Highpoint Risk Services LLC v. Companion Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Plaintiff: |
Highpoint Risk Services LLC |
Defendant: |
Companion Property & Casualty Insurance Co |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv03398 |
Filed: |
September 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam A Lindsay |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
87
Memorandum Opinion and Order re: 37 Defendant's Renewed Motion to Transfer Venue and Brief in Support; and 58 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Inadmissible Evidence Offered in Defendant's Appendix in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion to Transfer Venue and Brief in Support. The motion to strike is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the motion to transfer is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/25/2016) (mcrd)
|
September 24, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER: After careful consideration of the pleadings, file, record in this case, Report, and Defendant's objections to the Report, the court accepts the 25 magistrate judge's findings and conclusions. Accordingly, the court denies without prejudice Defendant's 8 Motion to Transfer Venue, and denies as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Defendant may refile its motion to transfer within 28 days of Plaintiff's filing in accordance with the 9/11/2015 order. The court gr ants in part and denies in part the parties' 30 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant's request to file its original answer on 10/9/2015 is granted. Because the court denies the motion to transfer without prejudice, Plaintiff's request to file its response to the objections on 10/15/2015, is denied as moot. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/24/2015) (bdb)
|
September 11, 2015 |
Filing
29
Order Accepting 24 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge: Accordingly, the court denies Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss, and grants Defendant's 6 Motion for an Order Requiring Joinder of Party Plaintiff. Accordingly, Plaintiff has to file an amended complaint by 9/25/2015, and add Aspen as a plaintiff to this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/11/2015) (twd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?