Grace v. EverHome Mortgage Company et al

Plaintiff: Gail A Grace
Defendant: EverHome Mortgage Company, Federal National Mortgage Association and Hughes Watters Askanase LLP
Case Number: 3:2013cv04563
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 69 Motion to Reconsider and Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/26/2016) (axm)
November 4, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: In its Memorandum Opinion and Order (Doc. 61 ), issued on 9/2/2015, the Court granted Defendants EverBank's and Federal National Mortgage Association's (Fannie Mae) Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 30 ) wit h respect to Plaintiff Gail A. Grace's claims for breach of contract, declaratory judgment, and injunctive relief. Doc. 61, Mem. Op. & Order. The Court denied summary judgment as to Grace's quiet title and trespass to try title claims, but granted Defendants leave to supplement their Motion on those issues. Id. 910. Before the Court is the Defendants' supplement (Docs. 62 , 63 ), as well as Grace's response (Doc. 64 ) and Defendants' reply (Doc. 65 ). For the reasons that follow, the Court GRANTS Defendants' supplemented Motion for Summary Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/4/2015) (bdb)
September 2, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion for SummaryJudgment as it relates to Plaintiff's breach of contract claim, declaratory judgment ac tion, and request for injunctive relief, but DENIES the Motion without prejudice to refile as it pertains to Plaintiff's suit to quiet title and action in trespass to try title. Should Defendants choose to refile their Motion, they must do so within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/2/2015) (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grace v. EverHome Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail A Grace
Represented By: Jack B Peacock, Jr
Represented By: Laura Leigh Pickens
Represented By: David M Vereeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EverHome Mortgage Company
Represented By: Stewart Clancy
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Stewart Clancy
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes Watters Askanase LLP
Represented By: Nathan Joseph Milliron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?