Redden et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Plaintiff: Charles Redden, Chris Brooks, Brad Kessler and Redden and Associates Inc
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv01380
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Memorandum Opinion and Order: granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; denying 28 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (See Order) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/22/2010) (dnc)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to replead their breach of contract (Count Five, Count Six, Count Seven) and defamation (Count Nine) claims in compliance with the courts order no later than 8/9/2010. (See Order) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/26/2010) (mfw)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying in part without prejudice 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (See Order) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/19/2010) (rrr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redden et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Redden
Represented By: Steven R Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Brooks
Represented By: Steven R Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Kessler
Represented By: Steven R Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redden and Associates Inc
Represented By: Steven R Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc
Represented By: Stephen E Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?