Green v. Davis, Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Gary Green
Respondent: Lorie Davis, Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2015cv02197
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Barbara M.G. Lynn
Presiding Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is hereby ordered that the referral of this cause to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn. All relief requested by Petitioner is denied. Petitioner is denied a Certificate of Appealability on all of his claims. All other pending motions are dismissed as moot. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/27/2019) (ykp)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: re: 52 Findings and Recommendations on Motion. The Court finds that a reasonable attorney would not regard the requeste d services as sufficiently important to the representation to warrant funding. Green has not shown that the sought services could develop potential merit of the claims that Green wants to pursue. Green has also not shown the likelihood that the ser vices will generate useful and admissible evidence. And with respect to the procedurally defaulted claims, Green has not shown a reasonable prospect that the requested services will be able to clear the obvious procedural hurdles standing in the way. Therefore, Green's opposed post-petition motion for funding (doc. 42 ) is DENIED. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/27/2018) (ndt)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OVERRULING 16 OBJECTIONS AND ACCEPTING 14 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/12/2016) (ykp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Davis, Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Green
Represented By: Lydia MV Brandt
Represented By: Michael Mowla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis, Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Ellen Stewart-Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?