MCI Communications Services, Inc. et al v. 360Networks (USA) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Verizon Select Services Inc and MCI Communications Services Inc
Defendant: Granite Telecommunications, LLC, Bullseye Telecom Inc, Orbitcom Inc, North Dakota Telephone Company, United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation, Midstate Communications Inc, Polar Communications Mutual Aid Corporation, Turtle Mountain Communications Inc, Dickey Rural Telephone Cooperative, Missouri Valley Communications, Inc., Broadvox-CLEC LLC, Dakota Central Telecom I, Inc., 360Networks (USA) Inc., Nemont Telephone Cooperative Inc, Daktel Communications LLC, West River Telecommunications Cooperative, Polar Telecom Inc, Mid-Rivers Telephone Cooperative Inc, Level 3 Communications LLC, Dakota Central Telecommunications Cooperative, Midstate Telephone Company LLC, BEK Communications Cooperative, Integra Telecom of North Dakota Inc, Midstate Communications, Inc., Bandwidth.Com CLEC LLC, Reservation Telephone Cooperative, SRT Communications Inc, Midcontinent Communications, Inter-Community Telephone Company LLC, McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services LLC, Zayo Group LLC, McLeodUSA Telecommunication Services, Inc., First Communications LLC and AT&T Corp
Case Number: 3:2014cv04571
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Filing 115 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Godley, Tamerlin)
January 30, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #114 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. (twd)
January 30, 2018 Filing 114 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Hafenbrack, Joshua)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER STAYING COUNTERCLAIMS. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/24/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 24, 2018 Filing 112 Joint STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF VERIZON AND MIDCONTINENT COMMUNICATIONS filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Godley, Tamerlin)
January 12, 2018 Filing 111 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Attachment A) (Godley, Tamerlin)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: Having considered the 1/12/2018 joint status report of Verizon and Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC, the court accepts the parties' suggestion that the court delay consideration of the remand issue. Accordingly, the court directs that the parties update the court on the status of their settlement no later than 2/2/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/12/2018) (aaa)
January 12, 2018 Filing 109 Joint STATUS REPORT of Verizon and Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC filed by Bandwidth.Com CLEC LLC. (Blau, Russell)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Motion to Extend Time, for a two-month extensionof the case deadlines set forth in the Counterclaim Scheduling Order. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/10/2018) (epm)
January 10, 2018 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Case Deadlines filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hafenbrack, Joshua)
January 3, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T Williams on behalf of Level 3 Communications LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Williams, Michael)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/21/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
November 13, 2017 Filing 104 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Bandwidth.Com CLEC LLC. Related document: Counterclaim (Blau, Russell)
October 27, 2017 COUNTERCLAIM against Bandwidth.Com CLEC, LLC filed by MCI Communications Services Inc (see document #103 for image). (axm) Modified filer on 11/13/2017 (axm).
October 27, 2017 Filing 103 AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO #67 COUNTERCLAIMS FILED BY BANDWIDTH.COM CLEC, LLC filed by MCI Communications Services Inc. (sss)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #98 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/27/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
October 24, 2017 Filing 101 RESPONSE filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc re: #100 Notice (Other) (Godley, Tamerlin)
October 23, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of BullsEye Telecom, Inc. pursuant to Scheduling Order No. 3 filed by Bullseye Telecom Inc (Zoracki, Allen)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting the Parties' Joint Motion for Two-Week Extension to Remaining Deadlines Under Scheduling Order No. 3. It is ORDERED that the Parties may have an additional 14 days, until Monday, 10/16/2017, to meet and confer regarding LECs' claims for attorneys' fees, and until Monday, 10/23/2017, to submit papers for entry of judgments, and for LECs to inform IXCs of the amount of attorneys' fees they are seeking and the basis for award of fees. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/26/2017) (ash)
September 19, 2017 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaimsto Counterclaims filed by Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer and Counterclaims) (Hafenbrack, Joshua)
September 18, 2017 Filing 97 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Godley, Tamerlin)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR SECOND EXTENSION TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING STIPULATED FACTS: The Parties may have an additional 10 days, until Monday, 9/18/2017 to file their Joint Status Report, and that each of the later deadlines set forth in Scheduling Order No. 3 (ECF No. 235), as amended by the 8/18/2017 Order (ECF No. 239), shall be extended equally by 10 additional days. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/8/2017) (axm)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: The Court hereby grants the unopposed motion of Counterclaim Defendant MCI Services, Inc. d/b/a Verizon Business and Verizon Select Services, Inc., for a two-week extension of the case deadlines set forth in the Counterclaim Scheduling Order. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/29/2017) (sss)
August 29, 2017 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hafenbrack, Joshua)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting the Parties' Joint Motion for Two-Week Extension to Submit Joint Status Report Regarding Stipulated Facts. The Parties may have an additional 14 days, until 9/8/2017, to file their Joint Status Report, and each of the later deadlines set forth in Scheduling Order No. 3, as amended on 6/28/17, shall be extended equally by 14 additional days. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/18/2017) (ash)
August 1, 2017 Filing 92 AMENDED ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. Related document: #63 Counterclaim (Godley, Tamerlin) Modified on 8/2/2017 to enhance text (dss).
