Ward v. City of Dallas Texas

Plaintiff: Teresa Ward Cooper
Defendant: City of Dallas Texas and Kimberly Owens
Case Number: 3:2013cv01330
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: 7 Motion to Remand filed by Teresa Ward Cooper. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2013) (aaa)
September 9, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations re: 60 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: 34 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kimberly Owens, City of Dallas Texas. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/9/2014) (ndt)
April 6, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Accepting 82 Findings and Recommendations re: 73 Motion for Sanctions filed by Teresa Ward Cooper, 70 Motion for Hearing, Motion to Alter Judgment, Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Teresa Ward Cooper. The objections are overruled and the Court ACCEPTS the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/6/2015) (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. City of Dallas Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ward Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dallas Texas
Represented By: Jason D McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Owens
Represented By: Jason D McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.