Keith v. J.D. Byrider Systems, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: |
Marvin Keith |
Defendant: |
J.D. Byrider Systems, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC, Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Holding Corporation, Byrider Funding, LLC and CarNow Auto Receivables Trust 2012-1 |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01317 |
Filed: |
April 11, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
Sidney A Fitzwater |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 29, 2016 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 71 MOTION Designate Expert Witness filed by Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Funding, LLC, Byrider Holding Corporation, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC, CarNow Auto Receivables Trust 2012-1, J.D. Byrider Systems, LLC. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/29/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 62 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC, J.D. Byrider Systems, LLC. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/20/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
|
June 5, 2015 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Byrider Holding Corporation, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC, CarNow Auto Receivables Trust 2012-1, Byrider Finance, LLC, J.D. Byrider Systems, LLC, Byrider Funding, LLC; granting MOTION to dismiss filed by James F. DeVoe, Jr.; and denying MOTION for more definite statement. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/5/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
|
October 14, 2014 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 25 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Byrider Holding Corporation, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC, CarNow Auto Receivables Trust 2012-1, Byrider Finance, LLC, J.D. Byrider Systems, LLC, Byrider Funding, LLC, and granting plaintiff leave to replead. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/14/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Keith v. J.D. Byrider Systems, LLC, et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Marvin Keith |
Represented By: |
Darrell W Cook |
Represented By: |
Melissa Jo Parker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: J.D. Byrider Systems, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey R Erler |
Represented By: |
Orrin Lea Harrison, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey R Erler |
Represented By: |
Orrin Lea Harrison, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Byrider Finance, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey R Erler |
Represented By: |
Orrin Lea Harrison, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Byrider Holding Corporation |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey R Erler |
Represented By: |
Orrin Lea Harrison, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Byrider Funding, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey R Erler |
Represented By: |
Orrin Lea Harrison, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: CarNow Auto Receivables Trust 2012-1 |
Represented By: |
Jeffrey R Erler |
Represented By: |
Orrin Lea Harrison, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?