 1487, 1489-1492, 1494-1504, 1506-1507, 1511, 1513-1517, 1526, 1529-1537, 1540-1543, 1456-1547, 1549, 1554, 1556, 1561, 1564-1565, 1569, 1573, 1577-1578, 1589, 1614, 1628, 1651, 1670, 1696, 1697, 1700, 1703. Sealed Transcripts: 877, 878, 894, 918, 1122, 1143-1144(circuit approval is required for access). PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so, since the USCA5 briefing deadline has now been set. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (axm)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1707 AFFIDAVIT re #1706 Order, Declaration of Albert G. Hill, III by Albert G Hill, III. (Parker, Wilmer)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1706 ORDER requiring, by 3/4/16, at 12:00 p.m., an affidavit or declaration pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746 that sets forth the name of the Trustee for each of the Grandchildren's Trusts; the name and address of the entity or person to whom the clerk of court is to send the disbursements; and whether there is any tax obligation exceeding $10,500,000. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/26/2016) (ash)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 16-10180 in USCA5 for #1705 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert G Hill, III. (axm)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1705 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to #1686 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #1704 Supplemental Order by Albert G Hill, III. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-7383377. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Ramos, Steven) Modified text and linkage on 2/17/2016 (axm).
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1704 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re: #1686 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Al III shall provide a written statement with all of the information requested in this Order to the Clerk of Court no later than January 22, 2016. The court further directs the clerk of court to proceed with the other disbursements as set forth on pages 36 and 37 of the court's Memorandum Opinion and Order. The funds designated for the Grandchildren's Trusts will remain in the court's registry until Mr. Hill III complies with the courts directives or until further order of the court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/12/2016) (ndt)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1703 (Document Restricted) Sealed Brief/Memorandum in Support re: #1696 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, filed by CHD/CNBW. (ndt) Modified on 2/16/2016 (chmb).
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1701 ORDER denying #1695 Motion for Clarification of Court's Order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/11/2016) (ndt)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1700 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response to Motion re: #1695 Motion for Clarification of the Court's Order [Doc #1686 ] filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP. (sss)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1699 ORDER: Before the court is the Unopposed Motion to Seal: CHD and CNBW's Response to Wilmington Trust, N.A.'s Motion for Clarification of the Court's Order [Doc. No. #1697 ], filed 2/1/2016. The court determines that the motion should be, and is hereby, granted. Accordingly, the court directs the clerk of court to file under seal CHD and CNBW's Response to Wilmington Trust, N.A.'s Motion for Clarification of the Courts Order [Doc. No. #1697 ]. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/3/2016) (sss)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1698 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth E Broughton, Jr for Michael H. Bernick on behalf of Wilmington Trust NA. (Broughton, Kenneth)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1697 (Document Restricted) Motion to Seal Response to Motion for Clarification (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Response to Wilmington Motion for Clarification, #2 Ex. A, #3 Proposed Order on Motion for Clarification, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal Response to Motion for Clarification) (Wright, Thomas)
January 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1696 (Document Restricted) Motion to Seal Brief on Contempt and Inability to Comply (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Brief on Contempt, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Proposed Order, #34 Letter to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1695 MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order [Doc. 1686] filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Broughton, Kenneth)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1694 NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's Order Dated January 15, 2016 re: #1684 Order filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Huff, Carrie)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1693 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1690 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Law Firms' Response is due by 2/1/2016.(Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/26/2016) (chmb)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1692 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1688 Motion to Extend Time. Wilmington Trust's response is due by 2/1/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/26/2016) (chmb)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1691 NOTICE of Albert. G. Hill, III Statement re: #1686 Memorandum Opinion and Order filed by Albert G Hill, III (Parker, Wilmer)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1690 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief on Hill III's Alleged Inability to Comply with Court Order ECF 1682 filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1689 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, Jr re: #1682 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Benedict, J)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1688 MOTION to Extend Time of Deadline for Briefing Requested in Order [Doc. 1682] filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Broughton, Kenneth)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1687 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth E Broughton, Jr on behalf of Wilmington Trust NA. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Broughton, Kenneth)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1686 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1576 MOTION for Payment filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/15/2016) (sss)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1685 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court construes the Magistrate Judge's 7/23/2015 Order (Doc. #1620 ), and the findings made during the 7/23/2015 hearing (see Tr., Doc. #1621 ), as a report and recommendation. For the reasons herein stated, and upon de novo review, the court accepts the Magistrate Judge's findings and recommendations in full. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/15/2016) (sss)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1684 ORDER: The court hereby directs the Clerk of Court to issue a check from funds held in the court's registry (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/15/2016) (sss)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Returned: Sealed Electronic Record on Appeal #1298, 1299, 1300, 1303, 1304, 1307, 1308, 1310, 1313, 1317, 1321, 1324, 1325, 1326. Electronic record recycled. (jrr)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1683 Transcript Order Form: transcript requested by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP for Motions hearing held 12/01/2015 Payment method: Private Funds - Requester has paid or will pay as directed by the reporter. (Court Reporter: Charyse Crawford.). (McAndrew, Patrick)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1682 ORDER: Upon consideration, further briefing is warranted in order for Court to determine the proper course of action to take with respect to Wilmington Trust, N.A.'s resignation as the current trustee of the MHTE-Albert G. Hill III Trust and the need to appoint a successor trustee. Accordingly, within 14 days of the date of this order the parties, as well as any individuals and entities with a direct interest in the matter, are DIRECTED to brief the issue of whether Mr. Hill is presently unable to comply with the Court's order dated July 23, 2015, #1620 , in light of the representations made in his Submission. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/7/2016) (mcrd)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1681 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1679 Motion to Withdraw (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/5/2016) (chmb)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1680 Amended STATUS REPORT Regarding Post-Judgment Discovery filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP, Albert G Hill, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Wright, Thomas)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1679 Joint MOTION to Withdraw Joint Status Report Regarding Post-Judgment Discovery filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP, Albert G Hill, III, Erin Nance Hill (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1677 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1676 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Mowla terminated (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/21/2015) (chmb)
December 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1676 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Mowla filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order) (Mowla, Michael)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1675 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1672 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Wilmer Parker. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/4/2015) (chmb)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1674 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1671 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bruce Maloy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/4/2015) (chmb)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1673 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank H Jackson on behalf of Albert G Hill, III. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jackson, Frank)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1672 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Wilmer Parker (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7230501) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jackson, Frank) (Main Document 1672 replaced on 12/7/2015) (twd).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1671 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Bruce Maloy (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-7230412) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jackson, Frank) (Main Document 1671 replaced on 12/4/2015) (twd).
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1669 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1659 Order to Show Cause, (Smith, John)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1668 ORDER: The court grants John Da Grosa Smith and Kristina M. Jones's Motion to Reconsider the Court's 11/5/2015 Order (Doc. 171 in the 4599 Action), conditioned on Mr. Stern filing a Notice of Appearance as counsel of record for Ms. Hill in the 4599 Action no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 12/4/2015; and grants John De Grosa Smith and Kristina M. Jones's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Albert G. Hill, III (Doc. 178 in the 4599 Action and Doc. #1661 in the 2020 Action). Finally, the court denies as moot Albert G. Hill, III's Request for a Continuance of Discovery Due on 11/30/2015 (Doc. #1666 in the 2020 Action and Doc. 184 in the 4599 Action). The court directs the Clerk of Court to file a copy of this Order in Civil Action Nos. 3-07-CV-2020-L-BK and 3-12-CV-4599-L-BK. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/1/2015) (bdb)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1668. Tue Dec 1 16:19:30 CST 2015 (crt)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1667 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Service in Compliance with Order filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1663 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order in 2020, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order in 4599) (Jones, Kristina)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1666 MOTION to Continue the Discovery Due on November 30, 2015 filed by Albert G Hill, III (Mowla, Michael)
November 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1665 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1659 Order to Show Cause, (Mowla, Michael)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1664 NOTICE of Service to Mr. Albert Hill, III re: #1661 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Da Grosa Smith and Kristina M. Jones filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jones, Kristina)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1663 ORDER: Before the court is the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Albert G. Hill, III, filed by John Da Grosa Smith and Kristina M. Jones on 11/23/2015 (Doc. #178 in the 4599 Action and Doc. #1661 in the 2020 Action). Given the overlap between Mr. Da Grosa Smith and Ms. Kristina M. Jones's current motion to withdraw from representation of Albert G. Hill, III, and counsels' prior motion to withdraw from representation of Erin Nance Hill, the court will consider the current motion at the same hearing as counsels' prior motion. Accordingly, the hearing on the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Albert G. Hill, III, is hereby set for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, 12/1/2015. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/25/2015) (axm)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1663. Wed Nov 25 10:53:32 CST 2015 (crt)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1662 RESPONSE filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1661 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Da Grosa Smith and Kristina M. Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1661 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Da Grosa Smith and Kristina M. Jones filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jones, Kristina)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1660 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #1642 Motion to Intervene, filed by Blind Faith Speculation, LLC. The court directs the Clerk of Court to file a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order in Civil Action Nos. 3:07-CV-2020-L-BK and 3:12-CV-4599-L-BK. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/23/2015) (aaa)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1660. Mon Nov 23 14:50:50 CST 2015 (crt)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1659 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The court directs counsel for the Hills, namely, Mr. John Da Grosa Smith and Ms. Kristina M. Jones of Smith LLC, and local counsel Mr. Michael Mowla, to show cause why monetary sanctions, attorney's fees and costs, and any other sanctions the court deems appropriate, should not be imposed against them for unreasonably and vexatiously multiplying proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1927, and for violating Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b)(1)-(b)(3) by filing the patently frivolous Motion for Recusal. Briefs are due by 12/3/2015, and shall not exceed 15 pages. In lieu of separate briefs, counsel may opt to file a consolidated brief with a 30-page limit. No further briefing will be permitted absent court order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/19/2015) (axm)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1658 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court denies Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge or Withdraw Referral (Doc. #144 in the 4599 Action), and denies Albert G. Hill, III's Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings Before Magistrate Judge, to Direct Magistrate Judge to Cease Conduct Exceeding Scope of Authority and for Withdrawal of Referrals to Magistrate Judge (Doc. #1631 in the 2020 Action). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/19/2015) (axm)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1658, 1659. Thu Nov 19 15:49:58 CST 2015 (crt)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1657 ORDER: Before the court is correspondence from Mr. John Da Grosa Smith, counsel for Erin Nance Hill and Albert G. Hill, III, in Civil Action 3:12-CV- 4599-L-BK (the "4599 Action"), filed with the court on November 13, 2015. The court construes the Notice as a motion for reconsideration of the court's November 5, 2015 Order denying John Da Grosa Smith and Kristina M. Jones's Amended Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Erin Hill, filed October 31, 2015 (Doc. #161 in the 4599 Action), and denying local counsel Michael Mowla's Amended Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Erin Hill, filed October 29, 2015 (Doc. #160 in the 4599 Action). The hearing is hereby set for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, December 1, 2015. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/17/2015) (aaa)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1657. Tue Nov 17 16:52:43 CST 2015 (crt)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1656 REPLY filed by Blind Faith Speculation, LLC re: #1642 MOTION to Intervene (for Leave to Intervene) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Fischman, Lawrence)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1655 ORDER: The court denies #1653 CHD and CNBW's Motion to Seal: Response to Hill Jr.'s Notice of $7.5 Million Installment Payment Into Registry, filed under temporary seal on 11/10/2015. Further, the court directs the Clerk of Court to strike and unfile CHD and CNBW's Response (Doc. 1653-1) and the summary of registry account statement (Doc. 1653-2). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/13/2015) (ran)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1654 ORDER denying #1635 Motion to Stay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/10/2015) (ran)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1653 ***STRICKEN AND UNFILED PER #1655 ORDER*** (Document Restricted) CHD CNBW's Motion to Seal: Response to Hill Jr. Notice of Installment Payment into Registry (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Response to Notice of Installment, #2 Exhibit 1 to Response to Notice of Installment, #3 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas) Modified on 11/13/2015 (ran).
