Charalambopoulos v. Grammer
Plaintiff: Dimitri Charalambopoulos
Defendant: Camille Grammer
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2014cv02424
Filed: July 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Assault, Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 NOTICE of Release of Bond re: #254 Notice (Other) filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Costs Taxed in amount of $24,384.70 against Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (mla)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT: Based on the jury's verdict, which is expressly incorporated herein, and all prior orders of the Court, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, the Court hereby awards judgment in favor of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer recover from Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Dimitri Charalambopoulos the amount of $36,025.00, plus prejudgment interest at the rate of 5.5% per annum in the amount of $269.67, plus post judgment interest at the rate of 2.43% per annum. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/24/2019) (mla)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 BILL OF COSTS by Camille Grammer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 to Bill of Costs) (Rohan, Richard)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 JUDGMENT: Based on the jury's verdict, the Court hereby awards judgment in favor of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer. It is Ordered that Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer recover from Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Dimitri Charalambopoulos the amount of $36,025.00, plus prejudgment interest at the rate of 5.5% per annum in the amount of $269.67, plus post judgment interest at the rate of 2.44% per annum. Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at #Exhibit Guide). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/29/2019) (axm)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Redacted Transcript for remote electronic access re: #377 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Trial Day 2 Proceedings held on 04/17/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (245 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms) (lms)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2019 at 4:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer Re: #372 MOTION for Judgment. It is ordered that Defendant's counsel is instructed to circulate dial-in information by 1:30 pm today. It is further ordered that at least one attorney per side attend the call. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/29/2019) (chmb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #372 MOTION for Judgment (Conner, Thomas)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Transcript Redaction Request re: #377 Transcript by attorney Richard A Rohan. (Rohan, Richard)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #372 MOTION for Judgment (Bender, Andrew)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion for Judgment [ECF No. 372]. The Court orders Plaintiff to file a response by Wednesday, May 15, 2019. Defendant's reply must be filed by Wednesday, May 22, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/1/2019) (chmb)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Pretrial conference Proceedings held on 04/15/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (53 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Trial Day 7 Proceedings held on 04/24/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (18 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Trial Day 6 Proceedings held on 04/23/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (142 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Trial Day 5 Proceedings held on 04/22/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (279 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Trial Day 4 Proceedings held on 04/19/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (253 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Trial Day 3 Proceedings held on 04/18/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (241 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Trial Day 2 Proceedings held on 04/17/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (245 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Trial Day 1 Proceedings held on 04/16/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (199 pages) Redaction Request due 5/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2019. (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Redacted Transcript for remote electronic access re: #335 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 03/29/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (82 pages) Redaction Request due 4/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2019. (lms) (lms)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting #371 Sealed Unopposed Motion to Redact. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/30/2019) (aaa)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MOTION for Judgment filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 (Document Restricted) UNOPPOSED MOTION TO REDACT filed by Camille Grammer. (epm)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed #369 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/25/2019) (epm)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Court's Exhibit and Witness List from Trial held 4/16/19-4/24/19. (chmb)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Seventh and final day of jury trial. Closing argument, jury deliberations and entry of verdict. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan, Thomas Conner and Kelli Hinson. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 2:40. (chmb)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Jury Notes. (axm)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 JURY VERDICT (see JURY CHARGE #366 ) (axm)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Jury Charge including JURY VERDICT. (axm)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Day six of jury trial. Testimony continued. Adjourned until 4/24/19 at 8:00 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan, Thomas Conner, and Kelli Hinson. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 6:10. (chmb)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Day 5 of Jury Trial. Testimony continued. Adjourned until 4/23/19 at 8:00 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan, Thomas Conner and Kelli Hinson. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 7:45. (chmb)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Proposed Jury Charge filed by Camille Grammer. (Conner, Thomas)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #361 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Rohan, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Supplemental Document by Dimitri Charalambopoulos as to #358 Proposed Jury Charge/Instructions . (Bender, Andrew)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Proposed Jury Charge filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Bender, Andrew)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 TRIAL BRIEF by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Bender, Andrew)
April 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 TRIAL BRIEF on Grand Jury Witness Testimony by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Day Four of Jury Trial. Testimony continued. Adjourned until 4/22/19 at 8:00 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan and Thomas Conner. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 6:00. (chmb)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 TRIAL BRIEF on Privileges and Defamation Damages by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Bender, Andrew)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Day Three of Jury trial. Testimony continued. Adjourned until 4/19/19 at 8:00 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan, Thomas Conner and Ellen Van Meir. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:35.
