Securities and Exchange Commission v. Stanford International Bank Ltd et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Promotora Marino CA, Roberto Barbar, Securities and Exchange Commission and Antonio Jubis Zacarias
Defendant: Claudia Martinez, Pablo M. Alvarado, Gary D. Magness, David Haggard, Charles Brickley, Roberto Pena, Trenton Miller, Monica Novitsky, Stanford Group Company, Grady Layfield, James D. Perry, R Allen Stanford, Scott Notowich, Matthew Drews, Walter Ricardo, A Rincon, Mark Kuhrt, Norman Blake, Nelson Ramirez, Stanford International Bank Ltd, Michael Word, Spencer Murchison, James R. Alguire, Thomas Espy, Gerardo Meave-Flores, Roberto Ulloa, Magness Securities, LLC, David Innes, Donel Bahrenburg, Miguel Valdez, Oralia Vaca de Machuca, Janie Martinez, James LeBaron, Maria Villanueva, James M Davis, Ray Deragon, Nigel Bowman, James Fontenot, Lawrence Messina, Bruce Lang, Stanford Capital Management LLC, Hank Mills, Attlee Gaal, Steve Slewitzke, Arturo Diaz, Tiffany Angelle, Gaines Daniel Adams, Sr., Leroy King, Tim Vanderver, Charles Hughes, Laura Pendergest-Holt, Rocky Roys, Victoria Anctil, Elsida Prieto, Steve Robinson, Charles Jantzi, Stanford Financial Group, Michael Mansur, Roberto A. Pena, Dirk Harris, Neal Clement, Tony Perez, Bill Whitaker, Judith Quinones, Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust, Marie Bautista, Sylvia Aquino, Patricia Herr, GMAG LLC, The Stanford Financial Group Bldg Inc, Teral Bennett, Pete Vargas, Patrick Cruickshank, Gary Haindel, Manuel Malvaez, Lupe Northam, Charles Vollmer, Gilberto Lopez, Jay Comeaux, Al Trullenque, Daniel Hernandez, Jonathan Barrack, Leonar Ramirez, Ron Clayton, John Schwab, Tim Parsons, Yolanda Suarez, Andrea Berger, David Nanes and Saraminta Perez
Petitioner: Katherine A Hill, Mariana DeLeon, Robert L. Ward, Nayade Panos Peche, Daphne Stidham, Frank Cammisano, Todd J Stephens, Paulo Costal, Cliff Damron, Natalia Tartakovski, David Bruce Muir, ATP Tour Inc, Claudine Parsons, JoAnn Dante, J.L. Wolverton, Sumeet Rai, Alberto Baron, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Michael Hanlen, David Fish, Moises Charua Guindic, Nancy Johnston, General Electric Capital Corporation, Kim K. Prudhomme, Jamie C. McMurray, Paul Nightingale, David Hazouri Neme, George Mueller, Joseph M Hill, The Eshelman Foundation, Larry Carlock, Robert and Margaret Houston Family Foundation, Paula Sutton, John S. Shelton, Charles Chaney Paschal, William C Rosenthal, Felipe Gonzalez, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Libby Diamant, Cindy Dore, Linda Boyd, North Bay Rare Coin, Sarah Rose Matthews, Sal L Messina, Greg L England, Trustmark National Bank, Brad Bradham, Barbara Buell, Laurie L. Wyly Revocable Trust, Burton Bowen, Beverly C Antignolo, Simon Blauman, Pierre Herding, Charles J Vollmer, Curtis Mallet-Prevost Colt & Mosle LLP, Robert T Ruff, Nancy Engle, Virginia L Verburg, Shadywood USA, Ltd., Michael Allen Long, Mark D Oge, Ash Shah, Paulette Pribyl, Universal Weather and Aviation Inc, James Owen Hannay, Jean Root, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Joy Davis, Michael Stevens for Mary Jane Stevens, James Ray Lowe Trust, Raymond Hunter, Stanford Condominium Owners Association, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Graham Davis, Arch Specialty Insurance Co, Divo Milan Haddad, Joseph Walker, Barbara Zwick, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Sarah Munoz, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Kelly Sills, Darrell Johnson, Sylvia Baron, Pamela Witters, Monarch Centre Associates LLC, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, James Painter, Nancy Carlock, Alfonso Urquiza, John Taylor Paschal, Jr., Andrew Munoz, Hortensia Hartt, Marilyn Youngs, Esta Kronberg, Koshy George, Kathleen Heidtmann, Beverly Braud, Murphy Buell, John G. Denison, Carol Lovil, Linda K Oge, Constance Blue, John Thibodeaux, Douglas Smith, Ryan Wrobleske, Matthew Weinman, Tommie Timms, Katherine Hunton, Robert Matejek, The Sydow Firm, Michael Carter, Meghan L. Cuddihy, Wanda Evers, ELECTRI International Inc, Cheray Hodges, Brenda Alford, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Kroll Inc, Sandra Darrell, Susan Largo, Patsy Glenn, Janice E. Porter, Paul Gallagher, Jay Stuart Bell, George T. Graves, III, Gerardo Meave, Susan L Blount, Angela Gonzalez, Rose Mareyna, Eddie Rollins, Harriet Owsley, David Quintos, Jerald Lee Monday, Trevor Ling, Gail Marquette, Susan Blount, Kerry Graham, Shay L. Townsend, Faye Vassilatos, John Turbeville, Richard E. Gay, Ronald Lee, Shelby Ortis, Louis J. Schaufele, Jr., Patricia Shaw, Dr. Samuel Bukrinsky, Timothy L Milligan, Robb A. Nen, the Nen Family Trust, and the Robb A. Nen Revocable Trust, Bert Benton, Edward C Antignolo, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Robert S Winter, Bernabe Williams, Carol Rupert, Carolyn Bertrand, Sigma Sigma Sigma Foundation, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Phillip E. Marrett, Kenneth Bird, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Jay Stovall, Eva Uchmany, Jorge Munoz, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Pam C. Marrett, Bill Metzinger, Isak Lempert, Janet Meader, Adela Levy de Charua, Jacobo Tartakovski, Kevin Boscamp, Raymond A Jetson, Gloria Hodapp Trujillo, Karen Ballantyne, Eduardo Urquiza, Barry L Rupert, Neal Benner, Aleyamma George, Charlotte Hunton, Chris Hudson, Arlene C Levin, Rube Holdings, Ltd., Carmen Berrocal, David Blue, Kelly Wyly, Paul N Means, Tim Jordan, Stargate, Ltd., Joyce Margiolos, Lois M Rosenthal, L J Sherman, Jr, Elias Charua Lladani, Jennifer Lynn Wyly Trust, Diane Hunter, Sam Wyly, Diana Dimitiova, Johnny David Damon, Catherine A Wantuck, Doug Shaw, Ursula Mesa, Jonathan Greer, Francisco Cabrera, Carla Elizabeth Miller, Aymeric Martinoia, Alison L. Hannay, Harry Margiolos, Carolyn E. McAnallen, Tory Dearmand, Carroll D Leu, VFS Financing Inc, U.S. Coins, LLC, Gonzalo Urquiza, Charles J Wyly Jr III, Ricardo Estrada, Lynette Carter, Charles J. Wyly, III Trust, Richard L. Nen and the Nen Family Trust, Karla Atkins, Martha Suarez, Elizabeth Hannay, David Brantley, Elizabeth F Thomas, Patricia C Kelso, Beverly DeLoach, Sylvia Bergeron, Gregory Maddux, Sue Ree Kennedy, Bruce Thompson, Robert S. Conte, Stuart Hudson, Ann Prudhomme, Cynthia Schnorf, Jack Denham, Jeff P. Purpera, Jr., Menahen Shueke Esses, Cameron Price Paschal, Fredric N Eshelman, Richard Hunton, Jr, Victoria Hunton, Linda Eismann, Walter Holmsten, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Victor Auli Panos, James P Kraus, Karen Wisniewski, John Sturrock, Thomas Souther, Mark Groesbeck, Jaime Urquiza, Herman Thibodeaux, Moises Guakil, Danna Carlene Cody, German Bricio, Judy W. Richardson, Steve Hoffman, Elizabeth Runkle, Charles R Weidler, Alexandra Hunton, Rebeca Waxtein, Debra L Asher, Michael Lewis, Michael Levine, Dolly Brenneman, C Eric Weidler, Peter J Yanutola, Maria Carrillo, Dan Meirson, Carmen Gonzalez Urquiza Gonzalez, Suzanne C Paschal, Tal E. Kimmel, Duane J Derwanik, Roland Sam Torn, Larry Hernandez, Frederick M. Gratke, Tom M Phelps, Patricia Thibodeaux, Donald R Miller, Jr, Westridge Community Development District, Doris Huang, Andrea Freedman, Timothy J Spence, Martha Caroline Wyly Trust, Randall Youngs, Ian David Ashbery, Equus VI LLC, Thomas W. McAnallen, Damian Lyder, Troy Lillie, Laurie Spellman, Lisa Wyly, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Carlos T Perez, Michael Rishmague, Sylvia Johnson, Byron Boyce, Henry Hill, W. Price Paschal Testamentary Trust, Mary P Shapley, Jocelyn Palumpa, James Price Davis, Rodney Fajkus, David Schnorf, Sara Guindic de Hait, Manuel Naluaez, Alexandra Munoz, Jane S. Shelton, Donald Miller, The Paschal Foundation, ENMR Plateau Telecommunications, Stewart Copeland Matthews, Financial Insurance Management Corp, Cathy Hamilton, James D Derwanik, George T Duggan, Jose Beitman, Allen Worthington, Linda Pace, David Jonathon Drew, Pre-War Art Inc, Wilma Diner, Andrew David Sparrow Wyly Trust, Darla Schmidt, Carl Knapp, Carolyn Kneese, Thomas M Cook, Joann Martrain, Deborah Vollmer, Nora E. Gay, Cornelius Shaw, Dina Dickerson, John F Thompson, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Hal Downing, Ira Gene Causey, Teresa Lamke, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Wampold & Company Inc, Susana Cisneros, Carlos Tony Perez, Parker H. Richardson Trust, Clifton J. McAdams, Joe Bergeron, III, Carlos Felipe Pena, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, Beverly Stephens, Richard J Doleshek, Marcelo Avila-Orejuela, Tahsin Yilmaz Kalkavan, Stephen A Lapinski, Greyhound Pets of America Houston, J. Michael Gaither, Interim Executive Management Inc, Kennon James Peavy, Saul Solomon, Odde Jalil Rishmague, John Taylor Paschal, Sr., David Mark Kelso, Monya Paul, Donna Allbritton, Price Paschal Lumber Co., Reese Schmidt, Steve Glasgow, Robin O'Malle, Ronald Huffman, Carla Kennedy, The Agape Trust, Dan Auli Panos, Susan Higgins, Nathaline Causey, Ian Acton Matthews, Lionel Alessio, Larry Alford, Thomas H Turner, Ronald J Kuhner, Mari Notley, Martha Castell, Ernesto Pena, Arlene Blackwell, Stephen J Pendergrass, Ray Ballantyne, Bertha Kleiman, Carolyn Schaufele, Mario Gebel, Cindy Kuhn, Christopher Parker Miller, Charles Baker, Angela Lyons Price, John Priovolos, Mississippi Hospitality & Restaurant Workers' Compensation Group, Lusky Investment Partnership, L.P., Walter Wilson, Ralph MacDonald, Verna Mueller, James B Hamilton, BH1, Royce Garber, Richard O Hunton, Singapore Puntamita Pte Ltd, Loretta Turbeville, Luis Charua Guindic, Wesley G Johnston, Barbara Baker, Gary Spellman, Edith T Paschal, Steven Graham, Linda Merkin, Ruth Charney de Baron, Numa L Marquette, Jim Letsos, Wendy Blauman, Sergio Raul Suarez, Abney International Ltd, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Mary Lou Timms, Mrs. W.A. Taylor Trust, Steven Spiegel, George Arnold, Taliaferro Reed Owsley, Carlos Estrada, Michael Eismann, Peggy Wiesner, Juana Ines Perdomo, eLandia International, Inc., Robert Ahders, John C Stephens, Elisa Kusner, Sarah MacDonald, Mike Kuhn, Louis Perry, Robert Hunton, Ann Root, Susy Kuhn, Charles M. Gillis, CM Sheldon, Michael Notley, Jaime Alexis Bornstein, Institute for International Banking Law & Practice, Ken A Wiley, Jason T. Richardson, Sergio Kusner, John Barrack, Donald R Miller, III, Diane Hanlen, Omar Lopez Garcia, Sylvia Gordon, Yvonne D'Cunha, Eric Challain, Nancy Repanshek, J.A. Parsons, D.R. Callen, Maria Isaacson, Albert Gordon, Andruw Jones, William C Davis, John M Fry, The Second Amended and Restated Robert A. Houston Revocable Trust, John A Thomas, M.D., Jeffrey J Campbell, Susan Fajkus, Fred Teller, Terel Benett, Jay A. Prudhomme, Abraham Diamant, J. Russell Mothershead, Dan O'Malle, J.M. Hill Family Limited Partnership, Clifford Canning, Russell Bergeron, Miller Family Investment, Philip H Eastman, III, Richard Glenn, Philip Olson, Mary Jean Yanutola, Heidi Gaiennie, Karen Olson, Dr George W. Lowe, Mark Repanshek, Matejek Family Foundation, Sandra Brewer, Michael K. Wheatley, Courtney Ward, Kathy R. Denison, Juan Carlos Sanchez, John Kirchhofer, Jamie Vanderbles, Sandy Cook, James C Richardson, Jr., Jason Leblanc, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, James Callans, Stephen Kennedy, James R. Lowe, Antonio Carrillo, Peter Wastell, Valerie Lowe, Charles Hunton, Linda Patston, Eliot Bernstein, RightChange.com.Inc., Lonna Souther, Alan Davis, James R. Lowe Family Partnership, LP, Ed Fiori, Robert S Greer, Jr, Rosine Chappell, Exchange Fund II Illiquid Asset Holding and Distribution, L.P., Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, David Hardesty, Trent L Rosenthal, Jane Canning, Jason Hutchinson, Stephen Gatlin, James Cole Richardson, Pershing LLC, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Hannah Kay Peck, Ruth Marina Rodriguez, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Katherine Burnell, Leanne Meirson, William Coulter, Tony Harper, William Gresham, Luther Hodges, Richard Helm, Billy Hansen, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, John Castell, Richard O Hunton, Jr, Melissa Ballantyne, Enrique Albin, Monica DeLeon, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Kenneth Meacham, Sandra Ling, Floyd A Raines, Patricia Maldonado, Allen H. Johnson, Jr., Jane Ann Sasser, Cesar Carillo, Sherry Bergeron, Barnell Albers, Lynn Wiggins, Jack H Verburg, City Plaza, LLC, Patricia Davis, Mary Edith Shapley, Alan Ratliff, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, United States Department of Justice, William Dedrick, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Mary Bergeron, Jose Estrada, Gagosian Gallery Inc, Matt Buglehall, Nigel Hamilton-Smith, Doris Crocker, Joanna Callans, Milford Wampold, Louis Schaufele, Bonnie O'Donnell-Painter, Carol Hunton, Julian Bradham, Don Wiesner, Marie Bergeron, Milford Wampold Support Foundation, Charles Crocker, Carolyn Nightingale, Cecelia Benner, Elvira M Barbe Pflucker, Olga Rojas De Sanchez, Pre-War Art Inc doing business as Gagosian Gallery, Jaime Alexis Arroyo Bornstein, John G Denison, Carole D Bullard, Mirlay Sanchez, Juan Salvador Mazzarri Payet, Flavio Antonio Alberto Salvetti Artola, Enrique Oeawa Espinoza, Sara Vixgaro Del Aguila, Pierre Wouters and Ybel Jeannette Sanchez Rojas
Respondent: Rebecca Reeves-Stanford and Randi Stanford
Not Classified By Court: Juan Manuel Dupuy Rada, Frank Carpin, Stephen Barber, Steven Glasgow, Asdrubal Caraballo, Allen Johnson, Miriam Scherman, Wiley Hutchins, Jr., Christopher K. Schaefer, Joseph Becker, Toronto-Dominion Bank, Greg R. Day, Claimants by Kachroo Legal Services PC, William Peerman, Ward Good, Stephen D Robinson, Peter Montalbano, Douglas M McDaniel, William S. Decker, Claude F Reynaud, Jr., Brent B. Milner, Paula S. Sutton, John Holliday, HSBC Bank PLC, Christiane Trujillo-Wertz, Christopher Prindle, Donald Whitley, Michael Conrad, John Santi, William O. Stone, Jr., Lori S Bensing, David A. Rappaport, Nancy Diaz, Paul Scherman, Dr Gustavo Durango Vela, Evan Farrell, Jonathan Mote, Randall Pickett, Deems May, Jr., David M. Stubbs, Joseph James Flynn, Steven Greenhaw, Joseph Becker, et al., Carroll Mullis, Cordell Haymon, Anita L de Caraballo, Shawn M. Cross, Carol McCann, Stephen G. Blumenreich, Robert Lenoir and Attorney at Law Edward C Snyder
Interested Party: Aviva Bakshy, Daniel Gomez Ferreiro, John Little, Edna Able, Martha Gillikin, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Whitney National Bank, Janet Presson, Malouf & Nockels LLP, Maria Irma Borja Figueroa, Willis Limited, Hunton & Williams LLP, Homer Bunker, Bowen Miclette & Britt Inc, Dillon Gage Inc of Dallas, Alberto J. Botello Reed, William R. Fusselmann, Manuel Canabal, Silvia Tamez de Botello, Juan Felipe Bucio Borja, Christopher Allred, Steven Queyrouze, Gilbert Lopez, Jr., Joan Gale Frank, Lucia Bucio Borja, Lilian Victoria Borja Figueroa, Bowen, Miclett & Britt, Inc., Theresa Navarro, Dillon Gage Inc, Maria Clara Dupuy Rada, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Rolando L Leon, Arch Specialty Insurance Co., Guy M Hohmann, Julia Darden, Meir O'Hanna, Chadbourne & Parke LLP, Ronald Stein, Maria O'Hanna, Jose Ramos, Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) SA, Proskauer Rose LLP, City of Sugarland, United States Department of State, Thomas V Sjoblom, Carlos Loumiet, Thomas J Moran, Lexington Insurance Co, Official Stanford Investors Committee, Gloria Alvarez, Peggy Roif Rotstain, Ysmael Benito Silva, Greenberg Traurig LLP, Willis of Colorado Inc, Teofila Silva, Paul D. Winter, Whitney Bank, Robert Gillikin, Nancy H de Leon, Osvaldo Pi and US Customs and Border Protection
Intervenor: Nancy Brownlee, James T. Hassell, Sr., Samuel G Pal, C Wayne Copeland, Thad Cobbs, Susan Stanford, Sheffield Holdings LP, Jeanne Ridlehuber, Charles Kyle Laffoon, Carol L Bourgeois, Gary Babcock, Madeline Berger, Sandra Aaronson, INX, Inc., Carolyn H Eames, Eugenia Collinsworth, Betty Wheatley, Millard E Bourgeois, Adriana Babcock, Victor A Mena, HP Financial Services Venezuela C.C.A., Beatrice Bustamante, Richard Eames, Alva Kerr, Maria Mena, Alfredo Machuca Gonzalez, Westport Insurance Company, Nanciann Eames, Charles Brunet, Harold Eyre and Audrey Pamela Davies
Claimant: David Strauss, Sandra Strauss, Richard Gonzales, Mr. Andrew Bennett Ezell and Cedar Glade Capital, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: United States of America, Walton Houston Galleria Office LP and Daniel Acund
3Rd Party Defendant: BDO USA, LLP and BDO USA LLP
Receiver: Ralph S Janvey and Ralph S. Janvey
Intervenor Defendant: Farmers & Merchants Bank
Trustee: Lynn Turk
Case Number: 3:2009cv00298
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3105. Wed Aug 25 08:30:03 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3105 ORDER granting #3101 Motion for Attorney Fees of Examiner. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/24/2021) (ndt)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3104 REPLY filed by John Little re: #3101 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3103. Wed Aug 4 09:09:05 CDT 2021 (crt)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3103 ORDER granting #3102 motion for expedited briefing. The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to the Examiner's motion for approval of his thirty-seventh interim fee application by Tuesday, 8/10/2021. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/3/2021) (mjr)
July 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3102 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Examiner's Motion filed by John Little (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
July 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3101 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3099, 3100. Thu Jul 22 10:23:53 CDT 2021 (crt)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3100 ORDER granting #3090 Motion for Approval of Sixty-Seventh Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/21/2021) (mjr)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3099 ORDER granting #3088 Motion for Increased Hourly Rates. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/21/2021) (mjr)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3098 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: #3090 MOTION for Approval of Sixty-Seventh Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3097 REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #3088 MOTION for Increased Hourly Rates for Baker Botts L.L.P. (Sadler, Kevin)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3096 Appendix in Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re #3095 Response/Objection to Receiver's Motion for Increased Hourly Rates for Baker Botts L.L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Frank, Janie)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3095 RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: #3088 MOTION for Increased Hourly Rates for Baker Botts L.L.P. (Frank, Janie)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3094 RESPONSE filed by John Little re: #3088 MOTION for Increased Hourly Rates for Baker Botts L.L.P. (Little, John)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3093 ORDER: The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to the Receiver's #3090 motion for increased hourly rates or the Receiver's #3088 motion for approval of his sixty-seventh interim fee application by 7/2/2021. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/28/2021) (ykp)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3093. Mon Jun 28 16:44:51 CDT 2021 (crt)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3087. Wed Jun 23 12:09:43 CDT 2021 (crt)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3092 MOTION to Expedite Briefing in Response to Receiver's Motion for Increased Hourly Rates and Sixty-Seventh Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3091 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3090 MOTION for Approval of Sixty-Seventh Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3090 MOTION for Approval of Sixty-Seventh Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Seventh Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3089 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3088 MOTION for Increased Hourly Rates for Baker Botts L.L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3088 MOTION for Increased Hourly Rates for Baker Botts L.L.P. filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Motion for Increased Hourly Rates for Baker Botts L.L.P.) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3087 ORDER Denying #3063 Motion for Reconsideration (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2021) (svc)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3084,3085. Fri May 14 10:52:00 CDT 2021 (crt)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3086 Interim STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Powers, Scott)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3085 ORDER granting #3077 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/13/2021) (oyh)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3084 ORDER granting #3074 Motion for approval of the sixty-sixth interim fee application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/13/2021) (oyh)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3083 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: 3074 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Sixth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3082 Notice filed by John Little re: #3077 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John) Modified text on 5/4/2021 (ykp).
