Greco et al v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Greco, Jules Brodsky, Todd J. Christenson, William Dickie, David Aiello, Tracy Albaugh, Donald Albaugh, Nassaval Anderson, Agi Bako, Todd Baraniak, Gary Barcinas, Jennifer Barcinas, Martha Barlow, Terrence Battist, Richard Bazzy, Gordon R Behling, Brandon Bernick, Albert S. Bier, Dennis Bill, Nicole Blasingame, Thomas Bloch II, Bernard B. Booth, Bart Boren, William A. Breseman, Sonya Brooks, Max Brourman, Mitchell Brourman, Andrea Brownlee, Miguel Busquets, Zachary S. Bussard, Chad Butterfield, Craig Butterfield, Michael G. Byrne, Brain Calvin, Jose Martin Carballo Garcia, Robert W. Carothers, Luis Castro, Bill Clark, Paul Charles Colavecchi, Mark Coronna, Maryanne Coronna, Carre Covell, Michael A. Cromer, James A. Dahl, Joseph R. Dailey, Arianne Z. Dar, Joseph Darragh, Wynne DeArman, Alfred C. Del Mastro, Lisa Dellabella, David DeMarco, John DiJoseph, Mike Dolabi, Elizabeth East, Matthew Edlebeck, Kenneth Edlebeck, James Edwards, Patricia Edwards, Elise C. Ewing, Frank E. Farrell, James Fox, Robert Franco, Tami Frankhouser, Brooke Freischmidt, Tim Gable, Michael Garippa, Myron Gefroh, Mike Gibson, Gilbert Kaye, Leon Goldstein, David Goydan, Silas Graham, Linda Grantin, Patsy Greco, Gerald Grillo, Steve Grohawalski, Pat Gunderson, Stephen Gurgovits, Stephen Gurgovits Jr, Bryant Hagen, Ronald Haines, John Halbleib, Kathleen Hamill, Mark Harchelroad, Jacob Haupricht, Virginia Hazelet, Brian T. Henciak, Dana Lamont Henderson, James Hogan, Paul Hrubesky, Terry R. Johnson, Johanna Johnson-Massey, Alyce A. Jones, Justin P. Junda, Connie Jurado, Larry Jurado, John Kaltenberg, Brian Kathary, John Kaufman, Rich Kay, Matt Keene, Adam Keller, Constance King, James W. Kirk, Harold Kirstein, Teresa G. Klembara, Mike Kramer, Stephanie Lake, John Lammers, Mary Kay Lammers, Eitan Laufer, Lisa Lawrence, Patrick Le, Paul Le, Jesse Legorreta, Lynn Lewis-Reed, David E. Lichty, Wayne Lieberman, Gail Limoni, Robert Limoni, Ray C. Lopez, Jonathan Mack, Kathleen Mack, Al MacVicar, Jennifer Malara, Floyd Malatesta, Craig Margelowsky, Lorrel Margelowsky, Keith Margelowsky, Louis Victor Martin, Shane Mason, Joseph Matesic, Joan Q. McAfoos, Ralph McBee, Kimberly McCloskey, Michael Robert McCluney, Richard J. McMaster, Gerardo Medellin, Joseph T. Menotti, Carl Metosky, Gary Michols, Bruce Miller, Gordon Miller III, Donald P. Monaco, Adrian Moreno, Kathleen Muenster, Kenneth Muenster, Gregg Nemec, Mark Nemec, Ricky Nevels, Mark Nicholson, James M. Nicholson, Raymond Niro, Daniel Noltner, Michael A. O'Connor, Mary O'Keefe, Donna O'Neill, Jeffrey R. Oleson, Tim Olson, Curtis Olson, Carri Olver, Jason Olver, William F. Ososkie, Cameron Pace, Kris Pak, Frank Parker, Gregory D. Pawlowski, Tim Petersen, Janet A. Pina, Stephen A. Pina, Christopher B. Piwinsky, Erica Piwinsky, Summer Plewes, Jeff Polacheck, Arturo Ramirez, Jeff Rathsack, Matthew Reber, Patrick Richards, Scott Richards, Robin Roberts, Keith Roberts, Derl Robertson, Anferny Rodriguez, Oscar Rodriguez, Buddy Rogers, Michael Rogers, James A. Rudolph, Richard Ryan, David A. Sachs, Lisa Salisbury, Ross A. Scarano, Maureen Schlegel, Ashley Schuldes, Natalie Schuldes, James R. Shento, Karen Shepner, Brett Sholder, Johnny O. Simmank, Joseph Sipes, James Stocki, William J. Stoddard, David W. Stone, Brian Surmacz, Celly Surmacz, Robert Susko, Jeffrey Sveum, John Swick, Michael Sylvester, Norman Talkowski, Steve Tennessen, Billy Thomas, Brittany Thompson, Tyler Tomesh, Cao-Ly Tran, Joni Transue, David Turner, Mark Turner, Rodrigo Vergara, Lynn Villani, Jason B. Wagler, David Wagner, Brian Weiland, David Weissman, David E. White, Carlene Whitsel, John Wisniewski, Ron D. Wright, Jennifer A. Yanda, Andrew Young, Dean Young, Kim Ziccardi and Randall Zotter
Defendant: Jerral Wayne Jones, National Football League, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., JWJ Corporation, Cowboys Stadium, L.P., Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC and Blue & Silver, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01005
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M.G. Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Order Accepting 232 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: 227 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer. The claims of plaintiffs William Breseman, Justin Junda, Michael Kramer, Raymond Niro, Phoenix Beverages, and Mark Turner are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/8/2017) (epm)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 193 Motion for Leave to File their First Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/2/2017) (epm) Modified to reduce text on 3/2/2017 (epm).
