Compucom Systems Inc et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: CompuCom Systems Inc
Defendant: NEC Display Solutions of America Inc, NEC Corporation of America, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, LG Display Co Ltd, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., NEC Electronics America Inc, AU Optronics Corporation America, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, LG Display America Inc, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Ltd, NEC Lcd Technologies Ltd, Epson Electronics America Inc, Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, NEC Corporation, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Tatung Company of America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Sharp Electronics Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc), Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Hitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc and Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd
Special Master: Martin Quinn
Consolidated Plaintiff: MetroPCS Wireless Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv02948
Filed: March 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2016 Filing 367 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Dan S Boyd on behalf of CompuCom Systems Inc. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Boyd, Dan)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: The action filed by Plaintiff MetroPCS Wireless Inc. is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation; Chi Mei Optoelectronics, USA, Inc.; and CMO Japan Co., Ltd. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/4/2016) (sss)
December 29, 2015 Filing 365 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice) (Breaux, Ronald)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: It is ORDERED that: The actions filed by Plaintiffs CompuCom Systems Inc and MetroPCS Wireless Inc against Defendant HannStar Display Corporation are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCvP 41(a)(2). Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/12/2015) (twd)
November 9, 2015 Filing 363 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by CompuCom Systems Inc, HannStar Display Corporation, MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice) (Griffith, Casey)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all deadlines in MetroPCS Wireless Inc., v. AU Optronics Corp., et al. shall be held in abeyance as to the Chi Mei defendants until 1/29/2016. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/3/2015) (sss)
November 2, 2015 Filing 361 STIPULATION Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Breaux, Ronald)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE: The Court ORDERS that all case schedules and deadlines in this case shall be held in abeyance until 11/30/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/26/2015) (twd)
October 23, 2015 Filing 359 STIPULATION Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by CompuCom Systems Inc, HannStar Display Corporation, MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Griffith, Casey)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE: Before the Court is the Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance filed by Plaintiff MetroPCS Wireless Inc. and Defendants Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation; Chi Mei Optoelectronics, USA, Inc.; and CMO Japan Co., Ltd. (collectively, "Stipulating Defendants"). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all deadlines in MetroPCS Wireless Inc., v. AU Optronics Corp., et al. shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, until 11/30/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/29/2015) (ctf)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER GRANTING #355 AGREED JOINT MOTION TO REVISE SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/24/2015) (bdb)
September 23, 2015 Filing 356 STIPULATION Holding Deadlines in Abeyance as to Defendants CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, and Chi Mei Optoelectronics, USA, Inc. by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Breaux, Ronald)
September 21, 2015 Filing 355 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #350 Scheduling Order, filed by CompuCom Systems Inc, HannStar Display Corporation, MetroPCS Wireless Inc, with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Revised Schedule) (Griffith, Casey)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: This Court having considered the #353 stipulation and all other relevant factors, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that: The Stipulation is So Ordered. The action filed by Plaintiff CompuCom Systems, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation; Chi Mei Optoelectronics, USA, Inc.; and CMO Japan Co., Ltd. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 9/18/2015) (bdb)
September 17, 2015 Filing 353 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by CompuCom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iovieno, Philip)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER: Before the Court is the Stipulation of Dismissal (Docket Entry #351 ), filed by Plaintiffs and Defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America (collectively, "AU Optronics"). It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that all claims and causes of action asserted herein by Plaintiffs against AU Optronics are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. All costs of court and attorney's fees are to be borne by the party incurring the same. This Order does not affect the rights or claims of Plaintiffs against any other Defendant or alleged co-conspirator in this litigation. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/7/2015) (bdb)
July 6, 2015 Filing 351 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by CompuCom Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyd, Dan)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the Court's three-week docket beginning 10/11/2016 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/9/2016. Settlement Status Report due by 9/19/2016. Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2016. Pretrial Materials due by 9/26/2016. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/18/2015) (Attachments: #1 Jury Questionnaire) (skt) Modified on 6/26/2015 (gr). Docket text and pretrial deadline modified on 9/16/2015 (twd).
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER: All deadlines in this action shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only. Plaintiffs and the Stipulating Defendants shall file their dismissal papers on or before Friday, 7/31/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/17/2015) (skt)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that all claims and causes of action asserted herein by Plaintiffs against Chunghwa are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/17/2015) (skt)
June 16, 2015 Filing 347 STIPULATION HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE by CompuCom Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless Inc, AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Vickery, Alan) Modified filers on 6/16/2015 (jrr).