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3081 NOTICE of Receiver's 37th Report Regarding the Claims & Distribution Processes filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3080 ORDER granting #3076 Motion for Expedited Briefing. The Court grants the motion and sets an expedited briefing schedule on the Receiver's motion for approval of his sixty-sixth interim fee application #3074 . The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to the Receiver's motion for approval of his sixty-sixth interim fee application by Friday, April 30, 2021. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/21/2021) (ndt)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3079 ORDER granting #3078 Motion to Expedited Briefing. The Court grants the motion and sets an expedited briefing schedule on the Examiner's motion for approval of his thirty-sixth interim fee application #3077 . The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to the Examiner's motion for approval of his thirty-sixth interim fee application by Friday, April 30, 2021. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/21/2021) (ndt)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3079,3080. Wed Apr 21 10:10:10 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3078 MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by John Little (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3077 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3076 MOTION for Expedite Briefing as to his Motion for Approval of Sixty-Sixth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Motion to Expedite Sixty-Sixth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (jmg).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3075 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3074 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Sixth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3074 MOTION for Approval of Sixty-Sixth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Sixth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (jmg).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3073 NOTICE of Receiver's 1st Schedule of 4.50% Payments to Be Made to Eligible Investor CD Claimants Pursuant to the 8th Interim Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sadler, Kevin)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3072 REPLY filed by Cordell Haymon re: #3063 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3053 Order, #3052 Memorandum Opinion and Order, (Babcock, Charles)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3071 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Co., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Lexington Insurance Co re: #3063 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3053 Order, #3052 Memorandum Opinion and Order, (Mungia, Manuel)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3070 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #3063 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3053 Order, #3052 Memorandum Opinion and Order, (Kuckelman, Michael)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3069 REPLY filed by Andrew Bennett Ezell re: #3054 MOTION for Judgment (Ezell, Andrew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3068 ORDER REGARDING RECEIVER'S SIXTY-FIFTH INTERIM FEE APPLICATION. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/1/2021) (ctf)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3067 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #3064 MOTION of Objection (Powers, Scott)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3068. Mon Mar 1 18:26:57 CST 2021 (crt)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3066 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: #3057 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin) Modified linkage on 2/22/2021 (mjr).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3066. Mon Feb 22 14:56:17 CST 2021 (crt)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3065 ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S #3051 EIGHTH INTERIM DISTRIBUTION PLAN: The Court OVERRULES all objections and GRANTS the Motion in full. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the Receiver to make interim distributions to eligible Investor CD Claimants according to the Eighth Interim Plan. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/18/2021) (jmg)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3065. Thu Feb 18 13:54:48 CST 2021 (crt)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3063 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3053 Order, #3052 Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by Cordell Haymon Attorney Charles L Babcock added to party Cordell Haymon(pty:mov), Attorney Charles L Babcock added to party Cordell Haymon(pty:mov) (Babcock, Charles)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3062 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #3054 Notice (Other) (Powers, Scott)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3061 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: #3051 MOTION for Approval of Eighth Interim Distribution Plan & Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Ralph S Janvey (Powers, Scott)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3060. Fri Feb 12 10:32:39 CST 2021 (crt)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3060 ORDER: This order addresses the Receiver's motion for expedited briefing #3059 . The Court grants the motion and sets an expedited briefing schedule on the Receiver's motion for approval of the sixty-fifth interim fee application #3057 . The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to this motion by Wednesday, 2/17/2021. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/11/2021) (ndt)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3059 MOTION to Expedite Briefing as to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sixty-Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3058 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3057 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Fifth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3057 MOTION for Approval of Sixty-Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Fifth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin) Modified docket text on 2/11/2021 (oyh).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3056 STATUS REPORT Requesting Oral Argument filed by Gagosian Gallery Inc. (Amini, Bijan)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3055 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: #2859 Joint MOTION for Hearing Regarding Stanford Assets in Switzerland filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Powers, Scott)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3054 NOTICE of Objection to Receiver's Amended Notice of Determination filed by Andrew Bennett Ezell. Party Andrew B. Ezell added. (Ezell, Andrew)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3053. Wed Jan 27 10:56:56 CST 2021 (crt)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3052. Mon Jan 25 11:40:50 CST 2021 (crt)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3052 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Because the Amended Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, and adequately addresses the Fifth Circuit's opinion regarding the original settlement, the Court approves the amended settlement agreement. The Court confirms its prior approval of payment of attorneys' fees to Movants' counsel. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/25/2021) (mjr) (Main Document 3052 replaced on 1/25/2021) (ctf).
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3053 FINAL BAR ORDER. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/22/2021) (ctf)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3052. Fri Jan 22 16:34:07 CST 2021 (crt)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3051 MOTION for Approval of Eighth Interim Distribution Plan & Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Powers, Scott)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3050 NOTICE of Letter to Court re: #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att filed by John Little (Little, John)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3049 RESPONSE filed by Cordell Haymon re: #3047 Notice (Other), (Babcock, Charles)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3048 NOTICE of Receiver's 36th Report Regarding the Claims & Distribution Processes filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3047 NOTICE of letter to Judge Godbey re: #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co, To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Sadler, Kevin)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3046 ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY/FILED IN ERROR***MOTION re #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att filed by Ralph S Janvey (Sadler, Kevin) Modified on 12/29/2020 (ykp).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3045 Received letter from USCA5 re: SUPREME COURT ORDER received denying petition for writ of certiorari filed by Appellants Mr. Roberto Barbar and Mr. Antonio Jubis Zacarias (svc)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3044 Received letter from USCA5 re: SUPREME COURT ORDER received denying petition for writ of certiorari filed by Ms. Carol Rupert, Mr. Michael Rishmague, Mr. Barry L. Rupert, Mr. Lionel Alessio and Mr. Dan Auli Panos, Appellants Ms. Edna Able, Mr. Robert C. Ahders, Mr. Rodrigo Rivera Alcayaga, Mr. David Arntsen and Ms. Carlie Arntsen (svc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3043. Thu Dec 10 12:06:21 CST 2020 (crt)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3043 ORDER granting #3037 Motion for Approval of the Sixty-Fourth Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/8/2020) (oyh) Modified docket text on 12/8/2020 (oyh).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3042 NOTICE of Regarding Receiver's Sixty-Fourth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3041 ORDER granting #3033 Motion for Approval of the Thirty- Fifth Interim Fee Application for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Expenses. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/30/2020) (axm)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3040 ORDER granting #3039 Motion to Expedite Briefing. The Court sets an expedited briefing schedule on the Receiver's #3037 motion for approval of the sixty-fourth interim fee application. The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to this motion by 12/7/2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/30/2020) (axm)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3040. Mon Nov 30 13:41:03 CST 2020 (crt)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3041. Mon Nov 30 13:45:05 CST 2020 (crt)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3039 MOTION to Expedite filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Motion to Expedite Briefing as to Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sixty-Fourth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3038 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3037 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3037 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Fourth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3036 Interim STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Powers, Scott)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3035 ORDER granting #3034 MOTION to Expedite Briefing. The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to the Examiner's motion for approval of his thirty-fifth interim fee application by Monday, 11/30/2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2020) (ykp)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3035. Thu Nov 19 11:32:57 CST 2020 (crt)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3034 MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3033 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3032. Tue Nov 10 08:26:20 CST 2020 (crt)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3032 ORDER: This Order addresses Defendant Robert Allen Stanford's pro se motion to recuse #2956 . The Court denies the motion. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/9/2020) (ctf)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3031 ORDER: This Order addresses the Receiver's motion for approval of the sixty-third interim fee application #3027 . Because the Court finds the request reasonable under the factors outlined in Johnson v. Ga. Highway Express, Inc., 488 F.2d 714, 71719 (5th Cir. 1974), and in line with the Court's previous fee application guidance, see, e.g., Order, 2/3/2010 #994 ; Tr. of Hr'g, 9/10/2009, 39-41 #777 , the Court grants the motion. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/9/2020) (ctf)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3031. Mon Nov 9 09:31:19 CST 2020 (crt)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3030 Status Request by R Allen Stanford with Deputy Clerk Response. (sre)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3029 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney John J. Little on behalf of John Little. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Little, John)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3028 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3027 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Third Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3027 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Request for Expedited Briefing of Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sixty-Third Interim Fee Application, #2 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Third Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3026 REPLY filed by Cordell Haymon re: #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s)) (Babcock, Charles)
August 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3025 EXAMINER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS NO. 9 filed by John Little re: #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att (Little, John) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (ykp).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3024 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Co., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Lexington Insurance Co re: #3012 Response/Objection, (Mungia, Manuel)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3023 Appendix in Support filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Co., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Lexington Insurance Co re #3022 Response/Objection to Cordell Haymon's Objection to Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Mungia, Manuel)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3022 RESPONSE filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Co., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Lexington Insurance Co re: #3011 Response/Objection, (Mungia, Manuel)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3021 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3020 Reply, In Support of Motion to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., to Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders and Judgments, and to Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Attorneys Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Powers, Scott)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3020 REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att (Powers, Scott)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3019 NOTICE of Receiver's Additional Schedules of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 1st, 2nd, 3rd, 4th, 5th, 6th, and 7th Interim Plans filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Sadler, Kevin)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3018 ORDER granting #3013 Motion for approval of the sixty-second interim fee application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/7/2020) (mla)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3017 NOTICE of Regarding Receiver's Sixty-Second Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3018. Fri Aug 7 15:24:34 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3016 Mail returned as undeliverable. #3006 Notice (Other) received back from Mark Kuhrt as No longer at this address - unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3015 ORDER: The Court sets an expedited briefing schedule on the Receiver's motion for approval of the sixty-second interim fee application #3013 . The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to this motion by Thursday, 8/6/2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2020) (ctf)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3015. Thu Jul 30 13:33:51 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3014 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3013 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Second Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3013 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Request for Expedited Briefing of Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sixty-Second Interim Fee Application, #2 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-Second Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3012 OBJECTION filed by HSBC Bank PLC re: #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att (Brinkman, Taylor)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3011 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Cordell Haymon re: #3005 Appendix in Support, #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att (Babcock, Charles)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3010 Mail returned as undeliverable. #3006 Notice (Other) received back from Audrey Pamela Davies as Refused - unable to forward - mail service suspended. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3009 Mail returned as undeliverable. #3006 Notice (Other) received back from Harold Eyre as Refused - unable to forward - mail service suspended. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3006 NOTICE OF AMENDED SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS. (ctf)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3006. Wed Jul 8 08:21:35 CDT 2020 (crt)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3008 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2997 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees received back from Audrey Pamela Davies as Return to Sender - Refused - Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (jmg)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3007 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2997 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees received back from Harold Eyre as Return to Sender - Refused - Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (jmg)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3005 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Att (Powers, Scott)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3004 MOTION to Approve Proposed Amended Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co., To Enter the Accompanying Bar Orders And Judgments, and To Confirm Prior Approval of the Movants Attorneys Fees filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Powers, Scott)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3003 NOTICE of Receiver's Schedules of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 2nd, 3rd, 4th, 5th, 6th, and 7th Interim Plans filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3002 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2991 Order on Motion to Expedite, received back from Audrey Pamela Davies as Refused - mail service suspended. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3001 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2991 Order on Motion to Expedite, received back from Harold Eyre as Refused - mail service suspended. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3000 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2984 Order, received back from Harold Eyre as Mail service suspended - Refused. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2999 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2984 Order, #2986 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief received back from Audrey Pamela Davies as Mail service suspended - Refused. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2998 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2986 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief received back from Harold Eyre as Return to Sender - Refused - Unable to Forward - Mail Service Suspended. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (jmg)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2997 ORDER granting #2989 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/23/2020) (axm)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2996 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2989 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2997. Tue Jun 23 13:27:48 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2995 Interim STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Powers, Scott)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2994 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2972 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing received back from Harold Eyre as Mail Service Suspended Return to Sender to Request a Postage Refund Go to Any USPS Retail Office for Registered Letters. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (oyh)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2993 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2962 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, received back from Audrey Pamela Davies as Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed Refused Sort in Manual Only No Automation. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (oyh)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2992 OPPOSITION filed by R Allen Stanford re: #2991 Order on Motion to Expedite. (oyh)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2991 ORDER granting #2990 Motion to Expedite Briefing. The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to the Examiner's motion for approval of his thirty-fourth interim fee application by Monday, 6/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/15/2020) (axm)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2991. Mon Jun 15 12:54:04 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2990 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on fee application filed by John Little (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2989 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2988 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2974 Order Approving Receiver's Seventh Interim Distribution Plan received back from Audrey Pamela Davies as Mail service suspended - unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2987 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2974 Order Approving Receiver's Seventh Interim Distribution Plan received back from Harold Eyre as Mail service suspended - unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2986 ORDER granting #2981 Motion for Approval of the Sixty-First Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/10/2020) (mla)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2985 NOTICE of Regarding Sixty-First Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2986. Wed Jun 10 16:50:26 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2984. Wed Jun 3 10:13:33 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2984 ORDER: The Court sets an expedited briefing schedule on the Receiver's motion for approval of the sixty-first interim fee application #2981 . The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to this motion by Tuesday, June 9, 2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/2/2020) (aaa)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2983 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2972 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing received back from Audrey Pamela Davies as Refused - unable to forward - mail service suspended. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2982 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2981 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Sixty-First Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2981 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Request for Expedited Briefing of Receiver's Motion for Approval of Sixty-First Interim Fee Application, #2 Proposed Order for Approval of Receivers Sixty-First Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2980 Mail returned as undeliverable. 2969 Order, received back from Harold Eyre as Refused - Unable to forward - Mail service suspended. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (mjr)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2979 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2962 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, received back from Harold Eyre as Return to Sender - Rufused - Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (jmg)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2978 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2965 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #2964 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees received back from Harold Eyre as Return to Sender Refused Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (oyh)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2977 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Sadler, Kevin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2976 NOTICE of Receiver's 35th Report Regarding the Claims & Distribution Processes filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2975 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2965 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #2964 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees received back from Audrey Pamela Davies as Return to Sender Refused Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (oyh)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2974 ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S SEVENTH INTERIM DISTRIBUTION PLAN. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/7/2020) (ctf)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2973 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: #2970 MOTION for Approval of Seventh Interim Distribution Plan & Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2974. Thu May 7 16:08:40 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2972 ORDER: Responses due by 5/6/2020. Replies due by 5/11/2020. re: #2970 MOTION for Approval of Seventh Interim Distribution Plan & Request for Expedited Consideration (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/30/2020) (ykp)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2971 ORDER granting #2967 Motion for Approval of Sixtieth Interim Fee Application and Request for Expedited Briefing. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/30/2020) (ykp)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2971. Thu Apr 30 12:18:35 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2972. Thu Apr 30 16:29:59 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2970 MOTION for Approval of Seventh Interim Distribution Plan & Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2969. Fri Apr 24 12:24:49 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2969 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court sets an expedited briefing schedule on the Receiver's motion for approval of the sixtieth interim fee application. The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to these motions by Wednesday, 4/29/20. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/23/2020) (chmb)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2968 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2967 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Sixtieth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2967 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Request for Expedited Briefing of Receiver's Sixtieth Interim Fee Application, #2 Proposed Order for Approval of Receivers Sixtieth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2966 Received letter from USCA5 re: SUPREME COURT ORDER received denying petition for writ of certiorari by Joseph Becker, et al (svc)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2965 ORDER granting #2960 Motion Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/31/2020) (ndt)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2964 ORDER granting #2959 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/31/2020) (ndt)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2963 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2959 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2964,2965. Tue Mar 31 14:44:27 CDT 2020 (crt)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2962 ORDER: The Court sets an expedited briefing schedule on the Receiver's motion for approval of the fifty-ninth interim fee application and the Examiner's motion for approval of the thirty-third interim fee application #2959 , #2960 . The Court orders the parties to file any opposition to these motions by Monday, 3/30/2020. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/25/2020) (ctf)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2962. Wed Mar 25 08:51:02 CDT 2020 (crt)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2961 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2960 MOTION for Approval of Receivers Fifty-Ninth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2960 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receivers Fifty-Ninth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2959 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2958 ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEYS' FEES. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/25/2020) (chmb)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2957 FINAL BAR ORDER: The Court finds that the terms of the Settlement Agreement are adequate, fair, reasonable, and equitable, and that the Settlement should be and is hereby APPROVED. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/25/2020) (chmb)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2957, 2958. Tue Feb 25 15:30:06 CST 2020 (crt)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2956 MOTION to Recuse U.S. District Judge David C. Godbey for Intervening Cause Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), (b) filed by R Allen Stanford. (hml)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2955 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: #2954 Response/Objection (Blakeway, Judith)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2954 OBJECTION filed by HSBC Bank PLC re: #2917 MOTION to Approve Proposed Settlement (Brinkman, Taylor)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2953 CLERK ORDER of USCA as to #2741 Notice of Appeal filed by R Allen Stanford. The petition is Dismissed pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to comply with the Court's notice of 12/16/2019. (svc)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2952 ORDER granting #2944 Motion for Approval of the Fifty-Eighth Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/21/2020) (chmb)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2951 NOTICE of Regarding Fifty-Eighth Interim Fee Application re: #2945 Appendix in Support, #2944 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2952. Tue Jan 21 16:03:11 CST 2020 (crt)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2950 ORDER granting #2938 Motion to Enjoin State Court Action Against Bank Defendants. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/15/2020) (chmb)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2950. Wed Jan 15 12:23:12 CST 2020 (crt)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2949 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 1/10/2020. Attorney Appearances: SEC - Janie Frank; Receiver - Kevin Sadler, Scott Powers; Examiner - John Little; Defendants - Jim Rouhandeh, Scott Berman, Noelle Reed, Phillip Price, Joe Wibenski, and Ed Snyder. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :33. (chmb)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2948 NOTICE of Compliance with Scheduling Order Regarding Greenberg Traurig LLP Settlement re: #2931 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4) (Buncher, Douglas)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2947 NOTICE of Receiver's 1st Schedule of 1.00% Payments to Be Made to Eligible Investor CD Claimants Pursuant to the 6th Interim Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sadler, Kevin)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2946 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS. (axm)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2945 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2944 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Eighth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2944 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Eighth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2943 ANSWER to #952 Amended Complaint filed by Leroy King. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael J Stanley added to party Leroy King(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Stanley added to party Leroy King(pty:dft) (Stanley, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2942 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal: It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs on appeal. (svc)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2941 RESPONSE filed by HSBC Bank PLC re: #2938 MOTION to Enjoin State Court Action Against Bank Defendants (Brinkman, Taylor)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2940 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Powers, Scott)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2939 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Leroy King; served on 12/3/2019. (Frank, Janie)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2938 MOTION to Enjoin State Court Action Against Bank Defendants filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2937 Interim STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Powers, Scott)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2936 ORDER granting #2925 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/25/2019) (ndt)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2935 ORDER granting #2923 Motion filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/25/2019) (ndt)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2934 NOTICE of Regarding Fifty-Seventh Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2933 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2925 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2932 NOTICE of Non-filing in Response to Proskauer Rose LLP's Motion to Enforce the Bar Orders and for an Order to Show Cause and Request for Expedited Consideration re: #2919 MOTION to Enforce Bar Orders and for Order to Show Cause filed by Proskauer Rose LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Rouhandeh, James)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2931. Tue Nov 19 16:38:20 CST 2019 (crt)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2931 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Approval Hearing set for 2/21/2020 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/18/2019) (ewd)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2930 Summons Issued as to Leroy King. (svc)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2929 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Frank, Janie)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2928. Fri Nov 8 10:25:48 CST 2019 (crt)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2928 ORDER: The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on January 10, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1505. Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/4/2019) (ewd)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2925 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2924 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2923 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2923 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Seventh Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin) Modified docket text per attorney on 11/4/2019 (aaa).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2927 JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal #2537 Notice of Appeal, #2589 Notice of Appeal, #2606 Notice of Appeal, #2528 Notice of Appeal,, #2587 Notice of Appeal, #2585 Notice of Appeal, #2535 Notice of Appeal. Issued as Mandate: 10/31/2019. It is ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is of the District Court is vacated, and the cause is remanded to the District Court for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at #Exhibit Guide). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (svc)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2926 Opinion of USCA in accordance with USCA judgment re #2608 Notice of Appeal, #2537 Notice of Appeal, #2589 Notice of Appeal, #2528 Notice of Appeal, #2587 Notice of Appeal #2585 , Notice of Appeal, #2535 Notice of Appeal. (svc) Modified file date on 11/4/2019 (svc).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2922 ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S SIXTH INTERIM DISTRIBUTION PLAN: This Order addresses the Receiver's #2904 Motion for Approval of Sixth Interim Distribution Plan (the "Motion"). After considering the Motion, the arguments of counsel, and the evidence and other materials in the record, the Court GRANTS the Motion in full. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the Receiver to make interim distributions to eligible Investor CD Claimants according to the following Sixth Interim Plan. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/23/2019) (twd)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2922. Wed Oct 23 13:21:29 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2921 ORDER granting #2905 Motion for approval of the fifty-sixth interim fee application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/21/2019) (mla)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2921. Mon Oct 21 15:37:09 CDT 2019 (crt)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2920 Appendix in Support filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re #2919 MOTION to Enforce Bar Orders and for Order to Show Cause. (Rouhandeh, James)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2919 MOTION to Enforce Bar Orders and for Order to Show Cause filed by Proskauer Rose LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Proskauer Rose LLP added. Attorney James P Rouhandeh added to party Proskauer Rose LLP(pty:ip). (Rouhandeh, James) Modified text on 10/21/2019 (mla).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2918 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2917 MOTION to Approve Proposed Settlement (Snyder, Edward)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2917 MOTION to Approve Proposed Settlement and Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Ralph S Janvey Attorney Edward C Snyder added to party Ralph S Janvey(pty:rc), Attorney Edward C Snyder added to party Ralph S Janvey(pty:rc) (Snyder, Edward)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2916 NOTICE of Receiver's Notice Regarding Fifty-Sixth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2915 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2801 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Phillips Lytle LLP and Robert Cornish, attorney, are withdrawn as counsel for Movant Beverly DeLoach. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/7/2019) (ewd)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2914 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: #2904 MOTION for Approval of Sixth Interim Distribution Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2913 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, #2535 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as to Mona Jean Reeves Lenoir, in her capacity as Executrix of the Estate of Deceased Defendant, Robert O. Lenoir, pursuant to appellant's motion. (axm)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2912 NOTICE of Dismissal of Mona Jean Reeves Lenoir, in Her Capacity as Executrix of the Estate of Deceased Defendant Robert O. Lenoir to Withdraw and Dismiss Her Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Robert Lenoir (Porter, John)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2910 MOTION to Amend Second Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) and Request for an Expedited Ruling filed by R Allen Stanford. (axm)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2911 ORDER of USCA as to #2537 Notice of Appeal. The unopposed motion of appellant, Scott Notowich, to dismiss appeal without prejudice is GRANTED. (axm) Modified linkage and text on 10/5/2019 (axm).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2909 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 , #2585 Notice of Appeal, #2535 Notice of Appeal: The appeal is dismissed as of 9/24/2019, as to Yolanda Suarez, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (axm)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2908 NOTICE of Dismissal of Yolanda Suarez to Withdraw and Dismiss Her Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2520 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Yolanda Suarez (Porter, John)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2907 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Objections to Lloyd's Settlement Filings filed by Douglas M McDaniel, Scott Notowich (Rogers, Stephan)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2906 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2905 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2905 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF FIFTY-SIXTH INTERIM FEE APPLICATION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Sixth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (epm).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2904 MOTION for Approval of Sixth Interim Distribution Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2903 NOTICE of Receiver's 34th Report Regarding the Claims & Distribution Processes filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2902 ORDER of USCA as to #2537 Notice of Appeal, filed by Eddie Rollins, Scott Notowich, Douglas M McDaniel. The motion of appellant, Douglas M. McDaniel, to dismiss appeal without prejudice is GRANTED. (epm)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2901 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. (epm)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2900 NOTICE to Withdraw and Dismiss Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by Aymeric Martinoia re: #2532 Appendix in Support #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection. (Porter, John) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (axm).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2899 NOTICE to Withdraw and Dismiss his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by John Santi re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection. (Porter, John)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2898 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 8/23/2019, as to the appellant, William Stone, ONLY. (epm)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2897 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 8/23/2019, as to appellant, Michael Conrad, ONLY. (epm)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2896 NOTICE Withdraw and Dismiss Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by William O. Stone, Jr re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection. (Porter, John) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (axm).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2895 NOTICE to Withdraw and Dismiss Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by Michael Conrad re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection. (Porter, John) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (axm).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2894 ORDER of USCA as to #2535 , #2537 , #2606 , #2608 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as of 8/20/2019, as to appellant, John Mark Holliday, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (axm)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2893 ORDER of USCA as to #2606 , #2608 , #2535 , #2537 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as of 8/20/2019, as to John Schwab, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (axm)
August 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2892 NOTICE of Dismissal of John Schwab to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection filed by John Schwab. (Porter, John)
August 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2891 NOTICE of Dismissal of John Holliday to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment, MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection filed by John Holliday (Porter, John)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2890 ORDER of USCA as to #2606 , #2608 , #2535 , #2537 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as of 8/15/2019, as to Doug Shaw, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (axm)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2887 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 , #2606 , #2537 , #2528 , #2535 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as of 8/15/2019, as to A.J. Rincon, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion.
