i.think inc v. Minekey Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff i.think inc. alleged that Defendants Minekey, Inc. and Delip Andra infringed on Plaintiff's service mark by using the iThink mark in connection with online opinion polls on Internet networking sites such as Facebook, MySpace, Hi5 and Friendster.

Plaintiff: i.think inc
Defendant: Minekey Inc, Delip Andra and Internet Unlimited LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00163
Filed: February 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Jorge A Solis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. THIS MATTER having come before the Court upon the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-styled action, Civil Action No. 3-08-CV- 0163-P, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Jorge A Solis on 10/17/08) (lmp)
October 15, 2008 ***Civil Case Terminated per document #38. (skt)
October 15, 2008 Filing 38 STIPULATION of Dismissal by i.think inc. (Prudhomme, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/17/2008 (skt).
September 9, 2008 Filing 37 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/15/2008. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 9/9/2008) (axm)
July 17, 2008 Filing 36 Defendant's Amended ANSWER to 32 Amended Complaint filed by Minekey Inc (Weinlein, Craig)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON NOTICE OF DISMISSAL. Delip Andra, and only Delip Andra, is dismissed without prejudice from this action, Civil Action No. 3-08-CV-0163-P. (see order) (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 7/10/08) (tln)
July 10, 2008 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by i.think inc re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Prudhomme, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by i.think inc (Prudhomme, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2008 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against all defendants filed by i.think inc. (Prudhomme, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 28 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. [Counsel granted leave to file an amended pleading under LR 15.1 is reminded to electronically file the amended pleading within 3 days. See ECF Standing Designation Order.] (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 7/2/2008) (axm)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: THIS MATTER having come before the Court upon Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Internet Unlimited, LLC, and only Internet Unlimited, LLC, is dismissed without prejudice from the above-captioned case. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 07/01/08) (lmp)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by i.think inc re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 7/11/2008. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 07/01/08) (lmp).
July 1, 2008 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by i.think inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Prudhomme, Jeffrey)
June 30, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Internet Unlimited LLC filed by i.think inc (Prudhomme, Jeffrey)
June 30, 2008 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by i.think inc re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Prudhomme, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/1/2008 (axm).
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant Internet Unlimited LLC's and Delip Andra's Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/30/2008. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 6/9/2008) (axm)
June 4, 2008 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim filed by i.think inc (Prudhomme, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant Internet Unlimited, LLC's and Delip Andra's Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/9/2008. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 5/19/08) (klm)
May 15, 2008 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant Internet Unlimited's and Delip Andra's Motions to Dismiss filed by i.think inc.(Prudhomme, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/16/2008 (lmp).
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 6 Motion to Remand. (See Order for specifics) (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/30/08) (skt)
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant Internet Unlimited, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff i.think inc. is granted an enlargement of time until twenty days after this Court issues its order on the pending Motion to Remand. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/1/08) (klm)
March 28, 2008 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim by i.think inc (Prudhomme, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Dispense Without Local Counsel. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 03/19/08) (lmp)
March 19, 2008 Filing 17 REPLY filed by i.think inc re 6 MOTION to Remand (Prudhomme, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2008 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Internet Unlimited LLC. (O'Neil, Dave)
March 13, 2008 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION Dispense With Local Counsel by Internet Unlimited LLC (O'Neil, Dave)
March 13, 2008 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Internet Unlimited LLC re 13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim (Attachments: # 1 Appendix to Internet Unlimited's M to Dismiss) (O'Neil, Dave)
March 13, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim by Internet Unlimited LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (O'Neil, Dave)
March 4, 2008 Filing 12 Appendix in Support filed by Minekey Inc, Delip Andra re 11 Response to Motion to Remand (Weinlein, Craig)
March 4, 2008 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Minekey Inc, Delip Andra re 6 MOTION to Remand and Supporting Brief (Weinlein, Craig)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant Andra's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff i.think inc. is granted an enlargement of time until twenty days after this Court issues its order on the pending Motion to Remand. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 2/25/08) (klm)
February 22, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant Andra's Motion to Dismiss by i.think inc (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting unopposed motion for enlargement of time to respond to motion to dismiss) (Franklin, Talcott) Modified on 2/22/2008 (tln).
February 19, 2008 Filing 8 Original ANSWER to Complaint by Minekey Inc (Weinlein, Craig)
February 13, 2008 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by i.think inc re 6 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Compendium, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (Franklin, Talcott)
February 13, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by i.think inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Franklin, Talcott)
February 12, 2008 Filing 5 Appendix in Support filed by Delip Andra re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Weinlein, Craig) Modified on 2/13/2008 (tln).
February 12, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Delip Andra with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Weinlein, Craig)
February 4, 2008 Filing 3 Standing Order Designating Case for ECF - see order for specifics. (Signed by Judge Jorge A Solis on 2/4/2008) (axm)
February 1, 2008 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Minekey Inc, Delip Andra. (axm)
February 1, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 160th Judicial District Court of Dallas County TX, case number 08-01055 filed by Minekey Inc, Delip Andra. (Filing fee $ 350; receipt number 18866) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (axm)
February 1, 2008 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by i.think inc. (demanded in state court, see doc 1 for image) (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: i.think inc v. Minekey Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: i.think inc
Represented By: Lawrence R Youst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minekey Inc
Represented By: Craig W Weinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delip Andra
Represented By: Craig W Weinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Unlimited LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?