MetroPCS Wireless Inc v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: MetroPCS Wireless Inc
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., AU Optronics Corporation America, Chi Mei Corporation, Sanyo CE Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Epson Electronics America Inc, Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Tatung Company of America Inc, Sharp Electronics Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd, AU Optronics Corporation, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc), Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Ltd, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Hitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc, Nexgen Mediatech Inc and Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd
Special Master: Martin Quinn
Case Number: 3:2010cv02576
Filed: March 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER: The Court finds that the following cases involve common questions of law and fact and should be consolidated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a): No. 3:11-cv-2948-M Compucom Systems, Inc. v. AU Optronics Corporation et al. No. 3:10-cv-02576-M MetroPCS Wireless Inc. v. AU Optronics Corporation et al. The consolidated action will use No. 3:11-cv-2948-M as the lead case. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/14/2015) (bdb)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER: The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Barbara M.G. Lynn for possible consolidation. All future pleadings shall be filed under case No. 3:10-CV-2576-M. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/12/2015) (ctf)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #288 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason M. Bussey. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/10/2015) (chmb)
April 10, 2015 Filing 291 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics Japan Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics USA, Inc. for Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (McNeil, Barry)
April 10, 2015 Filing 290 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CMO Japan Co Ltd identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics Japan Co., Ltd. for CMO Japan Co Ltd. (McNeil, Barry)
April 10, 2015 Filing 289 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation for Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (McNeil, Barry)
April 8, 2015 Filing 288 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jason M. Bussey (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6717597) filed by HannStar Display Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Griffith, Casey)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #278 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Ewart. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #277 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Scott. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #275 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Alan Nedeau. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #274 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Farschad Farzan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #273 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carl Lawrence Blumenstein. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #272 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Natasha A. Saggar Sheth. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #271 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Vieira. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Collin Barbee on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Barbee, Michael)
April 2, 2015 Filing 279 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey L Griffith on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Griffith, Casey)
April 1, 2015 Filing 278 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michael J. Ewart (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6702209) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 1, 2015 Filing 277 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michael R. Scott (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6702174) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
March 31, 2015 Filing 276 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan R Vickery on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vickery, Alan)
March 31, 2015 Filing 275 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher Alan Nedeau (Filing fee $25; Receipt number #80940) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (twd)
March 31, 2015 Filing 274 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Farschad Farzan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number #80940) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (twd)
March 31, 2015 Filing 273 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Carl Lawrence Blumenstein (Filing fee $25; Receipt number #80940) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (twd)
March 31, 2015 Filing 272 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Natasha A Saggar Sheth (Filing fee $25; Receipt number #80940) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (twd)
March 31, 2015 Filing 271 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher Vieira (Filing fee $25; Receipt number #80940) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (twd)
March 31, 2015 Filing 270 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Adams McGee on behalf of CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McGee, Matthew)
March 31, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald W Breaux on behalf of CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Breaux, Ronald)
March 31, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Frank McNeil on behalf of CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McNeil, Barry)
March 10, 2015 Filing 267 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
March 10, 2015 Filing 266 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:11-cv-00829. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 10, 2015 Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney no longer assigned to case. (ykp)
March 9, 2015 Filing 265 Conditional REMAND ORDER. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 3/9/15. (Attachments: #1 Order Suggesting Remand to Transferor Courts )(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/24/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS re #256 , 9214 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 262 JOINT STATUS REPORT for Track 2 Cases by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/23/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER RE: REMAINING TRACK 2 AND OREGON CASES. Status statement is due by 2/20/15. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #259 , (9290) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI of Dismissal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 5, 2014 Filing 259 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 9290) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/5/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 17, 2014 Filing 258 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/17/2014, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (9267 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/17/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 ORDER 9214 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 10, 2014 Filing 256 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Non-Party Co-Conspirators (Master Docket No. 9214) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/10/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS #241 , 9061 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 #242 , 9070 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 253 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc re #242 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Defendants Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #5 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #6 Exhibit 5, Part 1, to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #7 Exhibit 5, Part 2, to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #8 Exhibit 5, Part 3, to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #9 Exhibit 6, Part 1, to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #10 Exhibit 6, Part 2, to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #11 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott){MDL