Cable Electronics Inc v. North American Cable Equipment Inc et al

Plaintiff: Cable Electronics Inc
Defendant: North American Cable Equipment Inc, Aaron Starr and Lawrence Rufo
Case Number: 3:2008cv00433
Filed: March 12, 2008
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M. G. Lynn
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1121 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying 59 Motion to Dismiss filed by Blue Whale Limited, and 95 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Cable Electronics, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Blue Whale Limited. See Order (Ordered by Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 4/15/2010) (svc)
August 10, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court (Amended) Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery. Blue Whale's counsel has moved to withdraw, and given the timing in the Court's Order on that Motion, all discovery may be scheduled so as to be completed by October 30, 2009. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/10/09) (lmp)
August 4, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court [Amended by Docket Entry #76 (see order)] Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery. Blue Whale's counsel has moved to withdraw, and given the timing in the Court's Order on that Motion, all discovery may be scheduled so as to be due on or before October 2, 2009, so long as it is completed by October 30, 2009. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/4/09) (tln) Modified on 8/12/2009 (jrb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cable Electronics Inc v. North American Cable Equipment Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cable Electronics Inc
Represented By: George R Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Cable Equipment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Rufo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?