Speed et al v. The Bank Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Lakiesha Jackson Speed and Terry Speed
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP, CWABS Inc, Countrywide Home Loans Inc, The Bank of New York Trust Company NA, The Bank Of New York, Does 1 through 100, Inclusive and America's Wholesale Lender
Case Number: 3:2014cv03425
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Accepting 10 Findings and Recommendations on Case. The court dismisses without prejudice this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to comply with a court order. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/19/2014) (jrr)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Findings and Recommendations on Case: Plaintiff's action should be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). If, however, within 14 days of the date of this recommendation, Plaintiff complies with the Court's previous orders the Court should refer the case back to the undersigned for further pretrial management. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 11/18/2014) (mcrd)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court denies Plaintiff's 3 Application for Ex-Parte TRO and denies without prejudice Plaintiff's 3 Application for Temporary Injunction. The court also directs Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 10/01/2014, that is personally signed by him if he intends to proceed pro se, or a licensed attorney if he is represented by counsel. Additionally, all pleadings, motions, and papers filed by Plaintiff in this case in the future shall be persona lly signed by him or a licensed attorney of record in accordance with FRCvP 11(a). Failure to comply with this order will result in Plaintiff's pleadings being stricken or dismissal without prejudice of this action pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/24/2014) (twd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speed et al v. The Bank Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWABS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Trust Company NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Wholesale Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakiesha Jackson Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?