No. 9201](Scott, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 252 Declaration of John H. Chung in Support of #251 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9199] filed byToshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 24-27 to Declaration of John H. Chung)(Related document(s) #251 ) (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 251 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #241 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9198] (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 250 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc re #242 Notice of Motion/Stipulation [Master Docket No. 9168] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johnny W. Carter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/17/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 249 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Third Party Manufacturers [Master Docket No. 9162] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 248 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #247 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9159] filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-65, #4 Exhibit 66-82, #5 Exhibit 83-95)(Related document(s) #247 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 247 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc re #241 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9158] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part (9141) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 245 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #243 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation and Defendants' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [MDL Docket No. 9145] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING #212 , 8924 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 243 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation (MDL Dkt. No. 9141) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/30/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 5, 2014 Filing 242 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9070] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Michael R. Scott, #11 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 6/5/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 241 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [MDL No. 1827, Dockets Nos. 9061 and 9062 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Exhibit 6-10 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 11-15 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 16-20 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 21-25 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 26-32 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 33-39 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 40-44 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 45-48 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 240 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Response re Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED Response (MDL Dkt. No. 9048) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #213 , (8925 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal; Declaration of Carl L. Blumenstein filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal 8923 in 7-1827. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #211 , (8917 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., HannStar Display Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 236 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston denying #232 , (8984) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Counsel shall take care to include the correct case numbers in it's filings, there were several incorrect numbers in the caption.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #233 , (9010) Stipulation re: use of expert compensation at trial in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (295) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (281) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 9, 2014 Filing 233 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Expert Compensation At Trial [MDL No. 9010] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 232 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc to File Under Seal portions of their opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh C)[MDL No. 8984] (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 231 Remark : (A) Defendants Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Dkt. No. 8916), filed March 18, 2014 in Case No. 3:11-cv-0624, will be withdrawn only with regard to the Stipulated Plaintiffs listed above. The motion remains pending with respect to Interbond Corporation of Americas claim under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-03763, Office Depots claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-02225, TechDatas claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-05765 and TracFone Wireless Inc.s claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:10-cv-03205; (B) Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (Dkt. No. 8915), filed March 18, 2014, will be withdrawn only with regard to state law claims brought by the Stipulating Plaintiffs listed above and with respect to plaintiff Alfred Siegel, Trustee (Case No. 3:10-cv-05625). The motion remains pending with respect to Interbond Corporation of Americas claim under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-03763, Office Depots claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-02225, TechDatas claims under Florida and California law in Case No. 3:11-cv-05765 and TracFones Florida law claim in Case No. 3:10-cv-03205; and (C) Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (Dkt. No. 8924) filed March 18, 2014, will be withdrawn only with regard to the state law claims brought by the Stipulating Plaintiffs listed above and with respect to plaintiff Alfred Siegel, Trustee (Case No. 3:10-cv-05625). The motion remains pending with respect to the Sherman Act claims alleged by all plaintiffs (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Plaintiffs' State Law Claims; Stipulating Plaintiffs are not dismissing, and will continue to prosecute, their claims against Defendants under the Sherman Act, withdrawing motions. (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 229 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Plaintiffs' State Law Claims (MDL Dkt. No. 8983) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8976) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI as to various cases, see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 24, 2014 Filing 227 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 8976) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 23, 2014 Filing 226 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/23/2014). The Court granted the Administrative Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel #8957. Carl Blumenstein will continue in his role as defense liaison. SB Liquidation Trust indicated that it is in the process of settling their case (10-5458). By May 7, 2014, counsel will submit a proposed pretrial and trial schedule for Acer America (13-3349), Home Depot (13-6001), and Proview (13-3802), and a trial schedule for the Circuit City Case (10-5625). Every other case not specifically scheduled for a trial date will eventually will be remanded back to the originating districts. (Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8957 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing MOTIONS SET PURSUANT TO ORDER 8872 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 16, 2014 Filing 224 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) (Filed as Dkt. No. 8962 in MDL 1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/16/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 223 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER: DAUBERT Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (8947 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 7, 2014 Filing 221 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule (MDL Dkt. No. 8947) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/7/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 220 CLERKS NOTICE FOR ALL REMAINING CASES: A further case management Conference has been set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston The Court has determined that the following cases are remain open: 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:10-cv-03205-SI, 3:10-cv-04346-SI, 3:10-cv-05458-SI, 3:10-cv-05625-SI, 3:11-cv-00829-SI, 3:11-cv-02225-SI, 3:11-cv-02495-SI, 3:11-cv-03763-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-04119-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI, 3:11-cv-05781-SI, 3:11-cv-06241-SI, 3:12-cv-00335-SI, 3:12-cv-01426-SI, 3:12-cv-01596-SI, 3:12-cv-02214-SI, 3:12-cv-02495-SI, 3:12-cv-03802-SI, 3:12-cv-05371-SI, 3:12-cv-05460-SI, 3:13-cv-03349-SI, 3:13-cv-06001-SI. Counsel shall inform the clerk immediately if a case has been omitted for this notice. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed on or before April 17, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 219 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.s Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (MDL No. 8923) filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 218 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (MDL No. 8917) filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 217 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of AU Optronics Corporations Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Choice-of-Law Grounds (MDL No. 8925) filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 216 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Redacted Motion Summary Judgmetn Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #4 Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #5 Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #6 Redacted Exhibits 47-48, #7 Unredacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #8 Unredacted Exhs 1-18, #9 Unredacted Exhs 27-35, #10 Unredacted Exhs 36, #11 Unredacted Exhs 37-38, #12 Unredacted Exh 39, #13 Unredacted 40-42, #14 Unredacted 47-48)[MDL No. 8924](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 215 EXHIBITS re #214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Exhibits 6-9 to Declaration of Carl L. Blumenstein, filed in MDL-1827 as docket nos. 8928 and 8929 filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8 - Part I, #3 Exhibit 8 - Part II, #4 Exhibit 8 - Part III, #5 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #214 ) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America re #213 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CHOICE-OF-LAW GROUNDS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF CARL L. BLUMENSTEIN, filed in MDL-1827 as Docket Nos. 8928 and 8929 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 filed under seal, #3 Exhibit 2 filed under seal, #4 Exhibit 3 filed under seal, #5 Exhibit 4 filed under seal, #6 Exhibit 5)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 213 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, filed as MDL-1827 Docket No. 8925 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 212 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) . Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Brownstein ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 19-26, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 43-46, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 47-48)[MDL No. 8924](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 211 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by HannStar Display Corporation, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. GILLEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8917), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Request to Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Request to Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Request to Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (Request to Seal), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8) [MDL No.8917](Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 210 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, HannStar Display Corporation DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8915) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEN TE-HSIANG, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF PO CHIU)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 27, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE by MetroPCS Wireless Inc of Withdrawal of Counsel, Scott R. Jacobs (LeClair, Lewis) (Filed on 2/27/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #207 , (8879) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 18, 2014 Filing 207 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION ISSUES (filed as Docket No. 8879 in MDL-1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Motion Hearings set for TRACK 2 CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 28, 2014 Filing 205 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule [MDL Master Dkt. 8870 (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 1/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER, (8849 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 13, 2014 Filing 203 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Track 2 Deadlines; MDL Dkt. No. 8849 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/13/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8838) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 19, 2013 Filing 201 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by HannStar Display Corporation Stipulation With Proposed Order Regarding Certain Defendants Expert Depositions In Track 2 (MDL Dkt 8838) (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 12/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8831) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the Parties, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that: 1. The deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding the Proposed List of Summary Judgment Motions and Schedule for same is extended from December 11, 2013 to January 9, 2014. 2. The deadline for the Parties to file with the Court a Joint List of Proposed Summary Judgment Motions and Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Filings is extendedfrom December 12, 2013 to January 13, 2014. 3. This stipulation does not affect any other Track 2 deadlines as set forth in the Courts September 6, 2013 Order re Track 2 Deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 11, 2013 Filing 199 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America 8831 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Revised Deadlines In Track 2 Re: Summary Judgment Motion Lists (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 8804 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Stipulating Parties that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the Stipulating Defendants. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 27, 2013 Filing 197 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 8804 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8789) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Hitachi defendants filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 195 NOTICE by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Description of Issues/Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 194 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation with Proposed Order of Dismissal; MDL Dkt. No. 8789 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 13, 2013 Filing 193 NOTICE by HannStar Display Corporation Notice of Withdrawal (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Derr Schmidt on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Schmidt, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8655) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants in the Track 2 cases, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that Defendants opposition expert reports shall be served by October 31, 2013, and the underlying code and data for those reports shall be served by November 6, 2013. No other dates from the Courts Track 2 Scheduling Order shall be altered by this stipulation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 185 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8646] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 184 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #183 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #183 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 183 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); MDL Dkt. No. 8636 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 20, 2013 Filing 182 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation re #179 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Opposition to Motion to Compel Sharp 30(b)(6) Deposition (MDL Dkt. 8615) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Lutz, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER re: Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2. re #177 , 8497 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) re #176 , 8497 . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 179 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply With Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); MDL Dkt. No. 8553 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 29, 2013 Filing 178 NOTICE by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/29/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 26, 2013 Filing 177 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN EXPERT DEPOSITIONS IN TRACK 2 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 8498 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 8/26/2013) Modified on 8/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 26, 2013 Filing 176 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DOCKET 8497 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 8/26/2013) Modified on 8/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #174 , (8350) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records" (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 24, 2013 Filing 174 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records"; MDL Dkt. No. 8350 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting substitution of counsel for Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. re #172 , 8310 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/18/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013) Modified on 7/22/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 15, 2013 Filing 172 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William S Farmer Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel and Proposed Order (Farmer, William) (Filed on 7/15/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #167 , (8169) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel filed by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. AS AMENDED (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL IN TRACK 2 CASES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL re #166 , 8159 in 7-1827 Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #166 , (8159) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 21, 2013 Filing 167 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation [MDL Dkt. 8169] Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/21/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 166 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8159 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #161 . (8076) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER re #158 . 8060 Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #141 . (7973) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re #158 . (8060) stipulation and proposed order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 12, 2013 Filing 161 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DKT #8076 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 7, 2013 Filing 160 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd..STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel [MDL No.8064]. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #151 . (8035) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 6, 2013 Filing 158 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8060 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #145 . (7987) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI: Stipulation with proposed order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (AMENDED DOCUMENT of 7984 by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #146 . (8001) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #150 . (8000) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #149 . (7989) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #148 . (7988) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #144 . (7985) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation with Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 151 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8035 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 150 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8000 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 149 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7989 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 148 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7988 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #142 . (7983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed in MDL Master Case by Best Buy Co., Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, Jaco Electronics, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Viewsonic Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 146 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8001 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 145 Notice of Motion/Stipulation re AMENDED DOCUMENT by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. Amendment to #143 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7987. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 144 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7985 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 143 ***PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #145***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7984 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 142 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7983 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 141 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronis Co., Ltd., STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel (Davis, Allison) [MDL No. 7973]. (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #139 . (7866) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 8, 2013 Filing 139 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Close of Fact Discovery with Respect to Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. and Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. Depositions; MDL Dkt. No. 7866 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #137 . (7770) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 23, 2013 Filing 137 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7770 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 136 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re #133 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 134 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 14, 2013 Filing 133 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDK No.7652]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 12, 2013 Filing 132 Joint Case Management Conference Statement by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. [ MDL Dkt. No. 7640] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 1, 2013 Filing 130 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 21, 2012 Filing 128 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by MetroPCS Wireless Inc Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran Re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases and Proposed Order (MDL 7213) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 13, 2012 Filing 126 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 25, 2012 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas Notice of Appearance of Jessica N. Leal (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 10/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 124 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 123 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 122 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 120 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 119 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 27, 2012 Filing 118 REPLY (re #112 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Mooney)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 26, 2012 Filing 117 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG CO. OF AMERICA signed on 6/21/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5962 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #113 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #126 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting ( #58 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting ( #18 