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1652 Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of their Objections filed by Albert G Hill, III, Erin Nance Hill. (bdb)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1651 (Document Restricted) Notice of Fifth Circuit Motion to Dismiss filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (bdb)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1650 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #1633 Motion for Leave to File as untimely. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/6/2015) (chmb)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1649 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1632 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/6/2015) (chmb)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1647 NOTICE of Compliance and Notice of Payment of Funds Into The Court's Registry Pursuant to Paragraph 21 of The Final Judgment filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1646 ORDER: The court directs the Clerk of Court to file a copy of this Order in Civil Action Nos. 3-07-CV-2020-L-BK and 3-12-CV-4599-L-BK. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/5/2015) (bdb)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1645 RESPONSE filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1642 MOTION to Intervene (for Leave to Intervene) (Wright, Thomas)
October 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 OBJECTION filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1642 MOTION to Intervene (for Leave to Intervene) (Jones, Kristina)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1643 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1620 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of A. Kimbrough Davis, #2 Exhibit(s) Subpoenas, #3 Cover Sheet Cover Letter) (Jones, Kristina)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1642 MOTION to Intervene (for Leave to Intervene) filed by Blind Faith Speculation, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #2 Proposed Order). Party Blind Faith Speculation, LLC added. (Fischman, Lawrence)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1641 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1631 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings Before Magistrate Judge, to Direct Magistrate Judge to Cease Conduct Exceeding Scope of Authority and for Withdrawal of Referrals to Magistrate Judge (Jones, Kristina)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1640 RESPONSE filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1635 MOTION for Stay of Consideration of Motion for Payment Pending Resolution of appeals of Attorneys' Fee Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1638 REPLY filed by Albert G. Hill, III re: #1631 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings Before Magistrate Judge, to Direct Magistrate Judge to Cease Conduct Exceeding Scope of Authority and for Withdrawal of Referrals to Magistrate Judge (Jones, Kristina)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1639 ORDER of USCA as to #1570 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. IT IS ORDERED that the motion of appellees', Campbell Harrison & Dagley, L.L.P. and Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, P.L.L.C., to dismiss appeal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is GRANTED. (svc)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1637 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, Jr re: #1631 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings Before Magistrate Judge, to Direct Magistrate Judge to Cease Conduct Exceeding Scope of Authority and for Withdrawal of Referrals to Magistrate Judge (Raiff, Michael) Modified filers on 10/1/2015 (axm).
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1636 RESPONSE filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. re: #1631 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings Before Magistrate Judge, to Direct Magistrate Judge to Cease Conduct Exceeding Scope of Authority and for Withdrawal of Referrals to Magistrate Judge (Huff, Carrie)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1635 MOTION for Stay of Consideration of Motion for Payment Pending Resolution of appeals of Attorneys' Fee Claims filed by Albert G Hill, III with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Jones, Kristina)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1634 RESPONSE filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1631 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings Before Magistrate Judge, to Direct Magistrate Judge to Cease Conduct Exceeding Scope of Authority and for Withdrawal of Referrals to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1633 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate's Recommendation on, or (in the Alternative), Motion to Alter or Amend Magistrate's Order Granting, Motion of the HHTE New Hunt Trusts filed by Albert G Hill, III, Erin Nance Hill with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Jones, Kristina)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1632 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of their Objections to Magistrate's Recommendation on, or (in the Alternative) its Ruling on, "the Parties' Submissions Relating to the Appointment of a Successor Trustee for the MHTE-Albert G. Hill III Trust" filed by Albert G Hill, III, Erin Nance Hill with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Jones, Kristina)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1631 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings Before Magistrate Judge, to Direct Magistrate Judge to Cease Conduct Exceeding Scope of Authority and for Withdrawal of Referrals to Magistrate Judge filed by Albert G Hill, III with Brief/Memorandum in Support re #1620 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Cover Letter to Judge Sam A. Lindsay) (Jones, Kristina) Modified text and linkage on 9/28/2015 (axm).
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1630 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1624 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1629 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, Jr re: #1624 Notice (Other) (Raiff, Michael)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1628 (Document Restricted) CHD and CNBW's Motion for Leave to Seal CHD and CNBW's Notice of Fifth Circuit Motion to Dismiss Illiquid Asset Appeal for lack of Appellate Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Notice of Fifth Circuit Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 - Fifth Circuit Motion) (Wright, Thomas)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1627 Appendix in Support filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. re #1626 Response/Objection (Huff, Carrie)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1626 RESPONSE filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. re: #1623 Notice (Other) (Huff, Carrie)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Sealed Record on Appeal for USCA5 15-10407 (related to #1570 appeal): transmitted to Wright & Close LLP on disk only by mail. (svc)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1625 ORDER of USCA as to #1570 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. IT IS ORDERED that the Opposed motion of Appellees Campbell Harrison & Dagley, L.L.P. and Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, P.L.L.C. to view all sealed documents of the record on appeal is GRANTED. (svc)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 OBJECTIONS to #1620 Order filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jones, Kristina) Modified due to incorrect event used on 8/7/2015 (skt).
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1623 OBJECTIONS re: #1620 Order filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jones, Kristina) Modified due t incorrect event used on 8/7/2015 (skt).
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1622 NOTICE of Filing Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Petition for Writ of Certiorari) (Jones, Kristina)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1621 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 07/23/2015 before Judge Renee Toliver. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawn McRoberts, Telephone number (214) 753-2349. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (48 pages) Redaction Request due 8/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2015. (smm) (Main Document 1621 replaced on 7/24/2015) (skt).
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1620 ORDER granting: Motion #1540 of the HHTE New Hunt Trusts to Confirm that Title to the MHTE - Albert G. Hill III Trusts Interest in the Appraised MHTE Illiquid Assets has been Transferred to the HHTE New Hunt Trusts. Albert G. Hill, III (Hill III); Wilmington Trust, N.A.; and Kimbrough Davis are ORDERED to execute the Assignment of Interest as directed in the order by 8/6/2015. It is further ORDERED that Hill, III is to secure a successor trustee as directed in the Final Judgment 999 by 10/21/2015. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/23/2015) (mcrd)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1619 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Hearing on Motion #1540 of the HHTE New Hunt Trusts toConfirm that the Title to the MHTE Albert G. Hill III Trust'sInterest in the Appraised MHTE Illiquid Assets has been Transferred to the HHTE New Hunt Trusts was held on 7/23/2015. Order to Follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - John Da Grosa Smith; Michael Mowla; Defense - Thomas C. Wright, Patrick McAndrew; Carrie Lee Huff; Michael L. Raiff; Troy D. Phillips; Tom M. Dees; J. Keith Benedict; Richard Kevin Spencer, Zachary E. Johnson. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:20. (mcrd)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1618 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot Albert G. Hill, III's Motion for Protective Order, Doc. 1597,in light of the Court's Order granting Wilmington Trust's Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, Doc. 133 in 12-cv-4599-L-BK. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/22/2015) (chmb)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1617 NOTICE of Filing filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jones, Kristina) Modified on 7/22/2015 (skt).
