Bunch v. Mollobashy et al
Plaintiff: |
Gloria A Bunch |
Defendant: |
Alladin Mollobashy, Dana Bond and Baylor Hospital |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv01075 |
Filed: |
March 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
A. Joe Fish |
Presiding Judge: |
Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 4, 2017 |
Filing
76
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONOF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff's motion to strike defendant's appendix (entire) exhibit files, & affidavit of Alladdin Mollabashy, filed July 6, 2016 (docket entry 69 ) is DENIE D, and defendant Alladdin Mollabashy's motion for summary judgment, filed May 31, 2016 (docket entry 61 ) is GRANTED. By separate judgment, all of the plaintiff's remaining claims against Alladin Mollabashy, M.D. will be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/4/2017) (aaa)
|
March 7, 2016 |
Filing
59
ORDER ACCEPTING 56 FINDINGS AND CONCLUSIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's motion to stay due to extenuating circumstances, filed 5/27/2015 (docket entry 49 ) is DENIED, and defendant Dana Bond's first amended motion to dismiss for failure to serve proper notice and both defendants' motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to file pre-suit notices, filed 6/16/2015 (docket entry 52 at 3) are DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/7/2016) (sss)
|
September 17, 2015 |
Filing
55
Order Accepting 54 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Sanction Defendant Attorneys, filed 12/22/2014, is denied. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/17/2015) (jrr)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Mollabashy and Bond's 26 , 27 motions to dismiss are GRANTED in part. Bunch's fraud claims against them are DISMISSED. Their motions to dismiss Bunch's medical negligence claim are DENIED. This case is ABATED for 60 days in order for Bunch to provide Mollabashy and Bond the required pre-suit notices and for Bunch to effect service on Bond. Reliant's 23 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/26/2015) (tln)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing
20
ORDER accepting Report and Recommendations re 14 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiffs claims under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and her claims forlicense revocation and criminal prosecution are DISMISSED with prejudice (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/12/2014) (gr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?