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2012: #1 Order with Judicial Signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 114 OBJECTIONS to MOTION FOR PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULES IN DAP CASES (MDL 1827 #5861) by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC. filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 112 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. granting ( 5578 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #67 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting ( #106 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #83 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting ( #117 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #28 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #35 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 2, 2012 Filing 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 5, 2012 Filing 109 RESPONSE to re #107 Notice (Other), Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Regarding Trial Structure and Duplicative Recovery by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 2, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA FELDER (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 23, 2012 Filing 107 NOTICE by Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. / Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and of Issue and Claim Preclusion (Curran, Christopher) (Filed on 3/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 5, 2012 Filing 106 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR INTERLOCUTORY REVIEW re #80 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified on 1/26/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 16, 2011 Filing 104 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 9, 2011 Filing 103 REPLY (re #80 MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re #73 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re #73 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re #73 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, ) filed bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 12/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 7, 2011 Filing 102 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #100 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFF METROPCS WIRELESS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.S MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR INTERLOCUTORY REVIEW THE COURTS ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS METROPCS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-18)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 7, 2011 Filing 101 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #98 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 99 RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re #73 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re #73 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re #73 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, ) filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-18)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 2, 2011 Filing 98 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 97 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byHannstar Display Corporation. (Emerson, Ramona) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 96 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byHitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc, Hitachi LTD. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 95 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Sharp Electronics Corporation Answer to First Amended Complaint of MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. #35 bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 94 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Sharp Corporation Answer to First Amended Complaint of MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. 3064 bySharp Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 93 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 92 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byTatung Company of America Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 91 Answer to Amended Complaint #35 Amended Complaint,,, byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 90 Answer to Amended Complaint #35 Amended Complaint,,, / Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Answer to MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems Inc. (Chung, John) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 89 Answer to Amended Complaint #35 Amended Complaint,,, / Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s Answer to MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Electronic Components Inc. (Chung, John) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 88 Answer to Amended Complaint #35 Amended Complaint,,, / Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Chung, John) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 87 Answer to Amended Complaint #35 Amended Complaint,,, / Toshiba Corporation's Answer to MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (Chung, John) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 86 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Chimei Entities Answer to First Amended Complaint of MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Dkt. #35 byCMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 85 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byEpson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 84 ANSWER to #35 First Amended Complaint byChunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 11/30/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 83 ANSWER to #35 First Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 23, 2011 Filing 82 ANSWER to #35 First Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/23/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 22, 2011 Filing 81 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (4159 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re (4051) Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re (4051) Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,, (4162 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Samsung SDI and Sanyo Consumer Electronics to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, (4160 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Samsung SDI and Sanyo Consumer Electronics to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, (174 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Samsung SDI and Sanyo Consumer Electronics to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, (103 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion of Samsung SDI and Sanyo Consumer Electronics to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, (32 in 3:10-cv-05616-SI) MOTION to Dismiss, (80 in 3:11-cv-00829-SI) MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re (73) Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re (73) Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re (73) Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 80 MOTION To Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint re #73 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/2/2011. Replies due by 12/9/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 16, 2011 Filing 79 NOTICE by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 11/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jacob Ewart on behalf of the Chi Mei Defendants (Ewart, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 14, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ramsey Scott on behalf of the Chi Mei Defendants (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MITSUI TAIWAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE METROPCS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #40 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Tatung Company of America Inc. re #74 stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 3, 2011 Filing 74 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Tatung Company of America Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 27, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS METROPCS'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #41 , #43 , #72 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011) Modified on 10/27/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 21, 2011 Filing 72 Joinder re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] Modified on 3/11/2015 (gmg).
