The Inclusive Communities Project Inc v. Department of Treasury et al
Plaintiff: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc
Defendant: Department of Treasury and Office Comptroller of the Currency
Case Number: 3:2014cv03013
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Treasury, Office Comptroller of the Currency; denying 63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Inclusive Communities Project Inc.; and denying as moot 71 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Report and Testimony of Ann Owens filed by Department of Treasury, Office Comptroller of the Currency.(Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/6/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss filed by Office Comptroller of the Currency, Department of Treasury. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/28/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Office Comptroller of the Currency, Department of Treasury, and granting plaintiff leave to replead. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/4/2015) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc v. Department of Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Inclusive Communities Project Inc
Represented By: Laura Beth Beshara
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Comptroller of the Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?