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2888, 2889. Thu Aug 15 11:54:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2889 ORDER granting #2871 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/14/2019) (mla)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2888 ORDER granting #2868 Motion for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Fifth Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/14/2019) (mla)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2886 NOTICE of Dismissal of Doug Shaw to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection, filed by Doug Shaw. (Porter, John)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2885 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal of A.J. Rincon of his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection filed by Doug Shaw (Porter, John)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2884 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 , #2537 , #2606 , #2535 Notice of Appeal: The appeal is dismissed as of 8/12/2019, as to Timothy Parsons, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (axm)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2883 NOTICE of Dismissal of Timothy Parsons to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Tim Parsons (Porter, John)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2882 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2871 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2881 NOTICE of Regarding Fifty-Fifth Interim Fee Application re: #2869 Appendix in Support, #2868 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2880 OBJECTION to the Court's Exercise of Personal Jurisdiction filed by R Allen Stanford. (epm) Modified filer on 8/1/2019 (epm).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2879 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 7/31/2019, as to Peter Montalbano, ONLY. (epm)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2878 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 7/31/2019, as to James Fontenot, ONLY. (epm)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2877 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 7/31/2019, as to Janie Martinez, ONLY. (epm)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2876 NOTICE of Peter Montalbano to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection filed by Peter Montalbano (Porter, John) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (ykp).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2875 NOTICE of Janie Martinez to Withdraw and Dismiss Her Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal #2389 Response/Objection filed by Janie Martinez (Porter, John) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (ykp).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2874 NOTICE of James Fontenot to Withdraw and Dismiss his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection filed by James Fontenot (Porter, John)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2873 REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #2859 Joint MOTION for Hearing Regarding Stanford Assets in Switzerland (Sadler, Kevin)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2872 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 7/18/2019, as to Spencer Murchison, pursuant to appellant's motion. (epm)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2871 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2870 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 7/17/2019, as to Allen Johnson, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (epm)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2869 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2868 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Fifth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2) (Sadler, Kevin)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2868 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Fifth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Fifth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2867 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal of Allen Johnson of his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by Allen Johnson. (Porter, John) Modified text on 7/12/2019 (rekc).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2866 OBJECTION filed by Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) SA re: #2859 Joint MOTION for Hearing Regarding Stanford Assets in Switzerland (Reed, Noelle)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2865 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 7/03/2019, as to Trent Miller, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (epm)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2864 NOTICE of Dismissal of Lupe Northam to Withdraw and Dismiss Her Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Lupe Northam (Porter, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2863 NOTICE of Dismissal of Spencer Murchison to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Spencer Murchison (Porter, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2862 NOTICE of Dismissal of Trent Miller to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Trenton Miller (Porter, John)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2861 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 7/01/2019, as to Dirk Harris, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (epm)
June 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2860 NOTICE of Dismissal of Dirk Harris to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Dirk Harris (Porter, John)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2859 *** WITHDRAWN PER #3055 NOTICE OF WITHDRAW *** Joint MOTION for Hearing Regarding Stanford Assets in Switzerland filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin) Modified on 2/2/2021 (mjr).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2858 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Allen Johnson, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Gerardo Meave, Evan Farrell, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, Charles Vollmer, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good, #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Steve Robinson, Lupe Northam, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, James Fontenot, Aymeric Martinoia, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Doug Shaw, Trenton Miller, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. Clerk Order granting partial dismissal of appeal. (epm)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2857 NOTICE of Dismissal of Gerardo Meave to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Gerardo Meave-Flores (Porter, John)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2856 ORDER of USCA as to #2741 Notice of Appeal, filed by R Allen Stanford. IT IS ORDERED that appellants unopposed motion for partial dismissal of appellant, Bruce E. Lang, is GRANTED. (epm)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2855 NOTICE of Dismissal of Bruce Lang to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Bruce Lang (Porter, John)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2854 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal. COURT ORDER granting Motion for partial dismissal of appeal as to appellant, Trevor Ling, ONLY. (svc)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2853 NOTICE of Receiver's Additional Schedules of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 1st, 2nd, 3rd, 4th, and 5th Interim Plans filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Sadler, Kevin)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2852 NOTICE to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by Trevor Ling re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection. (Porter, John) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (axm).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2851 MOTION to Dismiss filed by R Allen Stanford (svc)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2850 Interim STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Powers, Scott)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2849 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as to Lori S. Bensing, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (svc)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2848 NOTICE of Dismissal of Lori Bensing to Withdraw and Dismiss her Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Lori S Bensing (Porter, John)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2847 NOTICE of Receiver's Subpoena to Stanley Law, P.C. filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sadler, Kevin)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2846 ORDER granting #2798 Motion to Approve Sale of Certain Property and Investment Interests Held by the Receivership Estate. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/14/2019) (aaa)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2846. Tue May 14 12:41:56 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2845 ORDER of USCA as to #2535 Notice of Appeal. Under FED. R. APP. P. 42(b), the appeal is dismissed, as to Claudia Martinez, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (svc)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2844 NOTICE of Dismissal of Claudia Martinez to Withdraw and Dismiss Her Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Claudia Martinez (Porter, John)
April 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2843 Neal Clement to Withdraw and Dismiss his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection, filed by Neal Clement (Porter, John)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2842 ORDER granting #2837 Motion for approval of the fifty fourth interim feeapplication. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/24/2019) (zkc)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2841 ORDER granting #2832 Motion for approval of the thirtieth interim fee application for payment of attorney's fees and expenses. The Court grants the motion and orders the Receiver to pay $74,360.76 to the firm of Little Pedersen Fankhauser, LLP. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/24/2019) (zkc)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2840 ORDER granting #2817 Motion for approval of the fifty third interim feeapplication. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/24/2019) (zkc)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 2840, 2841, 2842. Wed Apr 24 16:03:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2839 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #2835 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Powers, Scott)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2838 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2837 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Fourth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2837 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Fourth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2836 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2832 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2835 NOTICE of Claimant Cedar Glade Capital, LLC's Objection to Receiver's Proposed Withholding of Interim Distributions filed by Cedar Glade Capital, LLC (Billingsley, James)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2834 ORDER of USCA as to #2741 Notice of Appeal, filed by R Allen Stanford. Clerk Order granting partial dismissal of appeal. (epm)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2833 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal of Mark Groesbeck of his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection filed by Mark Groesbeck (Porter, John)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2832 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2831 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, #2535 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as of 3/18/2019, as to Charles Vollmer, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (axm)
March 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2830 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal of Charles Vollmer of his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by Charles Vollmer re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial or to Alter and Amend Final Bar Order, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection. (Porter, John) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (axm).
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2829 NOTICE of Receiver's 1st Set of Schedules of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 5th Interim Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2828 ORDER of USCA as to #2741 Notice of Appeal, filed by R Allen Stanford. The appeal is dismissed as of 2/18/2019, as to Steve Robinson, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (epm)
February 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2827 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal of Steve Robinson of his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Steve Robinson (Porter, John)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2826 ORDER of USCA as to #2537 Notice of Appeal, filed by Eddie Rollins, Scott Notowich, Douglas M McDaniel, #2528 Notice of Appeal, filed by Joseph Becker, Joseph Becker, et al., #2535 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lori S Bensing, Janie Martinez, Greg R. Day, Allen Johnson, Paula S. Sutton, Jonathan Mote, Pablo M. Alvarado, Bruce Lang, Lupe Northam, Steve Robinson, James D. Perry, Spencer Murchison, Evan Farrell, Gerardo Meave, John Schwab, A Rincon, Carol McCann, Steven Glasgow, Christopher Prindle, William S. Decker, Charles Vollmer, Stephen Barber, Tim Parsons, Peter Montalbano, Frank Carpin, Aymeric Martinoia, James Fontenot, John Holliday, Michael Conrad, Trenton Miller, Doug Shaw, Yolanda Suarez, Robert Lenoir, Randall Pickett, Dirk Harris, Tiffany Angelle, Claudia Martinez, Trevor Ling, Deems May, Jr., Mark Groesbeck, William O. Stone, Jr., Ward Good. The appeal is dismissed as of 2/14/2019, as to appellant, J.D. Perry, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (epm)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2825 NOTICE to Withdraw and Dismiss His Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by James D. Perry re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection. (Porter, John) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (axm).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2824 NOTICE of Receiver's Notice Regarding 53rd Interim Fee Application re: #2817 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Third Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2823 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2725 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief received back from Ybel Jeannette Sanchez Rojas as Addresse Unknown at marked address. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ykp)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2822 ORDER of USCA as to #2606 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cordell Haymon. The appeal is dismissed as to appellant, Carol McCann, ONLY, as of 1/22/2019, pursuant to appellant's motion. (epm)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2821 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal of Carol McCann of her Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order, #2397 Response/Objection, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, #2432 Response/Objection, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2554 Reply, #2535 Notice of Appeal, #2389 Response/Objection, filed by Carol McCann (Porter, John)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2820 ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEYS' FEES: The Receiver is ORDERED to pay Plaintiffs' counsel attorneys' fees in the amount of $15,458,849 upon receipt of the Settlement Amount in accordance with the terms of the Proskauer Settlement Agreement. The Receiver shall reimburse expenses paid by the Receivership Estate from the settlement proceeds in the amount of $1,164,604.22. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/18/2019) (zkc)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 2820. Fri Jan 18 16:47:10 CST 2019 (crt)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2819 FINAL BAR ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Proskauer Rose LLP, to Approve the Proposed Notice of Settlement with Proskauer Rose LLP, to Enter the Bar Order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Order, and for Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/16/2019) (rekc)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2819. Wed Jan 16 15:52:21 CST 2019 (crt)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2818 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S Janvey re #2817 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Third Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2817 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Third Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
January 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2816 NOTICE of Dismissal of Individual Objection of Bert Deems May, Jr. re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Deems May, Jr (Porter, John)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2815 NOTICE of Receiver's 33rd Report Regarding the Claims & Distribution Processes filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2814 ORDER of USCA as to #2535 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as to Bert Deems May Jr, ONLY, pursuant to appellant's motion. (svc) Modified file date on 12/17/2018 (svc).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2813 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Settlement Hearing held on 12/14/2018. Receiver- Kevin Sadler; Proskauer- Neil Burger, James Rouhandeh, Patrick Blakemore; Examiner- John Little; Official Stanford Investors- Ed Snyder; SEC- Janie Frank; and HSBC Bank- Taylor Brinkman (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :01. (chmb)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2812 RESPONSE filed by Proskauer Rose LLP re: #2796 Response/Objection (Burger, Neil)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2811 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: #2796 Response/Objection (Blakeway, Judith)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2810 NOTICE of COMPLIANCE re: #2780 Scheduling Order filed by Edward C Snyder (Snyder, Edward)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2809 Interim STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Powers, Scott)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2808 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Powers, Scott)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2807 ORDER granting #2794 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/28/2018) (ykp)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2806 ORDER granting #2792 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Second Interim Fee Application (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/28/2018) (ykp)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2806. Wed Nov 28 16:34:22 CST 2018 (crt)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2807. Wed Nov 28 16:46:19 CST 2018 (crt)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2805 ORDER granting #2784 Motion for Approval of Fifth Interim Distribution Plan. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (epm)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2804 NOTICE of Full Briefing re: #2798 MOTION to Approve Sale of Certain Property and Investment Interests Held by the Receivership Estate filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Powers, Scott)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2805. Mon Nov 19 16:54:04 CST 2018 (crt)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2803 NOTICE of re: #2792 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Second Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2802 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2794 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2801 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Claimant Beverly DeLoach filed by Beverly DeLoach (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Silver, David)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2800 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel of Record filed by Abney International Ltd, Donna Allbritton, Linda K Oge, Mark D Oge, Jane Ann Sasser, Gloria Hodapp Trujillo, Barbara Zwick (Silver, David)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2799 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal. IT IS ORDERED that appellants unopposed motion to substitute Robert Otis Lenoir with Mona Jean Reeves Lenoir, as Executrix of the Estate of Robert Otis Lenoir, upon suggestion of death is GRANTED. (svc)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2798 MOTION to Approve Sale of Certain Property and Investment Interests Held by the Receivership Estate filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Powers, Scott)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2797 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Settlement Proceedings held on 8-12-16 before Judge Godbey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Langford, Telephone number (214) 748-8068. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (5 pages) Redaction Request due 11/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2019. (svc)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2796 OBJECTION filed by HSBC Bank PLC re: #2768 MOTION to Approve Proposed Settlement (Brinkman, Taylor)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2795 ORDER granting #2782 Motion for Approval of Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/23/2018) (rekc)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2795. Tue Oct 23 16:37:56 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2794 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2793 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2792 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Second Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2792 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fifty-Second Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2791 NOTICE of Mootness re: ATP's Motion to Authorize Payment of Allowed CD Claim Distributions filed by ATP Tour Inc (Newman, Andrew)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2790 NOTICE of Full Briefing re: #2784 MOTION for Approval of Fifth Interim Distribution Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Day, Brendan)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2789 ***DISREGARD/ATTORNEY FILED IN WRONG CASE*** NOTICE of Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Ray Deragon filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Arlington, David) Modified on 10/10/2018 (zkc).
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2788 NOTICE of re: #2782 MOTION for Approval of Receivers Fifty-First Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2787. Tue Oct 2 11:40:37 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2787 ORDER granting #2691 Motion to Authorize Payment of Allowed CD Claim Distributions. The Court grants ATP's motion and directs the Receiver to pay ATP $60,300.00 of unpaid distributions. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/1/2018) (ykp)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2786 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as to Steven Glasgow, ONLY. (svc)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2785 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal of Steven Glasgow's Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Steven Glasgow (Porter, John)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2784 MOTION for Approval of Fifth Interim Distribution Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2781. Tue Sep 18 08:41:44 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2783 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2782 MOTION for Approval of Receivers Fifty-First Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2782 MOTION for Approval of Receivers Fifty-First Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2781 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS: The final hearing on the Motion is set for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David C. Godbey. Any objections are due by 11/23/2018. (ewd)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2780 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Approval Hearing for 12/14/2018 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/11/2018) (zkc)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 2780. Tue Sep 11 14:50:05 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2779 CERTIFICATE of Conference re #13 Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Snyder, Edward) Modified event text on 9/11/2018 (axm).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2778 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2726 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees received back from Olga Rojas DeSanchez as RTS. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (epm)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2777 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2727 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief received back from Olga Rojas De Sanchez as Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (svc)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2776 NOTICE of Receiver's Additional Schedules of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 1st, 2nd, 3rd, and 4th Interim Plans filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- 18th Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 1st Interim Plan, #2 Exhibit B -- 9th Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 2nd Interim Plan, #3 Exhibit C -- 5th Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 3rd Interim Plan, #4 Exhibit D -- 3rd Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 4th Interim Plan) (Sadler, Kevin)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2775 ORDER granting #2749 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Corrected Motion of Examiner. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/29/2018) (ykp)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2774 ORDER granting #2750 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fiftieth Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/29/2018) (ykp)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2774, 2775. Wed Aug 29 13:22:59 CDT 2018 (crt)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2772 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Powers, Scott)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2773 Received letter from United States Court of Appeals: The court has denied the motion to reopen the case. (svc)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2770 Proposal for contents of Scheduling Order filed by Official Stanford Investors Committee (Snyder, Edward) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (ykp).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2771 ORDER of USCA as to #2741 Notice of Appeal filed by R Allen Stanford. The appeal is dismissed for want of prosecution. (svc)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2769 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S Janvey re #2768 MOTION to Approve Proposed Settlement with Proskauer Rose, LLP (Snyder, Edward)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2768 EXPEDITED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH PROSKAUER ROSE LLP, TO APPROVE THE PROPOSED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WITH PROSKAUER ROSE LLP, TO ENTER THE BAR ORDER TO ENTER THE FINAL JUDGMENT AND BAR ORDER, AND FOR PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Ralph S Janvey (Snyder, Edward) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (svc).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2767 ORDER of USCA as to #2535 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed pursuant to appellant's motion, as to Jonathan Mote, ONLY. (svc)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2766 NOTICE of Filing with the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by R Allen Stanford (svc)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2765 NOTICE of Dismissal TO LLOYDS SETTLEMENT FILING filed by Jonathan Mote (Stanley, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2764 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdawal of Individual Objection of David Innes. (Porter, John) Modified text on 8/9/2018 (svc).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2763 ORDER of USCA as to #2535 Notice of Appeal filed by Tiffany Angelle only, is dismissed. (svc)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2762 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdawal of Individual Objection re: #2532 Appendix in Support #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order m #2397 Response/Objection #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite #2518 Order #2432 Response/Objection #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion #2554 Reply #2535 Notice of Appeal #2389 Response/Objection filed by Tiffany Angelle (Porter, John)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2761 NOTICE of re: #2750 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fiftieth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2760 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2749 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Corrected Motion of Examiner (Little, John)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2759 NOTICE of Fifth Amended Rule 45 Subpoena to Andres Alos filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2758 Return of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action serving YMAX Communications Corp on 7/13/2018. (ran)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2757 NOTICE of Fourth Amended Rule 45 Subpoena to Andres Alos filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2756 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2729 Order received back from Ybel Jeannette Sanchez Rojas as Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ran)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2755 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2729 Order received back from Olga Rojas De Sanchez as Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ran)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2754 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT Exhibit 1 to #2753 Notice of Third Amended Rule 45 Subpoena to Andres Alos by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin) Modified event text on 7/6/2018 (axm).