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER in case 3:14-MD-2587-D granting 236 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond. It is hereby ORDERED that the LECs may have an additional 14 days, until 7/21/2017, to respond to the IXCs' draft stipulated facts, and that each of the later deadlines set forth in Scheduling Order No. 3 (Dkt. No. 235 ) shall be extended equally by 14 additional days. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/28/2017) (ran)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 COUNTERCLAIM SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/20/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 3. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/1/2017) (ash)
May 25, 2017 Filing 88 ***DISREGARD, filed in wrong case per counsel*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H Angstreich for Scott Angstreich and Joshua Hafenbrack on behalf of MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Angstreich, Scott) Modified on 5/26/2017 (twd).
May 23, 2017 Filing 87 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Bandwidth.Com CLEC, LLC. (Bobeck, Joshua)
May 18, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H Angstreich for Scott H Angstreich and Joshua Hafenbrack on behalf of MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Angstreich, Scott)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying without prejudice #81 MOTION to Sever and Stay Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC's Non-IntraMTA Claims or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Remand Those Claims to the District of North Dakota filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/8/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Filed in 14-md-2587- ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY REMAINING DEADLINES IN SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that (1) all deadlines on after 1/13/2017 that are set forth in the Scheduling Order filed 7/19/2016 (ECF No. 201) are hereby stayed until otherwise ordered by the Court, and (2) within 20 days after the Court's resolution of the LECs' Motion to Dismiss Sprint's Amended Complaints (ECF No. 193) and Level 3's Motions to Dismiss the LECs' Complaints, the Parties shall submit a joint status report proposing appropriate procedures and deadlines for the case. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/11/2017) (ykp)
December 6, 2016 Filing 83 REPLY filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc re: #81 MOTION to Sever and Stay Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC's Non-IntraMTA Claims or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Remand Those Claims to the District of North Dakota (Godley, Tamerlin)
November 22, 2016 Filing 82 RESPONSE filed by Bandwidth.Com CLEC, LLC re: #81 MOTION to Sever and Stay Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC's Non-IntraMTA Claims or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Remand Those Claims to the District of North Dakota (Bobeck, Joshua)
November 1, 2016 Filing 81 MOTION to Sever and Stay Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC's Non-IntraMTA Claims or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Remand Those Claims to the District of North Dakota filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc (Godley, Tamerlin)
October 7, 2016 Filing 80 Joint STATUS REPORT OF VERIZON AND BANDWIDTH.COM CLEC, LLC IN REGARD TO NON-INTRAMTA CLAIMS filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. (Godley, Tamerlin)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: The LECs' 8/10/2016 208 motion for leave to file joint motion to strike certain affirmative defenses or for partial judgment on the pleadings on those defenses is denied without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/25/2016) (bdb)
July 22, 2016 Filing 78 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. Related document: #67 Counterclaim (Godley, Tamerlin)
July 21, 2016 Filing 77 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. Related document: #64 Counterclaim,,, (Maraschino, Margaret)
July 21, 2016 Filing 76 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. Related document: #63 Counterclaim (Maraschino, Margaret)
July 21, 2016 Filing 75 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. Related document: #62 Counterclaim (Maraschino, Margaret)
July 21, 2016 Filing 74 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. Related document: #68 Counterclaim (Maraschino, Margaret)
July 21, 2016 Filing 73 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. Related document: #66 Counterclaim (Maraschino, Margaret)