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying Motion for Leave of Court to File Under Seal, Doc. 1614. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/22/2015) (chmb)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1615 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1604 Notice as to Lack of Jurisdiction. (skt)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1614 (Document Restricted) Motion by Plaintiff Albert G. Hill III for Leave of Court to File Under Seal the Attached Notice of Filing and Exhibit A (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing) (Jones, Kristina)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1613 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1612 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/22/2015) (chmb)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1612 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Notice as to Lack of Juridiction filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Jones, Kristina)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1611 RESPONSE filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. re: #1604 Notice (Other) (Huff, Carrie)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1610 RESPONSE filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1604 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1609 Sur-reply filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund LP re: #1576 MOTION for Payment. (axm)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1608 ORDER granting #1607 Motion for Leave to File its Surreply to Reply of CHD and CNBW in Support of Their Motion for Payment. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/17/2015) (axm)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1607 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. re: #1576 MOTION for Payment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A (Sur-reply), #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Fischman, Lawrence)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1606 ORDER denying #1603 Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Response to CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/17/2015) (axm)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1605 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Interested parties are DIRECTED to file a response to Albert G. Hill, III's Notice as to Lack of Jurisdiction, Doc. 1604, by Tuesday July 21, 2015. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/17/2015) (chmb)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1604 NOTICE of Lack of Jurisdiction re: #1579 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jones, Kristina)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1603 Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Response to CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment filed by D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Melrose Properties, LLC, THH Properties Limited Partnership, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership re: #1576 MOTION for Payment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Ayres, Lee)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1602 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1597 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order as to CHD and CNBW's Subpoenas to Wilmington Trust (Jones, Kristina)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1601 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Hill III's Reply Brief in support of his Emergency Motion for Protective Order, Doc. 1597, is due by 7/16/2015 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/16/2015) (chmb)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1600 RESPONSE filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1597 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order as to CHD and CNBW's Subpoenas to Wilmington Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1599 REPLY filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1576 MOTION for Payment (Wright, Thomas)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1598 Order Referring #1597 Emergency Motion for Protective Order as to CHD and CNBW's Subpoenas to Wilmington Trust to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/13/2015) (axm)
July 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1597 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order as to CHD and CNBW's Subpoenas to Wilmington Trust filed by Albert G Hill, III with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Letter to Judge Sam A. Lindsay, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4) (Jones, Kristina)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1596 ORDER: The court hereby grants movants a five-page extension for their reply brief re #1576 MOTION for Payment. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/10/2015) (jrr)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 Corrected Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Albert G Hill, III, Erin Nance Hill re #1586 Response and Objection. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (jrr)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1594 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1593 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document, currently attached as an Exhibit to Motion, as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/8/2015) (chmb)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1593 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum of Law in Response to CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment filed by Albert G Hill, III with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Comparison, #2 Exhibit(s) Corrected Memorandum, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 to Corrected Memorandum, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. 2 to Corrected Memorandum, #5 Proposed Order) (Jones, Kristina)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1592 ORDER: Plaintiffs never obtained leave of court to file the Corrected Memorandum. Therefore, the court will not consider the Corrected Memorandum and directs the clerk of court to strike Plaintiffs' #1590 Corrected Memorandum of Law in Response to CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/7/2015) (jrr)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1591 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1588 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/7/2015) (chmb)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 ***STRICKEN PER #1592 ORDER*** RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1576 MOTION for Payment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Jones, Kristina)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1589 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1576 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1588 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Response to CHD's Motion for Payment filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiff, Michael)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 RESPONSE filed by Wilmington Trust NA re: #1576 MOTION for Payment (Johnson, Zachary)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1586 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1576 MOTION for Payment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2) (Jones, Kristina)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1585 RESPONSE filed by THH Properties Limited Partnership, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership, Melrose Properties LLC, D&B Thompson Investments LP re: #1576 MOTION for Payment (Ayres, Lee) Modified filers on 7/2/2015 (ykp).
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 Amended RESPONSE filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. re: #1576 MOTION for Payment (Fischman, Lawrence)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Sealed Documents for USCA5 15-10407 (related to #1570 appeal): transmitted to Smith LLC on disk only by mail. Shipped: FedEx 773962611891. (axm)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 ORDER of USCA as to #1570 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert G Hill, III. Appellant's motion to view sealed documents in the record on appeal is GRANTED. (axm)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1582 RESPONSE filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. re: #1576 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Fischman, Lawrence)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 RESPONSE filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. re: #1576 MOTION (Huff, Carrie)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1580 ORDER re #1576 MOTION for Payment. The court directs Defendants to file their response to the above-referenced motion no later than 7/2/2015. Any reply must be filed no later than 7/13/2015. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/23/2015) (jrr)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 15-10407 (related to #1570 appeal): transmitted to Smith LLC on disk only by mail. (svc)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 15-10407 (related to #1570 appeal): Record consisting of ECF electronic record, 18 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic document(s). (circuit approval is required for access),. To request a copy of the record, #contact the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1579 ORDER: The Court has determined that a hearing will assist in resolving the matters in question. Accordingly, interested parties are DIRECTED to appear for a hearing before the Court in Courtroom #1409, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, Texas 75242 on Thursday, July 23, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. Five days prior to the hearing, all interested parties shall submit proposed orders to toliver_orders@txnd.uscourts.gov. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/16/2015) (mcrd)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1578 (Document Restricted) 2015 Registry Accounting Statement (gmg)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 (Document Restricted) 2014 Registry Accounting Statement (gmg)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1576 MOTION for Payment filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1575 ORDER denying #1573 Motion for Leave to Seal CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment: The court directs CHD and CNBW to file the Motion for Payment and associated exhibits on or before 6/16/2015. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/12/2015) (twd)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1574 ORDER granting #1553 Continuing Motion by Administrator Albert G. Hill, III to Obtain 2014 and Current Account Statements for the Disputed Ownership Funds Held in the Court's Registry: The clerk of court is directed to provide counsel for Hill III the Fund's monthly bank statements that pertain to 2014 and 2015 (insofar as said statements are complete and available as of the date of this Order) and a ledger or similar documentation sufficient to show any monies paid into or out of the registry account for 2014 and 2015 (insofar as available as of the date of this Order). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/12/2015) (twd)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1573 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to Seal Motion for Payment (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to Seal, #2 CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment, #3 Appendix and Exhibits to Motion for Payment, #4 Proposed Order on Motion for Payment) (Wright, Thomas)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 15-10407 for #1570 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. (svc)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1572 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1571 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney L T Bradt terminated (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/6/2015) (chmb)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1571 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Albert G Hill, III(individually, and as a Beneficiary of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, derivatively on behalf of the Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, individually, As a beneficiary of the Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr. Trust Estate, and derivately on Behalf of the Haroldson) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bradt, L)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1570 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to #1550 Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by Albert G Hill, III. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-6771127. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Jones, Kristina)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1569 (Document Restricted) CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF PLAINTIFF ALBERT G. HILL, III IN REPLY TO ALBERT G. HILL, JR.'S RESPONSE TO ECF NO. #1549 AND CHD AND CNBW'S OPPOSITION TO HILL III'S SUBMISSION ON APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE filed by Albert G Hill, III. (ctf)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1568 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1566 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/1/2015) (chmb)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1567 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [] Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/1/2015) (chmb)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal re: #1565 Sealed Reply filed by Albert G Hill, III. (See Doc #1565 for image.) (awc)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1566 MOTION leave to extend page limitation for consolidated reply re #1565 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jones, Kristina)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1555 Motion for Leave to File, #1549 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion,, #1554 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/23/2014) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Consolidated Memorandum of Hill III in Reply to ECF 1556 and ECF 1554/1564, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of A. Kimbrough Davis) (Jones, Kristina)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1564 (Document Restricted) CHD AND CNBW'S OPPOSITION TO HILL III'S SUBMISSION ON APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP. (ctf)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1563 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1555 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/27/2015) (chmb)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1562 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #1554 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/27/2015) (chmb)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1561 (Document Restricted) Wilmington Trust, N.A.'s Notification of Payment of Fee Certifications (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Johnson, Zachary)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1560 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1558 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Da Grosa Smith. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/23/2015) (chmb)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1559 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1557 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristina M. Jones. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/23/2015) (chmb)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1558 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6748385) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, John)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1557 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6748344) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jones, Kristina)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1556 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1551 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1555 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Response to ECF No. 1549 Pursuant to ECF No. 1551 filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiff, Michael)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1554 (Document Restricted) Motion to Seal CHD and CNBW's Opp to Hill III's Submission on Appointing Successor Trustee (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed - Opp to Hill III's Submission on Appt Successor Trustee, #2 Proposed Order Motion to Seal, #3 Additional Page(s) Letter to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1553 MOTION CONTINUING MOTION BY ADMINISTRATOR ALBERT G. HILL III OBTAIN 2014 AND CURRENT ACCOUNT STATEMENTS re #1465 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Obtain Account Statements (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010), #1517 (Document Restricted) EMERGENCY MOTION BY ALBERT G. HILL III TO REURGE ECF 1465, MOTION TO OBTAIN ACCOUNT STATEMENTS REGARDING FUNDS BEING HELD IN THE COURTS REGISTRY (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009), #1518 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion,,, filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Misc. Order 45, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mowla, Michael)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1552 ORDER denying #1514 Albert G. Hill, III's Motion to Refer Contempt to the U.S. Attorney, or, in the Alternative, to Appoint Special Prosecutor to Prosecute Civil and Criminal Contempt Against the Trustee, Wilmington Trust, N.A. The court directs Wilmington to pay the Fee Certifications at issue no later than 4/24/2015, and to file a notification with the court upon completion of payment. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/9/2015) (ykp) Modified document security per DJ chambers on 4/10/2015 (bdb).