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2753 NOTICE of Third Amended Rule 45 Subpoena to Andres Alos filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2752 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2727 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, received back from Ybel Jeannette Sanchez Rojas as Return to Sender. Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ndt)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2751 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2750 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fiftieth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2750 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fiftieth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2749 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Corrected Motion of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2748 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2747 NOTICE of Second Amended Rule 45 Subpoena to Andres Alos filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2746 NOTICE of Receiver's 32nd Report Regarding the Claims & Distribution Processes filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2745 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee (with Deputy Clerk Response) filed by R Allen Stanford. (sss) Motion forwarded to USCA5. Modified on 7/2/2018 (svc).
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2744 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #1923 Motion per #2691 Motion to Authorize Payment. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2018) (chmb)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2743 NOTICE of Amended Rule 45 Subpoena to Andres Alos filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. 2744 Thu Jun 21 16:14:03 CDT 2018 (crt)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 18-10692 in USCA5 for #2741 Notice of Appeal filed by R Allen Stanford. (svc)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2742 NOTICE of Rule 45 Subpoena to Andres Alos filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2741. with TO Mon Jun 11 12:37:23 CDT 2018 (crt)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2741 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #2731 Order on Motion, to the Fifth Circuit by R Allen Stanford. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (zkc)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2740. Tue Jun 5 13:49:43 CDT 2018 (crt)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2740 ORDER denying #2738 Motion for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/4/2018) (ran)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2739 Objection to Proposed Settlement by Aaron Ashkenazi. (axm)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2738 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint filed by Sara Vixgaro Del Aguila, Enrique Oeawa Espinoza, JuanSalvador Mazzarri Payet, Elvira M Barbe Pflucker, Flavio Antonio Alberto Salvetti Artola. (epm)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2737 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Powers, Scott)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2736 Interim STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S. Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Powers, Scott)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2735 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action on Alos & Associates, P.A. on April 26, 2018 by Ralph S. Janvey. (Sadler, Kevin)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2734 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action on Alexander Angueira, PLLC on April 25, 2018 by Ralph S. Janvey. (Sadler, Kevin)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2733 Intervener's Reply to Joint Response to Motion for Leave to File Intervening Complaint, filed by Audrey Pamela Davies and Harold Eyre. (ran) Modified on 6/5/2018 (ewd).
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2731. Fri May 11 13:48:00 CDT 2018 (crt)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2732. Fri May 11 10:19:14 CDT 2018 (crt)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2732 ORDER: The Court grants the #2676 motion but limits its granting of requests (3) and (4) to lawsuits filed by Stanford, not individuals acting in concert with him. The Court excuses the Parties from responding to Stanford's opposed motions in this or any other Stanford case. Further, the Court enjoins Stanford from filing any new lawsuits against the Parties or Receivership Professionals without first seeking and obtaining leave of Court. The Court further directs the Clerk of the Court not to accept for filing any such new complaint that Stanford files unless Stanford has obtained leave of Court for such filing. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/10/2018) (ykp)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2731 ORDER denying #2576 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying #2596 Motion to Dismiss; denying #2602 Motion to Dismiss; denying #2605 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #2651 Motion to Dismiss; denying #2652 Motion to discharge the Examiner; denying #2664 Motion for expedited ruling on Rule 12(b)(1) motion to Dismiss; denying #2665 Motion to terminate services of Karyl Van Tassel and FTI; denying #2675 Motion for Leave to to submit personal letters; denying #2680 Motion for relief from void judgment (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/10/2018) (ykp)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2730 ORDER granting #2670 MOTION for Order to Confirm the Status of the Receivership as a "Qualified Settlement Fund". (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/10/2018) (ykp)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2730. Thu May 10 14:52:01 CDT 2018 (crt)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2729 ORDER denying #2666 Motion to Intervene; denying #2669 Motion to Intervene; denying #2677 Motion to Intervene; denying #2687 Motion to Intervene; denying #2689 Motion to Intervene; denying #2697 Motion to Intervene; denying #2699 Motion to Intervene; denying #2704 Motion to Intervene; denying #2705 Motion to Intervene; denying #2710 Motion to Intervene; denying #2724 Motion to Intervene; denying #2728 Motion to Intervene. The Court further grants the Receiver, the Examiner, the SEC, and OSIC's request to be excused from responding to such future motions to intervene until and unless the Court informs the parties that a response is necessary. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/7/2018) (epm)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2729. Mon May 7 12:19:49 CDT 2018 (crt)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2728 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint filed by Daniel Acund. (epm)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2727 ORDER granting #2662 Motion for approval of the forty-eighth interim fee application. Applying the ten percent holdback previously imposed by the Court to the non-out-of-pocket expenses, see Order, 4/4/2012 #1565 (modifying holdback for nonout-of-pocket expenses), the Receiver requests payment of $1,939,396.69, which the Court approves in full. The Receiver may apply later for the held-back amount of $190,358.70. The Court reserves any ruling on objections to that amount until a later date. Finally, the Receiver requests approval for payment of $2,032.90 to a professional firm in connection with the Official Stanford Investors Committee from 8/1/2017 to 9/30/2017. See Receiver's Mot. 22. The Court approves the Receiver's request for $2,032.90 for payment to that professional firm. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/4/2018) (epm)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2726 ORDER granting #2694 Motion for Attorney Fees and orders the Receiver to pay $103,544.08 to the firm of Little Pedersen Fankhauser, LLP. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/4/2018) (epm)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2725 ORDER granting #2692 Motion for approval of the forty-ninth interim fee application. Applying the ten percent holdback previously imposed by the Court to the nonout-of-pocket expenses, see Order, 4/4/2012 #1565 (modifying holdback for non-out-of pocket expenses), the Receiver requests payment of $2,002,989.35, which the Court approves in full. The Receiver may apply later for the held-back amount of $201,605.20. The Court reserves any ruling on objections to that amount until a later date. Finally, the Receiver requests approval for payment of $11,070.90 to professional firms in connection with the Official Stanford Investors Committee from 10/1/2017 to 11/30/2017. See Rec.'s Mot. 24. The Court approves the Receiver's request for $11,070.90 for payment to those professional firms. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/4/2018) (epm)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2725. Fri May 4 11:24:34 CDT 2018 (crt)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2727. Fri May 4 11:45:33 CDT 2018 (crt)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2726 . Fri May 4 11:46:02 CDT 2018 (crt)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2724 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) filed by Mirlay Sanchez. (axm)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2723 OBJECTION filed by Artemisa Patricia Hernandez Contreras, Iker Artemio Zetina Hernandiz, Itzar Abani Zetina Hernandez. (rekc)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2722 NOTICE of Rule 45 Subpoena to Luis Ruiz filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2721 NOTICE of Rule 45 Subpoena to Alos & Associates, P.A. filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2720 NOTICE of Rule 45 Subpoena to Alexander Angueira, PLLC filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2719 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal filed Pablo M. Alvarado. The appeal is dismissed as to Pablo M. Alvarado, ONLY, pursuant to appellant;s motion. (svc)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2718 NOTICE of Dismissal and Withdrawal to LLoyd's Settlement Filings filed by Pablo M. Alvarado (Stanley, Michael)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2717 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, and #2585 Notice of Appeal are dismissed as of April 12, 2018, as to Evan Farrell, Randall Pickett, and Christopher Prindle, ONLY, pursuant to the joint motion of the three parties. (svc)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2716 NOTICE of Evan Farrell, Randall Pickett, and Christopher Prindle to Withdraw and Dismiss Their Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Evan Farrell, Randall Pickett, Christopher Prindle (Porter, John)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2715 NOTICE of Firm Change filed by Official Stanford Investors Committee (Blakeway, Judith)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2714 NOTICE of Rule 45 Subpoena to Luis Ruiz filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2713 NOTICE of Rule 45 Subpoena to Alos & Associates, P.A. filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2712 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2694 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (Little, John)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2711 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #2705 MOTION to Intervene, #2704 MOTION to Intervene, #2699 MOTION for Leave to File Intervening Complaint, #2697 MOTION to Intervene, #2710 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) (Powers, Scott)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2710 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) filed by Jaime Alexis Arroyo Bornstein. (sss)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2709 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT LAURA PENDERGEST-HOLT : The Securities and Exchange Commission having filed a Complaint and Defendant Laura Pendergest-Holt, also known as Laura Holt (hereinafter "Defendant") having entered a general appearance; consented to the Court's jurisdiction over Defendant and the subject matter of this action; consented to entry of this Final Judgment; waived findings of fact and conclusions oflaw; and waived any right to appeal from this Final Judgment. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/30/2018) (ndt)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2708 NOTICE of RUSSELL WARDEN GOOD AND PAULA SUTTON TO WITHDRAW AND DISMISS THEIR INDIVIDUAL OBJECTION TO THE LLOYDS SETTLEMENT FILING re: #2532 Appendix in Support,,,, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Ward Good, Paula S. Sutton (Porter, John)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: #2709 (see NEF for details) Docket No:. Fri Mar 30 16:16:06 CDT 2018 (crt)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2707 NOTICE of Regarding Forty-Ninth Interim Fee Application re: #2693 Appendix in Support, #2692 MOTION filed by Ralph S Janvey (Sadler, Kevin) Modified docket text on 3/28/2018 (zkc).
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2706 MOTION for Judgment Final Judgment as to Defendant Laura Pendergest-Holt filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-Consent of Defendant Laura Pendergest-Holt, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Final Judgment as to Defendant Laura Pendergest-Holt, #3 Proposed Order) (Frank, Janie)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2705 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint Pursuant to Federal rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) filed by Olga Rojas De Sanchez. (axm) Modified filer on 3/28/2018 (svc).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2704 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint Pursuant to Federal rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) filed by Ybel Jeannette Sanchez Rojas. (axm) Modified filed date on 3/27/2018 (axm). Modified filer on 3/28/2018 (svc).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2703 FINAL BAR ORDER: The Court GRANTS #2561 the Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Hunton & Williams LLP, to Enter the Bar Order, and to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/26/2018) (zkc)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2702 ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEYS' FEES: The Receiver is ORDERED to pay Plaintiffs' counsel attorneys' fees in the amount of $8,482,171.41 upon receipt of the Settlement Amount in accordance with the terms of the Hunton Settlement Agreement. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/26/2018) (zkc)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2701 ORDER: The Court denies the objections and, by separate documents, approves the settlement, approves the associated attorneys' fees, and enters the bar order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/26/2018) (zkc)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2701, 2702, 2703. Mon Mar 26 15:36:43 CDT 2018 (crt)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2700 NOTICE of Receiver's Additional Schedules of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 1st, 2nd, 3rd, and 4th Interim Plans filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- 17th Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 1st Interim Plan, #2 Exhibit B -- 8th Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 2nd Interim Plan, #3 Exhibit C -- 4th Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 3rd Interim Plan, #4 Exhibit D -- 2nd Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 4th Interim Plan) (Sadler, Kevin)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2699 MOTION for Leave to File Intervening Complaint filed by Pierre Wouters. (ndt)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2698 NOTICE of Receiver's 31st Report Regarding the Claims & Distribution Processes filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 17-11073 (related to #2608 , #2537 , #2589 , #2606 , #2528 , #2587 , #2585 , #2535 appeal): Record consisting of: 31 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 1 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic document number(s): 247 (circuit approval is required for access),. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2697 MOTION for leave to file an intervening complaint filed by Carole D Bullard (svc) (No Address Provided)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2696 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #2687 MOTION to Intervene, #2689 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint (Powers, Scott)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2695 NOTICE Regarding Pending Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss with Additional Case Law to Aid the Court in its Decision-Making filed by R Allen Stanford (svc)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2694 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2693 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2692 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2692 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Ninth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2691 Motion to Authorize Payment of Allowed CD Claim Distributions filed by ATP Tour Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Newman, Andrew) Modified on 3/5/2018 to add text (svc).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2690 Received letter from United States Court of Appeals: The court has granted the motion to supplement the record in this case with all documents from Case No. 3:09-CV-1274 in the Northern District of Texas - Dallas. The originating court is requested to provide us with a supplemental electronic record consisting of the documents outlined in the attached motion. Counsel is reminded that any citations to these documents must cite to the supplemental electronic record. (svc)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2689 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint filed by Alfredo Machuca Gonzalez, Oralia Vaca de Machuca. (epm)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2688 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action served on Daniel Hernandez on February 3, 2018 by Ralph S. Janvey. (Sadler, Kevin)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2687 MOTION for Leave to file an Intervening Complaint filed by Ian David Ashbery (svc)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2685 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: #2670 MOTION for Order to Confirm the Status of the Receivership as a "Qualified Settlement Fund" filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2686 ORDER of USCA as to #2537 Notice of Appeal, #2528 Notice of Appeal, #2535 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as of 2/22/2018, as to Russell Warden Good and Paula Sutton, ONLY, pursuant to the joint motion of the two parties. (axm)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2684 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S Janvey, John Little, Securities and Exchange Commission re: #2666 MOTION to Intervene, #2677 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint, #2669 MOTION to Intervene (Powers, Scott)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2683 REPLY filed by Ralph S Janvey re: #2676 MOTION Joint Motion for Modification of Order Limiting Requirement to Respond to Filings by R. Allen Stanford, for Declaration that Stanford is a Vexatious Litigant, for Injunction, and for Expedited Consideration (Powers, Scott)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2682 RESPONSE filed by R Allen Stanford re: #2676 Joint Motion for Modification of Order. (rekc)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2681 Objection to Change in Receivership's Status to that of a Qualified Settlement Fund filed by R Allen Stanford. (rekc)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2680 Second MOTION for Relief from Void Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by R Allen Stanford. (rekc)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2679 OBJECTION filed by ATP Tour Inc re: #1584 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s)) (Newman, Andrew)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2678 NOTICE of regarding 48th Interim Fee application re: #2662 MOTION filed by Ralph S Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2677 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint filed by Eugenia Collinsworth. (epm)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2676 MOTION Joint Motion for Modification of Order Limiting Requirement to Respond to Filings by R. Allen Stanford, for Declaration that Stanford is a Vexatious Litigant, for Injunction, and for Expedited Consideration filed by Ralph S Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powers, Scott)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2675 OBJECTION filed by R Allen Stanford re: #2662 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (aaa)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2674 REPLY filed by R Allen Stanford re: #2652 MOTION for an Order Discharging Court-Appointed Examiner. (aaa)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2673 NOTICE of Receiver's Rule 45 Subpoena to Daniel Hernandez filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Sadler, Kevin)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2672 ORDER granting #2635 Motion for Order Confirming Proposed Private Sale of Real Property in St. Croix, U.S. Virgin Islands (Estate Recovery Hill and Estate Mt. Welcome) and #2670 MOTION for Order to Confirm the Status of the Receivership as a "Qualified Settlement Fund" filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. The appointment of Elizabeth Guadalupe-Perez as appraiser pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2001(b) is hereby confirmed. The Receiver is hereby authorized to proceed with closing in accordance with the provisions set forth in the Parties' Sales Agreement. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/2/2018) (axm) Modified docket text on 3/16/2018 (ali).