June 15, 2015 Filing 346 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, CompuCom Systems Inc, MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissal Order) (Boyd, Dan)
June 5, 2015 Filing 345 Joint STATUS REPORT and Scheduling Stipulation filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, CompuCom Systems Inc, HannStar Display Corporation, MetroPCS Wireless Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G) (Pollak, William)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties in this consolidated action to confer and submit a Joint Report no later than Friday, 6/5/2015 that provides a briefing schedule for the allegedly unresolved standing and antitrust injury issues discussed during the Court's 4/9/2015 telephone conference, and a proposed schedule that anticipates a trial date in late summer or early fall of 2016. Upon receiving the Joint Report, the Court will set the relevant pretrial deadlines, including deadlines for pretrial materials, objections to pretrial materials, motions in limine, and a settlement conference. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/14/2015) (bdb)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER: The Court finds that the following cases involve common questions of law and fact and should be consolidated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a): No. 3:11-cv-2948-M Compucom Systems, Inc. v. AU Optronics Corporation et al. No. 3:10-cv-02576-M MetroPCS Wireless Inc. v. AU Optronics Corporation et al. The consolidated action will use No. 3:11-cv-2948-M as the lead case. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/14/2015) (bdb)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER: Before the Court is the Stipulation of Dismissal (Dkt. No. #341 ), filed by Plaintiff and Defendants LG Display Co., Ltd., and LG Display America, Inc. (the "Stipulating Defendants"). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), Plaintiff's action against the Stipulating Defendants is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and attorney's fees. Nothing in this Order shall be construed to affect Plaintiff's rights or claims against any other Defendant in this action. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/14/2015) (bdb)
May 13, 2015 Filing 341 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by CompuCom Systems Inc, LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyd, Dan)
May 13, 2015 ***Please disregard - case closed in error.*** Civil Case Terminated per #341 Stipulation of Dismissal. (bdb) Modified on 5/14/2015 (gmg).
May 7, 2015 Filing 340 STATUS REPORT of Position on Consolidation filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Breaux, Ronald)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #338 Motion to Extend Time. The Chi Mei Defendants shall report to the Court on the waiver and consolidation issues raised in the Court's April 9, 2015 telephone conference on or before May 7, 2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/4/2015) (ndt)
April 30, 2015 Filing 338 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Court's Request re Consolidation filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Breaux, Ronald)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #322 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kyle Smith. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/28/2015) (chmb)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER: Before the Court is the Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance [Docket Entry #334 ], filed by Plaintiff and Defendants LG Display Co., Ltd., and LG Display America, Inc. ("LG Defendants"). The Motion is GRANTED. Pursuant to the Stipulation, all schedules and deadlines in this case are suspended only as to the LG Defendants. Should Plaintiff and the LG Defendants not settle and dismiss their claims on or before 6/30/2015, as anticipated in the Stipulation, the parties will file a status report and/or a joint report with agreed, revised deadlines. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/27/2015) (tln)
April 27, 2015 Filing 335 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dan S Boyd on behalf of CompuCom Systems Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Boyd, Dan)
April 24, 2015 Filing 334 STIPULATION Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by CompuCom Systems Inc, LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Boyd, Dan)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER: Before the Court is the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time [Docket Entry #332 ], filed by the Chi Mei Defendants. The Motion is GRANTED. The Chi Mei Defendants shall report to the Court on the waiver and consolidation issues raised in the Court's 4/9/2015 telephone conference on or before 4/30/2015. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/24/2015) (tln)
April 23, 2015 Filing 332 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Court's Request re Consolidation filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Breaux, Ronald)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #319 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason M. Bussey. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/22/2015) (chmb)
April 21, 2015 Filing 330 Mail returned as undeliverable re 293 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, 294 Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice received back from Martin Quinn as Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (tln)
April 20, 2015 Filing 329 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Telephone Conference Call Proceedings held on April 9, 2015 before Judge Lynn. Court Reporter/Transcriber D. Keith Johnson, Telephone number 214-753-2325. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a #Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (27 pages) Redaction Request due 5/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (dkj)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #327 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Mike McKool and Lewis T. LeClair of McKool Smith are permitted to withdraw as attorneys of record for Plaintiff. Dan S. Boyd of Glast, Phillips & Murray P.C. is hereby substituted as attorney of record for Plaintiff. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/16/2015) (jrr)
April 15, 2015 Filing 327 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Dan S Boyd,Dan S Boyd for CompuCom Systems Inc. Motion filed by CompuCom Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Boyd, Dan)
April 10, 2015 Filing 325 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics Japan Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics USA, Inc. for Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (McNeil, Barry)
April 10, 2015 Filing 324 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CMO Japan Co Ltd identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Optoelectronics Japan Co., Ltd. for CMO Japan Co Ltd. (McNeil, Barry)
April 10, 2015 Filing 323 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Innolux Corporation for Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (McNeil, Barry)
April 9, 2015 Filing 326 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 4/9/2015. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Dan Boyd, Kyle Smith; Defense - Jason Bussey, Casey Griffith, Carl Blumenstein, Natasha Saggar Sheth, Alan Vickery, Greg Andres, Ron Breaux, Kyle Mach. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :45. (skt)
April 9, 2015 Filing 322 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kyle Smith (Filing fee $25; Receipt number DS081139) filed by CompuCom Systems Inc. (ndt)
April 8, 2015 Filing 321 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, HannStar Display Corporation re #320 Status Report (Vickery, Alan)
April 8, 2015 Filing 320 STATUS REPORT filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, HannStar Display Corporation. (Vickery, Alan)
April 8, 2015 Filing 319 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jason M. Bussey (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6717617) filed by HannStar Display Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Griffith, Casey)