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1551 ORDER: The Court finds that further briefing is warranted re #1549 . Interested parties may file a response to Hill IIIs submission no later than 4/20/2015. Hill III may file a reply no later than 4/30/2015. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/7/2015) (mcrd)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Destruction of Exhibits offered by All Parties (EXH-ADM flag removed) (svc)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 ORDER: The court denies #1536 Opposed Supplemental/Amended Motion by Albert G. Hill III for Rehearing, Reconsideration or Amend [sic] on Single Issue Contained in the Memorandum Opinion and Order dated November 3, 2015; and denies as moot #1535 Opposed Motion by Albert G. Hill III for Rehearing, Reconsideration or Amend [sic] on Single Issue Contained in the Memorandum Opinion and Order dated November 3, 2015. Upon review of this file, the court notes that many motions are routinely filed under seal. The court questions whether this practice should continue. Henceforth, no motions will be filed under seal without leave of court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/2/2015) (twd)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1549 (Document Restricted) Submission of Plaintiff Albert G. Hill, III in Response to #1546 February 13, 2015 Order Directing Him to Appoint Successor Trustee and #1548 Order (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) X1-25 largest, #2 Exhibit(s) X2-Managed Assets, #3 Exhibit(s) X3-Davis Affidavit, #4 Exhibit(s) X4-SunTrust Email, #5 Exhibit(s) X5-Affidavit DB) (Mowla, Michael) Modified docket text and terminating motion on 4/2/2015 (cea).
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1548 ORDER denying #1547 Motion to Appoint Deutsche Bank Trust Company NA as Successor Trustee: The Court will give Plaintiff Albert G. Hill, III one final opportunity to rectify this matter before imposing sanctions. No later than 4/1/2015, Hill III shall notify the Court that a suitable successor trustee(s) for the trusts at issue has been appointed. To be clear, the successor trustee(s) must be selected from the list of trust institutions provided by the FDIC as updated to the present date. Hill III shall also file with the Court the most recent FDIC list of Largest Trust Institutions by Managed Assets. Sanctions will follow if Hill III does not strictly comply with the Court's order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/16/2015) (twd)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1547 (Document Restricted) HILL IIIs MOTION TO APPOINT DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) ECF 1516-3, p. 2, #2 Affidavit(s) Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mowla, Michael)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER denying #1487 Motion to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s); denying #1506 Sealed Motion to Strike CHD's Opposition to Willimgton's Motion and Reply; denying #1510 Motion for Hearing. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/13/2015) (aaa)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER OF REFERENCE: The court vacates the 3/15/2012, Standing Order of Reference issued by Judge Reed O'Connor in this action. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), the Motion to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Determine if Clarification/Modification of Global Settlement Agreement, Final Judgment and/or Trusts is Necessary for Administration of the Trusts or, in the Alternative, Motion for Appointment of Successor Trustee(s), filed 6/9/2014; the Albert G. Hill III's Reply to Hill Jr.'s Response (ECF #1504 ) to Motion to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee, etc. (Wilmington's Motion ECF #1487 ) and Motion to Strike CHD's Opposition (ECF #1502 ) to Wilmington's Motion, filed 7/7/2014; and the Motion for Setting and Request for Hearing on Wilmington's Motion to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s), filed 8/11/2014, are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and determination. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/10/2015) (ctf)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1544 ORDER OF REFERENCE re: #1540 (Document Restricted) Motion of the HHTE New Hunt Trusts Confirm Title Transfer (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010). Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/21/2015) (bdb)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1543 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1540 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Huff, Carrie)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1542 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1540 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1535 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1536 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Spencer, Richard)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1541 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1540 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1540 (Document Restricted) Motion of the HHTE New Hunt Trusts Confirm Title Transfer (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Huff, Carrie)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1539 JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to #1478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. Judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 12/17/14. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at #www.txnd.uscourts.gov/Court Records). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (Attachments: #1 USCA5 Letter) (svc)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1538 Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re #1478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. (svc)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1537 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1535 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1536 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1536 (Document Restricted) OPPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL/ AMENDED MOTION BY ALBERT G. HILL III FOR REHEARING, RECONSIDERATION OR AMEND ON SINGLE ISSUE CONTAINED IN THE MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2014 (ECF 1534) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Mowla, Michael)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1535 (Document Restricted) OPPOSED MOTION BY ALBERT G. HILL III FOR REHEARING, RECONSIDERATION OR AMEND ON SINGLE ISSUE CONTAINED IN THE MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 6, 2014 (ECF 1531) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Mowla, Michael)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1534 (Document Restricted) Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/13/2014) (jrr)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1533 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #1526 Motion by Hill III to Reallocate the Prior Years Taxes Among All the Registry Accounts on a Pro Rata Basis According to the Interest Earned in Each Account in 2010, 2011, and 2012. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/13/2014) (jrr)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 (Document Restricted) Sealed Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Notice of Compliance and Notice of Payment of Funds Into the Court's Registry Pursuant to Paragraph 21 of the Final Judgment (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 (Document Restricted)***VACATED PER #1534 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER*** MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/6/2014) (aaa)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1530 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1487 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Mowla, Michael)
October 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1529 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1514 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Spencer, R)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1528 JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to #1406 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. Judgment of the District Court is Affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 9/12/14. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at #www.txnd.uscourts.gov/Court Records). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (svc)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1527 Opinion of USCA(13-10939) in accordance with USCA judgment re #1406 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. (svc)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1526 (Document Restricted) MOTION BY HILL III TO REALLOCATE THE PRIOR YEARS TAXES AMONG ALL THE REGISTRY ACCOUNTS ON A PRO RATA BASIS ACCORDING TO THE INTEREST EARNED ON EACH ACCOUNT IN 2010, 2011, AND 2012 (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EX1 Allocation of Taxes on Funds in Court Registry Accounts, #2 Proposed Order EX2 Proposed Order) (Mowla, Michael)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1525 ORDER Granting #1524 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond re: #1514 (Document Restricted) ALBERT G. HILL, IIIS MOTION TO REFER CONTEMPT TO THE U.S. ATTORNEY, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROSECUTOR TO PROSECUTE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL CONTEMPT AGAINST THE TRUSTEE, WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A. Responses due by 10/14/2014. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/17/2014) (cea)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Albert G. Hill, IIIs Motion to Refer Contempt to the U.S. Attorney, or, in the Alternative, to Appoint Special Prosecutor to Prosecute Civil and Criminal Contempt Against the Trustee, Wilmington Trust, N.A. (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Spencer, R)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1523 (Document Restricted) ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #1521 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/11/2014) (ndt)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1522 NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: #1521 (Document Restricted) EMERGENCY MOTION BY HILL III FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED TAX RETURN AND DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS FOR PAYMENT OF TAX LIABILITY (FOR TAX RETURN DUE ON SEPTEMBER 15, 2014, BALANCE OF 2012 RETURN, AND FOR 2014 ESTIMATED TAXES) ( filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1521 (Document Restricted) EMERGENCY MOTION BY HILL III FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED TAX RETURN AND DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS FOR PAYMENT OF TAX LIABILITY (FOR TAX RETURN DUE ON SEPTEMBER 15, 2014, BALANCE OF 2012 RETURN, AND FOR 2014 ESTIMATED TAXES) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EX1 2013 1120-SF AGHill3 DOF 2014-09-08, #2 Exhibit(s) EX2 2012 IRS Notice Hill3-DOF 2014-06-14, #3 Exhibit(s) EX3 Email Price 2012 Tax Due 1467.53) (Mowla, Michael)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1520 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1514 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1519 (Document Restricted) Monthly bank statements that pertain to 2013 for the registry funds in this action (filed under seal pursuant to Order #1518 ) (lrl)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 ORDER: The court grants #1465 Plaintiff's motion to obtain account statements. The court denies as moot the Emergency Motion by Albert G. Hill III to Reurge ECF 1465, Motion to Obtain Account Statements Regarding Funds Being Held in the Court's Registry #1517 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/4/2014) (tla)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1517 (Document Restricted) EMERGENCY MOTION BY ALBERT G. HILL III TO REURGE ECF 1465, MOTION TO OBTAIN ACCOUNT STATEMENTS REGARDING FUNDS BEING HELD IN THE COURTS REGISTRY (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Email from CPA, #2 Exhibit(s) ECF 1465) (Mowla, Michael)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1516 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1514 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1510 Motion for Hearing (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Raiff, Michael)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1515 (Document Restricted) Notice of Supplemental Authority Supporting Renewed Motion to Release Funds from Court Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Huff, Carrie)
August 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1514 (Document Restricted) ALBERT G. HILL, IIIS MOTION TO REFER CONTEMPT TO THE U.S. ATTORNEY, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROSECUTOR TO PROSECUTE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL CONTEMPT AGAINST THE TRUSTEE, WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A. (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Mowla, Michael)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1513 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1510 Motion for Hearing (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 14-10505 (related to #1478 appeal): transmitted to Gibson Dunn & Crutcher on disk only by hand delivery. (svc)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1512 ORDER of USCA as to #1478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. IT IS ORDERED that the unopposed motion of appellees, Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, P.L.L.C. and Campbell Harrison & Dagley, L.L.P., to view the entire sealed record on appeal is GRANTED. (svc)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Sealed Record on Appeal for USCA5 14-10505 (related to #1478 appeal): transmitted to Wright & Close LLP on disk only Federal Express 770871195404. (svc)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1511 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1510 Motion for Hearing (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Mowla, Michael)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order SEALED Record on Appeal for USCA5 14-10505 (related to #1478 appeal): transmitted to Gibson Dunn & Crutcher on disk only by hand delivery. (svc)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1510 MOTION for Hearing re #1487 MOTION to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) or, in the Alternative, for Other Relief re #998 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Spencer, R)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1509 ORDER of USCA as to #1478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. The joint stipulation of appellees to view the entire sealed record on appeal is GRANTED. (axm)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1508 ORDER of USCA as to #1478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. IT IS ORDERED that unopposed motion of Campbell, Harrison, & Dagley, L.L.P. and Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, to appear as appellees in this case is GRANTED. (svc)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1507 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1487 Motion to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Determine if Clarification/Modification of Global Settlement Agreement, Final Judgment and/or Trusts is Necessary for Administration of the Trust or, in the Alternative, Motion for Appointment of Successor Trustee(s), #1506 Motion to Strike (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Enclosure letter to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Strike CHD's Opposition to Willimgton's Motion and Reply re: #1487 Motion to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Determine if Clarification/Modification of Global Settlement Agreement, Final Judgment and/or Trusts is Necessary for Administration of the Trust or, in the Alternative, Motion for Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/23/2014) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reliance CFO, #2 Proposed Order) (Mowla, Michael) Modified text and linkage on 7/8/2014 (axm).