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2672. Fri Feb 2 17:17:03 CST 2018 (crt)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2671 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 2/1/2018. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (chmb)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2670 MOTION for Order to Confirm the Status of the Receivership as a "Qualified Settlement Fund" filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2669 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) filed by Katherine A Hill. (rekc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2018: #1 Back of Envelope) (rekc).
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2668 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2667 Notice (Other) Regarding Proposed Private Sale of Real Property in St. Croix, U.S. Virgin Islands (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2667 NOTICE of Proposed Private Sale of Real Property in St. Croix, U.S. Virgin Islands (Estate Recovery Hill & Estate Mt. Welcome) filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2666 MOTION for Leave to File an Intervening Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) filed by Diane Hanlen, Michael Hanlen. (rekc)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2665 MOTION to Terminate the Services of Karyl Van Tassel, and FTI Consulting Inc and to Bar Any Post-Termination Application on Their Part for Payment filed by R Allen Stanford. (zkc)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2664 MOTION to Expedite Judgment on the Merits of Pending Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1657(a) filed by R Allen Stanford. (zkc)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2663 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2662 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2662 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for approval of Receiver's Forty-Eighth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2661 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by John Little re: #2652 MOTION (Little, John)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2660 ORDER granting #2635 Motion Interim Order Regarding Proposed Private Sale and Order Confirming Proposed Private Sale of Real Property in St. Croix, U.S. Virgin Islands. Status Hearing set for 2/1/2018 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/17/2018) (ndt)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2660. Wed Jan 17 13:08:51 CST 2018 (crt)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2659 ORDER of USCA: The court has granted appellants motion to file brief out of time and for extension of time to and including January 22, 2018 for filing appellants brief in this case. (svc)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2658 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2655 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sashi C. Bach. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/8/2018) (chmb)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2657 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2654 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart H. Singer. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/8/2018) (chmb)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2656 ORDER granting #2626 Motion to Withdraw and to be Removed from the Electronic Service List filed by Mr. Lee H. Shidlofsky. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/2/2018) (axm)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2655 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8892057) filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP Attorney Sashi C Bach added to party Greenberg Traurig LLP(pty:ip), Attorney Sashi C Bach added to party Greenberg Traurig LLP(pty:ip) (Bach, Sashi)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2654 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8891998) filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP Attorney Stuart Harold Singer added to party Greenberg Traurig LLP(pty:ip), Attorney Stuart Harold Singer added to party Greenberg Traurig LLP(pty:ip) (Singer, Stuart)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2656. Tue Jan 2 17:05:09 CST 2018 (crt)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2653 OBJECTION re: #2635 MOTION for Interim Order Regarding Proposed Private Sale and Order Confirming Proposed Private Sale of Real Property in St. Croix, U.S. Virgin Islands. (aaa)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2652 MOTION for an Order Discharging Court-Appointed Examiner filed by R Allen Stanford. (aaa)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2651 MOTION Requesting an Expedited Ruling on his pending Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Ripeness Doctrine filed by R Allen Stanford. (aaa)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2650 ORDER granting #2633 Motion to Approve Sale of Investment Interests inIndependent Bank Group, Inc. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/21/2017) (ams)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2650. Thu Dec 21 16:37:32 CST 2017 (crt)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2649 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: #2633 MOTION to Approve Sale of Investment Interests in Independent Bank Group, Inc. filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 2648. Wed Dec 20 10:59:26 CST 2017 (crt)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2648 ORDER DIRECTING PERSHING, LLC TO TURNOVER FUNDS TO RALPH S. JANVEY FOR CREDIT TO THE SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S JUDGMENT. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/19/2017) (ykp)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2647 ORDER granting #2622 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Seventh Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/14/2017) (ykp)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2647. Thu Dec 14 15:16:12 CST 2017 (crt)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2646 REPLY to the SEC's #2641 Response to Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and Related Motions. (ams)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2645 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal, #2537 Notice of Appeal, #2606 Notice of Appeal, #2528 Notice of Appeal, #2587 Notice of Appeal #2585 Notice of Appeal. Appellants' unopposed motion for the Court to clarify its order by confirming that the forty day extension runs from December 13, 2017 and the deadline to file appellants briefs is January 22, 2018 is GRANTED.
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2644 NOTICE of Receiver's Notice Regarding 47th Interim Fee Application re: #2622 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Seventh Interim Fee Application, #2643 Response/Objection filed by Ralph S Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2643 OBJECTION filed by R Allen Stanford re: #2622 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Seventh Interim Fee Application. (ykp)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2642 Appendix in Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re #2641 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Van Tassel Direct Testimony, #2 Exhibit(s) SIB Form D, #3 Exhibit(s) SIB Disclosure Statement) (Frank, Janie)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2641 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: #2602 MOTION to Dismiss, #2605 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2602 MOTION to Dismiss, #2596 MOTION to Dismiss (Frank, Janie)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2640. Fri Dec 1 13:56:14 CST 2017 (crt)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2640 ORDER granting #2604 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court grants the motion and orders the Receiver to pay $102,096.03 to the firm of Little Pedersen Fankhauser, LLP. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/30/2017) (ykp)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2639 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Powers, Scott)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2638 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 11/28/2017. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Janie Frank, Receiver- Kevin Sadler, Examiner- John Little; Defense - Edwin Buffmire, Lindsey Marsh, Gordon Cooney, Jeffrey Chapman, JIm Aycock, Jim Cowles, Noelle Reed, Ed Synder, Dick Sayles, Lynn Newver, Peter Kazanoff, Peter Morgenstern, Scott Burman, Robert Gilbert, Michael Criden, John Schwartz, and Haleigh Jones. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :47. (chmb)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2637 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Preliminary Hearing held on 11/28/2017. Attorney Appearances: Receiver - Kevin Sadler, Examiner- John Little; Defense - Edwin Buffmire, Lindsey Marsh, Joel Glover, John Schwartz, ed Synder, Dick Sayles, Jeff Colson, Lynn K. Neuver, Peter Kazanoff, Peter Mortenssen, Scott Brennan, Heleigh Jones, F. Scott Karse and Kenneth Johnston. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :19. (chmb)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2636 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2635 MOTION for Interim Order Regarding Proposed Private Sale and Order Confirming Proposed Private Sale of Real Property in St. Croix, U.S. Virgin Islands (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2635 MOTION for Interim Order Regarding Proposed Private Sale and Order Confirming Proposed Private Sale of Real Property in St. Croix, U.S. Virgin Islands filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2634 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2633 MOTION to Approve Sale of Investment Interests in Independent Bank Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2633 MOTION to Approve Sale of Investment Interests in Independent Bank Group, Inc. filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2632 Interim STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Powers, Scott)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2631 NOTICE of Resolution of Greenberg Traurig LLP's Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Settlement With Hunton & Williams LLP and Request to Amend Proposed Bar Orders re: #2613 Response/Objection filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP, Hunton & Williams LLP, Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Sayles, Richard)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Supplemental Record on Appeal for USCA5 17-10663 (related to #2608 , #2537 , #2606 , #2528 , #2535 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (axm)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2629 RESPONSE filed by Hunton & Williams LLP re: #2599 Notice (Other), #2617 Response/Objection, #2613 Response/Objection, #2595 Notice (Other), #2601 Notice (Other), #2611 Notice (Other), #2603 Notice (Other), #2600 Notice (Other), #2615 Response/Objection, #2614 Response/Objection, #2619 Notice (Other), #2616 Notice (Other), #2620 Notice (Other), #2594 Notice (Other) (Sayles, Richard)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2628 Correspondence to the Court, filed by Patricia Johnson. (epm)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2627 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: #2599 Notice (Other), #2617 Response/Objection, #2613 Response/Objection, #2581 Response/Objection, #2595 Notice (Other), #2601 Notice (Other), #2611 Notice (Other), #2603 Notice (Other), #2600 Notice (Other), #2615 Response/Objection, #2614 Response/Objection, #2619 Notice (Other), #2616 Notice (Other), #2620 Notice (Other), #2594 Notice (Other) (Morgenstern, Peter)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2630 Objection to Proposed Settlement. (axm)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2626 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel and to be Removed from Service List filed by Mark Kuhrt, Gilberto Lopez, Laura Pendergest-Holt, R Allen Stanford with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Shidlofsky, Lee)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2625 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2604 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (26th) (Little, John)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2624 NOTICE of Compliance with Scheduling Order re: #2561 MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion for Order Approving Proposed Settlement with Hunton & Williams, LLP, to Enter Bar Order, to Enter Final Judgment and Bar Order, and for Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees filed by Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s), #2 Declaration(s), #3 Declaration(s), #4 Declaration(s)) (Little, John)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2623 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2622 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Seventh Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2622 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Seventh Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 17-10663 in USCA5 for #2608 Notice of Appeal filed by Lori S Bensing et al and, #2606 Notice of Appeal filed by Cordell Haymon. (svc)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2621 ORDER of USCA as to #2608 Notice of Appeal: COURT ORDER granting appellants' unopposed motion to stay further proceedings in this court pending the filing of the supplemental record on appeal filed by Appellants Ms. Tiffany Angelle, Mr. Pablo M. Alvarado and Ms. Lori S. Bensing. (svc)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2620 Objection to Proposed Settlement. (axm)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2618 OBJECTION re: #2609 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/ filed by R Allen Stanford. (sss)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2617 OBJECTION filed by Pershing LLC re: #2614 Response/Objection, #2563 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,, (Farrell, Thomas)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2619 Objection to Proposed Settlement. (axm)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2616 NOTICE of objections from Francis Daymir Sanchez. (rekc)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2615 OBJECTION filed by Toronto-Dominion Bank re: #2614 Response/Objection (Acker, Rodney)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2614 OBJECTION filed by HSBC Bank PLC re: #2563 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,, (Brinkman, Taylor)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2613 OBJECTION filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP re: #2563 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,, (Cowles, Jim)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2612 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2609 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. The SEC's responses to Stanfords Rule 12(b)(6) Motion [Dkt. 2596], the Amended Rule 12(b)(6) [Dkt. 2605], the Rule 60 Motion [Dkt. 2602], and the Motion to Recuse [Dkt. 2602] are due by December 1, 2017. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/3/2017) (chmb)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 17-11073 (related to #2537 , #2589 , #2528 , #2587 , #2585 , #2535 appeal): Record consisting of: 220 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 25 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic documents (circuit approval is required for access),. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2610 ORDER granting #2573 Motion for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Sixth Interim Fee Application. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/2/2017) (rekc)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2609 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2602 MOTION to Dismiss, #2605 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2602 MOTION to Dismiss, #2596 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Frank, Janie)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2608 AMENDED NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #2535 Notice of Appeal to the Fifth Circuit by Pablo M. Alvarado, Tiffany Angelle, Lori S Bensing, Michael Conrad, Evan Farrell, James Fontenot, Steven Glasgow, Ward Good, Mark Groesbeck, Dirk Harris, John Holliday, Allen Johnson, Bruce Lang, Robert Lenoir, Trevor Ling, Claudia Martinez, Janie Martinez, Aymeric Martinoia, Deems May, Jr, Carol McCann, Gerardo Meave, Trenton Miller, Peter Montalbano, Jonathan Mote, Spencer Murchison, Lupe Northam, Tim Parsons, James D. Perry, Randall Pickett, Christopher Prindle, A Rincon, Steve Robinson, John Schwab, Doug Shaw, William O. Stone, Jr, Yolanda Suarez, Charles Vollmer. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Porter, John)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2610. Thu Nov 2 13:48:10 CDT 2017 (crt)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2607 NOTICE of Fully Briefed Status re: #2547 MOTION First Amended Motion for An Order Directing Turnover of Funds Held by Pershing, LLC to Ralph S. Janvey for Credit to the SEC Judgment re #2543 MOTION Motion for an Order Directing the Turnover of Funds Held by Pershing, LLC to the SEC filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2606 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #2521 Order,, to the Fifth Circuit by Cordell Haymon. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8777335. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Babcock, Charles)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2611 Objection to Proposed Settlement. (axm)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2605 EMERGENCY MOTION to Amend/Correct #2602 MOTION to Dismiss filed by R Allen Stanford. (epm)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2604 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (26th) filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2603 Objections to Proposed Settlement. (axm)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2602 MOTION to Dismiss filed by R Allen Stanford. (aaa)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2601 Objections to Proposed Settlement. (axm)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2600 Objections to Proposed Settlement. (axm)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2598 Transcript Order Form: re #2585 Notice of Appeal transcript not requested (Pulman, Randall)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2597 Transcript Order Form: re #2587 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested (Miner, Curtis)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2596 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by R Allen Stanford. (sss)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2595 NOTICE of objections from Alida Villegas and Maria Vittoria Sogliano. (ash)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2594 NOTICE of objections from Gazi El Halabi Zaid. (ash)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2593. Wed Oct 4 09:19:33 CDT 2017 (crt)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2593 ORDER: This Order addresses Objectors Former Employees' motion for new trial, #2530 in SEC v. Stanford Int'l Bank, Ltd., Case No. 3:09-CV-298-N (N.D. Tex) (the "Receivership Action"); Objectors Scott Notowich, Eddie Rollins, and Doug McDaniels' motion for new trial, #2533 in the Receivership Action; and Objector Cordell Haymon's motion for reconsideration, #2539 in the Receivership Action (collectively, the "Rule 59 Motions"). Because either the Court has previously addressed Objectors' arguments or they have been waived, the Court denies the Rule 59 Motions. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/3/2017) (axm) Modified text on 10/4/2017 (axm).
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 17-11073 for #2589 Notice of Appeal filed by Edna Able, #2587 Notice of Appeal filed by Roberto Barbar, Antonio Jubis Zacarias, #2585 Notice of Appeal filed by Ana Berrocal Ballesteros et al. (svc)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2592 Transcript Order Form: re #2585 Notice of Appeal transcript not requested (Pulman, Randall) Modified on 9/29/2017 (svc).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2591 RESPONSE filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re: #2576 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Frank, Janie)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2599 Objections to Proposed Settlement. (axm)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2590 NOTICE of re: #2573 MOTION for Approval of Receivers Forty-Sixth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2589 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Edna Able. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8689295. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Stanley, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2588 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Roberto Barbar, Antonio Jubis Zacarias (King, Christopher) Modified text on 9/20/2017 (rekc).
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2587 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #2565 Order to the Fifth Circuit by Roberto Barbar, Antonio Jubis Zacarias. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8684930. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (King, Christopher)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2586 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2579 Order on Motion for Hearing, received back from Nick Sherrod as not deliverable as addressed. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (rekc)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2585 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #2568 Order on Motion to Expedite,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #2567 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #2566 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2569 Order, #2565 Order to the Fifth Circuit by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Elisa Kusner, Isak Lempert, Adela Levy de Charua, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, David Quintos, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Michael Rishmague, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Barry L Rupert, Carol Rupert, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Carmen Gonzalez Urquiza Gonzalez, Rebeca Waxtein. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8681113. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Pulman, Randall)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2583 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2563 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing received back from Mark Kuhrt as No Longer at This Address. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (svc)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2584 Received letter from United States Court of Appeals Re: Your appeal has been placed in abeyance this date pending resolution of the Rule 59 motions pending in the District Court in case #3:09-CV-298. Once the case has been removed from abeyance, you will receive notification from this court with any additional instructions. (svc)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2582 RESPONSE filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP re: #2579 Order. (Cowles, Jim) Modified linkage on 9/13/2017 (rekc).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2580 MOTION Agreed Motion to Distribute Notice of Settlement and Bar Order Proceedings via ECF filed by Ralph S Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Morgenstern, Peter) Modified on 9/13/2017 (ash).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2581 OBJECTION filed by R Allen Stanford re: #2563 Scheduling Order. (ams)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2579 ORDER: The Joint Expedited Motion filed by the Receiver, the Examiner and the Official Stanford Investors Committee seeking a status conference #2578 is GRANTED. The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 11/28/2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/7/2017) (ash)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2578 Joint MOTION for Hearing Status Conference filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2577 ***DISREGARD/MOTION WAS MEANT TO BE FILED AS AN ATTACHMENT TO 2576*** MOTION to Dismiss filed by R Allen Stanford. (ykp) Modified text on 9/6/2017 (ykp).