July 21, 2016 Filing 72 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. Related document: #69 Counterclaim (Maraschino, Margaret)
April 26, 2016 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadvox-CLEC, LLC re #67 Counterclaim (Bobeck, Joshua)
April 26, 2016 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bandwidth.Com CLEC, LLC re #65 Notice of Attorney Appearance (Bobeck, Joshua)
April 26, 2016 Filing 69 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Broadvox-CLEC, LLC (Thomas, Steven)
April 26, 2016 Filing 68 COUNTERCLAIM against MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. filed by Integra Telecom of North Dakota, Inc. (Merz, Gregory)
April 26, 2016 Filing 67 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Bandwidth.Com CLEC, LLC (Bobeck, Joshua)
April 26, 2016 Filing 66 COUNTERCLAIM against MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. filed by Bullseye Telecom, Inc. (Klein, Andrew)
April 26, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua M Bobeck on behalf of Bandwidth.Com CLEC, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bobeck, Joshua)
April 25, 2016 Filing 64 COUNTERCLAIM by North Dakota LEC Defendants against MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. filed by United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation, Midstate Communications, Inc., SRT Communications, Inc., Inter-Community Telephone Company, L.L.C., North Dakota Telephone Company, Polar Communications Mutual Aid Corporation, Polar Telecom, Inc., Mid-Rivers Telephone Cooperative Inc, Nemont Telephone Cooperative, Inc., Dakota Central Telecommunications Cooperative, Turtle Mountain Communications, Inc., Daktel Communications, LLC., Midstate Telephone Company, LLC, Missouri Valley Communications, Inc., Reservation Telephone Cooperative, BEK Communications Cooperative, West River Telecommunications Cooperative, Dakota Central Telecom I, Inc., Dickey Rural Telephone Cooperative (Hogue, David)
April 25, 2016 Filing 63 COUNTERCLAIM against MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. filed by Midcontinent Communications (Pelham, Zachary)
April 22, 2016 Filing 62 COUNTERCLAIM against MCI Communications Services Inc and Verizon Select Services Inc. filed by McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, L.L.C. (Johnson, Eric) Modified on 4/26/2016 (mem).
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The balance of defendants' 12/8/15 motion for leave to file counterclaims, for order establishing related procedures, and for status conference is granted. Plaintiffs' 12/10/15 request for extension of time to replead state claims is granted. And plaintiffs' 12/22/15 motion for final judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b), or, in the alternative, for certification review under 28 U.S.C. 1292, and for stay pending appeal is denied. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/16/2016) (ash)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting defendants' motion for leave to file counterclaims. The motion is granted to the extent that defendants may file counterclaims and may do so no later than 4/26/16. The court at this time is neither deciding the balance of defendants' motion, nor is it deciding plaintiffs' motion for final judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b), or, in the alternative, for certification review under 28 U.S.C. 1292, and for stay pending appeal. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/26/2016) (ash)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants' Lead Counsel, Defendants' Liaison Counsel, with leave to replead plaintiffs' state-law claims; denying MOTION to Dismiss on Primary Jurisdiction Grounds or, in the Alternative, for Stay Pending Referral. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/17/2015) (gr)
May 1, 2015 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadvox-CLEC, LLC. (Thomas, Steven)
April 24, 2015 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, L.L.C.. (Johnson, Eric)
April 16, 2015 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc. re #54 Summons Issued, #52 Amended Complaint,, Service of Summons on Defendant Midstate Communications Inc. (Maraschino, Margaret)
April 6, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Coates Watkins for James F. Bendernagel and Michael J. Hunseder on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Watkins, Emily)
March 31, 2015 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to Midstate Communications Inc. (ctf)
March 30, 2015 Filing 53 ***DISREGARD, INCORRECT SUMMONS ISSUED***Summons Issued as to Zayo Group LLC. (ndt) Modified on 3/31/2015 (ctf).