April 8, 2015 Filing 318 NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. filed by CompuCom Systems Inc (LeClair, Lewis)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #308 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emmet P. Ong. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2015) (chmb)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #309 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Richichi. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2015) (chmb)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #310 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward Fu. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2015) (chmb)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #311 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sheila R. Adams. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2015) (chmb)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #312 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Greg D. Andres. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2015) (chmb)
April 7, 2015 Filing 312 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Greg D. Andres (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6712563) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 6, 2015 Filing 311 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Sheila R. Adams (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6709912) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 3, 2015 Filing 310 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Edward Fu (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6707780) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 3, 2015 Filing 309 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brian Richichi (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6707645) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 3, 2015 Filing 308 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Emmet P. Ong (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6707637) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #297 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher B. Hockett. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #295 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neal A. Potischman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #296 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William D. Pollak. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #287 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Vieira. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #288 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Natasha A. Saggar Sheth. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #289 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Nedeau. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #290 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carl L. Blumenstein. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #291 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Farschad Farzan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/2/2015) (chmb)
April 2, 2015 Filing 299 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Collin Barbee on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Barbee, Michael)
April 2, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey L Griffith on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Griffith, Casey)
April 2, 2015 Filing 297 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher B. Hockett (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6704578) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 1, 2015 Filing 296 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney William D. Pollak (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6702552) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 1, 2015 Filing 295 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Neal A. Potischman (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6702289) filed by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (McNeil, Barry)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #281 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kyle W. Mach. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/1/2015) (chmb)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #279 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susan E. Nash. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/1/2015) (chmb)
March 31, 2015 Filing 292 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan R Vickery on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vickery, Alan)
March 31, 2015 Filing 291 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Farschad Farzan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 80941) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (bdb)
March 31, 2015 Filing 290 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Carl Lawrence Blumenstein (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 80941) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (bdb)
March 31, 2015 Filing 289 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher Alan Nedeau (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 80941) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (bdb)
March 31, 2015 Filing 288 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Natasha A. Saggar Sheth (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 80941) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (bdb)
March 31, 2015 Filing 287 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher Vieira (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 80941) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (bdb)
March 31, 2015 Filing 286 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Adams McGee on behalf of CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McGee, Matthew)
March 31, 2015 Filing 285 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald W Breaux on behalf of CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Breaux, Ronald)
March 31, 2015 Filing 284 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Frank McNeil on behalf of CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McNeil, Barry)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING #282 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Attorney Kyle W. Mach is exempted from Local Rule 83.10(a), and may represent Defendants LG Display Co., Inc., and LG Display America, Inc. as local counsel. Mr. Mach will be expected to perform all duties of local counsel required by the local rules and procedures of this Court, including appearance at hearings on short notice. Should the parties not settle the case, the Court will reconsider its ruling. (chmb) (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING #279 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Attorney Susan E. Nash is exempted from Local Rule 83.10(a), and may represent Defendants LG Display Co., Inc., and LG Display America, Inc. as local counsel. Ms. Nash will be expected to perform all duties of local counsel required by the local rules and procedures of this Court, including appearance at hearings on short notice. Should the parties not settle the case, the Court will reconsider its ruling. (chmb) (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/30/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 282 MOTION to Proceed without Local Counsel re #281 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kyle W. Mach (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6692066) filed by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd (Nash, Susan)
March 27, 2015 Filing 281 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kyle W. Mach (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6692066) filed by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nash, Susan)
March 27, 2015 Filing 280 MOTION to Proceed without Local Counsel re #279 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Susan Nash (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6691905) filed by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd (Nash, Susan) Modified docket text, per attorney on 3/27/2015 (aaa). Modified text on 3/30/2015 (ykp).