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2576 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by R Allen Stanford. (ykp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2017: #1 Exhibit(s)) (ykp).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2575 OBJECTION filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP re: #2563 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Amending Scheduling Order with Respect to the Hunton & Williams Settlement) (Cowles, Jim)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2574 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2573 MOTION for Approval of Receivers Forty-Sixth Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2573 MOTION for Approval of Receivers Forty-Sixth Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2571,2572. Fri Aug 25 09:40:04 CDT 2017 (crt)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2572 ORDER: The Receiver's #2548 motion for approval of forty-fourth interim fee application is granted. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/24/2017) (ash)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2571 ORDER amending #2564 to approve in full the Receiver's requested payment. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/24/2017) (ash)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2570 ORDER granting #2541 Motion for Approval of Twenty-Fifth Interim Fee Application for Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/24/2017) (axm)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2570. Thu Aug 24 12:55:51 CDT 2017 (crt)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2569 ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEYS' FEES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SETTLEMENT WITH THE WILLIS DEFENDANTS: The motion #2398 is granted. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2568 FINAL BAR ORDER: The Court GRANTS #2369 the Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants, to Enter the Bar Order, and to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2567 ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEYS' FEES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SETTLEMENT WITH THE BMB DEFENDANTS: The motion #2398 is granted. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2566 FINAL BAR ORDER: The Court GRANTS #2383 the Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement of Claims Against the BMB Defendants, to Enter the Bar Order, and to Enter the Final Judgments and Bar Orders. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2565 ORDER: The Court denies the objections set forth in #2464 , #2466 , #2467 , #2468 , #2469 , #2470 , and #2475 and, by separate documents, approves the Settlements and enters the Bar Orders. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2564 ORDER: The Receiver's #2516 motion for approval of forty-fourth interim fee application is granted. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2563 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Final Approval Hearing re #2561 will be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey at the United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas, at 10:00 a.m. on 11/28/17, which is a date at least ninety (90) calendar days after entry of this Scheduling Order. Any Person who wishes to object to the terms of the Settlement, the Bar Order, the Judgment and Bar Order, or Plaintiffs' request for approval of attorney's fees, or who wishes to appear at the Final Approval Hearing, must file a written objection in 3:09-CV-0298-N through ECF or by mailing the written objection to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242 by 11/7/17. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2563,2564,2565,2566,2567,2568,2569. Wed Aug 23 18:15:54 CDT 2017 (crt)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Record on Appeal for USCA5 17-10663 (related to #2537 , #2528 , #2535 appeal): Record consisting of: ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 25 Volume(s) electronic transcript, Sealed or ex parte electronic document(s) (circuit approval is required for access),. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by #contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (svc)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2562 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re #2561 MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion for Order Approving Proposed Settlement with Hunton & Williams, LLP, to Enter Bar Order, to Enter Final Judgment and Bar Order, and for Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees (Morgenstern, Peter)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2561 MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion for Order Approving Proposed Settlement with Hunton & Williams, LLP, to Enter Bar Order, to Enter Final Judgment and Bar Order, and for Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Morgenstern, Peter)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2560 NOTICE of William Peerman to Withdraw and Dismiss his Individual Objection to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing filed by William Peerman (Porter, John) Modified text on 8/14/2017 (rekc).
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2559 ORDER of USCA as to #2535 Notice of Appeal. Under FED R. APP. P. 42(b), appellants unopposed motion for partial dismissal of the appeal as to appellants Stephen Barber, Frank Carpin, Greg R. Day and William S. Decker, the appeal is dismissed as to those parties only, as of August 08, 2017, pursuant to appellant's motion. (svc)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2558 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Intent to Individually Withdraw from and Dismiss the Appeal of Stephen R. Barber, Frank Carpin, Greg R. day, and William S. Decker re: #2535 Notice of Appeal,,,,,, filed by Stephen Barber, Frank Carpin, Greg R. Day, William S. Decker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Porter, John)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2557 NOTICE of Stephen Barber, Frank Carpin, Greg Day, William S. Decker, Stephen Greenhaw, Wiley Hutchins, Jr., and Carroll Mullis to Withdraw and Dismiss Their Individual Objections to the Lloyd's Settlement Filing re: #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2432 Response/Objection,,, #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En, #2521 Order,, #2397 Response/Objection,,, #2554 Reply,,, #2389 Response/Objection,,, filed by Stephen Barber, Frank Carpin, Greg R. Day, William S. Decker, Steven Greenhaw, Wiley Hutchins, Jr, Carroll Mullis (Porter, John)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2556 NOTICE of re: #2548 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2555 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #2553 Supplemental Document (Sadler, Kevin)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2554 REPLY filed by Pablo M. Alvarado, Tiffany Angelle, Stephen Barber, Lori S Bensing, Frank Carpin, Michael Conrad, Greg R. Day, William S. Decker, Evan Farrell, James Fontenot, Steven Glasgow, Ward Good, Mark Groesbeck, Dirk Harris, John Holliday, Allen Johnson, Bruce Lang, Robert Lenoir, Trevor Ling, Claudia Martinez, Janie Martinez, Aymeric Martinoia, Deems May, Jr, Carol McCann, Gerardo Meave, Trenton Miller, Peter Montalbano, Jonathan Mote, Spencer Murchison, Lupe Northam, Tim Parsons, James D. Perry, Randall Pickett, Christopher Prindle, A Rincon, Steve Robinson, John Schwab, Doug Shaw, William O. Stone, Jr, Yolanda Suarez, Paula S. Sutton, Charles Vollmer re: #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 (Porter, John)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2553 Supplemental Document by GMAG LLC, Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust, Gary D. Magness, Magness Securities, LLC as to #2550 Status Report . (Mentz, Rachel)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2552 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by GMAG LLC, Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust, Gary D. Magness, Magness Securities, LLC re: #2548 MOTION (Mentz, Rachel)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2551 EXAMINER'S NOTICE REGARDING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF TWENTY-FIFTH INTERIM FEE APPPLICATION filed by John Little re: #2541 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Of Examiner (25th). (Little, John) Modified text on 7/13/2017 (dsr).
July 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2550 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Powers, Scott)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2549 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2548 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2548 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receivers Forty-Fifth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2547 MOTION First Amended Motion for An Order Directing Turnover of Funds Held by Pershing, LLC to Ralph S. Janvey for Credit to the SEC Judgment re #2543 MOTION Motion for an Order Directing the Turnover of Funds Held by Pershing, LLC to the SEC filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tyler, Nancy)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2546 RESPONSE filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Co., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Lexington Insurance Co re: #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 (Lane, Daniel)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2545 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S Janvey re: #2533 MOTION for New Trial or to Alter/Amend Judgment, #2539 MOTION for Reconsideration, #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 (Sadler, Kevin)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2544 NOTICE of Receiver's 1st Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 4th Interim Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: 1st Schedule under 4th Interim Plan) (Sadler, Kevin)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2543 MOTION for an Order Directing the Turnover of Funds Held by Pershing, LLC to the SEC filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Proposed Order) (Tyler, Nancy)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2542 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy E Tyler on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Tyler, Nancy)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 17-10663 in USCA5 for #2537 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie Rollins et al, #2528 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph Becker, et al., #2535 Notice of Appeal filed by Lori S Bensing et al, (svc)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2541 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (25th) filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2540 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2529 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel R. Mentz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/15/2017) (chmb)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2539 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Order Approving Settlement Between (1) Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Lexington Insurance Company, and Arch Specialty Insurance Company, and (2) Ralph S. Janvey, in His Capacity as Court Appointed Receiver for Standford International Bank, et al filed by Cordell Haymon re #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schwarz, Kurt) Modified text on 6/16/2017 (axm).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2538 Transcript Order Form: re #2535 Notice of Appeal, transcript not requested. (Porter, John)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2537 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #2521 Order,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, to the Fifth Circuit by Douglas M McDaniel, Scott Notowich, Eddie Rollins. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8475448. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Rogers, Stephan)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2536 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Douglas M McDaniel, Scott Notowich, Eddie Rollins re #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, #2533 MOTION for New Trial or to Alter/Amend Judgment (Rogers, Stephan)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2535 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #2521 Order,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, #2518 Order,, to the Fifth Circuit by Pablo M. Alvarado, Tiffany Angelle, Stephen Barber, Lori S Bensing, Frank Carpin, Michael Conrad, Greg R. Day, William S. Decker, Evan Farrell, James Fontenot, Steven Glasgow, Ward Good, Mark Groesbeck, Dirk Harris, John Holliday, Allen Johnson, Bruce Lang, Robert Lenoir, Trevor Ling, Claudia Martinez, Janie Martinez, Aymeric Martinoia, Deems May, Jr, Carol McCann, Gerardo Meave, Trenton Miller, Peter Montalbano, Jonathan Mote, Spencer Murchison, Lupe Northam, Tim Parsons, James D. Perry, Randall Pickett, Christopher Prindle, A Rincon, Steve Robinson, John Schwab, Doug Shaw, William O. Stone, Jr, Yolanda Suarez, Paula S. Sutton, Charles Vollmer. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8473797. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Porter, John)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2534 Transcript Order Form: re #2528 Notice of Appeal transcript not requested (Preis, Phillip)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2533 MOTION for New Trial or to Alter/Amend Judgment filed by Douglas M McDaniel, Scott Notowich, Eddie Rollins (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Stephan Bruce Rogers added to party Douglas M McDaniel(pty:obj), Attorney Stephan Bruce Rogers added to party Douglas M McDaniel(pty:obj), Attorney Stephan Bruce Rogers added to party Scott Notowich(pty:obj), Attorney Stephan Bruce Rogers added to party Scott Notowich(pty:obj), Attorney Stephan Bruce Rogers added to party Eddie Rollins(pty:obj), Attorney Stephan Bruce Rogers added to party Eddie Rollins(pty:obj) (Rogers, Stephan)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2532 Appendix in Support filed by Pablo M. Alvarado, Tiffany Angelle, Stephen Barber, Lori S Bensing, Frank Carpin, Michael Conrad, Greg R. Day, William S. Decker, Evan Farrell, James Fontenot, Steven Glasgow, Ward Good, Mark Groesbeck, Dirk Harris, John Holliday, Allen Johnson, Bruce Lang, Robert Lenoir, Trevor Ling, Claudia Martinez, Janie Martinez, Aymeric Martinoia, Deems May, Jr, Carol McCann, Gerardo Meave, Trenton Miller, Peter Montalbano, Jonathan Mote, Spencer Murchison, Lupe Northam, Tim Parsons, William Peerman, James D. Perry, Randall Pickett, Christopher Prindle, A Rincon, Steve Robinson, John Schwab, Doug Shaw, William O. Stone, Jr, Yolanda Suarez, Paula S. Sutton, Charles Vollmer re #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, (Porter, John)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2531 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Pablo M. Alvarado, Tiffany Angelle, Stephen Barber, Lori S Bensing, Frank Carpin, Michael Conrad, Greg R. Day, William S. Decker, Evan Farrell, James Fontenot, Steve Glasgow, Ward Good, Mark Groesbeck, Dirk Harris, John Holliday, Allen Johnson, Bruce Lang, Robert Lenoir, Trevor Ling, Claudia Martinez, Janie Martinez, Aymeric Martinoia, Deems May, Jr, Carol McCann, Gerardo Meave, Trenton Miller, Peter Montalbano, Jonathan Mote, Spencer Murchison, Lupe Northam, Tim Parsons, William Peerman, James D. Perry, Randall Pickett, Christopher Prindle, A Rincon, Steve Robinson, John Schwab, Doug Shaw, William O. Stone, Jr, Yolanda Suarez, Paula S. Sutton, Charles Vollmer re #2530 MOTION for New Trial OR MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 (Porter, John)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2530 MOTION for New Trial OR (), MOTION to Alter Judgment , MOTION to Amend/Correct Final Bar Order Entered May 16, 2017 [Docket No. 2519] Granting Settlement and Order Denying Objections [Docket No. 2518] Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 filed by Objecting Former Employees, et al Attorney John C Porter, Jr added (Porter, John)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2529 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8468533) filed by GMAG LLC, Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust, Gary D. Magness, Magness Securities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Rachel R Mentz added to party GMAG LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel R Mentz added to party GMAG LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel R Mentz added to party Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel R Mentz added to party Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel R Mentz added to party Gary D. Magness(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel R Mentz added to party Gary D. Magness(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel R Mentz added to party Magness Securities, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel R Mentz added to party Magness Securities, LLC(pty:dft) (Mentz, Rachel)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2528 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #2521 Order,, #2519 Order on Motion to Expedite, #2518 Order, to the Fifth Circuit by Joseph Becker, et al. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-8468525. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Schedule One, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C) (Preis, Phillip)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2527 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by GMAG LLC, Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust, Gary D. Magness, Magness Securities, LLC re: #2525 Reply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Petrie, Andrew)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2528. Mon Jun 12 16:17:49 CDT 2017 (crt)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2526 NOTICE of Corrected Certificate of Service for Notice Regarding Forty-Fourth Interim Fee Application re: #2525 Reply filed by Ralph S Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2525 REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey re: #2516 MOTION (Sadler, Kevin)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2524 Appendix in Support filed by GMAG LLC, Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust, Gary D. Magness, Magness Securities, LLC re #2523 Response/Objection to Receiver's 44th Fee Application (Petrie, Andrew)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2523 OBJECTION filed by GMAG LLC, Gary D Magness Irrevocable Trust, Gary D. Magness, Magness Securities, LLC re: #2516 MOTION (Petrie, Andrew)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2522 STATUS REPORT Regarding Receivership, Asset Collection, and Ongoing Activities filed by Ralph S Janvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Powers, Scott)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2521 ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEYS' FEES: this order addresses the requests for attorneys' fees in the motion #2324 in 3:09-cv-0298. The Receiver is ORDERED to pay Kuckelman Torline Kirkland & Lewis attorneys' fees in the amount of $14 million upon receipt of the Settlement Amount in accordance with the terms of the Insurance Settlement Agreement. The Receiver iS ORDERED to pay Movants' counsel in the Reynaud litigation attorneys' fees in the amount of $100,000 upon receipt of the Settlement Amount. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/16/2017) (ash)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2520 ORDER granting #2500 Motion for Approval of Fourth Interim Distribution Plan. The Court orders the Receiver to make a fourth interim distribution. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/16/2017) (aaa)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2519 FINAL BAR ORDER: Before the Court is the Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, and Lexington Insurance Company (collectively "Underwriters"), to Enter the Bar Order, to Enter the Final Judgments and Bar Orders, and for Attorneys' Fees (the "Motion"), filed by Ralph S. Janvey, in his capacity as court-appointed Receiver for Stanford International Bank, Ltd. et al. (the "Receiver"). Docket No. #2324 . The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. The Court finds that the terms of the Agreement are adequate, fair, reasonable, and equitable, and that it should be and is hereby APPROVED. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/16/2017) (aaa)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2518 ORDER: This Order addresses the objections to the motion to approve the settlement between Plaintiffs Ralph S. Janvey (the "Receiver") and the Official Stanford Investors Committee ("OSIC") and Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Lexington Insurance Co., and Arch Specialty Insurance Co. (collectively, "Underwriters"). This Order also addresses the Objectors' motion to compel mediation related to the settlement. 2441 in the Receivership Action. The Court denies the objections to the Insurance Settlement and denies the Objectors' motion to compel. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/16/2017) (aaa)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2518,2519,2520. Tue May 16 14:16:19 CDT 2017 (crt)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2517 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2516 MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2516 MOTION filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Fourth Interim Fee Application) (Sadler, Kevin)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2515 RESPONSE filed by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Elisa Kusner, Sergio Kusner, Isak Lempert, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, David Quintos, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Michael Rishmague, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Barry L Rupert, Carol Rupert, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Carmen Gonzalez Urquiza Gonzalez, Rebeca Waxtein re: #2503 Notice (Other), #2505 Notice (Other), (Pulman, Randall)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2514 REPLY filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: #2503 Notice (Other). (Blakeway, Judith)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2513 NOTICE of Receiver's 16th Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 1st Interim Plan; 7th Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 2nd Interim Plan; and 3rd Schedule of Payments to Be Made Pursuant to the 3rd Interim Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 16th Schedule under 1st Interim Plan, #2 Exhibit B: 7th Schedule under 2nd Interim Plan, #3 Exhibit C: 3rd Schedule under 3rd Interim Plan) (Sadler, Kevin)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2512 RESPONSE filed by Roberto Barbar, Antonio Jubis Zacarias re: #2505 Receiver's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (King, Christopher) Modified text on 4/18/2017 (dsr).