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1505 ORDER: The court grants CHD and CNBW's Opposition to Any Order Disbursing Money From the Court's Registry, and, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay (Doc. #1495 ); and denies the Opposed Motion By Albert G. Hill, III to Disburse and Release Settlement Funds Currently Being Held in the Court's Registry in Light of Judgment Resolving Final Creditor Claims (Doc. #1498 ). The court will not order the distribution any registry funds interpleaded for the benefit of Hill III pending the final resolution of the attorneys' fee dispute on appeal. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/3/2014) (ctf)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1504 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1487 Motion to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Determine if Clarification/Modification of Global Settlement Agreement, Final Judgment and/or Trusts is Necessary for Administration of the Trust or, in the Alternative, Motion for Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1503 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1496 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/23/2014) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Mowla, Michael)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1502 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1487 Motion to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Determine if Clarification/Modification of Global Settlement Agreement, Final Judgment and/or Trusts is Necessary for Administration of the Trust or, in the Alternative, Motion for Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order, #3 Correspondence to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1501 (Document Restricted) Notice (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/23/2014) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EX1 Resignation and appointment 2010 Gift Trust, #2 Exhibit(s) EX2 Resignation and appointment Separate Hill 2010 Trust, #3 Exhibit(s) EX3 Reliance Letter 2014-06-26, #4 Exhibit(s) EX4 Press Release 2014-05) (Mowla, Michael)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1500 (Document Restricted)PROPOSED Order to Disburse and Wire Funds to the Acting Trustee of the Grandchildren's Trusts (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/18/2014) filed by Wilmington Trust NA (Spencer, R) Modified on 6/27/2014 to reflect it is a proposed order not signed by Judge Lindsey (svc).
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1499 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #1417 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/25/2014) (skt)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1498 (Document Restricted) Motion filed under seal (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/23/2014) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Mowla, Michael)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1497 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #1492 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/23/2014) (skt)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1496 (Document Restricted) Sealed Order: Replies due by 6/30/2014 re: #1492 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal). No further filings will be permitted in connection with this opposition and motion to stay, and a party is not to seek leave to file same. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/23/2014) (cea)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1495 (Document Restricted) Opposition to Any Order Disbursing Funds (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Correspondence) (Wright, Thomas)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1494 (Document Restricted) Sealed Order. The trustees of the Grandchildren's Trusts are therefore ordered to provide, by 6/25/2014, to the court, under seal, proposed orders and all other information necessary for the court to transmit the Installment Payments to the Grandchildren's Trusts, as required by Paragraph 22 of the Final Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/18/2014) (skt)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1493 ORDER granting #1491 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel: It is ordered that Iian Jablon, Marshall Camp are relieved of any further obligation or responsibility to represent Hill III in this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/18/2014) (twd)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1492 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Motion to Disburse and Release Settlement Funds Currently Being Held in the Courts Registry In Light of Judgment Resolving Final Creditor Claims) (Mowla, Michael)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1491 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Albert G Hill, III with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of I&M) (Jablon, Iian)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1490 (Document Restricted) Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Notice Of Payment Of Funds Into The Court's Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1489 (Document Restricted) Sealed Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part #1448 Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Albert G. Hill, Jr. Should Not Be Held in Contempt and Sanctioned for Failure to Comply with Final Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/16/2014) (axm)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1488 ORDER of USCA as to #1478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. Appellants opposed motion to view the entire sealed record is GRANTED. (svc)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1487 (Document Restricted) MOTION to Approve Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Determine if Clarification/Modification of Global Settlement Agreement, Final Judgment and/or Trusts is Necessary for Administration of the Trust or, in the Alternative, Motion for Appointment of Successor Trustee(s) filed by Wilmington Trust, NA re #998 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order). Party Wilmington Trust, N.A. added. (Spencer, R) Modified document restriction per Protective Order/Attorney on 7/10/2014 (jrr).
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1486 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Albert G Hill, III filed by THH Properties Limited Partnership, D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership, Melrose Properties, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Ayres, Lee)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1485 ORDER: Before the court is CHD and CNBW's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For Payment (Doc. #1483 ), which the court treats as a motion to withdraw CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment From Court Registry and MHTE-Albert G. Hill, III Trust (Doc. #1426 ). After review of the motion, the court grants the motion to withdraw. The court directs the clerk of court to withdraw or terminate CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment From Court Registry and MHTE-Albert H. Hill, III Trust (Doc. #1426 ). withdrawing sealed and/or ex parte motion #1426 . (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/4/2014) (axm)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1484 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #1342 Motion for Leave to File Intervention. The Louisiana Creditors shall file their Complaint in Intervention by June 6, 2014. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/4/2014) (aaa) Modified title on 6/5/2014 (ctf).
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1483 (Document Restricted) Notice of Withdrawal (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Correspondence) (Wright, Thomas)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1482 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Appeal in Case No. 3:12-cv-04599-L-BK filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Correspondence) (Wright, Thomas)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 ORDER denying #1449 Motion to Clarify or, In the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Orders Entered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/29/2014) (Entered in this case per chambers request.) (skt)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1479 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan A. Ward. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/29/2014) (chmb)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 14-10505 (related to #1478 appeal): transmitted to Wright & Close LLP on disk only by mail. (svc)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 14-10505 (related to #1478 appeal) transmitted to Michael Mowla on disk only by mail. (svc)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 14-10505 (related to #1478 appeal): Record consisting of ECF electronic record, 19 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte document(s)(circuit approval is required for access), certified to USCA. To request a copy of the record (on disk or on paper), #contact the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6015843) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Ward, Ryan)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 14-10505 for #1478 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. (svc)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1478 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Albert G Hill, III. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-5991401. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Mowla, Michael)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1477 ORDER denying #1471 Motion for Leave of Court to File an Emergency Motion for Relief Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b) Based on New Testimony By Former IRS Attorney Cynthia Camuel. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/17/2014) (tln)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1476 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court accepts the #1401 Findings and Conclusions as those of the court, overrules Plaintiff's objections, and denies Albert G. Hill, III's #1389 Supplemental Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) to Vacate Global Settlement Agreement and Final Judgment in Light of the Honorable Reed O'Connor's Recusal or, in the Alternative, for Leave to Take Discovery. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/17/2014) (tln)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, the court overrules The Hills' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying the Hills' Motion to Recuse the Honorable Renee H. Toliver, and denies The Hills' Motion to Alter or Amend the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying the Hills' Motion to Recuse the Honorable Renee H. Toliver. Further, the court concludes that recusal is not required in Case No. 3:07-CV-2020-L-BK; or Case No. 3:12-CV-4599-L-BK; and to the extent the Hills move to recuse Magistrate Judge Toliver, the court denies the motions. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/15/2014) (tln)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1474 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1471 Motion for Leave to File,,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1473 RESPONSE filed by Charla Aldous, Aldous Law Firm, Charla Aldous, PC, Baron & Blue, Lisa Blue, Law Offices of Stephen F. Malouf, PC re: #1471 First MOTION for Leave to File EMERGENCYMOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 60(b) BASED ON NEW TESTIMONY BY FORMER IRS ATTORNEY CYNTHIA CAMUEL (Loewinsohn, Alan)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1472 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1471 Motion for Leave to File,,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by John W Creecy, Albert G Hill, Jr, Lyda Hill, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Margaret Keliher, Brett Ringle, William Schilling, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne, Alinda H Wikert (Raiff, Michael)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Sealed Record on Appeal for USCA5 13-10939 (related to #1406 appeal): transmitted to Aarti Wilson at Irell & Manella per USCA5 Order. Federal Express 798329801840 (svc)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1471 First MOTION for Leave to File EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 60(b) BASED ON NEW TESTIMONY BY FORMER IRS ATTORNEY CYNTHIA CAMUEL filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed 60(b) Motion, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex1-Declaration of Hill III, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex2-Deposition Camuel, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex3-Answer Al Jr to MSJ, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex4-Trustee MSJ Lack Standing, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex5-Order Sustain Trustee MSJ, #7 Exhibit(s) Ex6-Wikert Response to RFP, #8 Exhibit(s) Ex7-Lyda Hill Response to RFP, #9 Exhibit(s) Ex8-Hill Jr Obj to RFP, #10 Exhibit(s) Ex9-Wikert Depo Excerpt, #11 Exhibit(s) Ex10-Lyda Hill Depo, #12 Exhibit(s) Ex11-Camuel CV) (Mowla, Michael)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1470 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by L T Bradt on behalf of Albert G Hill, III. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bradt, L)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1469 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Mowla on behalf of Albert G Hill, III. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mowla, Michael)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1468 ORDER of USCA as to #1406 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. Appellant's unopposed motion to view all sealed documents in the record is GRANTED. (svc) (svc).