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 TRIAL BRIEF on Defamation Damages by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 TRIAL BRIEF on Privileged Statements by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 TRIAL BRIEF on Grand Jury Secrecy by Camille Grammer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Day Two of Jury Trial. Witness testimony continued. Adjourned until 4/18/19 at 8:00 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan, Thomas Conner, Kelli Hinson and Ellen Van Meir. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:45. (chmb)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 (Document Restricted) Jury Roll. (This document is for district court access only and will not be included in any ROA that may later be prepared.). (rekc) (Main Document 352 replaced on 4/22/2019) (chmb).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Day one of Jury Trial. Jury Selection, opening and closing arguments, and begin testimony. Adjourned until 4/17/19 at 8:00 a.m. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan, Thomas Conner, Kelli Hinson and Ellen Van Meir. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 5:50. (chmb)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Pretrial Conference held on 4/15/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan, Thomas Conner and Kelli Hinson. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:50. (chmb)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Witness List by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 (Document Restricted) SEALED ORDER (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/15/2019) (ewd)
April 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Designation of Deposition by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
April 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Exhibit List --Amended by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Designation of Deposition by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Attachments: #1 Born, #2 Bragman, #3 Donatacci, #4 Kantalis, #5 MacLean 3.10.15, #6 MacLean 6.21.16, #7 McKissack, #8 Nagib, #9 Ramirez, #10 Royster, #11 Vo) (Fisher, Guy)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Exhibit List Third Amended by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Proposed Pretrial Order Final by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Proposed Jury Charge filed by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties are ordered to submit a final Pretrial Order by 4/11/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/5/2019) (chmb)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Pretrial conference Proceedings held on 04/03/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (48 pages) Redaction Request due 4/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2019. (lms)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 03/29/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (82 pages) Redaction Request due 4/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2019. (lms)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Pretrial Conference held on 4/3/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, II and Andrew Bender; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan and Thomas Conner. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (Exhibits admitted) Time in Court - 2:40. (chmb)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ELECTRONIC ORDER: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Pretrial Conference reset for 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/3/2019) (chmb)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #332 Sealed Opposition and Response to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Dimitri Charalambopoulos's Trial Brief in Support of Introducing Information Regarding Ms. Grammer's Insurance Coverage at Trial filed by Camille Grammer. (axm)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 (Document Restricted) Sealed Opposition and Response to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Dimitri Charalambopoulos's Trial Brief in Support of Introducing Information Regarding Ms. Grammer's Insurance Coverage at Trial filed by Camille Grammer re: #329 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document. (axm)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting #321 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The clerk shall file under seal Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's Opposition and Response to Plaintiffs Brief and Memorandum in Support of Introducing Information Regarding Grammer's Insurance Coverage at Trial [Doc. No. 321-1] and Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's Appendix to Opposition and Response to Plaintiffs Brief and Memorandum in Support of Introducing Information Regarding Grammer's Insurance Coverage at Trial [Doc. No. 321-2]. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/3/2019) (axm)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #329 Sealed Trial Brief on the Admissibility of Evidence Relating to Liability Insurance filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (axm)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 (Document Restricted) Sealed Trial Brief on the Admissibility of Evidence Relating to Liability Insurance filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (axm)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #325 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The clerk shall file under seal Plaintiffs Trial Brief on the Admissibility of Evidence Relating to Liability Insurance [Doc. No. 325-1] and Plaintiffs Appendix [Doc. No. 325-2]. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/3/2019) (axm)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Exhibit List -- Joint by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Exhibit List Second Amended by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Bender, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 First Amended Proposed Jury Charge filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Bender, Andrew) Modified on 4/2/2019 (svc).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Proposed Jury Charge filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Bender, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Proposed Jury Charge filed by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Pretrial Conference held on 3/29/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Andrew Bender, Joe Fisher, II and Guy Fisher; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan and Thomas Conner. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 3:10. (chmb)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #317 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection filed by Camille Grammer. (mla)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #314 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/28/2019) (mla)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection to re: #311 Sealed Objection filed by Camille Grammer. (mla)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #313 Amended Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Deposition Designation Objection Codes) (Rohan, Richard)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Exhibit List First Amended by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Opposition and Response to Pl's Objections to Testimony of Dr. Bethany Tucker, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix to Opposition and Response to Objections re Tucker) (Rohan, Richard)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. Amendment to #275 Designation of Deposition,. . (Attachments: #1 Maureen Donatacci 4.5.16, #2 Andrew Scott MacLean 3.10.15, #3 Andrew Scott MacLean 6.21.16) (Fisher, Guy)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 3/20/2019 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (52 pages) Redaction Request due 4/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2019. (lms)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 (Document Restricted) Sealed Objection to #264 Designation of Deposition filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (mla)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The clerk shall file under seal Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Dimitri Charalambopoulos' Objections to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's Deposition Designations and exhibits attached thereto [ECF Nos. 289-1, 289-2]. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/22/2019) (mla)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response in Opposition to #284 Motion in Limine filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (axm)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The clerk shall file under seal Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Dimitri Charalambopoulos' Response m Opposition to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's Motion in Limine [ECF No. 278-1]. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/22/2019) (axm) Modified text and linkage on 3/22/2019 (axm).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Guy Fisher and Joe Fisher, II; Defense - Richard Rohan, Ashley Yeargan and Thomas Conner. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 3:40. (chmb)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial is set for 4/15/2019 08:00 AM in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/20/2019) (chmb) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (ndt).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Continuation of Pretrial Conference is reset for 4/3/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/20/2019) (chmb)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Continuation of Pretrial Conference is set for 3/29/2019 10:00 AM in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/20/2019) (chmb)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Guy Fisher, Joe Fisher, Kirk Lechtenberger, Andrew Bender, Richard Rohan, Thomas Conner. Prv Fee: $5,100.00. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (mla)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 (Document Restricted)DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF CAMILLE GRAMMERSAPPENDIX TO OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS re: #292 Designation of Deposition filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (svc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 (Document Restricted) Sealed Order GRANTING UNOPPOSEDMOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/14/2019) (svc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #299 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection filed by Camille Grammer (svc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Brief in Opposition to Motion re: #288 Motion in Limine filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos filed by Camille Grammer (svc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #293 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/14/2019) (svc)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE TESTIMONY OF DR. BETHANY TUCKER by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #267 Proposed Pretrial Order (Rohan, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #269 Proposed Jury Charge/Instructions (Rohan, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 (Document Restricted) Motion For Leave To File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Def's Response and Brief in Opposition to Pl's Mtn in Limine, #2 Exhibit(s) Appx to Response and Brief) (Rohan, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Designation of Deposition by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Attachments: #1 Dr. Bethany J. Tucker, #2 Maureen Donatacci) (Fisher, Guy)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS . (Attachments: #1 Al-Zahir Born, #2 Dana Kantalis, #3 Andrew Scott MacLean, #4 Alycia Hughes-McKissack) (Fisher, Guy) Modified text on 3/14/2019 (ykp).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #288 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (ndt)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 (Document Restricted) Sealed Objection re: #264 Designation of Deposition (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/3/2015) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1. Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Deposition Designations, #2 Exhibit(s) 2. Deposition Excerpts) (Fisher, Guy)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 (Document Restricted) Sealed Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Dimitri Charalambopoulos' Motion in Limine and Brief in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (ndt)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #273 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/13/2019) (ndt)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #284 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion filed by Camille Grammer. (ndt)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 OBJECTION filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #276 Witness List (Fisher, Guy)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 (Document Restricted) Sealed Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's Motion in Limine and Brief in Support filed by Camille Grammer. (ndt)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #268 Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Rohan, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #275 Designation of Deposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Rohan, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 OBJECTION filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #265 Exhibit List (Fisher, Guy)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #272 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/13/2019) (ndt)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #271 Witness List (Rohan, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #272 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/3/2015) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1. Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine) (Fisher, Guy)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Defendant Grammer's Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures for April 2019 Trial Setting filed by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Witness List by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Designation of Deposition by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Attachments: #1 Al-Zahir Born, #2 Howard Bragman, #3 Maureen Donatacci, #4 Dana Kantalis, #5 Andrew Scott MacLean 3.10.15, #6 Andrew Scott MacLean 6.21.16, #7 Alycia Hughes-McKissack, #8 Sharif Nagib, #9 Dr. Pedro Ramirez, #10 Kristina Royster, #11 Matthew Vo) (Fisher, Guy)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Proposed Voir Dire by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine, #2 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Appendix) (Fisher, Guy)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex 1-Grammer's Motion in Limine and Brief in Support (filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit(s) Ex 2-Grammer's Appendix to Motion in Limine and Brief in Support) (Rohan, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Witness List by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Proposed Voir Dire by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Proposed Jury Charge filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Exhibit List by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Proposed Pretrial Order by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Exhibit List by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Designation of Deposition by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of 263 Fri Feb 22 12:14:33 CST 2019 (crt)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pretrial Conference is set for 3/20/2019 10:00 AM in the US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. The Court expects the parties to review the recently updated Judge Specific Requirements, located at: http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/judge/district-judge-karen-gren-scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/21/2019) (chmb)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 12/7/2018 before Judge Scholer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lanie Smith, Telephone number (214) 753-2354. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (10 pages) Redaction Request due 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019. (lms)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:259. Tue Dec 11 11:00:26 CST 2018 (crt)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:260. Tue Dec 11 09:04:41 CST 2018 (crt)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 4/1/2019 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. The setting is for a thirty-day docket. A pretrial conference in this case is set for Wednesday, 3/20/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 3/6/2019. The parties shall file objections to the above pretrial materials by 3/13/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/10/2018) (ykp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/25/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/10/2018) (aaa)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Letter to Judge Concerning Trial Setting filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Status Conference held on 12/7/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kirk Lechtenberger, Andrew Bender, Joe Fisher and Guy Fisher; Defense - Richard Rohan and Thomas Conner. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:04. (chmb)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints William Royal Furgeson as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/7/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/7/2018) (zkc)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 257. Fri Dec 7 10:28:07 CST 2018 (crt)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AFTER CASE TRANSFER: Status Conference set for 12/7/2018 12:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/13/2018) (zkc)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Court Request for Reassignment: Judge Sidney A Fitzwater no longer assigned to case. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:14-CV-2424-S. (axm)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE of Filing of Guarantee Deposit Bond filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER denying #248 Motion for Reconsideration; granting #248 Motion to Reopen Case. The clerk of court is directed to reopen this case statistically, the stay is lifted, and this case is set for trial on the two-week docket of 4/1/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/13/2018) (rekc)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 REPLY filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #251 Response/Objection, (Fisher, Guy)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE filed by Camille Grammer re: #248 MOTION for Reconsideration re #245 Memorandum Opinion and Order Staying the Proceedings MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION to Vacate Order Staying the ProceedingsMOTION to Set the Case for Trial (Rohan, Richard)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guy G Fisher for Andrew B. Bender on behalf of Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #248 MOTION for Reconsideration re #245 Memorandum Opinion and Order Staying the Proceedings MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION to Vacate Order Staying the ProceedingsMOTION to Set the Case for Trial (Fisher, Guy)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION for Reconsideration re #245 Memorandum Opinion and Order Staying the Proceedings, MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION to Vacate Order Staying the Proceedings, MOTION to Set the Case for Trial filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Fisher, Guy)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 USCA5 COURT ORDER denying petition for writ of mandamus filed by Petitioner Mr. Dimitri Charalambopoulos. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioners motion to place exhibits in support of petition under seal is GRANTED. (svc)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Richard A Rohan on behalf of Camille Grammer. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Rohan, Richard)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants Grammer's #228 motion to stay proceedings pending plaintiff's or his counsel's satisfaction of attorney's fee award. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/23/2018) (sss)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated per #245 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (sss)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL: The court has received the Help Desk Inquiry that pertains to #236 counsel's November 10, 2017 letter regarding conflicts with the current trial setting. The court has awaited responding while assessing its ability to accommodate any of the alternate dates proposed in the letter and due to the pending motion to stay. In order to eliminate any uncertainty about the March 19, 2018 setting, however, the court advises counsel that they may assume that the case will be removed from that docket and will not go to trial on that docket. (Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater).
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply Brief/Memorandum in Support re: #228 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion filed by Camille Grammer. (ndt)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #241 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Camille Grammer. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/11/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Def's Reply Brief in Support of Mtn to Stay Proceedings (Filed Under Seal)) (Rohan, Richard)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Brief in Opposition re: #228 Sealed MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (sss)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #238 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/20/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Fisher, Guy)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #235 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Stay. Responses due by 11/20/2017. Replies due by 12/11/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/13/2017) (axm)
November 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Scheduling Conflicts re: #234 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #228 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO STAY filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fisher, Guy)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER: Jury Trial reset for two-week docket of 3/19/2018 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1525, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/7/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Plaintiff's Supplemental Witness List, #2 Exhibit(s) B Plaintiff's Supplemental Exhibit List) (Fisher, Guy)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Exhibit List by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Witness List by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #228 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/13/2017) filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 (Document Restricted) MOTION TO STAY filed by Camille Grammer. (epm)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #218 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's or His Counsel's Satisfaction of Attorneys' Fee Award. The court directs the clerk of court to file under seal ECF document No. [219-1], which is Grammer's motion to stay. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/23/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #218 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's or His Counsel's Satisfaction of Attorneys' Fee Award (Rohan, Richard)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #218 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's or His Counsel's Satisfaction of Attorneys' Fee Award (Fisher, Guy)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #222 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 8/16/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/19/2017) (epm)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #218 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's or His Counsel's Satisfaction of Attorneys' Fee Award filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #218 Motion to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's or His Counsel's Satisfaction of Attorneys' Fee Award filed by Camille Grammer. (ndt)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #219 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Camille Grammer. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/13/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix to Motion to Modify Scheduling Order) (Rohan, Richard)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's or His Counsel's Satisfaction of Attorneys' Fee Award filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #197 MOTION to Compel filed by Camille Grammer. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/7/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER ON IN CAMERA INSPECTION. Production due by 5/10/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/3/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Unsealed, redacted version of #211 Sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #105 and #111 and ordering in camera inspection. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/22/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 (Document Restricted) Joint Request to Leave Sealed Portions of the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order (Sealed pursuant to order dated 3/8/2017) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Rohan, Richard)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER: The court has today filed #211 a sealed memorandum opinion and order in this case. The memorandum opinion and order is filed under seal because it may disclose materials submitted under seal during the briefing process. Because this litigation is a matter of public record, the court concludes that the entire memorandum opinion and order should not remain sealed. Instead, only the parts that should be protected from public disclosure will remain sealed. Accordingly, within 14 days of the date the memorandum opinion and order is filed, the parties must file a joint request identifying the parts that they request remain sealed. If they cannot agree on a particular joint request, they must state an individual request and explain why agreement could not be reached as to that request. The court grants the parties leave to file the joint request under seal. The clerk of court is directed to file this order as a public document. Response due by 3/22/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/8/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 (Document Restricted) Sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #105 and #111 and ordering in camera inspection. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/8/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER conditionally granting #116 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order, filed by Camille Grammer; granting #133 Motion for bifurcated trial of exemplary damages, filed by Camille Grammer; granting #134 Motion to strike Charalambopoulos' designation of Dr. Ramirez, filed by Camille Grammer; granting in part and denying in part #142 Motion to Strike Francis, filed by Camille Grammer, and granting motion to strike re-designation of Francis as an affirmative expert; granting in part and denying in part #144 Motion to Strike Charalambopoulos' expert Collins, filed by Camille Grammer; granting in part and denying in part #146 Motion to Strike Charalambopoulos' expert Browning, filed by Camille Grammer; and denying #148 Motion to Strike filed Charalambopoulos' expert Dr. Gruszecki, filed by Camille Grammer. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/8/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #197 MOTION to Compel (Conner, Thomas)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part, denying in part #139 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Camille Grammer. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/15/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #206 Response/Objection to Motion to Compel (Fisher, Guy)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #197 MOTION to Compel (Fisher, Guy)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER: The court resets the trial of this case to the two-week docket of December 4, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/9/2017) (aaa)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 RESPONSE filed by Camille Grammer re: #199 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Rohan, Richard)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Letter and Response to Court filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos, re #199 Order. (Fisher, Guy) Modified text on 1/30/2017 (mem).