March 27, 2015 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services Inc. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Godley, Tamerlin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 360Networks (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Zayo Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Zayo Group, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Onvoy, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Communications Infrastructure Investments, LLC for 360Networks (USA) Inc.. (Blau, Russell)
March 19, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell M Blau on behalf of 360Networks (USA) Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Blau, Russell)
February 27, 2015 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Blau, Russell)
February 10, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Christopher Falvey for Steven H. Thomas, Troy P. Majoue and Jennifer M. Larson on behalf of Broadvox-CLEC, LLC. (Falvey, James)
January 30, 2015 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bullseye Telecom, Inc.. (Klein, Andrew)
January 30, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Marc Klein for Andrew Klein, Philip Macres and Allen Zoracki on behalf of Bullseye Telecom, Inc.. (Klein, Andrew)
January 30, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Leon Carter, J Robert Arnett, II, Linda Stahl on behalf of MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Carter, E) Modified on 2/2/2015 (gr).
January 29, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Altresha Q Burchett -Williams on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Burchett -Williams, Altresha)
January 23, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas B Borton on behalf of First Communications LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Borton, Thomas)
January 22, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell M Blau on behalf of Bandwidth.Com CLEC, LLC, Granite Telecommunications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Blau, Russell)
January 22, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Merz on behalf of Integra Telecom of North Dakota, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Merz, Gregory)
January 21, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Stefan Johnson on behalf of McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, L.L.C.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Johnson, Eric)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CLICK ON FIRST CASE HYPERLINK REGARDLESS OF YOUR CASE NUMBER:CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This order applies to all cases transferred to this court by the JPML on 12/16/14, all tag-along cases later transferred to this court, and all related cases later filed in, removed to, ortransferred to this court. Unless the court otherwise directs, when a document is filed by the court and docketed in the Master Docket, it isdeemed filed and docketed in each individual case now pending or hereafter filed in this court that is part of this litigation. Unless the court otherwise directs, a party must make a filing only in an individual case orcases to which it is a party, not in the Master Docket. The court will conduct an initial scheduling conference on 2/18/2015 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1525, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. Parties may participate by telephone but must file in the Master Docket a request to do so. No later than 2/1315 at noon, the parties must file a brief written statement indicating their preliminaryunderstanding of the facts involved in the litigation and the critical factual and legal issues. No later than 2/13/15 at noon a party who has filed a pending motion in an individual case must file in the Master Docket a statement that identifies the motion. No later than 2/13/15 a party who is aware of a related case pending in federal or state court must file in the Master Docket an identifying statement. Applications for lead counsel and/or steering committee and liaison counsel for plas and dfts must be filed in the Master Docket no later than 2/13/15 at noon. Each dft is granted an extension of time to file response to cmp until date to be set. Pending the conference all pending disclosure and discovery are stayed. Prior to conference no motion shall be filed without leave of court. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/15/2015) (gr)
January 9, 2015 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Orbitcom, Inc.. (Pelham, Zachary)
January 9, 2015 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midcontinent Communications identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation for Midcontinent Communications. (Pelham, Zachary)
January 9, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary E Pelham on behalf of Orbitcom, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Pelham, Zachary)
January 9, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary E Pelham on behalf of Midcontinent Communications. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Pelham, Zachary)
January 5, 2015 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bullseye Telecom, Inc. Waiver sent on 11/21/2014. (Maraschino, Margaret)
January 1, 2015 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to McLeodUSA Telecommunication Services, Inc.. Waiver sent on 11/21/2014. (Godley, Tamerlin)
January 1, 2015 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Granite Telecommunications, LLC. Waiver sent on 11/21/2014. (Godley, Tamerlin)
January 1, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tamerlin J Godley on behalf of MCI Communications Services Inc, Verizon Select Services Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Godley, Tamerlin)
December 31, 2014 Filing 30 Case electronically transferred in from District of North Dakota; Case Number 3:14-cv-00088. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
