The Inclusive Communities Project Inc v. Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs et al
Plaintiff: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc
Defendant: Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs, Michael Gerber, Leslie Bingham-Escareno, Tomas Cardenas, C Kent Conine, Dionicio Vidal Flores, Juan Sanchez Munoz and Gloria L Ray
Case Number: 3:2008cv00546
Filed: March 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM OPINION finding that plaintiff has not proved a prima facie case on its disparate impact claim. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/26/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 252 Motion to Supplement the Trial Record, filed by The Inclusive Communities Project Inc, and 254 Cross-Motion to Supplement the Record, filed by Juan Sanchez Munoz, Michael Gerber, C Kent C onine, Leslie Bingham-Escareno, Gloria L Ray, Dionicio Vidal Flores, Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs, Tomas Cardenas, and adopting procedure for first round of merits briefing (plaintiff's prima facie case). (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/10/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER establishing procedure on remand. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/8/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 233 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Disposition of Petition for Certiorari filed by Juan Sanchez Munoz, Michael Gerber, C Kent Conine, Leslie Bingham-Escareno, Gloria L Ray, Dionicio Vidal Flores, Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs, Tomas Cardenas. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/23/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 195 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Costs from TDHCA filed by The Inclusive Communities Project Inc. The court grants plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees and nontaxable costs in the amount of $1,869,577.00 in attorney's fees and $24,392.00 in nontaxable costs. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/15/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 199 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment or, Alternatively for New Trial. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/8/2012) (axm)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The court adopts a remedial plan and it enters judgment today in accordance with its memorandum opinions and orders in this case and the remedial plan adopted today. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/7/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 179 Motion to Intervene filed by Frazier Revitalization Inc. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/12/2012) (skt)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Following a summary judgment decision and a bench trial, the court finds that plaintiff has proved its disparate impact claim under the Fair Housing Act, but it otherwise finds in favor of defendants. Within 60 days of the date this memorandum opinion and order is filed, defendants must file their remedial plan. Plaintiff may submit objections within 30 days after the remedial plan is filed. If objections are filed, the court will establish any necessary additional procedures by separate order. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/20/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting plaintiff's 65 October 2, 2009 motion for partial summary judgment; denying 68 defendants' October 2, 2009 motion for judgment on the pleadings and 70 October 2, 2009 motion for summary judgment; and denying plaintiff's 80 November 9, 2009 motion for leave to file supplemental appendix as moot. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/28/2010) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (see order) (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/11/2008) (axm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc v. Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Bingham-Escareno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Kent Conine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dionicio Vidal Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Sanchez Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria L Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?