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's 133 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED, Plaintiffs' 152 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is DENIED without prejudice, and Plaintiffs' 177 Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of the Appeal of the Related-Ibe Matter is GRANTED. This case is STAYED, except for the filing of an agreed motion to join Paul Ober, Mohit Goyal, Marie Pace, and Patricia Jones as Plaintiffs. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/21/2015) (axm)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The Cowboys Defendants' 4 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in its entirety. The NFL's 6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED only to the extent specified herein, and otherwise DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/6/2014) (twd)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 Motion to Remand. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed, no later than 10 days after entry of this Order, to inform the Court whether Plaintiff Covell will be dismissing her claims in this action. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/16/2014) (skt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greco et al v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Greco
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jules Brodsky
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd J. Christenson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dickie
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Aiello
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Albaugh
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Albaugh
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nassaval Anderson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agi Bako
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Baraniak
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Barcinas
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Barcinas
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Barlow
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Battist
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bazzy
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon R Behling
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Bernick
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert S. Bier
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Bill
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Blasingame
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bloch II
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard B. Booth
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Boren
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Breseman
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Brooks
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Brourman
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Brourman
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Brownlee
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Busquets
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary S. Bussard
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Butterfield
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Butterfield
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Byrne
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brain Calvin
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martin Carballo Garcia
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Carothers
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Castro
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Clark
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Charles Colavecchi
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Coronna
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryanne Coronna
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carre Covell
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Cromer
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Dahl
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Dailey
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianne Z. Dar
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Darragh
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynne DeArman
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred C. Del Mastro
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Dellabella
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David DeMarco
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John DiJoseph
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Dolabi
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth East
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Edlebeck
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Edlebeck
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edwards
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Edwards
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise C. Ewing
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank E. Farrell
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fox
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Franco
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Frankhouser
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Freischmidt
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Gable
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garippa
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Gefroh
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Gibson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Kaye
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Goldstein
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Goydan
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silas Graham
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Grantin
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Greco
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Grillo
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Grohawalski
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Gunderson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Gurgovits
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Gurgovits Jr
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Hagen
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Haines
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Halbleib
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hamill
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Harchelroad
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Haupricht
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Hazelet
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian T. Henciak
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Lamont Henderson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hogan
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hrubesky
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry R. Johnson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Johnson-Massey
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyce A. Jones
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin P. Junda
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Jurado
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Jurado
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kaltenberg
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kathary
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kaufman
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Kay
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Keene
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Keller
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance King
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Kirk
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Kirstein
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa G. Klembara
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Kramer
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lake
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lammers
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Lammers
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eitan Laufer
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lawrence
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Le
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Le
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Legorreta
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Lewis-Reed
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Lichty
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Lieberman
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Limoni
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Limoni
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray C. Lopez
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mack
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mack
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al MacVicar
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Malara
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Malatesta
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Margelowsky
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrel Margelowsky
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Margelowsky
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Victor Martin
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Mason
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Matesic
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Q. McAfoos
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph McBee
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly McCloskey
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robert McCluney
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. McMaster
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Medellin
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph T. Menotti
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Metosky
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Michols
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Miller
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Miller III
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald P. Monaco
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Moreno
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Muenster
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Muenster
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Nemec
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nemec
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Nevels
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nicholson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Nicholson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Niro
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Noltner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary O'Keefe
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna O'Neill
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey R. Oleson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Olson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Olson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carri Olver
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Olver
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Ososkie
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Pace
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Pak
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Parker
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory D. Pawlowski
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Petersen
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet A. Pina
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Pina
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher B. Piwinsky
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Piwinsky
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Plewes
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Polacheck
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Ramirez
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Rathsack
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Reber
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Richards
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Richards
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Roberts
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Roberts
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derl Robertson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anferny Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buddy Rogers
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rogers
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Rudolph
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ryan
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Sachs
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Salisbury
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross A. Scarano
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Schlegel
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Schuldes
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Schuldes
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Shento
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Shepner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Sholder
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny O. Simmank
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sipes
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stocki
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Stoddard
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Stone
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Surmacz
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celly Surmacz
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Susko
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Sveum
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Swick
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sylvester
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Talkowski
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Tennessen
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Thomas
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Thompson
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Tomesh
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cao-Ly Tran
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Transue
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Turner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Turner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Vergara
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Villani
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason B. Wagler
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wagner
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Weiland
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Weissman
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. White
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlene Whitsel
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wisniewski
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron D. Wright
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Yanda
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Young
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Young
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Ziccardi
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Zotter
Represented By: Michael J Avenatti
Represented By: Christopher S Ayres
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Ahmed Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerral Wayne Jones
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: R Thaddeus Behrens
Represented By: George W Bramblett, Jr
Represented By: Daniel H Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd.
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWJ Corporation
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowboys Stadium, L.P.
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowboys Stadium GP, LLC
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue & Silver, Inc.
Represented By: R Jack Ayres, Jr
Represented By: David W Dodge
Represented By: Paul A Grinke
Represented By: Levi G McCathern, II
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?