Lewis v. Texas Instruments Inc Employee Health Benefits Plan et al
Plaintiff: |
Iris Lewis |
Defendant: |
Texas Instruments Inc Employee Health Benefits Plan and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv04577 |
Filed: |
November 14, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Tarrant |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam A Lindsay |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: E.R.I.S.A. |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 14, 2014 |
Filing
95
ORDER: Having reviewed the motions, briefs, pleadings, file, record in this case, and the 94 findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge, the court determines that the findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge are correct and accepts th em as those of the court, except that the court will deny Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment in light of the court's determination that Defendants' motions to dismiss should be granted rather than denied as moot. According ly, the court grants the Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas (Doc. 44 ); grants Defendant TI Employees Health Benefit Plan's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 45 ); denies as moot Plaintiff's Motio n for Summary Judgment (Doc. 78 ); denies Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 82 ); denies Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleading (Doc. 65 ); denies Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Motion to Leave File d on 11/13/2013 (Doc. 74 ); denies Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleading (Doc. 75 ); and dismisses this action with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/14/2014) (ctf)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing
93
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying without prejudice 76 MOTION for Protective Order . (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 6/23/2014) (mcrd) (Main Document 93 replaced on 6/23/2014) (mcrd).
|
November 13, 2013 |
Filing
67
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the Protective Order remains unchanged, and Plaintiff's Answer in Opposition of the Protective Order [Dkt. No. 58] is OVERRULED. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 11/13/2013) (mcrd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?