Lawrence et al v. PEF Capital Properties LLC
Plaintiff: |
Angela Lawrence and Paul Martinez Bey |
Defendant: |
PEF Capital Properties LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv02371 |
Filed: |
July 16, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam A Lindsay |
Presiding Judge: |
Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Nature of Suit: |
Housing/Accommodations |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1981 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 15, 2013 |
Filing
22
Memorandum Opinion and Order Denies without predjudice 16 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PEF Capital Properties LLC, Grants in Part and Denies in Part the court's 4/23/2013 sua sponte motion to dismiss 20 . ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2013. ) The court directs Bey to file an amended complaint that addresses the deficiencies noted in this opinion by 6/14/2013. Any amended complaint filed by Bey must not include allegations, theories, or claims dismissed or d etermined by the court to be legally unviable. Failure to file an amended complaint by 6/14/2013, will result in dismissal of Bey's fraud claim, and this action will be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/15/2013) (tla)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
20
Memorandum Opinion and Order: The court sua sponte moves for dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) for lack of standing. Bey shall file a response to the courts sua sponte motion for dismissal by 5/13/2013. PEF shall not file a reply unless directed to do so by the court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/23/2013) (jrr)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing
15
ORDER: After reviewing the pleadings, file, and record in this case, the court determines that the findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge are correct, accepts them as those of the court, and dismisses without prejudice all claims asserted by Lawrence in this action for her failure to comply with a court order and failure to prosecute this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/18/2012) (cea)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?