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER TO RESECHEDULE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS INDIVIDUAL AND JOINT MOTIONS TO DISMISS by MetroPCS Wireless In (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 6, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 5, 2011 Filing 70 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO RESECHEDULE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS INDIVIDUAL AND JOINT MOTIONS TO DISMISS by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 23, 2011 Filing 69 Request for Judicial Notice re #67 Reply to Opposition/Response to Mitsui Taiwan's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed byMitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 23, 2011 Filing 68 Declaration of Michael E. Mumford in Support of #67 Reply to Opposition/Response to Mitsui Taiwan's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byMitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MetroPCS 2010 Proxy Statement, #2 Exhibit 2 - MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 1 of 6), #3 Exhibit 2 - MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 2 of 6), #4 Exhibit 2 - MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 3 of 6), #5 Exhibit 2 - MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 4 of 6), #6 Exhibit 2 - MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 5 of 6), #7 Exhibit 2 - MetroPCS 2009 Annual Report (Part 6 of 6), #8 Exhibit 3 - MetroPCS 2010 Annual Report)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 23, 2011 Filing 67 REPLY (re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byMitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 15, 2011 Filing 66 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #64 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - PLAINTIFF METROPCS WIRELESS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO #40 MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-16, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19-37)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 15, 2011 Filing 65 CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the Court is no longer accepting new motions to be noticed for Friday, November 4, 2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (3515) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 63 Request for Judicial Notice re #62 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Related document(s) #62 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 62 RESPONSE/Opposition to (re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #60 Ex Parte Application TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL ) filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-37)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 61 REPLY (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS's First Amended Complaint filed byChunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 60 Ex Parte Application TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 9, 2011 Filing 59 REPLY (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) filed bySanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 9/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 58 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #56 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFF METROPCS WIRELESS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS METROPCS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 1, 2011 Filing 57 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #55 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFF METROPCS WIRELESS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.S MOTION TO DISMISS METROPCS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 8/31/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/31/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting GRANGINT EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 8/31/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 30, 2011 Filing 53 STIPULATION AMENDED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.S MOTION TO DISMISS METROPCS WIRELESS, INC.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 52 RESPONSE/Opposition to #41 Defendant Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS' First Amended Complaint filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/26/2011) Modified on 8/29/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/30/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 51 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 50 RESPONSE/Opposition to (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #49 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal ) filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/26/2011) Modified on 8/29/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 26, 2011 Filing 49 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting extenstion time to file oppostion to motion to dismiss filed by MetroPCS (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 25, 2011 Filing 47 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.S MOTION TO DISMISS METROPCS WIRELESS, INC.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting extension of time to respond (11-829) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re: extension to time to respond to complaint in 11-3856 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 12, 2011 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Mitsui USA to Respond to First Amended Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 10, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 8/26/2011. Replies due by 9/9/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 5, 2011 Filing 43 Joinder re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 8/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] Modified on 3/11/2015 (gmg).