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 (Document Restricted) Sealed Exhibit 1-B to Appendix in Support of #197 MOTION to Compel filed by Camille Grammer. (twd)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ELECTRONIC ORDER #200 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/25/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B) (Conner, Thomas)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER: There are several pending motions in this case that the court has concluded should be decided before the parties must make pretrial filings and prepare for trial. To reduce theburdens on the parties caused by their preparing for trial without the benefit of the court's rulings, the court on its own initiative resets the trial of this case to the two-week docket of 7/24/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/25/2017) (ndt)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #197 MOTION to Compel (Conner, Thomas)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION to Compel filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Conner, Thomas)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #194 Motion Partially Modify Scheduling Order, so as to permit Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer to file a motion to compel discovery. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/25/2017) (epm)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #194 MOTION Partially Modify Scheduling Order (Conner, Thomas)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION Partially Modify Scheduling Order filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Conner, Thomas)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #188 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to Take Discovery filed by Camille Grammer. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/6/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #188 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to Take Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration (Rohan, Richard)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #188 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to Take Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration (Fisher, Guy)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER: Defendant-counterplaintiff Camille Grammer's request for expedited consideration of her #188 MOTION to partially modify scheduling order to permit defendant-counterplaintiff to take discovery concerning plaintiff-counterdefendant's ability to satisfy attorney's fee award is granted. Response due by 11/30/2016. Reply due by 12/5/2016 re: #188 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to Take Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/22/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #188 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to Take Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration (Rohan, Richard)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order to Permit Defendant to Take Discovery and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
November 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Inability to Pay Court Ordered Attorney's Fees filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Fisher, Guy)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTE: The documents attached were originally available in paper format only and are now attached here for electronic viewing in the clerk's office. Content includes items referenced in docket entries as -in paper- or -too large- etc. They were scanned in chronological order but are not separated with individual hyperlinks. The viewer is advised to scroll through content in order to locate requested material. (ali)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER: The court on its own initiative continues the trial to the two-week docket of Monday, 3/20/2017 before Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. Unexpired deadlines based on the prior trial setting, however, are hereby reset so that the parties shall now comply with them on the basis of the new setting. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/26/2016) (ykp)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #100 MOTION for Relief from Court Order Pursuant to FRCvP 60(b) or in the Alternative, Motion for Stay or in the Alternative Motion for Severance Pursuant to FRCvP 21 and/or Motion for Certification of Judgment Pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/13/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Notice of Manual Filing of 1 CD-non-documentary material containing Exhibit 1-A to the Appendix re #182 Appendix in Support. See Records Department. (epm)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #181 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Rohan, Richard)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Rohan, Richard)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #157 Appendix in Support, (Rohan, Richard)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #175 Reply filed by Camille Grammer. (epm)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #177 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/21/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #175 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Pl's Designation of Ramirez (Rohan, Richard)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #134 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Pedro Ramirez as an Expert for Plaintiff (Rohan, Richard)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #144 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Joanna Collins (Rohan, Richard)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #146 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert John Browning (Rohan, Richard)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #142 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Livia Liu Francis, Motion to Strike Re-Designation of Francis as an Affirmative Expert (Rohan, Richard)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #148 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Amy Gruszecki (Rohan, Richard)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #169 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 9/22/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/2/2016) (epm)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #160 Response/Objection, #164 Response/Objection, #153 Response/Objection, #167 Response/Objection, #166 Response/Objection, #162 Response/Objection, #155 Response/Objection filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #156 Brief/Memorandum in Support of #155 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (trk)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #133 MOTION Bifurcated trial of exemplary damages (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #142 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Livia Liu Francis, Motion to Strike Re-Designation of Francis as an Affirmative Expert (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #164 Response/Objection (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #146 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert John Browning (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #134 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Pedro Ramirez as an Expert for Plaintiff (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #160 Response/Objection to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's Motion to Strike Joanna Collins (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #144 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Joanna Collins (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #157 Appendix in Support, #156 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/3/2015) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-L and 2-C) (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Sealed Appendix in Support re: #157 Appendix in Support, #156 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/3/2015) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-L and 2-C) (Fisher, Guy) Modified event and text on 8/25/2016 (dsr).