March 27, 2015 Filing 279 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6691905) filed by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nash, Susan)
March 10, 2015 Filing 278 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Lynn. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
March 10, 2015 Filing 277 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:11-cv-06241. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 10, 2015 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:278. Tue Mar 10 15:36:04 CDT 2015 (crt)
March 9, 2015 Filing 276 Conditional REMAND ORDER. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 3/9/15. (Attachments: #1 Order Suggesting Remand to Transferor Courts )(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/24/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS re #267 , 9214 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 273 JOINT STATUS REPORT for Track 2 Cases by Compucom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/23/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER RE: REMAINING TRACK 2 AND OREGON CASES. Status statement is due by 2/20/15. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #270 , (9290) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI of Dismissal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 5, 2014 Filing 270 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 9290) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/5/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 17, 2014 Filing 269 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/17/2014, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (9267 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/17/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 ORDER 9214 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 10, 2014 Filing 267 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Non-Party Co-Conspirators (Master Docket No. 9214) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/10/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS #240 , 9061 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 #241 , 9070 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMS FOR WHICH THE PANEL WAS FIRST SOLD TO A THIRD PARTY MANUFACTURER #235 , 9056 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 263 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #262 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9202] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 7)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 262 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc re #241 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9201] (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 261 Declaration of John H. Chung in Support of #260 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9199] filed byToshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 24-27 to Declaration of John H. Chung)(Related document(s) #260 ) (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 260 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #240 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9198] (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 259 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #258 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9196] filed byLG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #258 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 258 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd re #235 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9195] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 257 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc re #241 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case. [Master Docket No. 9168] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johnny W. Carter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/17/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 256 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc re #235 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Third Party Manufacturers [Master Docket No. 9162] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 255 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #254 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9159] filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-65, #4 Exhibit 66-82, #5 Exhibit 83-95)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 254 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc re #240 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9158] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part (9141) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON UNDISCLOSED CONSPIRATORS OR AFFILIATES #197 , 8921 signed by Judge Illston on 7/3/14 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 251 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #249 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation and Defendants' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [MDL Docket No. 9145] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING #199 , 8924 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 249 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation (MDL Dkt. No. 9141) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/30/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 248 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #246 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of #197 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9138] by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibits BB and EE to Declaration of Lee F. Berger)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 247 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #245 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. #9135] by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/26/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #244 , (9093 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #237 , (9059 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 244 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9093] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 243 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #242 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version [MDL Dkt. No. 9092] filed byLG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (DUPLICATE OF MAIN DOCUMENTS - Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit DD, #4 Exhibit EE, #5 Exhibit FF)(Related document(s) #242 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 242 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd re #197 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9091] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 5, 2014 Filing 241 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, filed as MDL Dkt. No. 9070) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong with supporting Exs. A-I)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/5/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 240 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [MDL No. 1827, Docket Nos. 9061 and 9062] (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Exhibit 6-10 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 11-15 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 16-20 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 21-25 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 26-32 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 33-39 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 40-44 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 45-48 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 239 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #237 wrong e-filing event used (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 238 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 236*** Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd re #235 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Public Version of Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #236 wrong e-filing event used (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 237 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 236 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #235 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] filed byLG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) #235 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 235 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. 9056 and 9056-1] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 234 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Response re Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED Response (MDL Dkt. No. 9048) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #200 , (8925 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal; Declaration of Carl L. Blumenstein filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal #206 , 8923 in 7-1827. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #205 , (8920 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc. ("Nexgen"), CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #195 , (8917 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., HannStar Display Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 229 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston denying #221 , (8984) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Counsel shall take care to include the correct case numbers in it's filings, there were several incorrect numbers in the caption.