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1467 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1465 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Obtain Account Statements (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) (Wilson, Aarti)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1466 ORDER of USCA granting motion view all sealed documents in the record filed by Appellees Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, P.L.L.C. and Campbell Harrison & Dagley, L.L.P (Attachments: #1 USCA5 Letter) (svc)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Sealed Record on Appeal for USCA5 13-10939 (related to #1406 appeal): transmitted to Wright and Close LLP on disk only by mail. (svc)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1465 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Obtain Account Statements (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wilson, Aarti)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 ORDER of USCA as to #1406 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. Appellees' unopposed motion to view sealed documents contained in the record is GRANTED (svc)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Sealed Record on Appeal for USCA5 13-10939 (related to #1406 appeal): transmitted to Haynes & Boone LLP on disk only by hand delivery. (svc)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORDER: The court does not believe that a status conference is necessary at this time but will notify the parties and schedule a hearing, as necessary, in this or the related cases if it determines that doing so will assist the court in resolving the matters pending in the three cases. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/7/2014) (jrr)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1450 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jablon, Iian)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1448 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Jablon, Iian)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1449 MOTION Clarify, or in the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Orders Entered by the Court (Jablon, Iian)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1459 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1457 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1450 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Lyda Hill, Alinda H Wikert (Bowman, Bruce)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1457 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1448 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1456 RESPONSE filed by Charla Aldous, Aldous Law Firm, Charla Aldous, PC, Baron & Blue, Lisa Blue, Law Offices of Stephen F. Malouf, PC, Stephen Malouf re: #1449 MOTION Clarify, or in the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Orders Entered by the Court (Loewinsohn, Alan)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1449 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by John W Creecy, Margaret Keliher, Brett Ringle, William Schilling (Huff, Carrie)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 (Document Restricted) Sealed Objection re: #1450 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by John W Creecy, Margaret Keliher, Brett Ringle, William Schilling (Huff, Carrie)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1448 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1452 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1450 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1451 RESPONSE filed by Lyda Hill, Alinda H Wikert re: #1449 MOTION Clarify, or in the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Orders Entered by the Court (Bowman, Bruce)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 13-10939 (related to #1406 appeal): transmitted to Gibson Dunn & Crutcher on disk only by Federal Express 797369955265 (svc)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1450 (Document Restricted) Notice of Additional Evidence in Support of Objections (ECF No. 1410) to, or in the Alternative, Motion to Alter or Amend Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (ECF No. 1401) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Wilson, Aarti)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1449 MOTION Clarify, or in the Alternative, to Modify the Protective Orders Entered by the Court filed by Albert G Hill, III with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Wilson, Aarti)
November 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1448 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Albert G. Hill, Jr. Should Not Be Held in Contempt and Sanctioned for Failure to Comply with Final Judgment (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Wilson, Aarti)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1447 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1446 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 13-10939 (related to #1406 appeal): transmitted to Irell & Manella LLP on disk only by mail. (axm)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 13-10939 (related to #1406 appeal): transmitted to Kathleen S Rose, Wright & Close LLP on disk only by mail. (axm)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 13-10939 (related to #1406 appeal): transmitted to Haynes & Boone LLP on disk only by hand delivery. (svc)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 13-10939 (related to #1406 appeal): Record consisting of: ECF electronic record, 19 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte document(s)(circuit approval is required for access), certified to USCA. To request a copy of the record (on disk or on paper), #contact the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1446 (Document Restricted) Sealed Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Notice Regarding Installment Payment (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1445 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1438 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Wilson, Aarti)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1444 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1426 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1443 NOTICE: Letter to Judge Lindsay filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas) Modified text on 10/18/2013 (ykp).
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 NOTICE of Appearance and Registration filed by Regions Bank (Reed, Toni)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1441 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1426 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Wilson, Aarti)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1440 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1426 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1439 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1426 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Melrose Properties, LLC, THH Properties Limited Partnership, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership (Poe, Jason)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1438 (Document Restricted) Notice of Resignation of Wilmington as Trustee of Al III Trust and Supplement to Motion for Security (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas) Modified text on 10/11/2013 (axm).
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1437 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1424 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, #1410 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Wilson, Aarti)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1417 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Wilson, Aarti)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1435 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Ed Kinkeade recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam A Lindsay for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:07-CV-2020-L-BK. (gr)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1434 Court Request for Recusal: Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:07-CV-2020-K-BK. (gr)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1433 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:07-CV-2020-D-BK. (gr)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1416 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Wilson, Aarti)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1431 Court Request for Recusal: Judge David C Godbey recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Jane J Boyle for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:07-CV-2020-B-BK. (gr)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1430 NOTICE of Letter to Judge Godbey filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1429 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1423 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, #1418 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, #1410 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Wilson, Aarti)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jorge A Solis recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:07-CV-2020-N. (gr)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 (Document Restricted) Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Notice of Joinder in ECF No. 1425 (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 ***WITHDRAWN PER #1485 ORDER*** (Document Restricted) CHD and CNBW's Motion for Payment From Court Registry and MHTE-Albert G. Hill III Trust (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas) Modified on 6/5/2014 (axm).
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1417 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Lyda Hill, Alinda H Wikert (Bowman, Bruce)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1424 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1410 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by John W Creecy, Albert G Hill, Jr, Lyda Hill, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Margaret Keliher, Brett Ringle, William Schilling, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne, Alinda H Wikert (Raiff, Michael)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1410 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Charla Aldous, Aldous Law Firm, Charla Aldous, PC, Baron & Blue, Lisa Blue, Law Offices of Stephen F. Malouf, PC, Stephen Malouf (Loewinsohn, Alan)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1418 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 38, #4 Exhibit 39, #5 Exhibit 40, #6 Exhibit 41, #7 Exhibit 42, #8 Exhibit 43, #9 Exhibit 44) (Wright, Thomas)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1421 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1418 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28, #5 Exhibit 29, #6 Exhibit 30, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 34, #11 Exhibit 35) (Wright, Thomas)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1418 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18 part 1, #2 Exhibit 18 part 2, #3 Exhibit 18 part 3, #4 Exhibit 18 part 4, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 22, #9 Exhibit 23, #10 Exhibit 24) (Wright, Thomas)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1419 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1418 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13 part 1, #4 Exhibit 13 part 2, #5 Exhibit 13 part 3, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17) (Wright, Thomas)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1418 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1410 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 (Document Restricted) Guardian Ad Litem's Fourth Motion for Additional Fees (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/19/2010) filed by Guardian Ad Litem (Hurst, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 (Document Restricted) CHD and CNBW's Emergency Notice (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed Emergency Motion #1407 for Approval of Disbursement of Registry Funds. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 9/10/2013) (chmb)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1407 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Wilson, Aarti)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 Transcript Order Form: re #1406 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested (Wilson, Aarti)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1407 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr, Lyda Hill, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne, Alinda H Wikert (Dees, Tom)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1411 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1407 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by John W Creecy, Margaret Keliher, Brett Ringle, William Schilling (Huff, Carrie)
September 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 (Document Restricted) Sealed Objection to, or in the Alternative, Motion to Alter or Amend the #1401 Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation. (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) Part 1, #3 Exhibit(s) Part 2, #4 Exhibit(s) Part 3, #5 Exhibit(s) Part 4) (Wilson, Aarti) Modified title on 10/4/2013 (axm).
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 (Document Restricted) Sealed Order. The Court finds it necessary to expedite the response and reply deadlines re #1407 . Therefore, Defendants response deadline is September 3, 2013 and Plaintiffs reply deadline is September 6, 2013. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 8/30/2013) (chmb)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 NOTICE of Non-Opposition To: Al III's Emergency Motion for Payment of Taxes from Registry re: #1407 (Document Restricted) Sealed Emergency Motion for Approval of Proposed Tax Return and Disbursement of Registry Funds (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 (Document Restricted) Sealed Emergency Motion for Approval of Proposed Tax Return and Disbursement of Registry Funds (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wilson, Aarti)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1406 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to #1398 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion by Albert G Hill, III. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0539-5521717. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Wilson, Aarti)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 (Document Restricted) Sealed Account Statements Held in the Court's Registry. (gr)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting in part #1368 sealed motion (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/21/2013) (mcrd)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1403 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting in part motion #1349 . The Court thus GRANTS the motion to the extent that the Clerk is DIRECTED to add Regions as a listed trustee in the caption. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/20/2013) (mcrd)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1402 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1390 MotionPlaintiff's Motion to Obtain Account Statements Regarding Funds Held in the Court's Registry is GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/20/2013) (chmb)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1401 (Document Restricted) FINDINGS, CONCLUSION AND RECOMMENDATION re: #1389 Sealed Motion. It is recommended that the motion be DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/19/2013) (mcrd)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1400 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1389 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Supplemental Appendix) (Wilson, Aarti)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1390 Sealed MOTION to Obtain Account Statements Regarding Funds Being Held in the Court's Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Wilson, Aarti) Docket text modified on 8/5/2013 (twd).
