Manufacturers Collection Company LLC v. Precision Airmotive LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Manufacturers Collection Company LLC |
Defendant: |
Precision Airmotive LLC and Precision Airmotive Holdings LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00853 |
Filed: |
March 22, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam A Lindsay |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
237
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, the court: grants Precision's Motion for Summary Judgment Against MCC and Partial Summary Judgment Against AVCO to the extent it relates to MCC's claims against Precision and denies the motion to the extent it relates to Precision's third-party claim against AVCO (Doc. 220 ); denies Manufacturers Collection Company, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 170 ); and grants Third-Party Defendant AVCO Corporation's Moti on for Summary Judgment (Doc. 165 ). MCC's statutory and common law indemnity claims against Precision are dismissed with prejudice, and Precision's third-party statutory indemnity claim against AVCO is dismissed with prejudice. Finally, P laintiff MCC's and Third-Party Defendant AVCO/Lycoming's Joint Motion to Exclude Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Precision's Experts Elizabeth Erickson and James Erickson (Doc. 169 ) is denied as moot. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/1/2015) (ctf)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing
201
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part, denying in part 135 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 6/6/2014) (mcrd)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
188
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 140 Motion to Compel filed by Lycoming Engines as to the three outstanding items remaining in the parties' 179 Joint Status Report. AVCO's request for attorneys' fees and expenses is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 5/20/2014) (tln)
|
October 25, 2012 |
Filing
48
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 38 Motion to Continue and 39 Motion to Continue. The court strikes the current summary judgment reply filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Precision (docs. 43 , 44 ), as the court will allow them to jointly file replies to MCC's and AVCO's summary judgment responses and supplemental responses. MCC and AVCO shall have until 1/15/2013, to file supplemental responses to the pending 27 summary judgment motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 10/25/2012) (ctf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?