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2511 NOTICE of Full Briefing re: #2500 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fourth Interim Distribution Plan filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Powers, Scott)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2509,2510. Wed Apr 12 09:23:25 CDT 2017 (crt)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2510 ORDER: This Order addresses the Examiner's motion for approval of twenty-fourth interim fee application for payment of attorneys' fees and expenses #2495 . The Court grants the motion and orders the Receiver to pay the firm of Little Pedersen Fankhauser, LLP $141,999.13. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/11/2017) (sss)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2509 ORDER: This Order addresses the Receiver's motion for approval of forty-third interim fee application #2496 . The Court grants the motion. The Receiver requests payment of $2,264,086.36 which the Court approves in full. The Receiver may apply later for the held-back amount of $238,894.22. The Court reserves any ruling on objections to that amount until a later date. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/11/2017) (sss)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2508 RESPONSE filed by Cordell Haymon re: #2505 Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Schwarz, Kurt) Modified text on 4/10/2017 (rekc).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2507 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Came on to be considered this Motion for Court-Ordered Dismissal, filed by the Parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, and the Court finds that the dismissal is proper of (1) the Plaintiff Ralph Janvey's claims against Defendants Tiger Woods Foundation, Inc. and Tiger Woods Charity Event Corporation, and (2) Defendants' claims against Plaintiff. IT IS ORDERED that the Receiver hereby dismisses his claims against Defendants and Defendants hereby dismiss their claims against Plaintiff, with prejudice to later re-filing. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/31/2017) (epm)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2506 NOTICE of Withdrawal filed by BDO USA, LLP (Nelson, James)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2507. Fri Mar 31 15:57:25 CDT 2017 (crt)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2505 NOTICE of Supplementary Authority re: #2370 Appendix in Support #2369 MOTION to Expedite Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants, to Enter the Bar order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders, and to Enter the Notices of Bar Order filed by Ralph S Janvey, Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Blakeway, Judith)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2504 NOTICE of Louisiana Retirees' Response to the Notice of Supplemental Authorities by the Receiver re: #2503 Notice (Other), filed by Joseph Becker, Joseph Becker, et al. (Preis, Phillip)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2503 NOTICE of Supplementary Authority re: #2324 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order and to Stay Related Litigation and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Lexington Insurance Co, and Arch Specialty Insurance Co to enter the Bar Order, to En filed by Ralph S Janvey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Kuckelman, Michael)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2502 REPLY filed by John Little re: #2495 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (24th) (Little, John)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2501 NOTICE of re: #2496 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Third Interim Fee Application, #2497 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2500 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Fourth Interim Distribution Plan filed by Ralph S Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powers, Scott)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2499 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Rule 45 Subpoena filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Subpoena) (Krage, Ben)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2498 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Ralph S. Janvey, John Little. (Powers, Scott)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2497 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph S. Janvey re #2496 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Third Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) (Sadler, Kevin)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2496 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Third Interim Fee Application filed by Ralph S. Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadler, Kevin)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2495 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees of Examiner (24th) filed by John Little with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Little, John)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2494 ORDER granting #2450 Motion for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Second Interim Fee Application. The Receiver requests payment of $2,455,293.72 which the Court approves in full. The Receiver may apply later for the held-back amount of $247,714.48. The Court approves the Receiver's request for $6,746.07 for payment to professional firms. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/28/2017) (epm)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2494. Tue Feb 28 11:03:33 CST 2017 (crt)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2493 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Court Filings re: #2415 Reply, #2441 Joint MOTION to Compel Mediation, #2436 Response/Objection, #2386 Response/Objection, #2447 MOTION to Joinin Motion to Compel Mediation filed by Osvaldo Pi (Koonce, Charlene)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2492 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (2462) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn A Lewis terminated in case 3:09-cv-00298-N; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn A Lewis terminated in case 3:09-cv-01603-N-BQ; granting (196) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn A Lewis terminated in case 3:09-cv-01736-N-BQ; and granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn A Lewis terminated in case 3:10-cv-00313-N-BQ. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/16/2017) (ctf)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2491 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Rule 45 Subpoena filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Krage, Ben)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2490 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Rule 45 Subpoena filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Krage, Ben)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2489 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Rule 45 Subpoena filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Krage, Ben)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2488 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Rule 45 Subpoena - BMP Paribus filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Arlington, David)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2487 NOTICE of Receiver's 30th Report Regarding the Claims & Distribution Processes filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Sadler, Kevin)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2486 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Notice of Arrest of David Nanes filed by Ralph S Janvey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Sadler, Kevin)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2485 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Motion to Approve Settlement Proceedings held on 01/20/2017 before Judge David C. Godbey. Court Reporter/Transcriber, Linda J. Langford;, Telephone number, 214-748-8068; or email: lindajrob@aol.com. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (14 pages) Redaction Request due 2/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2017. (ljr)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2484 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Settlement Conference held on 1/20/2017. This is also related to case no. 3:13-CV-3980-N. Attorney Appearances: Receiver- Kevin Sadler, Douglas Buncher; Examiner - John Little, Individual Planitff groups- David Kitner, Ed Snyder, Judith Blakeway, Randy Pulman, Chris Kiy, Luis Delgado, Shawn Staples, Brad Foster and Jonathan Polkes. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :21. (chmb)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2483 Appendix in Support filed by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Sergio Kusner, Isak Lempert, Adela Levy de Charua, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, David Quintos, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Michael Rishmague, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Barry L Rupert, Carol Rupert, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Rebeca Waxtein re #2465 Appendix in Support,,,,,,,,, (Supplemental) (Pulman, Randall)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2482 REPLY filed by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Sergio Kusner, Isak Lempert, Adela Levy de Charua, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, David Quintos, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Michael Rishmague, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Barry L Rupert, Carol Rupert, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Rebeca Waxtein re: #2369 MOTION to Expedite MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants, to Enter the Bar order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders, and to Enter the Notices of Bar Order (Pulman, Randall)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2481 REPLY filed by Willis Limited, Willis of Colorado Inc re: #2369 MOTION to Expedite MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants, to Enter the Bar order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders, and to Enter the Notices of Bar Order (Guy, T)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2480 MOTION to Join Joinder of Paul D. Winter, Dependent Executor of The Estate of Robert S. Winter, Deceased, in Defendant Bowen, Miclette & Britt, Inc.'s Response to the Rupert Parties' Objections to Proposed Settlement and Bar Order filed by Paul D. Winter (Nesbitt, Paul)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2479 RESPONSE filed by Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: #2467 Response/Objection. #2398 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses in Connection with the Settlement with Willis and BMB Defendants (Snyder, Edward)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2478 RESPONSE filed by Bowen, Miclett & Britt, Inc. re: #2466 Response/Objection. (Foster, Bradley)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2477 Appendix in Support filed by Manuel Canabal, Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re #2476 Response/Objection to Motion to Approve Proposed Settlements With the Willis and BMB Defendants, to Enter the Bar Order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders, and to Enter the Notices of Bar Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Blakeway, Judith)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2476 RESPONSE filed by Manuel Canabal, Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee re: #2469 Response/Objection, #2470 Response/Objection, #2468 Response/Objection, #2464 Response/Objection. (Blakeway, Judith)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2475 OBJECTION to #2437 filed by Patricio Petricca and Pablo Flores. (ash)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2474 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Response to Objections to Proposed Willis and BMB Settlements in Excess of Page Limitations filed by Manuel Canabal, Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blakeway, Judith)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2473 NOTICE of Compliance with Scheduling Order Regarding Willis Settlement filed by Ralph S Janvey, Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 - Receiver Ralph Janvey Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. 2 - Examiner John Little Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. 3 - Ed Snyder Declaration, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. 4 - Judith Blakeway Declaration) (Blakeway, Judith)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2472 NOTICE of Compliance with Scheduling Order Regarding BMB Settlement filed by Ralph S Janvey, Ralph S. Janvey, Official Stanford Investors Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 - Receiver Ralph Janvey Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. 2 - Examiner John Little Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. 3 - Ed Snyder Declaration, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. 4 - Judith Blakeway Declaration-BMB Settlement) (Blakeway, Judith)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2471 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2463 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) Briefing may not exceed 50 pages for the Willis Objection and briefing may not exceed 50 pages for the BMB Objection. Objections are filed as documents 2464 and 2466. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/5/2017) (chmb)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2470 OBJECTION filed by Edna Able re: #2369 MOTION to Expedite MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants, to Enter the Bar order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders, and to Enter the Notices of Bar Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Staples, William)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2469 OBJECTION filed by Antonio Jubis Zacarias re: #2369 MOTION to Expedite MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants, to Enter the Bar order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders, and to Enter the Notices of Bar Order (Miner, Curtis)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2468 OBJECTION filed by Roberto Barbar re: #2369 MOTION to Expedite MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants, to Enter the Bar order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders, and to Enter the Notices of Bar Order (Miner, Curtis)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2467 OBJECTION filed by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Elisa Kusner, Sergio Kusner, Isak Lempert, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, David Quintos, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Michael Rishmague, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Barry L Rupert, Carol Rupert, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Carmen Gonzalez Urquiza Gonzalez, Rebeca Waxtein re: #2450 MOTION for Approval of Receiver's Forty-Second Interim Fee Application (Pulman, Randall)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2466 OBJECTION filed by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Elisa Kusner, Isak Lempert, Adela Levy de Charua, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, David Quintos, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Michael Rishmague, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Barry L Rupert, Carol Rupert, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Carmen Gonzalez Urquiza Gonzalez, Rebeca Waxtein re: #2383 MOTION to Expedite Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement of Claims Against the BMB Defendants, to Enter the Bar Order and to Enter the Final Judgments and Bar Orders (Pulman, Randall)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2465 Appendix in Support filed by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Sergio Kusner, Isak Lempert, Adela Levy de Charua, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, David Quintos, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Michael Rishmague, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Barry L Rupert, Carol Rupert, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Rebeca Waxtein re #2464 Response/Objection,,,,,,,, Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants (2369) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s)) (Pulman, Randall)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2464 OBJECTION filed by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Sergio Kusner, Isak Lempert, Adela Levy de Charua, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, David Quintos, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Michael Rishmague, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Barry L Rupert, Carol Rupert, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Carmen Gonzalez Urquiza Gonzalez, Rebeca Waxtein re: #2369 MOTION to Expedite MOTION Expedited Request for Entry of Scheduling Order and Motion to Approve Proposed Settlement with the Willis Defendants, to Enter the Bar order, to Enter the Final Judgment and Bar Orders, and to Enter the Notices of Bar Order (Pulman, Randall)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2463 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Objections to Proposed Willis and BMB Settlements in Excess of Page Limitations filed by Lionel Alessio, Dan Auli Panos, Victor Auli Panos, Ana Berrocal Ballesteros, Alberto Baron, Sylvia Baron, Jose Beitman, Cecelia Benner, Neal Benner, Carmen Berrocal, Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez, German Bricio, Elizabeth Pora Cabrera, Francisco Cabrera, Frank Cammisano, Ruth Charney de Baron, Lilia Garcia de Charua, Luis Charua Guindic, Moises Charua Guindic, Elias Charua Lladani, Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez, Maria Nelina Collado de Perez, Marianela Collado de Perez, Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien, Paulo Costal, Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio, Monica DeLeon, Mariana DeLeon, Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez, Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez, Jorge DeLeon Sanchez, Luis DeLeon Sanchez, Abraham Diamant, Libby Diamant, Carlos Estrada, Jose Estrada, Ricardo Estrada, Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio, Martha Gonzales DeCossio, Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio, Moises Guakil, Sara Guindic de Hait, Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour, David Hazouri Neme, Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero, Maria Isaacson, Antonio Assad Kanahuati, Bertha Kleiman, Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic, Cindy Kuhn, Mike Kuhn, Susy Kuhn, Ronald J Kuhner, Elisa Kusner, Sergio Kusner, Isak Lempert, Adela Levy de Charua, Carol Lovil, Damian Lyder, Nayade Panos Peche, Juana Ines Perdomo, Diana Quintos Dimitrova, Odde Jalil Rishmague, Gil Rodriguez Isaacson, Lab Tec Rodriguez Lezama, Laborotorio Rodriguez Lezama, Marcos Gil Rodriguez Lezama, Elizabeth Runkle, Juan Carlos Sanchez, Menahen Shueke Esses, Martha Suarez, Sergio Raul Suarez, Jacobo Tartakovski, Natalia Tartakovski, Fred Teller, Eva Uchmany, Alfonso Urquiza, Eduardo Urquiza, Gonzalo Urquiza, Jaime Urquiza, Juan Ignocio Urquiza, Mari Del Carmen Urquiza, Maria Teresa Urquiza, Carmen Gonzalez Urquiza Gonzalez, Rebeca Waxtein (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Lionel Alessio added.Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Lionel Alessio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Lionel Alessio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Dan Auli Panos(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Dan Auli Panos(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Victor Auli Panos(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Victor Auli Panos(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Ana Berrocal Ballesteros(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Ana Berrocal Ballesteros(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Alberto Baron(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Alberto Baron(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Sylvia Baron (pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Sylvia Baron (pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jose Beitman(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jose Beitman(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Cecelia Benner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Cecelia Benner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Neal Benner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Neal Benner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Carmen Berrocal(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Carmen Berrocal(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jorge Manuel Brenes-Ramirez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party German Bricio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party German Bricio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Elizabeth Pora Cabrera(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Elizabeth Pora Cabrera(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Francisco Cabrera(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Francisco Cabrera(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Frank Cammisano(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Frank Cammisano(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Ruth Charney de Baron(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Ruth Charney de Baron(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Lilia Garcia de Charua(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Lilia Garcia de Charua(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Luis Charua Guindic(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Luis Charua Guindic(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Moises Charua Guindic(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Moises Charua Guindic(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Elias Charua Lladani(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Elias Charua Lladani(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Bernardo Ramon Antonio Collado Perez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Maria Nelina Collado de Perez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Maria Nelina Collado de Perez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Marianela Collado de Perez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Marianela Collado de Perez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Maria Isabel Gonzalez Cossio Septien(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Paulo Costal(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Paulo Costal(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jorge Carlos Gonzalez DeCossio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Monica DeLeon(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Monica DeLeon(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Mariana DeLeon (pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Mariana DeLeon (pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Luis Gonzaga DeLeon Gonzalez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Arnoldo DeLeon Sanchez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jorge DeLeon Sanchez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jorge DeLeon Sanchez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Luis DeLeon Sanchez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Luis DeLeon Sanchez(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Abraham Diamant(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Abraham Diamant(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Libby Diamant(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Libby Diamant(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Carlos Estrada(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Carlos Estrada(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jose Estrada(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Jose Estrada(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Ricardo Estrada(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Ricardo Estrada(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Maria del Pilar Gonzales DeCossio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Martha Gonzales DeCossio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Martha Gonzales DeCossio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Miguel Angel Gonzales DeCossio(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Moises Guakil(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Moises Guakil(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Sara Guindic de Hait(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Sara Guindic de Hait(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Luisa Martha Haddad Abdulnour(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party David Hazouri Neme(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party David Hazouri Neme(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Carlos Augusto Hernandez Guerrero(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Maria Isaacson(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Maria Isaacson(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Antonio Assad Kanahuati(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Antonio Assad Kanahuati(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Bertha Kleiman(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Bertha Kleiman(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Daniel Luis Kleiman Guindic(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Cindy Kuhn(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Cindy Kuhn(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Mike Kuhn(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Mike Kuhn(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Susy Kuhn(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Susy Kuhn(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Ronald J Kuhner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Ronald J Kuhner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Elisa Kusner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Elisa Kusner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Sergio Kusner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Sergio Kusner(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Isak Lempert(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Isak Lempert(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Adela Levy de Charua(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Adela Levy de Charua(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Carol Lovil(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Carol Lovil(pty:mov), Attorney Randall A Pulman added to party Damian Lyder(pty:mo