Bivins v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Quentin Bivins
Case Number: 3:2013cv01848
Filed: May 16, 2013
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order: Motion for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b) as a successive § 2255 motion, the motion is transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. November 9, 2015 motion to amend the Rule 60(b) motion to cite new authority addressing Johnson in the direct-appeal context is denied as futile. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/19/2015) (ndt)
July 31, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Adopting 19 Findings and Recommendations on Motion. Petitioner's 5/30/2014 motion for reconsideration is denied. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/31/2014) (jrr)
April 30, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and Denying Certificate of Appealability re: 14 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: 2 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Quentin Bivins. It is therefore ordered that the findings , conclusions, and recommendation of the magistrate judge are adopted and that the motion to vacate set aside or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is denied. petitioner must pay the $505.00 appellate filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/30/2014) (tla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bivins v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Timothy Wayne Funnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Quentin Bivins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?