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 ORDER denying sealed #1343 Objections to, or in the Alternative Motion to Alter or Amend the Magistrate Judge's Order. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 7/30/2013) (chmb)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1389 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1389 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Lyda Hill, Alinda H Wikert (Bowman, Bruce)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1389 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Raiff, Michael)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1389 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by John W Creecy, Margaret Keliher, Brett Ringle, William Schilling (Huff, Carrie)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1389 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/19/2010) filed by Guardian Ad Litem (Guild, John)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 RESPONSE filed by Charla Aldous, Aldous Law Firm, Charla Aldous, PC, Baron & Blue, Lisa Blue, David Evans, Gresham PC, Law Offices of Stephen F. Malouf, PC, Stephen Malouf, Jonathan Nockels re: #1389 (Document Restricted) Supplemental Motion Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 60(b) to Vacate Global Settlement Agreement and Final Judgment in Light of the Honorable Reed OConnors Recusal Or, in the Alternative, For Leave to Take Discovery (Sealed pursuant to (Loewinsohn, Alan)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Thomas C Wright on behalf of Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wright, Thomas)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 (Document Restricted) MOTION to Obtain Account Statements Regarding Funds Being Held in the Court's Registry filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wilson, Aarti) Modified on 7/5/2013 (ykp).(Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 (Document Restricted) Supplemental Motion Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 60(b) to Vacate Global Settlement Agreement and Final Judgment in Light of the Honorable Reed OConnors Recusal Or, in the Alternative, For Leave to Take Discovery (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Appendix (part 1 of 4), #2 Appendix (part 2 of 4), #3 Appendix (part 3 of 4), #4 Appendix (part 4 of 4)) (Klaeb, Justin)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1388 Received letter from USCA5 Re: Supreme Court denied certiorari (svc)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1387 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1386 Motion to Substitute Attorney. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/25/2013) (chmb)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Kirk T Florence,Kirk T Florence for Lyda Hill,Kirk T Florence for Lyda Hill. Motion filed by Lyda Hill (Florence, Kirk)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to #1121 and #1296 Notice of Appeal filed by Albert G Hill, III. Judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at #www.txnd.uscourts.gov/Court Records). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (Attachments: #1 USCA5 Letter) (svc)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 Opinion of USCA (certified copy) in accordance with USCA judgment re #1121 and #1296 Notice of Appeals, filed by Albert G Hill, III. AFFIRMING in appeals 12-10620 and 11-10348 and DISMISSING appeal 12-10417. All outstanding motions are DENIED (svc)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1383 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Jorge A Solis for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:07-CV-2020-P. (gr)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Reed C O'Connor recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:07-CV-2020-M. (gr)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 RESPONSE filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP re: #1380 Notice (Other) (Wright, Thomas)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 NOTICE of Filing Motion to Recuse the Honorable Renee H Toliver in a Related Case filed by Albert G Hill, III, Erin Nance Hill (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Appendix) (Wilson, Aarti) Modified docket text on 5/3/2013 (cea).
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1379 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER denying sealed #1225 Application to Disburse Funds; denying sealed #1227 Joint Motion for Final Order Disbursing Registry Funds; denying #1241 BAM's Request for Release of Funds and for an Order to Disburse Funds; denying as moot #1249 Motion to Expedite and granting #1283 Application to Disburse Funds. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/19/2013) (mcrd)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed motion #1377 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/12/2013) (mcrd)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 (Document Restricted) Application for Approval of Proposed Tax Returns and Disbursement of Registry Funds in Payment of Tax Liabilities and Request for Expedited Consideration Thereof (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klaeb, Justin)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1368 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Klaeb, Justin)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1374 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee H. Ayres. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/3/2013) (chmb)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Lee H. Ayres (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5216890) filed by D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Melrose Properties, LLC, THH Properties Limited Partnership, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Poe, Jason)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Poe for S. Todd Parks on behalf of D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Melrose Properties, LLC, THH Properties Limited Partnership, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership. (Poe, Jason)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1368 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Lyda Hill, Alinda H Wikert (Davis, Lauren)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1368 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/8/2009) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1349 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/8/2009) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 NOTICE of Opposition re: #1368 (Document Restricted) Guardian Ad Litems Motion to Clarify Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem in Light of Attorneys Fee Dispute Following Resolution of Appeal (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/19/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Wright, Thomas)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 (Document Restricted) Guardian Ad Litems Motion to Clarify Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem in Light of Attorneys Fee Dispute Following Resolution of Appeal (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/19/2010) filed by Guardian Ad Litem (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Letter to Magistrate Judge Renee H. Toliver) (Guild, John)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John F Guild on behalf of Guardian Ad Litem. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Guild, John)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 REPLY filed by D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Melrose Properties, LLC, THH Properties Limited Partnership, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership re: #1342 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention on Behalf of THH Properties Limited Partnership, D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership and Melrose Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Letter to Judge Toliver) (Poe, Jason)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Attorney Jason Poe is ORDERED to file designation of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a), or move for leave of court to dispense with this requirement, no later than 3/27/2013. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/6/2013) (mcrd)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice #1363 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee H. Ayres for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.10, which requires that designated local counsel must reside or maintain an office within 50 miles of the division in which the case is pending. Clerk shall return admission fee to Applicant. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/6/2013) (mcrd)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Lee H. Ayres (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5160669) filed by D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Melrose Properties, LLC, THH Properties Limited Partnership, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Poe, Jason)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1349 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Klaeb, Justin)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1360 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Reply brief due by 3/8/2013. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/1/2013) (chmb)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #1355 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, filed by D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Melrose Properties, LLC, THH Properties Limited Partnership, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Additional Page(s) Cover Letter to Judge) (Poe, Jason)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1343 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Klaeb, Justin)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1358 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Albert G. Hill, III. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. (Klaeb, Justin)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1356 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Huff, Carrie)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1333 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Huff, Carrie)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1342 Motion for Leave to File,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1343 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1353 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1343 Objections to, or in the Alternative, Motion to Alter or Amend (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Raiff, Michael) Filer modified on 2/13/2013 (twd).
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1350 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Margaret Keliher, Brett Ringle, William Schilling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - pt.1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2 - pt.2, #4 Exhibit(s) 2 - pt.3) (Huff, Carrie)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1350 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1343 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Margaret Keliher, Brett Ringle, William Schilling (Huff, Carrie)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1352 ORDER of USCA denying as moot motion to place material under seal filed by Not Parties Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, P.L.L.C. and Campbell Harrison & Dagley, L.L.P.; motion to place appendix under seal filed by Appellee Mr. Albert G. Hill, III, motion to place appendix under seal filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, P.L.L.C. and Campbell Harrison & Dagley, L.L.P.; motion to place motion under seal filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, P.L.L.C. and Campbell Harrison & Dagley, L.L.P. and, motion to intervene as appellees' filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, P.L.L.C. and Campbell Harrison & Dagley, L.L.P. (svc)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 (Document Restricted) CHD and CNBWs Motion for Substitution of Parties or, Alternatively, for Joinder of a Party (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Declaration of Thomas C. Wright, #2 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1348 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1333 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Klaeb, Justin)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 NOTICE of CHD and CNBW's Notice Regarding Re-Assertion of Prior Filings Following Intervention filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #1229 sealed Second Motion to Intervene, denying as moot #1230 Motion to Expedite and denying as moot #1341 sealed Motion to Reconsider (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/1/2013) (mcrd)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 ORDER of USCA as to #1320 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III, and #1316 Notice of Appeal, filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. are dismissed as of January 30, 2013, pursuant to parties motions. (svc)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1344 NOTICE of Supplement to CHD and CNBW's Notice of Motion to Intervene in Fifth Circuit PBL Appeal re: #1337 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document, filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order (Document Restricted) OBJECTIONS TO, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER #1339 DENYING HIS MOTION TO ENFORCE THE JUDGMENT AND COMPEL TRANSFER OF BOOKS AND RECORDS TO SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES #1255 filed by Albert G Hill, III. See #1343 for image (svc)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1343 (Document Restricted) Sealed Objection re: #1339 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Disclosure,, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Klaeb, Justin)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention on Behalf of THH Properties Limited Partnership, D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership and Melrose Properties, LLC filed by THH Properties Limited Partnership, D&B Thompson Investments, LP, Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership, Melrose Properties, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Proposed Order). Party THH Properties Limited Partnership, D&B Thompson Investments, L.P., Thompson-Huffman Limited Partnership, and Melrose Properties, LLC added. (Poe, Jason)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Reconsider to Lift Stay Imposed by the Order (ECF #1335) (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Huff, Carrie)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #1317 Sealed Guardian Ad Litem's Third Motion for Additional Fees. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/16/2013) (mcrd)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1339 ORDER denying #1255 Motion to Enforce the Judgment and Compel Transfer of Books and Records to Successor Trustees or, in the Alternative, Motion for Relief From Final Judgment Under Rule 60(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/15/2013) (ctf)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1335 Order,, Terminate Motions, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 (Document Restricted) CHD and CNBW's Notice of Motion to Intervene in Fifth Circuit PBL Appeal (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1333 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Thomas)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 ORDER: In light of the pending appeals, motions #1199 , #1225 , #1227 , #1241 , #1249 , #1283 and #1333 in this case are STAYED. If the appeals are dismissed, Hill III is ORDERED to notify the Court as soon as possible. PBL's #1315 MOTION to Intervene is DENIED AS UNNECESSARY (See order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/7/2013) (mcrd)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #1333 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) O to R, #2 Exhibit(s) S, #3 Exhibit(s) T to Z, #4 Exhibit(s) AA pt.1, #5 Exhibit(s) AA pt.2, #6 Exhibit(s) BB to II, #7 Exhibit(s) JJ to RR) (Huff, Carrie)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1333 (Document Restricted) Sealed Renewed Motion to Release Funds (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Peggy Allison, Chester Donnally, Legacy Trust Company, L.T.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Huff, Carrie)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Complete Record on Appeal and All Supplemental Records' on Appeal for USCA5 12-10968 (related to #1296 , #1121 , #1320 , appeal): transmitted to Wright & Close LLP on disk only by mail. (svc)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1332 NOTICE of CHD and CNBW's Notice of Arbitration Award and Supplement to Oppositions to Requested Disbursements from Registry filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Cover Letter to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 NOTICE of Coverletter to Magistrate Judge Toliver re: #1330 Notice (Other) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Wright, Thomas)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1330 NOTICE of Related Case CHD and CNBW's Notice of Filing of Related Case filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Wright, Thomas)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1328 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Filing Letter to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1328 (Document Restricted) Sealed Confidential Albert G. Hill, Jr.'s Notice of Compliance and Notice of Payment of Funds into the Court's Registry Pursuant to Paragraph 21 of the Final Judgment (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Raiff, Michael)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 5th Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 10-10370,11-10348,12-10620,12-10968 (related to #1296 , #1121 , #1320 , appeal): Record consisting of: 1 Volume(s) ECF electronic record, Sealed or ex parte document number(s): : 1297,1298,1299,1300,1303,1303,1304,1307,1308,1310-1313,1317,1321,1324,1325, transmitted to USCA5. Shipped: Federal Express 296232215009539 (svc)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order 5th Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 10-10370,11-10348,12-10620,12-10968 (related to #1296 , #1121 , #1320 , appeal): transmitted to Wright & Close LLP. (svc)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Records on Appeal and Supplemental Records on Appeal for USCA5 12-10968 transmitted to Glast Phillips & Murray on disk only by mail. (svc)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1326 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1317 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter to Judge Toliver) (Klaeb, Justin)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1325 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1317 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Raiff, Michael)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order 5th Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 10-10370,11-10348,12-10620,12-10968 (related to #1296 , #1121 , #1320 , appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record, Sealed or ex parte document number(s): 1297,1298,1299,1300,1303,1303,1304,1307,1308,1310-1313,1317,1321,1324,1325 (circuit approval is required for access), certified to USCA. To request a copy of the record (on disk or on paper), #contact the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1317 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Lyda Hill, Alinda H Wikert (Attachments: #1 Correspondence to Judge Toliver) (Bowman, Bruce)
October 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 REPLY filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. re: #1315 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to JoinThird-Party Defendant (Fischman, Lawrence)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Charla Aldous, Aldous Law Firm, Charla Aldous, PC, Baron & Blue, Lisa Blue, Law Offices of Stephen F. Malouf, PC, Stephen Malouf re: #1315 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to JoinThird-Party Defendant (Loewinsohn, Alan)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1321 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1315 Motion to Intervene, Motion to Join (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Correspondence to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 12-10968 for Notice of Appeal, filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P.. (svc)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to #1311 Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion by Albert G Hill, III. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0539-4850094. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Klaeb, Justin)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 Transcript Order Form: transcript not requested. (ykp)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1318 Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in #1317 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion filed by Guardian Ad Litem. (Hurst, Michael)
September 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1317 (Document Restricted) Sealed Guardian ad Litems Third Motion for Additional Fees (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/19/2010) filed by Guardian Ad Litem (Hurst, Michael)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P.. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0539-4820561. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. SEE #1316 for Image (svc)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 ***Disregard***Selected wrong Court of appeals. NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P.. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0539-4820561. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Fischman, Lawrence) Modified on 9/14/2012 (svc).