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #156 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion Response to Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 A-B, #2 Exhibit(s) 1 C-D, #3 Exhibit(s) 1 E-F, #4 Exhibit(s) 1 G-K, #5 Exhibit(s) 2 A-F, #6 Exhibit(s) 3 A-H) (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #155 Response/Objection to Motion for Summary Judgment (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #153 Response/Objection to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's Motion to Strike Dr. Amy Gruszecki and Brief in Support (Fisher, Guy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #148 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Amy Gruszecki (Fisher, Guy)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Responses due by 8/25/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/1/2016) (rekc)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #134 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Pedro Ramirez as an Expert for Plaintiff, #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #142 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Livia Liu Francis, Motion to Strike Re-Designation of Francis as an Affirmative Expert, #146 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert John Browning, #148 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Amy Gruszecki, #133 MOTION Bifurcated trial of exemplary damages, #144 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Joanna Collins filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Exhibit 1-C on disk to #141 Appendix in Support of #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Camille Grammer. (Disk on file in records department.) (twd)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #148 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Amy Gruszecki (Rohan, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Amy Gruszecki filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #146 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert John Browning (Rohan, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert John Browning filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #144 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Joanna Collins (Rohan, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Joanna Collins filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #142 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Livia Liu Francis, Motion to Strike Re-Designation of Francis as an Affirmative Expert (Rohan, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Livia Liu Francis, Motion to Strike Re-Designation of Francis as an Affirmative Expert filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #140 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1A-1T, #2 Exhibit(s) 1U-1Y, #3 Exhibit(s) 1Z-2, #4 Exhibit(s) 2A-2F, #5 Exhibit(s) 2G-3A) (Conner, Thomas)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Conner, Thomas)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Camille Grammer (Conner, Thomas)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 (Document Restricted) Sealed Exhibit 1-G to Appendix in Support of #134 MOTION to Strike filed by Camille Grammer. (twd)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING #136 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/15/2016) (twd)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/3/2015) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #134 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Pedro Ramirez as an Expert for Plaintiff (Rohan, Richard)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Dr. Pedro Ramirez as an Expert for Plaintiff filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION Bifurcated trial of exemplary damages filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #131 Reply to Motion to Partially Modify Scheduling Order (Conner, Thomas)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #116 MOTION Partially Modify Scheduling Order (Conner, Thomas)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Service of Second Amended Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Estimate of Trial Length filed by Camille Grammer. (Conner, Thomas)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING #127 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO PARTIALLY MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER: It is ORDERED that the scheduling order is modified so that the discovery deadline is extended solely to permit Camille Grammer to take the deposition of Scott MacLean after 6/15/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/14/2016) (trk)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order filed by Camille Grammer (Conner, Thomas)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #111 MOTION for Sanctions (Conner, Thomas)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #116 MOTION Partially Modify Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5) (Fisher, Guy)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 (Document Restricted) Sealed Reply Brief in Support of Motion re: #105 Motion to Compel Discovery, filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (aaa)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #122 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/7/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal re: #114 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 9/3/2015) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery) (Fisher, Guy) Modified event and title on 6/6/2016 (awc).
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #120 Response/Objection to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5) (Fisher, Guy)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #111 MOTION for Sanctions (Fisher, Guy)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Brief re: #105 Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Camille Grammer. (aaa)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion #114 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/20/2016) (aaa)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #116 MOTION Partially Modify Scheduling Order (Rohan, Richard)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION Partially Modify Scheduling Order filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Rohan, Richard)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #114 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection and Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Rohan, Richard)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 (Document Restricted) Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1) (Rohan, Richard) Modified event and title on 5/20/2016 (sss).
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #110 Motion Partially Modify Scheduling Order Discovery due by 6/15/2016. Motions due by 7/15/2016. Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/9/2016) (mem)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #111 MOTION for Sanctions (Rohan, Richard)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rohan, Richard)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Partially Modify Scheduling Order filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos, Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rohan, Richard)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #100 MOTION for Relief from Court Order Pursuant to FRCvP 60(b) or in the Alternative, Motion for Stay or in the Alternative Motion for Severance Pursuant to FRCvP 21 and/or Motion for Certification of Judgment Pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) (Fisher, Guy)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery [105-1]; Exhibit 5 [Doc. 105-7]; and Exhibit 6 [105-8] filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/29/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery [105-1]; Exhibit 5 [Doc. 105-7]; and Exhibit 6 [105-8] filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Compel Discovery, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s)) (Fisher, Guy)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE filed by Camille Grammer re: #100 MOTION for Relief from Court Order Pursuant to FRCvP 60(b) or in the Alternative, Motion for Stay or in the Alternative Motion for Severance Pursuant to FRCvP 21 and/or Motion for Certification of Judgment Pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) (Conner, Thomas)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER on #100 temporarily staying obligation to pay attorney's fees awarded in #99 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Unless the court grants in whole or in part #100 the Motion for Relief from Court Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b) or in the Alternative, Motion for Stay or in the Alternative Motion for Severance Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 and/or Motion for Certification of Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos, this stay will terminate automatically when the court decides plaintiff-counterdefendant's motion. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/30/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Service Responses to Second Requests for Admissions and Fourth Set of Request for Production filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #100 MOTION Motion for Relief from Court Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b) or in the Alternative, Motion for Stay or in the Alternative Motion for Severance Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 and/or Motion for Certification of Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5 (Fisher, Guy)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for Relief from Court Order Pursuant to FRCvP 60(b) or in the Alternative, Motion for Stay or in the Alternative Motion for Severance Pursuant to FRCvP 21 and/or Motion for Certification of Judgment Pursuant to FRCvP 54(b) filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy) Docket text modified on 3/30/2016 (twd).
