Paragon Office Services LLC et al v. UnitedHealthGroup, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paragon Office Services LLC, Paragon Ambulatory Physician Services, LLC, Office Surgery Support Services LLC and Ambulatory Health Systems
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc. and Ingenix, Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv02205
Filed: August 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Although the court grants plaintiffs' 94 motion for leave to amend, it declines to remand the case. Given that plaintiffs' purpose for seeking leave to amend is to obtain a remand that the court declines to enter, the court gives plaintiffs the option of not filing the amended complaint. If they do amend, however, they must file their amended complaint within 14 days of the date this memorandum opinion and order is filed. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/22/2013) (tln)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 85 MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by Ambulatory Health Systems LLC, Office Surgery Support Services LLC, Paragon Ambulatory Physician Services, LLC, Paragon Office Services LLC. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/2/2013) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 49 Motion to Dismiss filed by UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., Ingenix, Inc, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company Inc. The court dismisses plaintiff s' ERISA claims, grants plaintiffs leave to file a second amended complaint, and declines to reach United's motion to the extent addressed to the dismissal of Ingenix or of plaintiffs' state-law claims, pending the filing of their second amended complaint. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/20/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 36 Motion to Remand to State Court, Motion to Sever, filed by Office Surgery Support Services LLC, Paragon Ambulatory Physician Services, LLC, Ambulatory Health Systems LLC, Paragon Office Services LLC. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/26/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 18 Motion to Remand, filed by Office Surgery Support Services LLC, Paragon Ambulatory Physician Services, LLC, Ambulatory Health Systems LLC, Paragon Office Services LLC. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/27/2012) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paragon Office Services LLC et al v. UnitedHealthGroup, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paragon Office Services LLC
Represented By: Steven D Sanfelippo
Represented By: Jody Lynn Rudman
Represented By: Martin E Rose
Represented By: Elizabeth Hosea Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paragon Ambulatory Physician Services, LLC
Represented By: Jody Lynn Rudman
Represented By: Martin E Rose
Represented By: Elizabeth Hosea Lemoine
Represented By: Steven D Sanfelippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office Surgery Support Services LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Hosea Lemoine
Represented By: Martin E Rose
Represented By: Jody Lynn Rudman
Represented By: Steven D Sanfelippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambulatory Health Systems
Represented By: Elizabeth Hosea Lemoine
Represented By: Martin E Rose
Represented By: Jody Lynn Rudman
Represented By: Steven D Sanfelippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company Inc
Represented By: Charles Chejfec
Represented By: C Shawn Cleveland
Represented By: Kathleen M Flannery
Represented By: Emily Coleman McCall
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: John W Reale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Chejfec
Represented By: C Shawn Cleveland
Represented By: Kathleen M Flannery
Represented By: Emily Coleman McCall
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: John W Reale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Chejfec
Represented By: C Shawn Cleveland
Represented By: Kathleen M Flannery
Represented By: Emily Coleman McCall
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: John W Reale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenix, Inc
Represented By: Charles Chejfec
Represented By: C Shawn Cleveland
Represented By: Kathleen M Flannery
Represented By: Emily Coleman McCall
Represented By: Matthew D Orwig
Represented By: John W Reale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?