Warner v. Lear Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kevin L Warner
Defendant: Lear Corporation, International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America UAW Local 129, Federal Mediation & Conciliation Service and John Doe Mediator
Case Number: 3:2015cv01878
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lear Corporation; denying 49 MOTION Opposing Counsel Disqualification filed by Kevin L Warner; granting 53 Motion to Strike filed by Lear Corporation; denying 56 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Kevin L Warner; and denying 60 Motion to Amend filed by Kevin L Warner. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/9/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America UAW Local 129. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/5/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss filed by International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America UAW Local 129, and granting plaintiff leave to replead. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/28/2016) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Lear Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin L Warner
Represented By: Bruce Barrington McLeod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Magliolo
Represented By: Christopher Peter Mazzoli
Represented By: Andrew T Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America UAW Local 129
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Mediation & Conciliation Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Mediator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?