Lowe v. ViewPoint Bank

Plaintiff: Sherri R Lowe
Defendant: ViewPoint Bank
Case Number: 3:2012cv01725
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: A. Joe Fish
Presiding Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:3410
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER ACCEPTING 98 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/26/2015) (tln)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order re 95 Recommendation Regarding Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal. The court certifies that any appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/6/2015) (jrr)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 89 Motion for Relief from U.S. Magistrate Judge's Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation filed by Sherri R Lowe. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/24/2014) (aaa)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Accepting 74 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant ViewPoint Bank's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, or, in the alternative, for summary judgment, filed 12/8/2013 (docket entr y 63) is granted on plaintiff's claims under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, the Federal Reserve Act (FRA), 12 U.S.C. § 503, the RFPA, breach of good faith, and defamation and slander. The motion is denied as to plaintiff's remaining cla ims, i.e., breach of ordinary care under the UCC, negligence and breach of contract. Plaintiff Sherri R. Lowe's motion for summary judgment for all claims against defendant Viewpoint Bank, filed 1/3/2014 (docket entry 68), is denied. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/16/2014) (jrr)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ACCEPTING 56 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/18/2013) (skt)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ACCEPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff Sherri Lowe's 9 Motion for No-Answer Default Judgment, filed on 6/29/2012 (docket entry 9), is DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/27/2012) (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. ViewPoint Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri R Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViewPoint Bank
Represented By: Robert A Hawkins
Represented By: S Cass Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?