December 30, 2014 Filing 29 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (1) (certified copy) transferring case to Northern District of Texas to be included in MDL Docket No. 2587. Case transferred via ECF extract civil case feature. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #21 , #22 , #23 , and #24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to documents and re-filed as SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED at #25 , #26 , #27 , and #28 . (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc. Level 3 Communications, LLC served on 12/22/2014, answer due 1/12/2015 (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc.. 360Networks (USA) Inc. served on 12/22/2014, answer due 1/12/2015 (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc.. Broadvox-CLEC, LLC served on 12/22/2014, answer due 1/12/2015 (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc. First Communications, LLC served on 12/22/2014, answer due 1/12/2015 (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 24 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Verizon Select Services Inc. (Murch, Douglas) Modified on 12/30/2014 to restrict access. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 23 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Verizon Select Services Inc. (Murch, Douglas) Modified on 12/30/2014 to restrict access. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 22 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Verizon Select Services Inc. (Murch, Douglas) Modified on 12/30/2014 to restrict access. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 21 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Verizon Select Services Inc. (Murch, Douglas) Modified on 12/30/2014 to restrict access. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc.. Integra Telecom of North Dakota, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (Murch, Douglas) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc.. AT&T Corp. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (Murch, Douglas) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 17, 2014 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hogue on behalf of BEK Communications Cooperative, Dakota Central Telecom I, Inc., Dakota Central Telecommunications Cooperative, Daktel Communications, LLC., Dickey Rural Telephone Cooperative, Inter-Community Telephone Company, L.L.C., Mid-Rivers Telephone Cooperative, Inc., Midstate Communications, Inc., Midstate Telephone Company, LLC, Missouri Valley Communications, Inc., Nemont Telephone Cooperative, Inc., North Dakota Telephone Company, Polar Communications Mutual Aid Corporation, Polar Telecom, Inc., Reservation Telephone Cooperative, SRT Communications, Inc., Turtle Mountain Communications, Inc., United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation, West River Telecommunications Cooperative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Defendants)(Hogue, David) Modified on 12/22/2014 to add "amended" text. (lc) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 17, 2014 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc.. BEK Communications Cooperative waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Dakota Central Telecom I, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Dakota Central Telecommunications Cooperative waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Daktel Communications, LLC. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Dickey Rural Telephone Cooperative waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Inter-Community Telephone Company, L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Mid-Rivers Telephone Cooperative, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Midstate Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Midstate Telephone Company, LLC waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Missouri Valley Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Nemont Telephone Cooperative, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; North Dakota Telephone Company waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Polar Communications Mutual Aid Corporation waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Polar Telecom, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Reservation Telephone Cooperative waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; SRT Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; Turtle Mountain Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; West River Telecommunications Cooperative waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (Murch, Douglas) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 17, 2014 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc.. Midcontinent Communications waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (Murch, Douglas) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 17, 2014 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc.. Orbitcom, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (Murch, Douglas) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 17, 2014 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Verizon Select Services Inc.. Bandwidth.Com CLEC, LLC waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (Murch, Douglas) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary E. Pelham on behalf of Orbitcom, Inc. (Pelham, Zachary) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 2, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary E. Pelham on behalf of Midcontinent Communications (Pelham, Zachary) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
December 1, 2014 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 Notice of Appearance. Clerk's office added additional 19 defendants as filers. (lh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
November 26, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hogue on behalf of BEK Communications Cooperative; Dakota Central Telecom I, Inc.; Dakota Central Telecommunications Cooperative; Daktel Communications, LLC.; Dickey Rural Telephone Cooperative; Inter-Community Telephone Company, L.L.C.; Midcontinent Communications; Mid-Rivers Telephone Cooperative, Inc.; Midstate Communications, Inc.; Midstate Telephone Company, LLC; Missouri Valley Communications, Inc.; Nemont Telephone Cooperative, Inc.; North Dakota Telephone Company; Polar Communications Mutual Aid Corporation; Polar Telecom, Inc.; Reservation Telephone Cooperative; SRT Communications, Inc.; Turtle Mountain Communications, Inc.; United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation; West River Telecommunications Cooperative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - list of Defendants represented)(Hogue, David) Modified on 12/1/2014 to add filers (lh). [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, L.L.C. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