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to JoinThird-Party Defendant () filed by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund, L.P. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to Intervene) (Fischman, Lawrence)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 ORDER of USCA ORDER of USCA Granting motion to place brief and record excerpts under seal filed by Appellant Mr. Albert G. Hill, III in 12-10620, and granting motion to place brief and record excerpts under seal filed by Appellants Mr. Albert G. Hill, III and Ms. Erin Nance Hill (svc)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 12-10620 (related to #1296 , #1121 appeal): transmitted to Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP on disk only by hand delivery. (axm)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1313 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #1304 Emergency Motion For Authorization to File Tax Returns on Behalf of Funds Deemed to Have Been Interpleaded Into the Courts Registry. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/20/2012) (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Attachment) (mcrd)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 11-10348/12-10620 (related to #1296 , #1121 appeal): transmitted to Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher on disk only by mail. (svc)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 12-10620 (related to #1296 , #1121 appeal): transmitted to Malouf & Nockels on disk only by hand delivery. (svc)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1312 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1304 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Judge Toliver) (Klaeb, Justin)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER denying #1297 Emergency Motion to Release Settlement Funds Currently Being Held in the Court's Registry. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/13/2012) (mcrd)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 11-10348/12-10620 (related to #1296 , #1121 appeal): Record consisting of: 2 Disk containing ECF electronic record, transmitted to Sherwood, Harper, Dakan USCA5. Shipped: Federal Express 798721346830 (svc)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1304 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/19/2010) filed by Charla Aldous, Aldous Law Firm, Charla Aldous, PC, Baron & Blue, Lisa Blue, Law Offices of Stephen F. Malouf, PC (Loewinsohn, Alan)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 RESPONSE filed by John W Creecy, Albert G Hill, Jr, Lyda Hill, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Margaret Keliher, William Schilling, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne, Alinda H Wikert re: #1304 (Document Restricted) Emergency Motion For Authorization to File Tax Returns on Behalf of Funds Deemed to Have Been Interpleaded Into the Courts Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Dees, Tom)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1304 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/19/2010) filed by Guardian Ad Litem (Hurst, Michael)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1304 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence in Support, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Proposed Order, #16 Correspondence to Judge Toliver) (Wright, Thomas)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 ORDER of USCA5: IT IS ORDERED that the motion of appellant Albert G. Hill, III to consolidate 11-10348 with 12-10620 and 12-10417 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellant Albert G.Hill, III to continue oral argument is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellant Albert G. Hill, III to expedite briefing schedule if appeals are consolidated is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellant Albert G. Hill, III to stay 12-10417 if appeal is not consolidated, pending the determination of above appeals is DENIED AS MOOT (svc)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 ORDER: re: #1304 Emergency Motion For Authorization. The Court finds that expedited briefing is warranted. Defendants and other interested parties are ORDERED to file a response to the motion no later than 8/10/2012. Albert G. Hill, III may file a reply brief no later than 8/15/2012. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/1/2012) (mcrd)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 (Document Restricted) Emergency Motion For Authorization to File Tax Returns on Behalf of Funds Deemed to Have Been Interpleaded Into the Courts Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Judge Toliver, #2 Appendix, #3 Proposed Order) (Klaeb, Justin)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1297 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support) (Klaeb, Justin)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 Record on Appeal for USCA5 12-10620 and Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 11-10348 (related to #1296 , #1121 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 Volume(s) ECF electronic record, Sealed or ex parte document number(s): 1242,1243,1245,1246,1248,1250-1253,1256,1257,1263-1269,1271-1275,1278-1281,1283-1285, 1287,1289,1291,1292,1294,1297, transmitted to USCA5. Shipped: Federal Express 296232215008693 (svc)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 12-10620 for #1296 Notice of Appeal, filed by Albert G Hill, III. (svc)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 10-10370 (related to #1296 , #1121 appeal): transmitted to Wright Brown & Close LLP on disk only by mail. (svc)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 RESPONSE filed by Albert G Hill, Jr, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne re: #1297 (Document Restricted) Emergency Motion to Release Settlement Funds Currently Being Held in the Court's Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) (Dees, Tom)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1300 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1297 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Alinda H Wikert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Email Correspondence) (Bowman, Bruce)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1297 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Charla Aldous, Aldous Law Firm, Charla Aldous, PC, Baron & Blue, Lisa Blue, Law Offices of Stephen F. Malouf, PC (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Loewinsohn, Alan)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1297 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence in Support, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Proposed Order, #20 Transmittal Letter) (Wright, Thomas)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal and Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 10-10370 (related to #1296 , #1121 appeal): transmitted to Irell & Manella LLP on disk only by Federal Express 793787205440 (svc)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order 4th Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 12-10620 (related to #1296 , #1121 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record, Sealed or ex parte document number(s): 1242,1243,1245,1246,1248,1250-1253,1256,1257,1263-1269,1271-1275,1278-1281,1283-1285, 1287,1289,1291,1292,1294,1297 (circuit approval is required for access), certified to USCA. To request a copy of the record (on disk or on paper), #contact the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 (Document Restricted) Emergency Motion to Release Settlement Funds Currently Being Held in the Court's Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support, #2 Cover Sheet Transmittal letter to Magistrate Judge Toliver, #3 Proposed Order) (Klaeb, Justin)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit as to #1295 Order, Terminate Motions by Albert G Hill, III. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0539-4623150. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Klaeb, Justin)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 ORDER Al IIIs Motion to Recuse is Denied #1257 #1287 (Ordered by Judge Reed C O'Connor on 5/15/2012) (gr)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1283 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Guardian Ad Litem, Albert G Hill, Jr (Raiff, Michael)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 ORDER: Until such time as the appeal is resolved, all pending motions, including #1199 , #1225 , #1227 , #1229 , #1230 , #1241 , #1249 , #1255 and #1283 are STAYED. Any motions relating to Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal #1257 , are excluded from this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/8/2012) (mcrd)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #1250 Motion to Clarify Account Statements only insofar as the Clerk's prior accounting, provided to Plaintiff in sealed document #1243 , is supplemented by this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/20/2012) (mcrd)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #1283 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Calloway, Norris, Burdette & Weber, PLLC, Campbell Harrison & Dagley LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Thomas)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1290 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #1233 Motion to Substitute Attorney. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/11/2012) (chmb)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re: #1287 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, #1284 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, #1285 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Owens, Justin)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re: #1255 Motion to Compel,, Motion for Disclosure, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, III (Owens, Justin)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Raiff, Michael)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 OBJECTION filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1284 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, #1285 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, (Owens, Justin)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 (Document Restricted) Sealed Sur-reply re: #1257 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Albert G Hill, Jr, William Herbert Hunt, Ivan Irwin, Jr, Elisa M Summers, Heather V Washburne (Attachments: #1 Appendix To Defendants' Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff Albert G. Hill, III's Motion To Recuse The Honorable Reed O'Connor) (Raiff, Michael)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 (Document Restricted) Sealed Sur-reply re: #1264 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection, #1280 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, #1257 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) filed by John W Creecy, Haroldson Lafayette Hunt Jr Trust Estate, Margaret Keliher, Margaret Hunt Trust Estate, Brett Ringle, William Schilling (Huff, Carrie)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 (Document Restricted) Sealed Application To Disburse Lump Sum Payment To The Single Fund Grandchildren's Trust (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/8/2009) filed by Guardian Ad Litem, Albert G Hill, Jr, Albert G Hill, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Raiff, Michael)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 REPLY filed by Albert G Hill, III re: #1250 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Clarify Account Statements Regarding Funds Being Held in the Court's Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010)(Document Restricted) Sealed Motion to Clarify Account Statements Regarding Funds Being Held in the Court's Registry (Sealed pursuant to order dated 11/8/2010) (Wilson, Aarti)
Marc