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #67 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Camille Grammer. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/10/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #97 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. The following amended deadlines are imposed: To complete discovery and file a joint estimate of trial length and joint status report concerning the progress of settlement negotiations by 5/15/2016. To file a summary judgment motion by 6/15/2016. To file a motion not otherwise covered by the Court's Scheduling Order by 6/15/2016. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/8/2016) (ran)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos, Camille Grammer (Conner, Thomas)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's Second Set of Interrogatories and Third Requests for Production of Documents filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Dimitri Charalambopoulos' SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #94 (Fisher, Guy) Modified on 1/25/2016 (gr).
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Fourth AMENDED ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand, filed by Camille Grammer, COUNTERCLAIM against Dimitri Charalambopoulos filed by Camille Grammer (Conner, Thomas)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 THIRD AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Camille Grammer, THIRD AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Dimitri Charalambopoulos filed by Camille Grammer. (axm)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #90 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Camille Grammer (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/30/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #90 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #70 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim (Rohan, Richard)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #70 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Def's Third Amended Answer and Third Amended Counterclaim) (Rohan, Richard)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Protection re: #80 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Rule 11) (Fisher, Guy)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Camille Grammer and First Amended Answer to Counterclaim filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #86 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and First Amended Answer to Counterclaim filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/28/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #70 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos [See document #88 for image]. (axm)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and First Amended Answer to Counterclaim filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Second Amended Complaint and First Amended Answer to Counterclaim, #2 Proposed Order) (Fisher, Guy)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Service of Responses and/or Objections to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's Second Request for Production filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Resetting trial to Two-Docket of 12/5/2016 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1525, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/21/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Letter to Hon. Sidney A. Fitzwater re: #82 Scheduling Order filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for two-week docket beginning 10/3/2016 before Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/9/2015) (chmb)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order Referring Motion for Determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) re: #80 MOTION for Protective Order. The Magistrate Judge may conduct a hearing if he/she determines that a hearing is necessary. This order of reference also prospectively refers all procedural motions (e.g., to modify briefing limitations, to supplement a motion, or for an expedited hearing) hereafter filed by a party who supports or opposes the referred motion, and that relate to the resolution of the motion. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/9/2015) (ndt)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ***WITHDRAWN PER #89 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL*** MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Fisher, Guy) Modified on 12/29/2015 (axm).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying #78 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/4/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Subpoena of Micahel D. Park, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Subpoena of Joe D. Morris, #3 Proposed Order) (Fisher, Guy)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure of Rebuttal Expert Testimony filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Michael D. Park served on 11/21/2015. (bdb)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Other Expenses Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Conner, Thomas)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure of Expert Testimony filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure of Expert Testimony filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy) Modified text on 10/1/2015 (jrr).
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Other Expenses Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fisher, Guy)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/3/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER WITH JURY DEMAND AND COUNTERCLAIM filed by Camille Grammer. (tln)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: As set forth in this memorandum opinion and order, the court grants Grammer's July 1, 2015 #57 motion to amend/correct her first amended answer and counterclaim; grants Grammer's July 30, 2015 #62 motion for protective order; grants Charalambopoulos' July 10, 2015 #58 amended motion to amend/correct scheduling order; and grants in part and denies in part Grammer's July 31, 2015 #65 motion to amend/correct/partially modify scheduling order. The court amends the scheduling order as set forth in today's order. By separate order, the court will enter the protective order. The court directs the clerk of court to docket the proposed second amended answer and counterclaim submitted with Grammer's motion. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/3/2015) (tln)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Other Expenses Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Conner, Thomas)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Other Expenses Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Conner, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Estimate of Trial Length filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos, Camille Grammer. (Conner, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Amend/Correct /Partially Modify Scheduling Order filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Conner, Thomas)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Camille Grammer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Protective Order) (Conner, Thomas)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #58 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order (Fisher, Guy)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #59 Response/Objection to Motion for Amended Scheduling Order (Conner, Thomas)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE filed by Camille Grammer re: #58 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order (Conner, Thomas)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct Her First Amended Answer and Counterclaim filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Conner, Thomas)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Service of Responses and/or Objections to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Camille Grammer's First Set of Requests for Production filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Service of Second Requests for Production filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Camille Grammer. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/22/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #51 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Conner, Thomas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Conner, Thomas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #44 Supplemental Document, #42 Response/Objection, (Conner, Thomas)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING THE #46 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF SHARIF NAGIB. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/7/2015) (twd)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING THE #47 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF NADIA WALLACE. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/7/2015) (twd)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File To Take The Deposition of Nadia Wallace filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File To Take The Deposition of Nagib Sharif filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Defendant-counterplaintiff's reply brief in support of her #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act is due no later than May 8, 2015, or at a later time approved by the court. Reply brief due by 5/8/2015. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/29/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Supplemental Document by Dimitri Charalambopoulos as to #43 Appendix in Support . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 4, #2 Exhibit(s) 5, #3 Exhibit(s) 6, #4 Exhibit(s) 7, #5 Exhibit(s) 8, #6 Exhibit(s) 9, #7 Exhibit(s) 10, #8 Exhibit(s) 11, #9 Exhibit(s) 12) (Fisher, Guy)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #42 Response/Objection, (Fisher, Guy)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 4, #2 Exhibit(s) 5, #3 Exhibit(s) 6, #4 Exhibit(s) 7, #5 Exhibit(s) 8, #6 Exhibit(s) 9, #7 Exhibit(s) 10, #8 Exhibit(s) 11, #9 Exhibit(s) 12) (Fisher, Guy)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Service of Requests for Production to Camille Grammer filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Camille Grammer; denying in part as moot and in part on the merits #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Camille Grammer; granting in part and denying in part #23 MOTION for Discovery filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos; and denying #34 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Camille Grammer. The court grants Charalambopoulos 60 days from the date this memorandum opinion and order is filed to complete specified and limited discovery and 90 days from the date this memorandum opinion and order is filed to file a supplemental response to Grammer's motion to dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/29/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #23 MOTION for Discovery (Fisher, Guy)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #37 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Conduct Discovery (Conner, Thomas)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE filed by Camille Grammer re: #23 MOTION for Discovery (Conner, Thomas)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #34 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Conner, Thomas)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER directing Camille Grammer to file brief addressing whether #34 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act is governed by Texas substantive and/or procedural law, and the supporting authorities for her position. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/17/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Camille Grammer (Conner, Thomas)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing DVD re: #31 Appendix in Support, #30 Reply filed by Camille Grammer. To Be Found in Voluminous Documents. (cea)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Conner, Thomas)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #30 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Conner, Thomas)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY filed by Camille Grammer re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Conner, Thomas)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OBJECTION filed by Camille Grammer re: #20 Response/Objection, (Conner, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 the parties Joint Motion for Leave to File Under Seal seal. The clerk shall file under seal Exhibit E to Charalambopouloss Response to Grammars Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (ECF No. 20-2, page 35), previously filed with this Court on 9/2/14, and shall file under seal the attachment (ECF No. 26-1) to the parties instant joint motion. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/9/2014) (gr)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION Leave to File Under Seal re #20 Response/Objection, filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) E) (Fisher, Guy) Modified on 9/9/2014; exh 1 sealed pursuant to order #27 (gr).
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #24 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Fisher, Guy)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #23 MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-A) (Fisher, Guy)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Discovery filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos (Fisher, Guy)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Fisher, Guy)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re #20 Response/Objection, (Fisher, Guy)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, A-C, #2 Exhibit(s) D-H, #3 Exhibit(s) I-J, #4 Exhibit(s) K-L, #5 Exhibit(s) 2-3, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Fisher, Guy) Modified on 9/9/2014, Exh 2 sealed pursuant to order #27 (gr).
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2015. Discovery due by 8/1/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 1/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2015. Status Report due by 8/1/2015. The court will set the case for trial by separate order. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/13/2014) (chmb)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #17 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #16 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Rohan, Richard)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Appendix in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #14 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Rohan, Richard)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Camille Grammer re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act (Rohan, Richard)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint Scheduling Proposal by Dimitri Charalambopoulos, Camille Grammer. (Rohan, Richard)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. (Fisher, Guy)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Dimitri Charalambopoulos. Related document: #4 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim.(Fisher, Guy)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with Jury Demand filed by Camille Grammer (Rohan, Richard)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ashley R. Yeargan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/22/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stanton L. Stein. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/22/2014) (Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6172915) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Yeargan, Ashley)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6172848) filed by Camille Grammer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Stein, Stanton)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Camille Grammer. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Dimitri Charalambopoulos filed by Camille Grammer (Conner, Thomas)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Scheduling Proposal due by 8/11/2014. (Ordered by Chief Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/10/2014) (chmb)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Fitzwater. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 101st Judicial District Court, case number DC-14-05826 filed by Camille Grammer. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-6144815) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A1, #3 Exhibit(s) A2, #4 Exhibit(s) A3, #5 Exhibit(s) A4, #6 Exhibit(s) A5, #7 Exhibit(s) A6, #8 Exhibit(s) B, #9 Exhibit(s) C - Certificate of Interested Parties, #10 Cover Sheet, #11 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Rohan, Richard)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Camille Grammer. See document #1 for image. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charalambopoulos v. Grammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitri Charalambopoulos
Represented By: Joe J Fisher
Represented By: Kirk F Lechtenberger
Represented By: Mark Christophe Sparks
Represented By: Andrew Benjamin Bender
Represented By: Guy G Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille Grammer
Represented By: Richard A Rohan
Represented By: Ashley R Yeargan
Represented By: Stanton Lawrence Stein
Represented By: Thomas Seth Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: William Royal Furgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?