November 17, 2014 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc.(as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
October 8, 2014 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation, West River Telecommunications Cooperative. (Second summons issued as to defendants inadvertently omitted in case opening) (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson. Case assigned to Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein for all further proceedings. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
September 19, 2014 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Verizon Select Services Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/22/2014. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to MCI Communications Services, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/22/2014. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
September 8, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
September 5, 2014 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, Inc., Verizon Select Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MCI Broadband Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent Terremark Worldwide, Inc., Corporate Parent Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Corporate Parent MCI Communications Corporation, Corporate Parent Verizon Business Global LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for MCI Communications Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc., Corporate Parent GTE Corporation, Corporate Parent NYNEX LLC, Corporate Parent Verizon Ventures LLC for Verizon Select Services Inc. (as) [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]
September 5, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 314000473) filed by Verizon Select Services Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as) Modified on 10/8/2014 to add two defendants omitted at case opening. (kmk). [Transferred from North Dakota on 12/31/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCI Communications Services, Inc. et al v. 360Networks (USA) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By: Russell M Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullseye Telecom Inc
Represented By: Philip James Macres
Represented By: Andrew Marc Klein
Represented By: Allen Clark Zoracki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitcom Inc
Represented By: Zachary E Pelham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota Telephone Company
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Telephone Mutual Aid Corporation
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstate Communications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Communications Mutual Aid Corporation
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Mountain Communications Inc
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickey Rural Telephone Cooperative
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Valley Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadvox-CLEC LLC
Represented By: Troy P Majoue
Represented By: James Christopher Falvey
Represented By: Steven H. Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer Larson Ryback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Central Telecom I, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360Networks (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Russell M Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nemont Telephone Cooperative Inc
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daktel Communications LLC
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West River Telecommunications Cooperative
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Telecom Inc
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Rivers Telephone Cooperative Inc
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level 3 Communications LLC
Represented By: Michael T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Central Telecommunications Cooperative
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstate Telephone Company LLC
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEK Communications Cooperative
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integra Telecom of North Dakota Inc
Represented By: Gregory Merz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstate Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandwidth.Com CLEC LLC
Represented By: Russell M Blau
Represented By: Joshua M Bobeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reservation Telephone Cooperative
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRT Communications Inc
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midcontinent Communications
Represented By: Zachary E Pelham
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Community Telephone Company LLC
Represented By: Steven A Lautt
Represented By: Gerard J Duffy
Represented By: David J Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services LLC
Represented By: Juliet Ann Cox
Represented By: Eric Stefan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zayo Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLeodUSA Telecommunication Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Communications LLC
Represented By: Thomas B Borton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Represented By: Altresha Q Burchett -Williams
Represented By: Michael J Hunseder
Represented By: James F Bendernagel, Jr
Represented By: Emily Coates Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verizon Select Services Inc
Represented By: Kim E Brust
Represented By: Joshua Hafenbrack
Represented By: J Robert Arnett, II
Represented By: Douglas W Murch
Represented By: E Leon Carter
Represented By: Margaret G Maraschino
Represented By: Linda R Stahl
Represented By: Henry Weissmann
Represented By: Scott H Angstreich
Represented By: Tamerlin J Godley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI Communications Services Inc
Represented By: Kim E Brust
Represented By: Joshua Hafenbrack
Represented By: J Robert Arnett, II
Represented By: Douglas W Murch
Represented By: E Leon Carter
Represented By: Margaret G Maraschino
Represented By: Linda R Stahl
Represented By: Henry Weissmann
Represented By: Scott H Angstreich
Represented By: Tamerlin J Godley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?