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #226 , (9010) Stipulation re: use of expert compensation at trial in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (295) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (281) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 9, 2014 Filing 226 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc., LG Display Co Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Expert Compensation at Trial [MDL No. 9010] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 225 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #224 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O-1, #16 Exhibit O-2, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z-1, #28 Exhibit Z-2, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS, #48 Exhibit TT, #49 Exhibit UU, #50 Exhibit VV)(Related document(s) #224 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 224 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [Master Docket No. 8991] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 223 Remark : (A) Defendants Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Dkt. No. 8916), filed March 18, 2014 in Case No. 3:11-cv-0624, will be withdrawn only with regard to the Stipulated Plaintiffs listed above. The motion remains pending with respect to Interbond Corporation of Americas claim under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-03763, Office Depots claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-02225, TechDatas claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-05765 and TracFone Wireless Inc.s claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:10-cv-03205; (B) Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (Dkt. No. 8915), filed March 18, 2014, will be withdrawn only with regard to state law claims brought by the Stipulating Plaintiffs listed above and with respect to plaintiff Alfred Siegel, Trustee (Case No. 3:10-cv-05625). The motion remains pending with respect to Interbond Corporation of Americas claim under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-03763, Office Depots claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-02225, TechDatas claims under Florida and California law in Case No. 3:11-cv-05765 and TracFones Florida law claim in Case No. 3:10-cv-03205; and (C) Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (Dkt. No. 8924) filed March 18, 2014, will be withdrawn only with regard to the state law claims brought by the Stipulating Plaintiffs listed above and with respect to plaintiff Alfred Siegel, Trustee (Case No. 3:10-cv-05625). The motion remains pending with respect to the Sherman Act claims alleged by all plaintiffs (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Plaintiffs' State Law Claims; Stipulating Plaintiffs are not dismissing, and will continue to prosecute, their claims against Defendants under the Sherman Act, withdrawing motions. (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 221 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc to File Under Seal portions of their opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh C)[MDL No. 8984](Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 220 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Plaintiffs' State Law Claims (MDL Dkt. No. 8983) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8976) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI as to various cases, see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 24, 2014 Filing 218 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 8976) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 23, 2014 Filing 217 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/23/2014). The Court granted the Administrative Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel #8957. Carl Blumenstein will continue in his role as defense liaison. SB Liquidation Trust indicated that it is in the process of settling their case (10-5458). By May 7, 2014, counsel will submit a proposed pretrial and trial schedule for Acer America (13-3349), Home Depot (13-6001), and Proview (13-3802), and a trial schedule for the Circuit City Case (10-5625). Every other case not specifically scheduled for a trial date will eventually will be remanded back to the originating districts. (Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8957 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing MOTIONS SET PURSUANT TO ORDER 8872 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 16, 2014 Filing 215 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) (Filed as Dkt. No. 8962 in MDL 1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/16/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER: DAUBERT Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (8947 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 7, 2014 Filing 212 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule (MDL Dkt. No. 8947) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/7/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 211 CLERKS NOTICE FOR ALL REMAINING CASES: A further case management Conference has been set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston The Court has determined that the following cases are remain open: 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:10-cv-03205-SI, 3:10-cv-04346-SI, 3:10-cv-05458-SI, 3:10-cv-05625-SI, 3:11-cv-00829-SI, 3:11-cv-02225-SI, 3:11-cv-02495-SI, 3:11-cv-03763-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-04119-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI, 3:11-cv-05781-SI, 3:11-cv-06241-SI, 3:12-cv-00335-SI, 3:12-cv-01426-SI, 3:12-cv-01596-SI, 3:12-cv-02214-SI, 3:12-cv-02495-SI, 3:12-cv-03802-SI, 3:12-cv-05371-SI, 3:12-cv-05460-SI, 3:13-cv-03349-SI, 3:13-cv-06001-SI. Counsel shall inform the clerk immediately if a case has been omitted for this notice. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed on or before April 17, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 210 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.s Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (MDL No. 8923) filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 209 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (MDL No. 8917) filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 208 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Defendants Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds (MDL No 8920). filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 207 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of AU Optronics Corporations Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Choice-of-Law Grounds (MDL No. 8925) filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 206 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Redacted Motion Summary Judgmetn Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #4 Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #5 Redacted Exhs 27-42, #6 Redacted Exhs 47-48, #7 Unredacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #8 Unredacted Exhs. 1-18, #9 Unredacted Exhs. 27-35, #10 Unredacted Exh. 36, #11 Unredacted 37-38, #12 Unredacted Exh 39, #13 Unredacted Exhs. 40-42, #14 Unredacted Exhs. 47-48)[MDL No. 8923](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 205 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc.Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. 8920] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 204 Declaration of Weifan Wang in Support of #196 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Certification of Authenticity [MDL Dkt. 8919] filed byCMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Related document(s) #196 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 203 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #196 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [MDL Dkt. 8918] filed byCMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Errata 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Errata 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63)(Related document(s) #196 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 202 EXHIBITS re #200 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Exhibits 5-9 to Declaration of Carl L. Blumenstein (filed as MDL docket nos. 8928 and 8929) filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8 - PART I, #4 Exhibit 8 - PART II, #5 Exhibit 8 - PART III, #6 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #200 ) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 201 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America re #200 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CHOICE-OF-LAW GROUNDS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, as Docket Nos. 8928 and 8929 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 filed under seal, #3 Exhibit 2 filed under seal, #4 Exhibit 3 filed under seal, #5 Exhibit 4 filed under seal)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 200 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (Ex Parte Application filed as Docket No. 8925 in MDL-1827) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 199 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Brownstein ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 19-26, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #5 Exhibit Redactedf Exhibits 43-46, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 47-48)[MDL No. 8924](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 198 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #197 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. 8922] filed byLG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #197 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 197 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [MDL Dkt. 8921] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 196 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc Defendants' Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [MDL Dkt. 8916] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 195 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, HannStar Display CorporationAdministrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. GILLEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8917), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Request to Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Request to Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Request to Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (Request to Seal), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 194 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, HannStar Display Corporation DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8915) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEN TE-HSIANG, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF PO CHIU)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 27, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE by Compucom Systems Inc of Withdrawal of Counsel, Scott R. Jacobs (LeClair, Lewis) (Filed on 2/27/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #191 , (8879) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 18, 2014 Filing 191 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues [MDL No. 8879] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Motion Hearings set for TRACK 2 CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 28, 2014 Filing 189 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule [MDL Master Dkt. 8870] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 1/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER, (8849 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 13, 2014 Filing 187 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Track 2 Deadlines; MDL Dkt. No. 8849 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/13/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8838) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 19, 2013 Filing 185 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 8838 (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8831) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the Parties, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that: 1. The deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding the Proposed List of Summary Judgment Motions and Schedule for same is extended from December 11, 2013 to January 9, 2014. 