August 5, 2011 Filing 42 Proposed Order re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Tatung Company of America Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 8/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 5, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCSs First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Tatung Company of America Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/26/2011. Replies due by 9/9/2011. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 8/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 5, 2011 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/19/2011. Replies due by 8/26/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Makoto Ichikawa, #2 Proposed Order Granting Mitsui Taiwan's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 10/27/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 25, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 7/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 18, 2011 Filing 37 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #36 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal First Amended Complaint by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #34 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011) Modified on 7/21/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Epson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc, Hitachi LTD, Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd, Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America Inc, Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Ltd. Filed byMetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 34 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno in Support of Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 30, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Galvin Block (Block, Micah) (Filed on 6/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER withdrawing motions to dismiss (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 22, 2011 Filing 31 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 6/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 17, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D West (West, Sandra) (Filed on 6/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 14, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 14, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 10, 2011 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui & Co., Ltd. for Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. , Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd.'s Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 6/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 9, 2011 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS's Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Tatung Company of America Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 6/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 9, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Makoto Ichikawa, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Mitsui Taiwan's Motion to Dismiss MetroPCS Complaint)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 6/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 9, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Tracy Cole, and Michael E. Mumford (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 6/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited. (Mumford, Michael) re #21 Stipulation. (Filed on 5/25/2011) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) Modified on 5/31/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 05/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited. (Mumford, Michael)re #21 Stipulation. (Filed on 5/25/2011) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) Modified on 5/31/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.] (Entered: 05/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 21 STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL re #16 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011) Modified on 5/11/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting request to waive argument on motion to service (5/20/11 Motion off calendar) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 2, 2011 VACATING CHUNCHWA'S MOTION FROM 5/20/11 CALENDAR (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 2, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. Hearing on #16 MOTION Order Authorizing Plaintiff MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. To Serve Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Through Its U.S. Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) MOTION Order Authorizing Plaintiff MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. To Serve Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Through Its U.S. Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2011 Filing 18 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Waiving Oral Argument on MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.'s Motion for Order Authorizing Plaintiffs to Serve Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.Through Its U.S. Counsel by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2011 Filing 17 RESPONSE/Opposition to (re #16 MOTION Order Authorizing Plaintiff MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. To Serve Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Through Its U.S. Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) MOTION Order Authorizing Plaintiff MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. To Serve Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Through Its U.S. Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) ) filed byChunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/29/2011) Modified on 4/29/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 15, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION Order Authorizing Plaintiff MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. To Serve Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Through Its U.S. Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #3 Proposed Order)(Isaacson, William) (Filed on 4/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 12, 2011 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting extension to respond by Mitsui re #9 Stipulation (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011) Modified on 3/2/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 25, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Chi Mei Corporation, Nexgen Mediatech Inc. and Nexgen Mediatech USA, Inc. by MetroPCS Wireless Inc (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 25, 2011 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 24, 2011 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action MetroPCS Wireless Inc. v. AU Optronics Corp., etal from the Northern District of Texas. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 24, 2011 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:10-cv-02576. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 16, 2011 Filing 6 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-11). Case transferred to San Francisco Division of Northern District of California. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/9/2011) (mcr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 21, 2011 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Philip J. Iovieno (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 46403) filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (mcr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 21, 2011 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney William A Isaacson (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 46403) filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (mcr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 21, 2011 Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Anne M Nardacci (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 46403) filed by MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (mcr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 17, 2010 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Magistrate Judge Stickney preliminarily assigned. File to Judge Godbey. (axm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate MetroPCS, Inc. for MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. (LeClair, Lewis) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the #Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 0539-3631860) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (LeClair, Lewis) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MetroPCS Wireless Inc v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd
Represented By: Jacob P Alpren
Represented By: David C Brownstein
Represented By: Rachel Susan Brass
Represented By: William S Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Barry Frank McNeil
Represented By: Micah Galvin Block
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: John H Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: John H Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Represented By: Natasha A Saggar Sheth
Represented By: Carl Blumenstein
Represented By: Alan R Vickery
Represented By: John D Cline
Represented By: Christopher Nedeau
Represented By: Melissa L Gardner
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Represented By: K C Maxwell, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Corporation
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo CE Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: John M Grenfell
Represented By: Jacob R Sorensen
Represented By: Lindsay A Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: John H Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co Ltd
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Barry Frank McNeil
Represented By: Micah Galvin Block
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Barry Frank McNeil
Represented By: Micah Galvin Block
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America Inc
Represented By: Rachel Susan Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: John M Grenfell
Represented By: Jacob R Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HannStar Display Corporation
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Jason M Bussey
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Jessica Nicole Leal
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Ramona M Emerson
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gillen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Michael Collin Barbee
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Represented By: Casey L Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: John H Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Represented By: Natasha A Saggar Sheth
Represented By: Carl Blumenstein
Represented By: Alan R Vickery
Represented By: John D Cline
Represented By: Christopher Nedeau
Represented By: Melissa L Gardner
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Represented By: K C Maxwell, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co (USA Inc)
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays Ltd
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E Vargo, Jr
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MetroPCS Wireless Inc
Represented By: Melissa B Felder
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Lewis T LeClair
Represented By: Anne M Nardacci
Represented By: Scott R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?