Brendel v. Meyrowitz et al
Plaintiff: |
Greg Brendel |
Defendant: |
Scott Meyrowitz, SSB International LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, Charles Schwab Bank and Mary Meyrowitz |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv01928 |
Filed: |
June 3, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Dallas Office |
County: |
Dallas |
Presiding Judge: |
Sidney A Fitzwater |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 12, 2018 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count III filed by Greg Brendel. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/12/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
|
March 8, 2018 |
Filing
110
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 98 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sarah Pappas. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/8/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing
85
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for Judgment filed by Greg Brendel; granting 69 Motion to Intervene filed by Sarah Pappas for the purpose of determining her rights in the funds held in the state cou rt registry; denying 79 request for judicial notice filed by Greg Brendel; and denying 83 Motion to Vacate filed by Scott Meyrowitz and SSB International, LLC. The court enters a Rule 54(b) final judgment confirming the Arbitration Award and awarding Greg Brendel the sum of $1,018,254.22 against defendants Scott Meyrowitz and SSB International, LLC, jointly and severally. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/30/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court denies defendants' 41 , 48 motions to disburse funds, denies Brendel's 51 motion to stay, and denies Brendel's 44 motion for reconsideration. The court enters a Rule 54(b) judgment dismissing Brendel's actions against Scott and SSB. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/29/2016) (sss)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Meyrowitz and SSB International LLC's ("SSB") 17 motion to compel arbitration is granted, the parties are ordered to arbitrate Brendel's claims in accordance with the Arbitration Agreement, and th is lawsuit is dismissed with prejudice by judgment filed today. Because the court is dismissing this action with prejudice, Brendel's 36 motion for leave to file his third amended complaint, and Meyrowitz and SSB's 37 motion for protective order are denied as moot. Brendel has voluntarily dismissed Charles Schwab Bank and Wells Fargo Bank as defendants. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/25/2016) (axm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?