2. The deadline for the Parties to file with the Court a Joint List of Proposed Summary Judgment Motions and Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Filings is extendedfrom December 12, 2013 to January 13, 2014. 3. This stipulation does not affect any other Track 2 deadlines as set forth in the Courts September 6, 2013 Order re Track 2 Deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 11, 2013 Filing 183 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America 8831 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Revised Deadlines in Track 2 Re: Summary Judgment Motion Lists (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 8804 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Stipulating Parties that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the Stipulating Defendants. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 27, 2013 Filing 181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 8804 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8789) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Hitachi defendants filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 179 NOTICE by Compucom Systems Inc Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Description of Issues/Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 178 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation with Proposed Order of Dismissal; MDL Dkt. No. 8789 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 13, 2013 Filing 177 NOTICE by HannStar Display Corporation Notice of Withdrawal (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Derr Schmidt on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Schmidt, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8655) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants in the Track 2 cases, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that Defendants opposition expert reports shall be served by October 31, 2013, and the underlying code and data for those reports shall be served by November 6, 2013. No other dates from the Courts Track 2 Scheduling Order shall be altered by this stipulation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 169 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8646] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 168 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #167 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #167 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 167 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); DKT No. 8636 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 20, 2013 Filing 166 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation re #163 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Opposition to Motion to Compel Sharp 30(b)(6) Deposition (MDL Dkt. 8615) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Lutz, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER re: Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2. re #161 , 8498 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) re 1620 , 8497 . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 163 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply With Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); MDL Dkt. No. 8553 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 29, 2013 Filing 162 NOTICE by Compucom Systems Inc Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/29/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 161 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN EXPERT DEPOSITIONS IN TRACK 2 [MDL DKT NO. 8498] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 160 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL DKT NO. 8497] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 13, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #157 , (8350) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records" (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 24, 2013 Filing 157 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records"; MDL Dkt. No. 8350 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #152 , (8169) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel filed by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. AS AMENDED (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL IN TRACK 2 CASES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL re #150 , 8159 in 7-1827 Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #150 , (8159) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 21, 2013 Filing 152 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation [MDL Dkt. 8169] Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/21/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 150 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8159 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #145 . (8076) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER 8060 Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #117 . (7973) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re #138 . (8060) Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 12, 2013 Filing 145 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DKT #8076 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Hansen (Hansen, Bradley) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra West Neukom (West Neukom, Sandra) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 7, 2013 Filing 140 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel [MDL No. 8065] (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #129 . (8035) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 6, 2013 Filing 138 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8060 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #121 . (7987) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI: Stipulation with proposed order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (AMENDED DOCUMENT of 7984 by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #122 . (8001) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #127 . (7999) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #126 . (8000) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #125 . (7989) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #124 . (7988) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #120 . (7985) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation with Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE by CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 129 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8035 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 30, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 5/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 127 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7999 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 126 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8000 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 125 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7989 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 124 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7988 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #118 . (7983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed in MDL Master Case by Best Buy Co., Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, Jaco Electronics, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Viewsonic Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 122 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8001 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 121 Notice of Motion/Stipulation -AMENDED DOCUMENT by Compucom Systems Inc. Amendment to #119 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7987. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 120 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7985 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 119 ***PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #121***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7984 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 118 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7983 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 117 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel (Davis, Allison)[MDL NO. 7973]. (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #115 . (7931) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Further Depositions filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 17, 2013 Filing 115 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc). STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Further Depositions [MDL NO.7931]. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #113 . (7919) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 16, 2013 Filing 113 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7919 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/16/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #11 . (7866) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 8, 2013 Filing 111 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Close of Fact Discovery with Respect to Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. and Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. Depositions [MDL No. 7866].(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/9/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting oi #109 . (7770) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 23, 2013 Filing 109 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7770 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 108 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re #105 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 106 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 14, 2013 Filing 105 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL No.7652]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 12, 2013 Filing 104 Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Compucom Systems Inc [MDL Dkt. No. 7640] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 1, 2013 Filing 102 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 10, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 1/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 10, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 21, 2012 Filing 98 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Compucom Systems Inc Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran Re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases and Proposed Order (MDL 7213) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 13, 2012 Filing 96 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 95 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 94 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 93 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint byHannstar Display Corporation. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 92 Toshiba Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #38) byToshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 91 Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint #38) byToshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 90 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #38) byToshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 89 Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #38) byToshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 88 Answer to Amended Complaint #38 Amended Complaint of Compucom Systems, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Compucom Systems Inc byLG Display Co Ltd. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 10/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 87 Answer to Amended Complaint #38 Amended Complaint of Compucom Systems Inc. byLG Display America Inc. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 86 Hitachi Defendants' ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint of CompuCom Systems, Inc. byHitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc, Hitachi LTD. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 85 ANSWER to #85 Amended Complaint of Compucom Systems, Inc. byEpson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 84 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint byNEC Electronics America Inc. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 83 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint byNEC Display Solutions of America Inc. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 82 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint byNEC LCD Technologies LTD. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 81 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES OF CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION (N/K/A CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION), CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., AND CMO JAPAN CO., LTD. TO COMPUCOM SYSTEMS, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byCMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 80 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint byNEC Corporation of America. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 79 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF HARRISON J. FRAHN IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 77 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 76 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint bySharp Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 75 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint of CompuCom Systems, Inc. bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 74 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint from CompuCom Systems, Inc. byChunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 73 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint (First Amended) (6956 in 3:07-md-01827 SI) byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 72 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint (CompuCom) byMitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
October 12, 2012 Filing 71 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint (CompuCom) byMitsui & Co (USA Inc). (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (6581 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Extension of Time For Defendants to Respond to CompuCom System, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 29, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 29, 2012 Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #38 Amended Complaint Stipulation of Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer CompuCom System, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc). (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND NEC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPUCOM FAC (11-62421)(6108) (6114) (6309) in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; (56) (58) (62) in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/21/2012)[Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 17, 2012 Filing 67 REPLY (re #58 MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss CompuCom, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America Inc, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC LCD Technologies LTD. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 15, 2012 Filing 66 REPLY (re #56 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CompuCom System, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) Reply In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion To Dismiss CompuCom System, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed byMitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc). (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed on 8/6/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6358 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (64) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI. THEREFORE, CompuCom, by its counsel, and Stipulating Defendants, by the undersigned counsel, stipulate and agree as follows: Stipulating Defendants shall submit any reply brief by August 17, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
August 2, 2012 Filing 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 30, 2012 Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #58 MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss CompuCom, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) OPPOSITION TO NEC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPUCOM SYSTEMS, INC.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 30, 2012 Filing 62 Ex Parte Application TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Nikas, #2 Proposed Order )(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 30, 2012 Filing 61 RESPONSE (re #56 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CompuCom System, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) COMPUCOMS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS COMPUCOMS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Nikas, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 60 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 59 Request for Judicial Notice re #58 MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss CompuCom, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America Inc, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC LCD Technologies LTD. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss ; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss CompuCom, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America Inc, NEC Electronics America Inc, NEC LCD Technologies LTD. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/30/2012. Replies due by 8/15/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Dunavan in Support of NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss CompuCom, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dylan Dunavan, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Dylan Dunavan)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 57 Declaration of Michael E. Mumford in Support of #56 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CompuCom System, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed byMitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #56 ) (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CompuCom System, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc). Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/30/2012. Replies due by 8/15/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 54 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 52 Request for Judicial Notice re #51 Reply to Opposition/Response NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re Track Two Plaintiffs' Scheduling Motion filed byNEC Electronics America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C-D to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #51 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 27, 2012 Filing 51 REPLY (re #45 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Mooney)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 26, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG CO. OF AMERICA signed on 6/21/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5962 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #113 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #126 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting ( #58 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting ( #18 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2012: #1 Order with Judicial Signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC. filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 19, 2012 Filing 46 RESPONSE (re #45 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases filed byNEC Electronics America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases with Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order re: Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 6/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 45 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by Compucom Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed on 5/22/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting (5738) Stipulation to extend time to respond to complaint in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (43) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 18, 2012 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc). (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 5/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 15, 2012 Filing 42 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #41 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Compucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( 5631 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Compucom Systems Inc, ( #37 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) Ex Parte Application TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Compucom Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/14/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012) Modified on 5/15/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting (5630) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (36) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI. Withdrawing Motion 5471 . Setting new briefing schedule see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. granting ( 5578 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #67 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting ( #106 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #83 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting ( #117 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #28 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #35 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 8, 2012 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byCompucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 8, 2012 Filing 37 Ex Parte Application TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 8, 2012 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
May 2, 2012 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed on 4/17/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5462 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #32 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND AND ORDER filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012) Modified on 4/18/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 17, 2012 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CompuCom System, Inc.'s Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc). Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/1/2012. Replies due by 5/8/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael E. Mumford, #2 Proposed Order)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 16, 2012 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE AND TIME TO RESPOND AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 5, 2012 Filing 31 RESPONSE to re #26 Notice (Other), Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Regarding Trial Structure and Duplicative Recovery by Compucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 5343 Stipulation to Dismiss Samsung in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting #28 Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
April 2, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA FELDER (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 30, 2012 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 14, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Michael E. Mumford and Tracy L. Cole (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 3/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
March 13, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and Of Issue and Claim Preclusion (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting (4877) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (24) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 24, 2012 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF COMPUCOM'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL re #22 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/6/2012) Modified on 2/7/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 31, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION BY PLAINTIFF COMPUCOM SYSTEMS, INC. FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) filed by Compucom Systems Inc. Responses due by 2/14/2012. Replies due by 2/21/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher V. Fenlon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Fenlon, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Illston GRANTING STIPULATION re #20 . #4590 TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, WAIVER OF SERVICE in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (20) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012) Modified on 1/23/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
January 18, 2012 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to complaint and waiver of service filed by Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd, Mitsui & Co (USA Inc). (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 1/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 16, 2011 Filing 19 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Pretrial ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 16, 2011 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Compucom Systems Inc. v. AU Optronics Corp., et al from the Northern District of Texas. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 16, 2011 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:11-cv-02948. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
December 7, 2011 Filing 15 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-20): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of 4/17/2007, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Susan Yvonne Illston. (Signed by Jeffery N Luthi on 11/29/2011) (jrb) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 23, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION Second Supplement to Motion to Seal Complaint filed by Compucom Systems Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exh 1 - Redacted Complaint, #2 Exh 2 - Redacted MetroPCS Complaint, #3 Exh 3 - Order Granting Ex Parte Appl to Seal) (LeClair, Lewis) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher V. Fenlon. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/21/2011) (axm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip J. Iovenio. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/21/2011) (axm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William A Isaacson. Clerk shall deposit application fee to the Non-Appropriated Fund of this Court. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/21/2011) (axm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney William A Isaacson (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 54198) filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (skt) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Philip J. Iovenio (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 54198) filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (skt) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher V. Fenlon (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 54198) filed by Compucom Systems Inc. (skt) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]
November 15, 2011 Filing 7 Supplement to Motion to Seal Complaint filed by Compucom Systems Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (LeClair, Lewis) Modified on 11/16/2011 (gmg). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/10/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compucom Systems Inc et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Display Solutions of America Inc
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd
Represented By: Jacob P Alpren
Represented By: David C Brownstein
Represented By: William S Farmer
Represented By: Rachel Susan Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Brian Richichi
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Barry Frank McNeil
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gillen
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Edward Fu
Represented By: Sheila R Adams
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: William D Pollak
Represented By: Bradley R Hansen
Represented By: Jason M Bussey
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Greg Donald Andres
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co Ltd
Represented By: Kyle Mach
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Nash
Represented By: Holly A House
Represented By: Kevin C McCann
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: Carl Blumenstein
Represented By: Natasha A Saggar Sheth
Represented By: Alan R Vickery
Represented By: John D Cline
Represented By: Melissa L Gardner
Represented By: Christopher Nedeau
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Represented By: K C Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America Inc
Represented By: Kyle Mach
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Nash
Represented By: Holly A House
Represented By: Kevin C McCann
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Lcd Technologies Ltd
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: John M Grenfell
Represented By: Lindsay A Lutz
Represented By: Jacob R Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co Ltd
Represented By: Brian Richichi
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Barry Frank McNeil
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gillen
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Represented By: Edward Fu
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: Sheila R Adams
Represented By: William D Pollak
Represented By: Bradley R Hansen
Represented By: Jason M Bussey
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Greg Donald Andres
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc
Represented By: Brian Richichi
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Barry Frank McNeil
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gillen
Represented By: Edward Fu
Represented By: Sheila R Adams
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: William D Pollak
Represented By: Bradley R Hansen
Represented By: Jason M Bussey
Represented By: Greg Donald Andres
Represented By: Christopher B Hockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: John M Grenfell
Represented By: Jacob R Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HannStar Display Corporation
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Casey L Griffith
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gillen
Represented By: Michael Collin Barbee
Represented By: Jason M Bussey
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: Carl Blumenstein
Represented By: Natasha A Saggar Sheth
Represented By: Alan R Vickery
Represented By: John D Cline
Represented By: Melissa L Gardner
Represented By: Christopher Nedeau
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Represented By: K C Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co (USA Inc)
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Ernest E Vargo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays Ltd
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co (Taiwan) Ltd
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Ernest E Vargo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CompuCom Systems Inc
Represented By: Lewis T LeClair
Represented By: Melissa B Felder
Represented By: Dan S Boyd
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Kyle Smith
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Christopher V Fenlon
Represented By: Scott R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: MetroPCS Wireless Inc
Represented By: Melissa B Felder
Represented By: Mike McKool
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Lewis T LeClair
Represented By: Anne M Nardacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?